Carolyn Nolen, et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: CAROLYN NOLEN, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated, VINDY KELLEY, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated, CARA KELLEY, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated, PAULA LITTON, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated and WINDY KELLEY, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, INC., FAIRSHARE VACATION OWNERS ASSOCIATION and RCI LLC
Case Number: 22-11128
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kenya J. Reddy for Carolyn Nolen, Cara Kelley, Windy Kelley, and Paula Litton [22-11128] (ECF: Kenya Reddy) [Entered: 05/20/2022 02:24 PM]
May 11, 2022 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 05/11/2022 03:06 PM]
May 9, 2022 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney John Yanchunis for Appellants Carolyn Nolen, Cara Kelley, Paula Litton and Windy Kelley. Appellants brief due on 06/17/2022, with the appendix due seven days from the filing of the brief. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 05/09/2022 02:57 PM]
May 4, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Nathaniel G. Foell for Fairshare Vacation Owners Association Nathaniel Garrett Foell for Fairshare Vacation Owners Association, RCI LLC and Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. [22-11128] (ECF: Nathaniel Foell) [Entered: 05/04/2022 01:11 PM]
May 2, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Joseph H. Lang, Jr. for Appellee Fairshare Vacation Owners Association. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11128] (ECF: Joseph Lang) [Entered: 05/02/2022 04:37 PM]
April 26, 2022 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to John Yanchunis for Carolyn Nolen, Cara Kelley, Paula Litton and Windy Kelley. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 04/26/2022 12:36 PM]
April 26, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Matthew Allen for Fairshare Vacation Owners Association, RCI LLC and Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. [22-11128] (ECF: David Allen) [Entered: 04/26/2022 11:34 AM]
April 25, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney John Yanchunis for Appellants Cara Kelley, Vindy Kelley, Paula Litton and Carolyn Nolen. [22-11128] (ECF: John Yanchunis) [Entered: 04/25/2022 02:01 PM]
April 25, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John Yanchunis for Cara Kelley, Vindy Kelley, Paula Litton and Carolyn Nolen. [22-11128] (ECF: John Yanchunis) [Entered: 04/25/2022 01:46 PM]
April 25, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney John Yanchunis for Appellants Cara Kelley, Vindy Kelley, Paula Litton and Carolyn Nolen. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11128] (ECF: John Yanchunis) [Entered: 04/25/2022 02:05 PM]
April 25, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James M Terrell for Cara Kelley, Windy Kelley, Paula Litton and Carolyn Nolen. [22-11128] (ECF: James Terrell) [Entered: 04/25/2022 06:04 PM]
April 25, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph H. Lang, Jr. for Fairshare Vacation Owners Association [22-11128] (ECF: Joseph Lang) [Entered: 04/25/2022 08:30 PM]
April 8, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Cara Kelley on 04/07/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/18/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/25/2022 as to Appellant Cara Kelley. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/09/2022 as to Appellee Fairshare Vacation Owners Association [Entered: 04/11/2022 12:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Carolyn Nolen, et al v. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CAROLYN NOLEN, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Bradford D. Barron
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle
Represented By: Rodney E. Miller
Represented By: James M. Terrell
Represented By: John Yanchunis
Represented By: Kenya Jamila Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VINDY KELLEY, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Bradford D. Barron
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle
Represented By: Rodney E. Miller
Represented By: James M. Terrell
Represented By: John Yanchunis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARA KELLEY, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Bradford D. Barron
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle
Represented By: Rodney E. Miller
Represented By: James M. Terrell
Represented By: John Yanchunis
Represented By: Kenya Jamila Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAULA LITTON, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Bradford D. Barron
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle
Represented By: Rodney E. Miller
Represented By: James M. Terrell
Represented By: John Yanchunis
Represented By: Kenya Jamila Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WINDY KELLEY, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: John Yanchunis
Represented By: Bradford D. Barron
Represented By: Patrick A. Barthle
Represented By: Rodney E. Miller
Represented By: Kenya Jamila Reddy
Represented By: James M. Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WYNDHAM VACATION RESORTS, INC.
Represented By: David Matthew Allen
Represented By: Chris S. Coutroulis
Represented By: Nathaniel Garrett Foell
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FAIRSHARE VACATION OWNERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: David Matthew Allen
Represented By: Chris S. Coutroulis
Represented By: Nathaniel Garrett Foell
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Joseph H. Lang Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RCI LLC
Represented By: David Matthew Allen
Represented By: Chris S. Coutroulis
Represented By: Nathaniel Garrett Foell
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?