A1A Burrito Works, Inc., et al v. Sysco Jacksonville, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: A1A BURRITO WORKS, INC., a Florida corporation, A1A BURRITO WORKS TACO SHOP 2, INC., a Florida corporation and JUNIPER BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., a Florida corporation, on behalf of themselves and those similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: SYSCO JACKSONVILLE, INC., a Delaware corporation
Case Number: 22-11330
Filed: April 22, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Samuel Felker for Appellee Sysco Jacksonville, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11330] (ECF: Samuel Felker) [Entered: 05/23/2022 04:38 PM]
May 23, 2022 Response to Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Samuel Felker for Appellee Sysco Jacksonville, Inc.. [22-11330] (ECF: Samuel Felker) [Entered: 05/23/2022 04:40 PM]
May 20, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christian S. Daniel for Sysco Jacksonville, Inc. [22-11330] (ECF: Christian Daniel) [Entered: 05/20/2022 08:21 AM]
May 20, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael A. Glick for Sysco Jacksonville, Inc. [22-11330] (ECF: Michael Glick) [Entered: 05/20/2022 08:19 AM]
May 17, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Desislava Docheva for Sysco Jacksonville, Inc.. [22-11330] (ECF: Desislava Docheva) [Entered: 05/17/2022 11:43 AM]
May 17, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Samuel Felker for Sysco Jacksonville, Inc.. [22-11330] (ECF: Samuel Felker) [Entered: 05/17/2022 11:40 AM]
May 13, 2022 ***ENTERED IN ERROR***NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Brian K. Herrington for A1A Burrito Works, Inc., A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 05/13/2022 09:41 AM]
May 11, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brian K. Herrington for Appellants A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc., A1A Burrito Works, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-11330] (ECF: Brian Herrington) [Entered: 05/11/2022 05:02 PM]
May 11, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Brian K. Herrington for Appellants A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc., A1A Burrito Works, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc.. [22-11330] (ECF: Brian Herrington) [Entered: 05/11/2022 05:07 PM]
May 10, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eve A. Cann for Sysco Jacksonville, Inc. [22-11330] (ECF: Eve Cann) [Entered: 05/10/2022 05:29 PM]
May 10, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian K. Herrington for Appellants A1A Burrito Works, Inc., Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc., and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc. [22-11330] (ECF: Brian Herrington) [Entered: 05/10/2022 02:38 PM]
May 6, 2022 30-day Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Janet R. Varnell for Appellants A1A Burrito Works, Inc., A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc.. Appellants brief due on 07/01/2022 as to Appellant A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc.. Appendix due on 07/08/2022 as to Appellant A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc.. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 05/06/2022 03:48 PM]
May 5, 2022 ***NO ACTION TAKEN-see FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii)***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew Peterson for A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc., A1A Burrito Works, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc.. [22-11330] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 05/05/2022 08:14 AM]
May 5, 2022 ***NO ACTION TAKEN-see FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii)***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian W. Warwick for A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc., A1A Burrito Works, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc.. [22-11330] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 05/05/2022 08:11 AM]
May 5, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Janet R. Varnell for A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc., A1A Burrito Works, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc.. [22-11330] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 05/05/2022 08:07 AM]
May 5, 2022 ***NO ACTION TAKEN-see FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii)***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Erika Roxanne Willis for A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc., A1A Burrito Works, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc.. [22-11330] (ECF: Janet Varnell) [Entered: 05/05/2022 08:17 AM]
May 5, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian W. Warwick for A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc., A1A Burrito Works, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc.. [22-11330] (ECF: Brian Warwick) [Entered: 05/05/2022 09:30 AM]
May 5, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew Peterson for A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc., A1A Burrito Works, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc.. [22-11330] (ECF: Matthew Peterson) [Entered: 05/05/2022 09:33 AM]
May 5, 2022 Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Janet R. Varnell for Erika Roxanne Willis, Matthew Peterson, and Brian W. Warwick for A1A Burrito Works, Inc., A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc.. Pursuant to FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii) a person cannot electronically file through another person's account. Please resubmit thru the appropriate account of the ECF filer reflected on the signature block of the filed document. [Entered: 05/05/2022 08:47 AM]
May 5, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Erika Roxanne Willis for A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc., A1A Burrito Works, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc.. [22-11330] (ECF: Erika Willis) [Entered: 05/05/2022 09:34 AM]
April 22, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants A1A Burrito Works Taco Shop 2, Inc., A1A Burrito Works, Inc. and Juniper Beach Enterprises, Inc. on 04/21/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/01/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/11/2022 as to Appellants. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/25/2022 as to Appellees. [Entered: 04/27/2022 10:16 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: A1A Burrito Works, Inc., et al v. Sysco Jacksonville, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A1A BURRITO WORKS, INC., a Florida corporation
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Represented By: Brian R. Morrison
Represented By: Matthew Peterson
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Janet R. Varnell
Represented By: Brian W. Warwick
Represented By: Erika Roxanne Willis
Represented By: John Yanchunis
Represented By: Brian K. Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A1A BURRITO WORKS TACO SHOP 2, INC., a Florida corporation
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Represented By: Brian R. Morrison
Represented By: Matthew Peterson
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Janet R. Varnell
Represented By: Brian W. Warwick
Represented By: Erika Roxanne Willis
Represented By: John Yanchunis
Represented By: Brian K. Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUNIPER BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., a Florida corporation, on behalf of themselves and those similarly situated
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Represented By: Brian R. Morrison
Represented By: Matthew Peterson
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Janet R. Varnell
Represented By: Brian W. Warwick
Represented By: Erika Roxanne Willis
Represented By: John Yanchunis
Represented By: Brian K. Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SYSCO JACKSONVILLE, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Kyle Allen Diamantas
Represented By: Desislava Docheva
Represented By: Samuel L. Felker
Represented By: Samuel Felker
Represented By: Eve A. Cann
Represented By: Christian Daniel
Represented By: Michael Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?