USA v. Clarence Brenson
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: CLARENCE BRENSON
Case Number: 22-11680
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Clarence Brenson, Court Reporter: Cheryl Powell, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 04/25/2022. [Entered: 05/20/2022 03:39 PM]
May 20, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Clarence Brenson, Court Reporter: Roy B. Isbell, Proceeding Type and Date: Other Hearings 05/20/2022. [Entered: 05/20/2022 03:36 PM]
May 18, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher Bodnar for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Alabama for USA. [22-11680] (ECF: Christopher Bodnar) [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:26 PM]
May 16, 2022 CJA appointment issued by this court to Attorney Andrew M. Jones for Appellant Clarence Brenson. [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:18 PM]
May 16, 2022 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Clarence Brenson on 05/02/2022. Fee Status: IFP Pending. USDC motion pending: Motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis and Motion for appointment of counsel filed on 05/02/2022. [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Clarence Brenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Christopher John Bodnar
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CLARENCE BRENSON
Represented By: Andrew M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?