Jay Gould v. Interface, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: JAY D. GOULD
Defendant / Appellee: INTERFACE, INC.
Case Number: 22-12340
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Jobs
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Thomas M. Clyde for Appellee Interface, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12340] (ECF: Thomas Clyde) [Entered: 08/16/2022 02:09 PM]
August 15, 2022 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Jay D. Gould. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/16/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/15/2022 01:41 PM]
August 12, 2022 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Geraldine Glover, Filer: Jay D. Gould, Dt. all Trans. Filed: 08/07/2022, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 10/26/2021. [Entered: 08/12/2022 08:03 AM]
August 11, 2022 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 08/11/2022 03:57 PM]
August 5, 2022 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Stephen E. Hudson for Interface, Inc. is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 08/05/2022 02:44 PM]
August 5, 2022 Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Geraldine Glover, 07/25/2022, Jay D. Gould, Pre-Trial Proceedings 10/26/2021. [Entered: 08/05/2022 11:21 AM]
August 2, 2022 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Keith R. Blackwell for Appellant Jay D. Gould. [22-12340] (ECF: Keith Blackwell) [Entered: 08/02/2022 02:27 PM]
August 2, 2022 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Keith R. Blackwell for Appellant Jay D. Gould. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-12340] (ECF: Keith Blackwell) [Entered: 08/02/2022 02:49 PM]
August 1, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lesli Nicole Gaither for Interface, Inc.. [22-12340] (ECF: Lesli Gaither) [Entered: 08/01/2022 01:09 PM]
August 1, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Allen Garrett for Appellee Interface [22-12340] (ECF: Curtis Garrett) [Entered: 08/01/2022 11:57 AM]
August 1, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen E. Hudson for Interface, Inc.. [22-12340] (ECF: Stephen Hudson) [Entered: 08/01/2022 11:42 AM]
August 1, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas M. Clyde for Interface, Inc.. [22-12340] (ECF: Thomas Clyde) [Entered: 08/01/2022 11:52 AM]
July 27, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert H. Poole II for Jay Gould [22-12340] (ECF: Robert Poole) [Entered: 07/27/2022 06:38 PM]
July 26, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Jay D. Gould, Court Reporter: Geraldine Glover, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 10/26/2021. [Entered: 07/26/2022 10:13 AM]
July 26, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Keith Blackwell for Jay Gould [22-12340] (ECF: Keith Blackwell) [Entered: 07/26/2022 04:10 PM]
July 25, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David Wayne Long-Daniels for Jay D. Gould. [22-12340] (ECF: David Long-Daniels) [Entered: 07/25/2022 06:45 PM]
July 25, 2022 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney David Wayne Long-Daniels for Appellant Jay D. Gould. Transcript(s) ordered. [22-12340] (ECF: David Long-Daniels) [Entered: 07/25/2022 06:49 PM]
July 25, 2022 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Merrie Allyson Lumpkin for Jay D. Gould. [22-12340] (ECF: Merrie Lumpkin) [Entered: 07/25/2022 06:54 PM]
July 14, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jay D. Gould on 07/12/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/02/2022 as to Appellant Jay D. Gould. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/16/2022 as to Appellee Interface, Inc. [Entered: 07/19/2022 01:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jay Gould v. Interface, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAY D. GOULD
Represented By: David Wayne Long-Daniels
Represented By: Merrie Allyson Lumpkin
Represented By: Keith R. Blackwell
Represented By: Robert Howard Poole II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERFACE, INC.
Represented By: Thomas M. Clyde
Represented By: Lesli Nicole Gaither
Represented By: Stephen E. Hudson
Represented By: Brittany Nash
Represented By: Curtis Allen Garrett Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?