Augustus Rose, Jr. v. Noel Stephen, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: AUGUSTUS ROSE, JR.
Defendant / Appellee: NOEL E. STEPHEN, Okeechobee County Lead Official Sheriff Commander, Okeechobee County Sheriff Department, in individual and official capacities, HUASCAR OSCAR MOREIRA, Okeechobee County Sheriff Jail Deputy, Okeechobee County Sheriff Department, in individual and official capacities, OKEECHOBEE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, in individual and official capacities, TRI COUNTY HEALTH-CARE PROVIDER, Okeechobee County Jail, in individual and official capacities, GARY BELL, Okeechobee County Sheriff Department, in individual and official capacities, DAVID HAZELIEF, District 1, Board of County Commissioners, in individual and official capacities, BRYANT CULPEPPER, District 2, Board of County Commissioners, in individual and official capacities, BRADLEY G. GOODBREAD, District 3, Board of County Commissioners, in individual and official capacities, TERRY BURROUGHS, District 4, Board of County Commissioners, in individual and official capacities, KELLY OWENS, District 5, Board of County Commissioners, in individual and official capacities, D. GAILDART, Medical Doctor, FNU, KATHY, Physician Assistant (last name unknown), LINDA HERDON, Lead Medical Nurse at Okeechobee County Jail, KEARSTIN DORRANCE, P.A. and M.D. at Okeechobee County Jail and JENNIFER BANKER, Nurse Assistant at Okeechobee County Jail
Case Number: 22-13740
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner-Civil Rights (US not def)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the Appellant Augustus Rose, Jr. failed to pay the filing and docketing fees (or file a motion in the district court for relief from the obligation to pay in advance the full fee) to the district court within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 12/20/2022 08:51 AM]
December 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Augustus Rose, Jr.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:23 PM]
November 3, 2022 PRISONER (PLRA) APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Augustus Rose, Jr. on 11/03/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid.. [Entered: 11/09/2022 03:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Augustus Rose, Jr. v. Noel Stephen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AUGUSTUS ROSE, JR.
Represented By: Augustus Rose Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NOEL E. STEPHEN, Okeechobee County Lead Official Sheriff Commander, Okeechobee County Sheriff Department, in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUASCAR OSCAR MOREIRA, Okeechobee County Sheriff Jail Deputy, Okeechobee County Sheriff Department, in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OKEECHOBEE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRI COUNTY HEALTH-CARE PROVIDER, Okeechobee County Jail, in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARY BELL, Okeechobee County Sheriff Department, in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID HAZELIEF, District 1, Board of County Commissioners, in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRYANT CULPEPPER, District 2, Board of County Commissioners, in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRADLEY G. GOODBREAD, District 3, Board of County Commissioners, in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERRY BURROUGHS, District 4, Board of County Commissioners, in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KELLY OWENS, District 5, Board of County Commissioners, in individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. GAILDART, Medical Doctor, FNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHY, Physician Assistant (last name unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LINDA HERDON, Lead Medical Nurse at Okeechobee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEARSTIN DORRANCE, P.A. and M.D. at Okeechobee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER BANKER, Nurse Assistant at Okeechobee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?