Stephen Sewalk, et al v. Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEPHEN SEWALK and SMS BUSINESS ENTITIES, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: VALPAK DIRECT MARKETING SYSTEMS, LLC
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Case Number: 22-13819
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Filing 45 Certificate of Mailing Affidavit of Stephen Sewalk to Court for filing under seal filed by Attorney Anthony Garcia for Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc.. [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 10/16/2023 03:50 PM]
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Motion to supplement the record filed by Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc. is GRANTED. [ # 23 ] ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION. (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 10/16/2023 09:41 AM]
September 8, 2023 Filing 43 Attorney Anthony Garcia for Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc. hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 11/15/2023. Anthony A. Garcia, Tel: (720) 663-1834 will present argument. [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 09/08/2023 12:37 PM]
September 7, 2023 Filing 42 Oral argument scheduled. Argument Date: Wednesday, 11/15/2023 Argument Location: Atlanta Courtroom: Atlanta 339. [Entered: 09/07/2023 12:15 PM]
September 7, 2023 Filing 41 Attorney Joseph Trumon Phillips for Appellee Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 11/15/2023. Eric Goldberg (cell phone # 310-948-6418) will present argument. [22-13819] (ECF: Joseph Phillips) [Entered: 09/07/2023 11:29 AM]
September 7, 2023 Filing 40 Attorney Anthony Garcia for Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc. hereby acknowledges receipt of a copy of the printed calendar for 11/13/2023. Anthony A. Garcia, Tel: (720) 663-1834 will present argument. [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 09/07/2023 11:16 AM]
September 7, 2023 Filing 39 Calendar issued as to cases to be orally argued the week of 11/13/2023 in Atlanta, Georgia. Counsel are directed to electronically acknowledge receipt of this calendar by docketing the Calendar Receipt Acknowledged event in ECF (a document upload is not required). [Entered: 09/07/2023 09:52 AM]
August 28, 2023 Filing 38 Four Additional copies of Appellee's Brief and Supplemental Appendix received from Joseph Trumon Phillips for Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC and forwarded to the record room. [Entered: 08/28/2023 04:04 PM]
August 28, 2023 Filing 37 Four Additional copies of Appellant's Brief, Appendix and Reply Brief received from Anthony Garcia for Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc. and forwarded to the record room. [Entered: 08/28/2023 04:03 PM]
August 24, 2023 Filing 36 This appeal has been removed from tentative calendar # 5 and will be reassigned at a later date. [Entered: 08/24/2023 09:59 AM]
August 21, 2023 Filing 35 Assigned to tentative calendar number 5 in Atlanta during the week of December 11, 2023. You must file an additional 3 identical paper copies of the briefs and appendices within 7 days of the date of this notice, unless you previously provided the additional copies. [Entered: 08/21/2023 11:16 AM]
March 21, 2023 Filing 34 Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Appellants SMS Business Entities, Inc. and Stephen Sewalk. [Entered: 03/21/2023 11:17 AM]
March 17, 2023 Filing 33 Reply Brief filed by Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc.. [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 03/17/2023 07:10 PM]
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Appellants Motion to Supplement Record with Stephen Sewalks Affidavit Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 10(e) is CARRIED WITH THE CASE. [ # 23 ] RSR (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 03/10/2023 03:38 PM]
February 27, 2023 Filing 31 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellee Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC. 2 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 02/27/2023 03:10 PM]
February 27, 2023 Filing 30 Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Appellee Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC. [Entered: 02/27/2023 03:10 PM]
February 24, 2023 Filing 29 Supplemental Appendix [2 VOLUMES] filed by Appellee Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC. [22-13819] (ECF: Joseph Phillips) [Entered: 02/24/2023 01:19 PM]
February 24, 2023 Filing 28 Appellee's Brief filed by Appellee Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC. [22-13819] (ECF: Joseph Phillips) [Entered: 02/24/2023 01:04 PM]
February 10, 2023 Filing 27 Reply to response filed by Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc.. [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 02/10/2023 07:16 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion to supplement the record filed by Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc. [ # 23 ] filed by Attorney Joseph Trumon Phillips for Appellee Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC. [22-13819] (ECF: Joseph Phillips) [Entered: 02/03/2023 01:45 PM]
February 2, 2023 Filing 25 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants SMS Business Entities, Inc. and Stephen Sewalk. 1 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 02/02/2023 03:07 PM]
February 1, 2023 Filing 24 Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc.. [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 02/01/2023 12:53 PM]
January 30, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to supplement the record filed by Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc.. Motion is Opposed. [23] [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 01/30/2023 12:17 PM]
January 30, 2023 Filing 22 Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Appellants SMS Business Entities, Inc. and Stephen Sewalk. [Entered: 01/30/2023 11:29 AM]
January 26, 2023 Filing 21 Appellant's brief filed by Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc.. [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 01/26/2023 07:39 PM]
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc. is GRANTED by clerk [ # 19 ]. Appellants brief is due on 01/26/2023, with the appendix due seven (7) days from the filing of the brief. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 12/19/2022 04:11 PM]
December 18, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 01/26/2023 filed by Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc.. Motion is Unopposed. [19] [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 12/18/2022 04:01 PM]
December 18, 2022 Filing 18 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Anthony Garcia for Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 12/18/2022 03:39 PM]
December 15, 2022 Filing 17 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 12/15/2022 04:28 PM]
December 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Joseph Trumon Phillips for Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 12/15/2022 03:34 PM]
December 14, 2022 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Joseph Trumon Phillips for Appellee Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13819] (ECF: Joseph Phillips) [Entered: 12/14/2022 04:28 PM]
December 9, 2022 Filing 14 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Anthony Garcia for Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc.. [Entered: 12/09/2022 04:25 PM]
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time filed by Appellant Stephen Sewalk is GRANTED by clerk [ # 12 ]. [Entered: 12/09/2022 04:24 PM]
December 9, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement form out of time filed by Stephen Sewalk. Motion is Unopposed. [12] [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 12/09/2022 12:43 PM]
December 2, 2022 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Anthony Garcia for Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 12/02/2022 05:13 PM]
December 2, 2022 Filing 10 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Trumon Phillips for Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC. [22-13819] (ECF: Joseph Phillips) [Entered: 12/02/2022 05:02 PM]
December 2, 2022 Filing 9 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David M. Riley for Appellee [22-13819] (ECF: David Riley) [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:58 PM]
December 2, 2022 Filing 8 Public Communication: According to our records, J. Trumon Phillips for Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. See FRAP 46, and the accompanying circuit rules. Please contact attorney admissions at 404-335-6122 for further information regarding your admission. [Entered: 12/02/2022 03:38 PM]
December 2, 2022 Filing 7 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Anthony Garcia for Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc.. [22-13819] (ECF: Anthony Garcia) [Entered: 12/02/2022 02:56 PM]
December 2, 2022 Filing 6 Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, J. Trumon Phillips for Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. See FRAP 46, and the accompanying circuit rules. [Entered: 12/02/2022 02:53 PM]
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Eric Goldberg for Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC. [22-13819] (ECF: Eric Goldberg) [Entered: 12/02/2022 02:24 PM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 Anthony Garcia and Adam M. Wolfe for Appellants Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc. have been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 12/01/2022 02:27 PM]
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Anthony Garcia and Adam M. Wolfe for Stephen Sewalk and SMS Business Entities, Inc.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). [Entered: 12/01/2022 02:22 PM]
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 ***NO ACTION TAKEN-see FRAP 46 ***APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC J. Trumon Phillips for Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC. [22-13819]--[Edited 12/02/2022 by EBL] (ECF: Joseph Phillips) [Entered: 11/30/2022 05:54 PM]
November 14, 2022 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants SMS Business Entities, Inc. and Stephen Sewalk on 11/11/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/27/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/30/2022 as to Appellant Stephen Sewalk. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/14/2022 as to Appellee Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC [Entered: 11/16/2022 01:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Stephen Sewalk, et al v. Valpak Direct Marketing Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN SEWALK
Represented By: Anthony A. Garcia
Represented By: Adam M. Wolfe
Represented By: Anthony Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SMS BUSINESS ENTITIES, INC.
Represented By: Anthony A. Garcia
Represented By: Adam M. Wolfe
Represented By: Anthony Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VALPAK DIRECT MARKETING SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: Eric Goldberg
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Represented By: Jonathan Serrano
Represented By: Joseph Trumon Phillips
Represented By: David Michael Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: D. David Keller
Represented By: Raymond L. Robin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?