Securities and Exchange Commission v. Justin Keener
Plaintiff / Appellee: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant / Appellant: JUSTIN W. KEENER
Case Number: 22-14237
Filed: December 22, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Filing 21 Reply to response filed by Appellant Justin W. Keener. [22-14237] (ECF: Helgard Walker) [Entered: 02/16/2023 11:40 AM]
February 9, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Justin W. Keener [ # 19 ] filed by Attorney Archith Ramkumar for Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission. [22-14237] (ECF: Archith Ramkumar) [Entered: 02/09/2023 02:31 PM]
January 30, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to consolidate appeals 22-14237 and 21-13755 filed by Justin W. Keener. Motion is Opposed. [19] [22-14237] (ECF: Helgard Walker) [Entered: 01/30/2023 12:58 PM]
January 6, 2023 Filing 17 Response to Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Archith Ramkumar for Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission. [22-14237] (ECF: Archith Ramkumar) [Entered: 01/06/2023 02:49 PM]
January 6, 2023 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Archith Ramkumar for Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-14237] (ECF: Archith Ramkumar) [Entered: 01/06/2023 01:00 PM]
January 6, 2023 Filing 15 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Christopher Regan for Justin W. Keener. [22-14237] (ECF: Christopher Regan) [Entered: 01/06/2023 08:48 AM]
January 5, 2023 Filing 18 Returned Mail was received for Attorney Jane Serene Raskin for Appellant Justin W. Keener. [Entered: 01/09/2023 02:59 PM]
January 5, 2023 Filing 14 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 01/05/2023 04:35 PM]
January 4, 2023 Filing 13 Returned Mail was received for Attorney Jane Serene Raskin for Appellant Justin W. Keener. IN RE: DKT-2 Appeal WITH Deficiency dated December 27, 2022. [Entered: 01/04/2023 05:28 PM]
January 4, 2023 Filing 12 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Archith Ramkumar for Appellee Securities & Exchange Commission [22-14237] (ECF: Archith Ramkumar) [Entered: 01/04/2023 01:21 PM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 11 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Brian Alan Richman for Appellant Justin W. Keener. [22-14237] (ECF: Brian Richman) [Entered: 12/29/2022 01:30 PM]
December 29, 2022 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brian Alan Richman for Appellant Justin W. Keener. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-14237] (ECF: Brian Richman) [Entered: 12/29/2022 01:27 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 9 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Justin W. Keener. The appellant's brief is due on or before 01/31/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 12/28/2022 04:32 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Brian Alan Richman for Appellant Justin W. Keener. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 12/28/2022 04:29 PM]
December 28, 2022 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Brian Alan Richman for Appellant Justin W. Keener. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [22-14237] (ECF: Brian Richman) [Entered: 12/28/2022 04:00 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian A. Richman for Justin W. Keener [22-14237] (ECF: Brian Richman) [Entered: 12/27/2022 05:12 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 5 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by M. Jonathan Seibald for Justin W. Keener [22-14237] (ECF: M. Seibald) [Entered: 12/27/2022 05:07 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Barry R. Goldsmith for Justin W. Keener [22-14237] (ECF: Barry Goldsmith) [Entered: 12/27/2022 05:05 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Helgi C. Walker for Justin W. Keener [22-14237] (ECF: Helgard Walker) [Entered: 12/27/2022 05:02 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 2 According to our records, Benjamin Greenberg for Justin W. Keener is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. See FRAP 46, and the accompanying circuit rules. [Entered: 12/27/2022 02:06 PM]
December 22, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Justin W. Keener on 12/21/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/10/2023 as to Appellant Justin W. Keener. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/24/2023 as to Appellee Securities and Exchange Commission. [Entered: 12/27/2022 01:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Justin Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Joshua E. Braunstein
Represented By: Antony Richard Petrilla
Represented By: Archith Ramkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JUSTIN W. KEENER
Represented By: Helgard C. Walker
Represented By: Jared Edward Dwyer
Represented By: Barry Goldsmith
Represented By: Benjamin Greenberg
Represented By: Adam Miller
Represented By: Jane Serene Raskin
Represented By: Christopher F. Regan
Represented By: Brian Alan Richman
Represented By: M. Jonathan Seibald
Represented By: Christopher Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?