USA v. $389,820.00 in United States Currency, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: $389,820.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, $15,780.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, 4,550.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, 1972 CHEVROLET CHEVELLE SS 396, VIN: 1D37H2R582820, WITH ALL APPURTENANCES AND ATTACHMENTS THEREON and MISCELLANEOUS JEWELRY, NAMELY: 18K YELLOW GOLD ROLEX WATCH, SIDE SERIAL NOS. V390198 AND 218238, INSIDE SERIAL NOS. 2418; 3-ROW 14K YELLOW GOLD DIAMOND BRACELET WITH 11.47 CARATS IN 93 DIAMONDS; A 32
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Case Number: 23-10376
Filed: February 3, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2023 Filing 14 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Michael Lee Kidd for Appellants. [Entered: 03/22/2023 02:58 PM]
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Appellants' motion for leave to file the civil appeal statement out of time is GRANTED by clerk [ # 8 ]. [Entered: 03/22/2023 02:54 PM]
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellants $389,820.00 in United States Currency, $15,780.00 in United States Currency, 4,550.00 in United States Currency, 1972 Chevrolet Chevelle SS 396, VIN: 1D37H2R582820, with all appurtenances and attachments thereon and Miscellaneous Jewelry, namely: 18k yellow gold Rolex watch, side serial nos. v390198 and 218238, inside serial nos. 2418; 3-row 14k yellow gold diamond bracelet with 11.47 carats in 93 diamonds; a 32 is GRANTED by clerk [ # 11 ]. Appellants brief is due on 04/12/2023, with the appendix due (7) days thereafter. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 03/21/2023 02:14 PM]
March 19, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 03/20/2023 filed by $15,780.00 in United States Currency, $389,820.00 in United States Currency, 1972 Chevrolet Chevelle SS 396, VIN: 1D37H2R582820, with all appurtenances and attachments thereon, 4,550.00 in United States Currency and Miscellaneous Jewelry, namely: 18k yellow gold Rolex watch, side serial nos. v390198 and 218238, inside serial nos. 2418; 3-row 14k yellow gold diamond bracelet with 11.47 carats in 93 diamonds; a 32. Motion is Unopposed. [11] [23-10376] (ECF: Michael Kidd) [Entered: 03/19/2023 11:32 PM]
March 10, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of deficient Civil Appeal Statement filed by Michael Lee Kidd for $389,820.00 in United States Currency, $15,780.00 in United States Currency, 4,550.00 in United States Currency, 1972 Chevrolet Chevelle SS 396, VIN: 1D37H2R582820, with all appurtenances and attachments thereon, Miscellaneous Jewelry, namely: 18k yellow gold Rolex watch, side serial nos. v390198 and 218238, inside serial nos. 2418; 3-row 14k yellow gold diamond bracelet with 11.47 carats in 93 diamonds; a 32 and Service. Incorrect Event used to file a document. Please re-file the document using the "motion" event within (3) days. [Entered: 03/10/2023 10:17 AM]
March 6, 2023 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-10376] (ECF: Michael Kidd) [Entered: 03/06/2023 05:37 PM]
March 6, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement Out of Time out of time filed by Appellants $15,780.00 in United States Currency, $389,820.00 in United States Currency, 1972 Chevrolet Chevelle SS 396, VIN: 1D37H2R582820, with all appurtenances and attachments thereon, 4,550.00 in United States Currency and Miscellaneous Jewelry, namely: 18k yellow gold Rolex watch, side serial nos. v390198 and 218238, inside serial nos. 2418; 3-row 14k yellow gold diamond bracelet with 11.47 carats in 93 diamonds; a 32. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8] --[Edited 03/21/2023 by TLS] (ECF: Michael Kidd) [Entered: 03/06/2023 04:59 PM]
March 6, 2023 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Brett J. Talley. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-10376] (ECF: Brett Talley) [Entered: 03/06/2023 11:48 AM]
March 3, 2023 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Alabama for USA. [23-10376] (ECF: Brett Talley) [Entered: 03/03/2023 04:28 PM]
March 2, 2023 Filing 5 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Lee Kidd for Service. [23-10376] (ECF: Michael Kidd) [Entered: 03/02/2023 06:21 PM]
February 28, 2023 Filing 4 Attorney Joe Reed for Appellants $389,820.00 in United States Currency, $15,780.00 in United States Currency, 4,550.00 in United States Currency, 1972 Chevrolet Chevelle SS 396, VIN: 1D37H2R582820, with all appurtenances and attachments thereon and Miscellaneous Jewelry, namely: 18k yellow gold Rolex watch, side serial nos. v390198 and 218238, inside serial nos. 2418; 3-row 14k yellow gold diamond bracelet with 11.47 carats in 93 diamonds; a 32 has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 02/28/2023 03:52 PM]
February 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Joe Reed for $389,820.00 in United States Currency, $15,780.00 in United States Currency, 4,550.00 in United States Currency, 1972 Chevrolet Chevelle SS 396, VIN: 1D37H2R582820, with all appurtenances and attachments thereon and Miscellaneous Jewelry, namely: 18k yellow gold Rolex watch, side serial nos. v390198 and 218238, inside serial nos. 2418; 3-row 14k yellow gold diamond bracelet with 11.47 carats in 93 diamonds; a 32. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 02/28/2023 03:51 PM]
February 3, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants $15,780.00 in United States Currency, $389,820.00 in United States Currency, 1972 Chevrolet Chevelle SS 396, VIN: 1D37H2R582820, with all appurtenances and attachments thereon, 4,550.00 in United States Currency and Miscellaneous Jewelry, namely: 18k yellow gold Rolex watch, side serial nos. v390198 and 218238, inside serial nos. 2418; 3-row 14k yellow gold diamond bracelet with 11.47 carats in 93 diamonds; a 32 on 01/31/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/15/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/21/2023 as to Appellant $389,820.00 in United States Currency. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/07/2023 as to Appellee United States of America [Entered: 02/07/2023 12:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. $389,820.00 in United States Currency, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Eric Counts
Represented By: Russell Turner Duraski
Represented By: Verne H. Speirs
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Alabama
Represented By: Brett Joseph Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: $389,820.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Represented By: Joe Reed
Represented By: Michael Lee Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: $15,780.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Represented By: Joe Reed
Represented By: Michael Lee Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: 4,550.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Represented By: Joe Reed
Represented By: Michael Lee Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: 1972 CHEVROLET CHEVELLE SS 396, VIN: 1D37H2R582820, WITH ALL APPURTENANCES AND ATTACHMENTS THEREON
Represented By: Joe Reed
Represented By: Michael Lee Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MISCELLANEOUS JEWELRY, NAMELY: 18K YELLOW GOLD ROLEX WATCH, SIDE SERIAL NOS. V390198 AND 218238, INSIDE SERIAL NOS. 2418; 3-ROW 14K YELLOW GOLD DIAMOND BRACELET WITH 11.47 CARATS IN 93 DIAMONDS; A 32
Represented By: Joe Reed
Represented By: Michael Lee Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Michael Lee Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?