January Littlejohn, et al v. School Board of Leon County Florida, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JANUARY LITTLEJOHN and JEFFREY LITTLEJOHN
Defendant / Appellee: SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY FLORIDA, ROBIN OLIVERI, RACHEL THOMAS, ROCKY HANNA and DR. KATHLEEN RODGERS
Case Number: 23-10385
Filed: February 6, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2023 Filing 17 Amended motion to reinstate appeal filed by January Littlejohn and Jeffrey Littlejohn. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [17] [23-10385] (ECF: Mary McAlister) [Entered: 03/29/2023 01:02 PM]
March 20, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to reinstate appeal filed by January Littlejohn and Jeffrey Littlejohn. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [16] [23-10385] (ECF: Mary McAlister) [Entered: 03/20/2023 02:23 PM]
March 20, 2023 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-10385] (ECF: Mary McAlister) [Entered: 03/20/2023 02:18 PM]
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant January Littlejohn and Jeffrey Littlejohn failed to comply with the rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 03/20/2023 10:18 AM]
March 8, 2023 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jeffrey Slanker for Appellees Rocky Hanna, Robin Oliveri, Dr. Kathleen Rodgers, School Board of Leon County Florida and Rachel Thomas. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-10385] (ECF: Jeffrey Slanker) [Entered: 03/08/2023 09:04 PM]
February 28, 2023 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 02/28/2023 03:30 PM]
February 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Mary Elizabeth McAlister for January Littlejohn and Jeffrey Littlejohn. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. If you are an appellant or petitioner, upon expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice, your appeal will be dismissed for want of prosecution if the default has not been remedied, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b). If you are an appellee or respondent, no action will be taken on documents submitted until the CIP deficiency is remedied. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-5. [Entered: 02/24/2023 02:19 PM]
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The motion for extension of time to and including May 4, 2023, in which to file the Appellants brief is GRANTED, with the appendix due seven (7) days from the filing of the brief. [ # 3 ]. ELB (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 02/22/2023 03:16 PM]
February 22, 2023 Filing 9 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Vernadette Ramirez Broyles for January Littlejohn and Jeffrey Littlejohn. [23-10385] (ECF: Vernadette Broyles) [Entered: 02/22/2023 10:35 AM]
February 22, 2023 Filing 8 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Mary Elizabeth McAlister for Appellants January Littlejohn and Jeffrey Littlejohn. [23-10385] (ECF: Mary McAlister) [Entered: 02/22/2023 10:32 AM]
February 22, 2023 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Mary Elizabeth McAlister for Appellants January Littlejohn and Jeffrey Littlejohn. No hearings. [23-10385] (ECF: Mary McAlister) [Entered: 02/22/2023 10:25 AM]
February 21, 2023 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Terry Joseph Harmon for Rocky Hanna, Robin Oliveri, Dr. Kathleen Rodgers, School Board of Leon County Florida and Rachel Thomas. [23-10385] (ECF: Terry Harmon) [Entered: 02/21/2023 11:44 AM]
February 21, 2023 Filing 5 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael P. Spellman for Rocky Hanna, Robin Oliveri, Dr. Kathleen Rodgers, School Board of Leon County Florida and Rachel Thomas. [23-10385] (ECF: Michael Spellman) [Entered: 02/21/2023 11:41 AM]
February 21, 2023 Filing 4 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey Slanker for Rocky Hanna, Robin Oliveri, Dr. Kathleen Rodgers, School Board of Leon County Florida and Rachel Thomas. [23-10385] (ECF: Jeffrey Slanker) [Entered: 02/21/2023 11:37 AM]
February 16, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 05/04/2023, for extension of time to file appendix to 05/11/2023 filed by January Littlejohn and Jeffrey Littlejohn. Motion is Unopposed. [3] [23-10385] (ECF: Mary McAlister) [Entered: 02/16/2023 03:16 PM]
February 16, 2023 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mary Elizabeth McAlister for January Littlejohn and Jeffrey Littlejohn. [23-10385] (ECF: Mary McAlister) [Entered: 02/16/2023 03:05 PM]
February 6, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants January Littlejohn and Jeffrey Littlejohn on 02/03/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/20/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/22/2023 as to Appellant January Littlejohn. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/08/2023 as to Appellee School Board of Leon County Florida [Entered: 02/08/2023 03:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: January Littlejohn, et al v. School Board of Leon County Florida, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANUARY LITTLEJOHN
Represented By: Vernadette Ramirez Broyles
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Represented By: Ernest G. Trakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY LITTLEJOHN
Represented By: Vernadette Ramirez Broyles
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Represented By: Ernest G. Trakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCHOOL BOARD OF LEON COUNTY FLORIDA
Represented By: Terry Joseph Harmon
Represented By: Jeffrey Slanker
Represented By: Michael P. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBIN OLIVERI
Represented By: Terry Joseph Harmon
Represented By: Jeffrey Slanker
Represented By: Michael P. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RACHEL THOMAS
Represented By: Terry Joseph Harmon
Represented By: Jeffrey Slanker
Represented By: Michael P. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROCKY HANNA
Represented By: Terry Joseph Harmon
Represented By: Jeffrey Slanker
Represented By: Michael P. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. KATHLEEN RODGERS
Represented By: Terry Joseph Harmon
Represented By: Jeffrey Slanker
Represented By: Michael P. Spellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?