USA v. Jason Martinez
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: JASON C. MARTINEZ
Case Number: 23-11297
Filed: April 19, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2023 Filing 8 Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Date filed: 04/25/2023, DE # 160. Transcript Order: Donna Boland, 04/27/2023, Jason C. Martinez, Sentencing 01/20/2023. [Entered: 04/27/2023 02:56 PM]
April 27, 2023 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Jason C. Martinez, Court Reporter: Donna Boland, Proceeding Type and Date: Sentencing for co-defendant Chad Dennison 01/20/2023. [Entered: 04/27/2023 09:35 AM]
April 26, 2023 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert G. Davies for U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Florida for USA. Related cases? No. [23-11297] (ECF: Robert Davies) [Entered: 04/26/2023 01:28 PM]
April 26, 2023 Filing 5 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jennifer H. Callahan for USA Related cases? No. [23-11297] (ECF: Jennifer Callahan) [Entered: 04/26/2023 09:26 AM]
April 24, 2023 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Marcos Beaton, Jr. for Appellant Jason C. Martinez. Transcript(s) ordered. [23-11297] (ECF: Marcos Beaton) [Entered: 04/24/2023 05:34 PM]
April 24, 2023 Filing 3 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Marcos Beaton, Jr. for Appellant Jason C. Martinez. Transcript(s) ordered. [23-11297] (ECF: Marcos Beaton) [Entered: 04/24/2023 05:13 PM]
April 24, 2023 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Related cases? No. [23-11297] (ECF: Marcos Beaton) [Entered: 04/24/2023 04:35 PM]
April 19, 2023 Filing 1 CRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jason C. Martinez on 04/18/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. [Entered: 04/24/2023 03:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Jason Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jennifer Callahan
Represented By: Robert G. Davies
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JASON C. MARTINEZ
Represented By: Marcos Beaton Jr.
Represented By: John Anthony Terrezza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?