Michael Kaufman, et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHAEL C. KAUFMAN, MARY JACKSON ROBINSON, DIANA MYERS, CHERYL BUTLER-ADAMS, DEBRAH HENRY, DAVID WHITAKER, JOHN BRUGALETTA, DONOVAN J. JACOBS, GENE PALENO, JAY RIOJAS, VICTOR KHOURY, LAURIE REYNOLDS, RUSHELLE GONDER, PEDRO LUCERO, RONALDO MALDIA, PAULETTE CALHOUN, SUSAN KNAPP, BETTIE TAYLOR, DAPHNE BRIDGES, KENNETH MELDE, KRISTEN NEVARES, MARCELA WARMSLEY, MELINDA M. HARMS, ERICKA BLACK, ROBERT CERVELLI, GORDON MCFARLAND, RAMAND GIDDINGS, JUDITH GROSS, VICKY KEEN, GERALD MUEHL, JOHN FUESTING, PRISCILLA FUESTING, ELIZABETH WASHINGTON, DANIEL DWINNELLS and CARLA CAMPAGNONE
Defendant / Appellee: SEKOU GARY, GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, SEAN HULL, JAMES MCCAIN, ASHLEY MCCAIN, DAIMLER AG, MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, FCA US LLC, GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY and GENERAL MOTORS HOLDING LLC
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Case Number: 23-11402
Filed: April 28, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 22, 2024 Michael Kaufman, et al v. FCA US LLC, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2023 Filing 37 Returned Mail was received for Attorney William E. McDonald, III for Appellee FCA US LLC. IN RE: 06/29/2023 JQ [Entered: 07/19/2023 12:16 PM]
July 13, 2023 Filing 36 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants Ericka Black, Daphne Bridges, John Brugaletta, Cheryl Butler-Adams, Paulette Calhoun, Carla Campagnone, Robert Cervelli, Daniel Dwinnells, John Fuesting, Priscilla Fuesting, Ramand Giddings, Rushelle Gonder, Judith Gross, Melinda M. Harms, Debrah Henry, Donovan J. Jacobs, Michael C. Kaufman, Vicky Keen, Victor Khoury, Susan Knapp, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia, Gordon McFarland, Kenneth Melde, Gerald Muehl, Diana Myers, Kristen Nevares, Gene Paleno, Laurie Reynolds, Jay Riojas, Mary Jackson Robinson, Bettie Taylor, Marcela Warmsley, Elizabeth Washington, David Whitaker and Not Party Service [23-11402] (ECF: Matthew Weinshall) [Entered: 07/13/2023 11:35 PM]
July 13, 2023 Filing 35 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees General Motors Company, General Motors Holding LLC and General Motors, LLC [23-11402] (ECF: Renee Smith) [Entered: 07/13/2023 05:19 PM]
July 13, 2023 Filing 34 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees DAI and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC [23-11402] (ECF: Troy Yoshino) [Entered: 07/13/2023 04:13 PM]
July 13, 2023 Filing 33 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee FCA US LLC [23-11402] (ECF: Daniel Graham) [Entered: 07/13/2023 03:09 PM]
July 10, 2023 Filing 32 Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Appellants' briefs are due 8/16/2023, with the appellants' appendices due within seven days of the filing date of the appellants' briefs. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 07/10/2023 03:44 PM]
June 30, 2023 Filing 31 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Ericka Black, Daphne Bridges, John Brugaletta, Cheryl Butler-Adams, Paulette Calhoun, Carla Campagnone, Robert Cervelli, Daniel Dwinnells, John Fuesting, Priscilla Fuesting, Ramand Giddings, Rushelle Gonder, Judith Gross, Melinda M. Harms, Debrah Henry, Donovan J. Jacobs, Michael C. Kaufman, Vicky Keen, Victor Khoury, Susan Knapp, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia, Gordon McFarland, Kenneth Melde, Gerald Muehl, Diana Myers, Kristen Nevares, Gene Paleno, Laurie Reynolds, Jay Riojas, Mary Jackson Robinson, Bettie Taylor, Marcela Warmsley, Elizabeth Washington and David Whitaker. The appellant's brief is due on or before 07/17/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 06/30/2023 03:42 PM]
June 29, 2023 Filing 30 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Ericka Black, Daphne Bridges, John Brugaletta, Cheryl Butler-Adams, Paulette Calhoun, Carla Campagnone, Robert Cervelli, Daniel Dwinnells, John Fuesting, Priscilla Fuesting, Ramand Giddings, Rushelle Gonder, Judith Gross, Melinda M. Harms, Debrah Henry, Donovan J. Jacobs, Michael C. Kaufman, Vicky Keen, Victor Khoury, Susan Knapp, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia, Gordon McFarland, Kenneth Melde, Gerald Muehl, Diana Myers, Kristen Nevares, Gene Paleno, Laurie Reynolds, Jay Riojas, Mary Jackson Robinson, Bettie Taylor, Marcela Warmsley, Elizabeth Washington and David Whitaker. [Entered: 06/29/2023 12:08 PM]
June 13, 2023 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Troy Masami Yoshino for Appellees DAI and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-11402] (ECF: Troy Yoshino) [Entered: 06/13/2023 06:26 PM]
June 13, 2023 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Daniel T. Graham for FCA US LLC Attorney Daniel T. Graham for Appellee FCA US LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-11402] (ECF: Daniel Graham) [Entered: 06/13/2023 05:43 PM]
June 13, 2023 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Renee D. Smith for Defendants-Appellees General Motors LLC, General Motors Company and General Motors Holdings LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-11402] (ECF: Renee Smith) [Entered: 06/13/2023 12:10 PM]
June 9, 2023 Filing 26 USDC FRAP 4 Order as to Appellants Ericka Black, Daphne Bridges, John Brugaletta, Cheryl Butler-Adams, Paulette Calhoun, Carla Campagnone, Robert Cervelli, Daniel Dwinnells, John Fuesting, Priscilla Fuesting, Ramand Giddings, Rushelle Gonder, Judith Gross, Melinda M. Harms, Debrah Henry, Donovan J. Jacobs, Michael C. Kaufman, Vicky Keen, Victor Khoury, Susan Knapp, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia, Gordon McFarland, Kenneth Melde, Gerald Muehl, Diana Myers, Kristen Nevares, Gene Paleno, Laurie Reynolds, Jay Riojas, Mary Jackson Robinson, Bettie Taylor, Marcela Warmsley, Elizabeth Washington and David Whitaker was filed on 06/07/2023. Docket Entry 4655. [Entered: 06/09/2023 10:25 AM]
June 6, 2023 Filing 25 Returned Mail was received for Attorney William E. McDonald, III for Appellee FCA US LLC. IN RE: 05/16/2023 Dkt Ntc [Entered: 06/07/2023 02:36 PM]
June 5, 2023 Filing 24 Returned Mail was received for Attorney Todd A. Smith for Appellants Michael C. Kaufman, David Whitaker, Victor Khoury, Mary Jackson Robinson, Diana Myers, Cheryl Butler-Adams, Debrah Henry, John Brugaletta, Donovan J. Jacobs, Gene Paleno, Jay Riojas, Laurie Reynolds, Rushelle Gonder, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia, Paulette Calhoun, Susan Knapp, Bettie Taylor, Daphne Bridges, Kenneth Melde, Kristen Nevares, Marcela Warmsley, Melinda M. Harms, Ericka Black, Robert Cervelli, Gordon McFarland, Ramand Giddings, Judith Gross, Vicky Keen, Gerald Muehl, John Fuesting, Priscilla Fuesting, Elizabeth Washington, Daniel Dwinnells and Carla Campagnone. IN RE: 05/02/2023 Docketing Notice [Entered: 06/06/2023 11:34 AM]
June 2, 2023 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Matthew P. Weinshall for Appellants Michael C. Kaufman, David Whitaker, Victor Khoury, Mary Jackson Robinson, Diana Myers, Cheryl Butler-Adams, Debrah Henry, John Brugaletta, Donovan J. Jacobs, Gene Paleno, Jay Riojas, Laurie Reynolds, Rushelle Gonder, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia, Paulette Calhoun, Susan Knapp, Bettie Taylor, Daphne Bridges, Kenneth Melde, Kristen Nevares, Marcela Warmsley, Melinda M. Harms, Ericka Black, Robert Cervelli, Gordon McFarland, Ramand Giddings, Judith Gross, Vicky Keen, Gerald Muehl, John Fuesting, Priscilla Fuesting, Elizabeth Washington, Daniel Dwinnells and Carla Campagnone. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 06/02/2023 10:49 AM]
June 2, 2023 Filing 22 Removed from case: Attorney Matthew P. Weinshall for Not Party Service in 23-11402. [Entered: 06/02/2023 10:44 AM]
June 2, 2023 Filing 21 Removed from case: Attorney Matthew P. Weinshall for Not Party Service in 23-11402. [Entered: 06/02/2023 09:54 AM]
June 1, 2023 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Matthew P. Weinshall for Appellants Ericka Black, Daphne Bridges, John Brugaletta, Cheryl Butler-Adams, Paulette Calhoun, Carla Campagnone, Robert Cervelli, Daniel Dwinnells, John Fuesting, Priscilla Fuesting, Ramand Giddings, Rushelle Gonder, Judith Gross, Melinda M. Harms, Debrah Henry, Donovan J. Jacobs, Michael C. Kaufman, Vicky Keen, Victor Khoury, Susan Knapp, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia, Gordon McFarland, Kenneth Melde, Gerald Muehl, Diana Myers, Kristen Nevares, Gene Paleno, Laurie Reynolds, Jay Riojas, Mary Jackson Robinson, Bettie Taylor, Marcela Warmsley, Elizabeth Washington, David Whitaker and Not Party Service. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [23-11402] (ECF: Matthew Weinshall) [Entered: 06/01/2023 05:18 PM]
June 1, 2023 Filing 19 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Matthew P. Weinshall for Appellants Ericka Black, Daphne Bridges, John Brugaletta, Cheryl Butler-Adams, Paulette Calhoun, Carla Campagnone, Robert Cervelli, Daniel Dwinnells, John Fuesting, Priscilla Fuesting, Ramand Giddings, Rushelle Gonder, Judith Gross, Melinda M. Harms, Debrah Henry, Donovan J. Jacobs, Michael C. Kaufman, Vicky Keen, Victor Khoury, Susan Knapp, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia, Gordon McFarland, Kenneth Melde, Gerald Muehl, Diana Myers, Kristen Nevares, Gene Paleno, Laurie Reynolds, Jay Riojas, Mary Jackson Robinson, Bettie Taylor, Marcela Warmsley, Elizabeth Washington, David Whitaker and Not Party Service. Related cases? Yes. [23-11402] (ECF: Matthew Weinshall) [Entered: 06/01/2023 12:50 PM]
June 1, 2023 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Matthew P. Weinshall for Appellants Ericka Black, Daphne Bridges, John Brugaletta, Cheryl Butler-Adams, Paulette Calhoun, Carla Campagnone, Robert Cervelli, Daniel Dwinnells, John Fuesting, Priscilla Fuesting, Ramand Giddings, Rushelle Gonder, Judith Gross, Melinda M. Harms, Debrah Henry, Donovan J. Jacobs, Michael C. Kaufman, Vicky Keen, Victor Khoury, Susan Knapp, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia, Gordon McFarland, Kenneth Melde, Gerald Muehl, Diana Myers, Kristen Nevares, Gene Paleno, Laurie Reynolds, Jay Riojas, Mary Jackson Robinson, Bettie Taylor, Marcela Warmsley, Elizabeth Washington, David Whitaker and Not Party Service. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-11402] (ECF: Matthew Weinshall) [Entered: 06/01/2023 12:46 PM]
June 1, 2023 Filing 17 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew P. Weinshall for Ericka Black, Daphne Bridges, John Brugaletta, Cheryl Butler-Adams, Paulette Calhoun, Carla Campagnone, Robert Cervelli, Daniel Dwinnells, John Fuesting, Priscilla Fuesting, Ramand Giddings, Rushelle Gonder, Judith Gross, Melinda M. Harms, Debrah Henry, Donovan J. Jacobs, Michael C. Kaufman, Vicky Keen, Victor Khoury, Susan Knapp, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia, Gordon McFarland, Kenneth Melde, Gerald Muehl, Diana Myers, Kristen Nevares, Gene Paleno, Laurie Reynolds, Jay Riojas, Mary Jackson Robinson, Bettie Taylor, Marcela Warmsley, Elizabeth Washington, David Whitaker and Service. Related cases? Yes. [23-11402] (ECF: Matthew Weinshall) [Entered: 06/01/2023 12:39 PM]
June 1, 2023 Filing 16 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Peter Prieto for Ericka Black, Daphne Bridges, John Brugaletta, Cheryl Butler-Adams, Paulette Calhoun, Carla Campagnone, Robert Cervelli, Daniel Dwinnells, John Fuesting, Priscilla Fuesting, Ramand Giddings, Rushelle Gonder, Judith Gross, Melinda M. Harms, Debrah Henry, Donovan J. Jacobs, Michael C. Kaufman, Vicky Keen, Victor Khoury, Susan Knapp, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia, Gordon McFarland, Kenneth Melde, Gerald Muehl, Diana Myers, Kristen Nevares, Gene Paleno, Laurie Reynolds, Jay Riojas, Mary Jackson Robinson, Bettie Taylor, Marcela Warmsley, Elizabeth Washington and David Whitaker. Related cases? Yes. [23-11402] (ECF: Peter Prieto) [Entered: 06/01/2023 12:35 PM]
May 24, 2023 Filing 15 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey M. Sniadanko for FCA US LLC. Related cases? Yes. [23-11402] (ECF: Jeffrey Sniadanko) [Entered: 05/24/2023 05:57 PM]
May 24, 2023 Filing 14 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel T. Graham for FCA US LLC. Related cases? Yes. [23-11402] (ECF: Daniel Graham) [Entered: 05/24/2023 04:56 PM]
May 22, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE: Due to the large number of parties associated with this appeal, not all parties from the district court docket have been entered on this Courts docket at this time. The parties may consult the relevant notice(s) of appeal, other case documents, and the district court docket to identify all parties. If any party objects to not having all parties listed on the docket, the party may file an objection stating its reasoning within 14 days after the date of this notice. [Entered: 05/22/2023 03:40 PM]
May 19, 2023 Filing 11 Jurisdiction: FRAP 4 motion pending in district court as to Appellants Daphne Bridges, John Brugaletta, Cheryl Butler-Adams, Paulette Calhoun, Rushelle Gonder, Debrah Henry, Donovan J. Jacobs, Michael C. Kaufman, Victor Khoury, Susan Knapp, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia, Kenneth Melde, Diana Myers, Gene Paleno, Laurie Reynolds, Jay Riojas, Mary Jackson Robinson, Bettie Taylor, David Whitaker and Appellees DAI, FCA US LLC and General Motors Company DE #: 4625 [Entered: 05/19/2023 12:50 PM]
May 17, 2023 Filing 10 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Renee Smith for General Motors LLC, General Motors Company, and General Motors Holding LLC Renee D. Smith for General Motors, LLC. Related cases? Yes. [23-11402] (ECF: Renee Smith) [Entered: 05/17/2023 12:16 PM]
May 17, 2023 Filing 9 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Scott M. Sarason for FCA US LLC. Related cases? Yes. [23-11402] (ECF: Scott Sarason) [Entered: 05/17/2023 11:35 AM]
May 17, 2023 Filing 8 Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Scott M. Sarason for FCA US LLC and Renee D. Smith for General Motors, LLC. Appearance of Counsel filed in Incorrect cases. Please file all documents in case 23-11402 [Entered: 05/17/2023 11:08 AM]
May 16, 2023 Filing 7 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Raoul G. Cantero for Daimler AG, and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC Related cases? No. [23-11402] (ECF: Raoul Cantero) [Entered: 05/16/2023 10:02 PM]
May 16, 2023 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Troy Masami Yoshino for Daimler AG Troy Masami Yoshino for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Related cases? No. [23-11402] (ECF: Troy Yoshino) [Entered: 05/16/2023 04:14 PM]
May 2, 2023 Filing 2 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR*** Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Attorney Peter Prieto for Appellants Michael C. Kaufman, Mary Jackson Robinson, Diana Myers, Cheryl Butler-Adams and Debrah Henry.--[Edited 05/16/2023 by KJJ] [Entered: 05/02/2023 02:23 PM]
April 28, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Rushelle Gonder, Victor Khoury, Pedro Lucero, Ronaldo Maldia and Laurie Reynolds on 04/27/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. 04/28/2023 [Entered: 05/02/2023 03:12 PM]
April 28, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants John Brugaletta, Donovan J. Jacobs, Gene Paleno, Jay Riojas and David Whitaker on 04/27/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. 04/28/2023 [Entered: 05/02/2023 02:49 PM]
April 28, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Cheryl Butler-Adams, Debrah Henry, Michael C. Kaufman, Diana Myers and Mary Jackson Robinson on 04/27/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. 04/28/2023 Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/16/2023 as to Appellant Michael C. Kaufman. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/30/2023 as to Appellees Sekou Gary, General Motors, LLC and Sean Hull [Entered: 05/02/2023 02:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Kaufman, et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL C. KAUFMAN
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY JACKSON ROBINSON
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DIANA MYERS
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHERYL BUTLER-ADAMS
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEBRAH HENRY
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID WHITAKER
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN BRUGALETTA
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONOVAN J. JACOBS
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GENE PALENO
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAY RIOJAS
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICTOR KHOURY
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAURIE REYNOLDS
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RUSHELLE GONDER
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PEDRO LUCERO
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALDO MALDIA
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAULETTE CALHOUN
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUSAN KNAPP
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BETTIE TAYLOR
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAPHNE BRIDGES
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH MELDE
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KRISTEN NEVARES
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARCELA WARMSLEY
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MELINDA M. HARMS
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERICKA BLACK
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT CERVELLI
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GORDON MCFARLAND
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAMAND GIDDINGS
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JUDITH GROSS
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICKY KEEN
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GERALD MUEHL
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN FUESTING
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PRISCILLA FUESTING
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELIZABETH WASHINGTON
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL DWINNELLS
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLA CAMPAGNONE
Represented By: Peter Prieto
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson Jr.
Represented By: David Fernandes
Represented By: John Gravante III
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Mark Pifko
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Represented By: Todd A. Smith
Represented By: David S. Stellings
Represented By: Roland Tellis
Represented By: Stephen Neal Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEKOU GARY
Represented By: Sekou Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENERAL MOTORS, LLC
Represented By: Nadia Shoshana Abramson
Represented By: Amarto Bhattacharyya
Represented By: Douglas B. Brown
Represented By: Zoe Brumfield-Meyers
Represented By: Raoul G. Cantero
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Sam Ikard
Represented By: Krista L. Lenart
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Evan Ribot
Represented By: Laurie Michele Riley
Represented By: Renee D. Smith
Represented By: Rufus E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEAN HULL
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES MCCAIN
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASHLEY MCCAIN
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAIMLER AG
Represented By: Troy Masami Yoshino
Represented By: Douglas B. Brown
Represented By: Raoul G. Cantero
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC
Represented By: Troy Masami Yoshino
Represented By: Douglas B. Brown
Represented By: Raoul G. Cantero
Represented By: Angela D. Daker
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FCA US LLC
Represented By: John E. Berg
Represented By: Jay M. Berger
Represented By: Christopher Shawn Branton
Represented By: Raoul G. Cantero
Represented By: Michael P. Croghan
Represented By: Paul C. Do
Represented By: Robert M. Fulton
Represented By: Daniel T. Graham
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: William E. McDonald III
Represented By: Meghan C. Moore
Represented By: Scott M. Sarason
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sniadanko
Represented By: Martin Steinberg
Represented By: Terrence C. Thom
Represented By: Nicole Danielle Duga Walsh
Represented By: Mitchell Edward Widom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY
Represented By: Renee D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENERAL MOTORS HOLDING LLC
Represented By: Renee D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Christopher K. Eppich
Represented By: Amy Lynn Bennecoff Ginsburg
Represented By: Brian Morrison
Represented By: Ryan K. Stumphauzer
Represented By: Matthew P. Weinshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?