Arthur Ballard v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: ARTHUR HENRY BALLARD, As Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Ryan Ballard, Deceased
Defendant / Appellee: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Case Number: 23-12309
Filed: July 12, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2023 Filing 21 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 08/24/2023 04:16 PM]
August 14, 2023 Filing 20 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee General Motors LLC [23-12309] (ECF: Jeffrey Doss) [Entered: 08/14/2023 07:40 PM]
August 14, 2023 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Jeffrey P. Doss for Appellee General Motors LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-12309] (ECF: Jeffrey Doss) [Entered: 08/14/2023 07:37 PM]
August 14, 2023 Filing 18 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Arthur Henry Ballard [23-12309] (ECF: Adam Pittman) [Entered: 08/14/2023 01:46 PM]
August 14, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend the Pleadings filed by Arthur Henry Ballard. Motion is Unopposed. [17] [23-12309] (ECF: Adam Pittman) [Entered: 08/14/2023 01:44 PM]
August 9, 2023 Filing 16 Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Appellant's brief is due on 09/20/2023, with appellant's appendix due within seven days of the filing date of the appellant's brief. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 08/09/2023 04:21 PM]
August 2, 2023 Filing 15 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Adam Wade Pittman for Appellant Arthur Henry Ballard. Related cases? No. [23-12309] (ECF: Adam Pittman) [Entered: 08/02/2023 03:50 PM]
August 2, 2023 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Adam Wade Pittman for Appellant Arthur Henry Ballard. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-12309] (ECF: Adam Pittman) [Entered: 08/02/2023 02:00 PM]
August 2, 2023 Filing 13 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Arthur Henry Ballard. The appellant's brief is due on or before 08/21/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 08/02/2023 12:29 PM]
August 2, 2023 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Adam Wade Pittman for Appellant Arthur Henry Ballard. No hearings. [Entered: 08/02/2023 12:28 PM]
August 1, 2023 Filing 11 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by F. Jerome Tapley for Arthur Henry Ballard. Related cases? No. [23-12309] (ECF: F. Tapley) [Entered: 08/01/2023 02:26 PM]
July 31, 2023 Filing 10 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Arthur Henry Ballard. [Entered: 07/31/2023 04:52 PM]
July 26, 2023 Filing 9 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joel Chandler Bailey for General Motors LLC. Related cases? No. [23-12309] (ECF: Joel Bailey) [Entered: 07/26/2023 10:36 PM]
July 26, 2023 Filing 8 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael L. Bell for General Motors LLC. Related cases? No. [23-12309] (ECF: Michael Bell) [Entered: 07/26/2023 10:32 PM]
July 26, 2023 Filing 7 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Rachelle E. Sanchez for General Motors LLC. Related cases? No. [23-12309] (ECF: Rachelle Sanchez) [Entered: 07/26/2023 10:29 PM]
July 26, 2023 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey P. Doss for General Motors LLC Related cases? No. [23-12309] (ECF: Jeffrey Doss) [Entered: 07/26/2023 10:23 PM]
July 26, 2023 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Adam Wade Pittman for Appellant Arthur Henry Ballard. No hearings. [23-12309] (ECF: Adam Pittman) [Entered: 07/26/2023 10:47 AM]
July 25, 2023 Filing 4 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adam Wade Pittman for Arthur Henry Ballard. Related cases? No. [23-12309] (ECF: Adam Pittman) [Entered: 07/25/2023 04:29 PM]
July 20, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Mandatory ECF sent to Adam Wade Pittman. [Entered: 07/25/2023 08:25 AM]
July 19, 2023 Filing 2 Appellate fee was paid on 07/05/2023 as to Appellant Arthur Henry Ballard. [Entered: 07/19/2023 02:59 PM]
July 12, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Arthur Henry Ballard on 07/05/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/02/2023 as to Appellant Arthur Henry Ballard. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/16/2023 as to Appellee General Motors LLC [Entered: 07/19/2023 02:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Arthur Ballard v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARTHUR HENRY BALLARD, As Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph Ryan Ballard, Deceased
Represented By: Douglas A. Dellaccio Jr.
Represented By: Austin K. Kurtz
Represented By: Adam Wade Pittman
Represented By: James Curtis Tanner
Represented By: F. Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Clyde Talbot Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Represented By: Joel Chandler Bailey
Represented By: Michael L. Bell
Represented By: Rachelle E. Sanchez
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?