John McEachern, et al v. E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN NELSON PATRICK MCEACHERN and BLUE DEALER SERVICES, INC.
Defendant / Appellee: E.R.J. INSURANCE GROUP, INC. and PABLO CREEK SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 23-13298
Filed: October 6, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2023 Filing 20 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. and Pablo Creek Services, Inc. [23-13298] (ECF: Brett Carey) [Entered: 11/10/2023 04:19 PM]
November 10, 2023 Filing 19 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants Blue Dealer Services, Inc. and John Nelson Patrick McEachern [23-13298] (ECF: David Marcus) [Entered: 11/10/2023 01:52 PM]
November 10, 2023 Filing 18 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew V. Bartle for Appellants Related cases? No. [23-13298] (ECF: Matthew Bartle) [Entered: 11/10/2023 01:47 PM]
November 9, 2023 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brett Carey for Appellees E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. and Pablo Creek Services, Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-13298] (ECF: Brett Carey) [Entered: 11/09/2023 11:26 AM]
November 9, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Lori J. Caldwell for E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. and Pablo Creek Services, Inc., Brett Carey for E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. and Pablo Creek Services, Inc. and Candy L. Messersmith for E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. and Pablo Creek Services, Inc.. You have failed to complete the Web-Based CIP on the Court's website and have not filed the standalone CIP. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you both remedy the default(s) AND file a motion to remedy the default(s). [Entered: 11/09/2023 08:24 AM]
November 3, 2023 Filing 15 Response to Civil Appeal Statement form filed by Attorney Brett Carey for Appellees E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. and Pablo Creek Services, Inc.. [23-13298] (ECF: Brett Carey) [Entered: 11/03/2023 03:18 PM]
October 27, 2023 Filing 14 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Blue Dealer Services, Inc. and John Nelson Patrick McEachern. [Entered: 10/27/2023 04:21 PM]
October 26, 2023 Filing 13 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 10/26/2023 03:40 PM]
October 24, 2023 Filing 12 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lori J. Caldwell for E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. and Pablo Creek Services, Inc.. Related cases? No. [23-13298] (ECF: Lori Caldwell) [Entered: 10/24/2023 01:38 PM]
October 24, 2023 Filing 11 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Candy L. Messersmith for E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. and Pablo Creek Services, Inc. Related cases? No. [23-13298] (ECF: Candy Messersmith) [Entered: 10/24/2023 01:31 PM]
October 24, 2023 Filing 10 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brett Carey for E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. and Pablo Creek Services, Inc.. Related cases? No. [23-13298] (ECF: Brett Carey) [Entered: 10/24/2023 01:23 PM]
October 24, 2023 Filing 9 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney David L. Marcus for Appellants Blue Dealer Services, Inc. and John Nelson Patrick McEachern. Related cases? No. [23-13298] (ECF: David Marcus) [Entered: 10/24/2023 12:56 PM]
October 18, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Dione C. Greene for Appellants Blue Dealer Services, Inc. and John Nelson Patrick McEachern. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-13298] (ECF: Dione Greene) [Entered: 10/18/2023 03:15 PM]
October 18, 2023 Filing 7 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Dione C. Greene for Blue Dealer Services, Inc. and John Nelson Patrick McEachern. Related cases? No. [23-13298] (ECF: Dione Greene) [Entered: 10/18/2023 03:01 PM]
October 16, 2023 Filing 6 Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney David L. Marcus for Appellants John Nelson Patrick McEachern and Blue Dealer Services, Inc.. Appellants brief due on 12/15/2023 as to Appellant Blue Dealer Services, Inc.. Appendix due on 12/22/2023 as to Appellant Blue Dealer Services, Inc.. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 10/16/2023 03:08 PM]
October 16, 2023 Filing 5 Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Blue Dealer Services, Inc. and John Nelson Patrick McEachern. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/15/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 10/16/2023 11:28 AM]
October 16, 2023 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney David L. Marcus for Appellants John Nelson Patrick McEachern and Blue Dealer Services, Inc.. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 10/16/2023 11:27 AM]
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney David L. Marcus for Appellants Blue Dealer Services, Inc. and John Nelson Patrick McEachern. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [23-13298] (ECF: David Marcus) [Entered: 10/13/2023 11:15 AM]
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David L. Marcus for Appellants Related cases? No. [23-13298] (ECF: David Marcus) [Entered: 10/11/2023 12:17 PM]
October 6, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Blue Dealer Services, Inc. and John Nelson Patrick McEachern on 10/05/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/24/2023 as to Appellant John Nelson Patrick McEachern. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/07/2023 as to Appellee E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc. [Entered: 10/10/2023 02:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John McEachern, et al v. E.R.J. Insurance Group, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN NELSON PATRICK MCEACHERN
Represented By: David L. Marcus
Represented By: Dione C. Greene
Represented By: William Mallory Kent
Represented By: Matthew V. Bartle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BLUE DEALER SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: David L. Marcus
Represented By: Dione C. Greene
Represented By: William Mallory Kent
Represented By: Matthew V. Bartle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E.R.J. INSURANCE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Brett Carey
Represented By: Sally Rogers Culley
Represented By: Candy L. Messersmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PABLO CREEK SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Lori J. Caldwell
Represented By: Brett Carey
Represented By: Sally Rogers Culley
Represented By: Candy L. Messersmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?