Fertilizantes Tocantins S.A. v. TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc.
Plaintiff: FERTILIZANTES TOCANTINS S.A.
Defendant: TGO AGRICULTURE (USA) INC.
Case Number: 24-11051
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Jason H. Baruch for Fertilizantes Tocantins S.A. and Stacy Delayne Blank for Fertilizantes Tocantins S.A.. You have failed to complete the Web-Based CIP on the Court's website and have not filed the standalone CIP. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you both remedy the default(s) AND file a motion to remedy the default(s). [Entered: 05/28/2024 12:43 PM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 14 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jason H. Baruch for Fertilizantes Tocantins S.A. Related cases? No. [24-11051] (ECF: Jason Baruch) [Entered: 05/28/2024 09:25 AM]
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc. is GRANTED by clerk [ # 12 ]. Appellants brief is due on 06/13/2024. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 04/30/2024 05:16 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 06/13/2024 filed by TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc.. Motion is Unopposed. [12] [24-11051] (ECF: Brian Cohen) [Entered: 04/30/2024 01:23 PM]
April 29, 2024 Filing 11 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stacy D. Blank for Appellee Fertilizantes Tocantins S.A. Related cases? No. [24-11051] (ECF: Stacy Blank) [Entered: 04/29/2024 12:19 PM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 04/25/2024 02:41 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 9 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/14/2024. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/24/2024 04:24 PM]
April 24, 2024 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney John Hay for Appellant TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 04/24/2024 04:23 PM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 7 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney John Hay for Appellant TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc. [Entered: 04/23/2024 12:54 PM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney John Hay for Appellant TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc.. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [24-11051] (ECF: John Hay) [Entered: 04/23/2024 09:10 AM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Brian E. Cohen for Appellant TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-11051] (ECF: Brian Cohen) [Entered: 04/23/2024 09:08 AM]
April 23, 2024 Filing 4 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney John Hay for Appellant TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc.. Related cases? No. [24-11051] (ECF: John Hay) [Entered: 04/23/2024 09:06 AM]
April 22, 2024 Filing 3 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Brian E. Cohen for TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc. Related cases? No. [24-11051] (ECF: Brian Cohen) [Entered: 04/22/2024 11:04 AM]
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John J. Hay for TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc. Related cases? No. [24-11051] (ECF: John Hay) [Entered: 04/22/2024 10:58 AM]
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc. on 04/02/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/26/2024 as to Appellant TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/06/2024 as to Appellee Fertilizantes Tocantins S.A [Entered: 04/08/2024 04:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Fertilizantes Tocantins S.A. v. TGO Agriculture (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERTILIZANTES TOCANTINS S.A.
Represented By: Jason H. Baruch
Represented By: Christopher R. Nolan
Represented By: Paul Joseph Punzone
Represented By: Qian Shen
Represented By: Allison Nicole Skopec
Represented By: Stacy Delayne Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TGO AGRICULTURE (USA) INC.
Represented By: Steven Brotman
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Furton
Represented By: Carlos H. Marin
Represented By: Hannah Oswald
Represented By: Jorden Rutledge
Represented By: Joshua Skundberg
Represented By: John Hay
Represented By: Brian E. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?