The Federal Savings Bank v. Stephon Montgomery, et al
Plaintiff: THE FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK
Defendant: STEPHON L. MONTGOMERY and HELEN IRBY
Case Number: 24-11061
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Filing 16 USDC order on limited remand as to Appellants Helen Irby and Stephon L. Montgomery filed on 05/31/2024. Docket Entry 88. [Entered: 06/03/2024 01:54 PM]
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: We REMAND the case to the district court to enter an order determining whether the April 8 filing should be construed as a Rule 4(a)(5) motion and, if yes, making the findings required by that Rule. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(5)(A) (noting that the district court may extend the time to file a notice of appeal if a party moves for extension no later than 30 days after the time prescribed by Rule 4(a) expires and shows excusable neglect or good cause); 28 U.S.C. 2107(c); Campbell v. Air Jam. Ltd., 760 F.3d 1165, 1168 (11th Cir. 2014) (noting that pro se filings should be liberally construed); Parker v. Strickland, 728 F.2d 1406, 1407 (11th Cir. 1984) (stating that even a pro se appellant must make a specific motion for an extension). Upon completion of its proceedings on remand, the district court shall return the record, as supplemented, to this Court for further consideration. This appeal is HELD IN ABEYANCE pending the remand. CRW, BCG and BL (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 05/31/2024 09:20 AM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 14 Returned Mail was received for Party Helen Irby. IN RE: 05/01/2024 CIP deficiency letter. [Entered: 05/21/2024 11:21 AM]
May 17, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Mandatory ECF sent to Stephon L. Montgomery. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN ON THIS FILING. [Entered: 05/20/2024 08:00 AM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 12 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Stephon L. Montgomery. [Entered: 05/15/2024 09:31 AM]
May 14, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of receipt: Transcript Order Form as to Appellant Stephon L. Montgomery. [Entered: 05/15/2024 09:28 AM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Stephon L. Montgomery. You have failed to file the standalone CIP. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you both remedy the default(s) AND file a motion to remedy the default(s). [Entered: 05/01/2024 08:28 AM]
May 1, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Helen Irby. You have failed to file the standalone CIP. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you both remedy the default(s) AND file a motion to remedy the default(s). [Entered: 05/01/2024 08:25 AM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 8 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Stephon L. Montgomery. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/15/2024. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/26/2024 11:58 AM]
April 26, 2024 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Stephon L. Montgomery. No hearings. [Entered: 04/26/2024 11:53 AM]
April 25, 2024 Filing 6 Returned Mail was received for Party Helen Irby. IN RE: April 08, 2024, CIVIL - Notice of Docketing [Entered: 04/25/2024 03:49 PM]
April 12, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Daniel S. Hefter for The Federal Savings Bank. You have failed to complete the Web-Based CIP on the Court's website. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you both remedy the default(s) AND file a motion to remedy the default(s). [Entered: 04/12/2024 02:50 PM]
April 11, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to dismiss appeal as untimely filed by The Federal Savings Bank. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [4] [24-11061] (ECF: Daniel Hefter) [Entered: 04/11/2024 02:33 PM]
April 11, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-11061] (ECF: Daniel Hefter) [Entered: 04/11/2024 02:17 PM]
April 11, 2024 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel S. Hefter for The Federal Savings Bank. Related cases? No. [24-11061] (ECF: Daniel Hefter) [Entered: 04/11/2024 02:16 PM]
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Helen Irby and Stephon L. Montgomery on 04/05/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. USDC motion pending: MOTION to Strike 79 Notice of Appeal DE 82. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/26/2024 as to Appellant Stephon L. Montgomery. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/06/2024 as to Appellee The Federal Savings Bank [Entered: 04/08/2024 03:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: The Federal Savings Bank v. Stephon Montgomery, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK
Represented By: Daniel S. Hefter
Represented By: John W. Clark IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHON L. MONTGOMERY
Represented By: Stephon L. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HELEN IRBY
Represented By: Helen Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?