Music Royalty Consulting, Inc. v. William McLean
Plaintiff: MUSIC ROYALTY CONSULTING, INC.
Defendant: WILLIAM RUDOLPH MCLEAN and WILLIAM MCLEAN
Case Number: 24-11193
Filed: April 17, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Contract Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 16, 2024 Music Royalty Consulting, Inc. v. William McLean

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Judgment entered as to Appellant William McLean. [Entered: 05/16/2024 01:35 PM]
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Opinion issued by court as to Appellant William McLean. Decision: Dismissed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link # http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions . [Entered: 05/16/2024 01:33 PM]
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Stephen Paul Dunn for Music Royalty Consulting, Inc.. Related cases? No. [24-11193] (ECF: Stephen Dunn) [Entered: 05/02/2024 03:13 PM]
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Erica Shell for Music Royalty Consulting, Inc.. Related cases? No. [24-11193] (ECF: Erica Shell) [Entered: 05/02/2024 12:28 PM]
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant William McLean. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/28/2024. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 05/01/2024 10:46 AM]
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party William McLean. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 05/01/2024 10:42 AM]
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Party William McLean. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [24-11193] (ECF: William McLean) [Entered: 04/30/2024 04:25 PM]
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Party William McLean. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-11193] (ECF: William McLean) [Entered: 04/30/2024 04:19 PM]
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Party William McLean. Related cases? No. [24-11193] (ECF: William McLean) [Entered: 04/30/2024 04:17 PM]
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant William Rudolph McLean on 04/15/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/06/2024 as to Appellant William Rudolph McLean. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/16/2024 as to Appellee Music Royalty Consulting, Inc. [Entered: 04/18/2024 03:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Music Royalty Consulting, Inc. v. William McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUSIC ROYALTY CONSULTING, INC.
Represented By: Stephen Paul Dunn
Represented By: Erica J. Shell
Represented By: Erica Shell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM RUDOLPH MCLEAN
Represented By: William Rudolph McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM MCLEAN
Represented By: William McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?