USA v. Fane Lozman
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: FANE LOZMAN
Case Number: 24-11477
Filed: May 7, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael Thomas Gray for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-11477] (ECF: Michael Gray) [Entered: 06/03/2024 02:47 PM]
June 3, 2024 Filing 13 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Fane Lozman. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/17/2024. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 06/03/2024 10:44 AM]
June 3, 2024 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Fane Lozman. No hearings. [Entered: 06/03/2024 10:43 AM]
June 3, 2024 Filing 11 Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Fane Lozman. [Entered: 06/03/2024 10:42 AM]
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Transcript Order Form filed by Appellant Fane Lozman is GRANTED by clerk [ # 8 ]. [Entered: 06/03/2024 10:40 AM]
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Appellant Fane Lozman is GRANTED by clerk [ # 7 ]. [Entered: 06/03/2024 10:39 AM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to file transcript order form out of time filed by Fane Lozman. Motion is Unopposed. [8] [24-11477] (ECF: Fane Lozman) [Entered: 05/30/2024 11:08 PM]
May 30, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file Certificate of Interested Persons to 05/30/2024 filed by Fane Lozman. Motion is Unopposed. [7] [24-11477] (ECF: Fane Lozman) [Entered: 05/30/2024 10:56 PM]
May 29, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Fane Lozman. You have failed to file the standalone CIP. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you both remedy the default(s) AND file a motion to remedy the default(s). [Entered: 05/29/2024 02:20 PM]
May 29, 2024 Filing 5 The Transcript Order Form has not been filed as to Appellant Fane Lozman. The appellant is hereby notified that, pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless the appellant (1) files a completed Transcript Order Form in this Court AND in the district court OR files in this Court a certificate stating no transcript will be ordered; AND (2) files in this Court a Motion to File Documents Out of Time. [Entered: 05/29/2024 02:16 PM]
May 28, 2024 Filing 15 Over the phone extension granted by clerk. Appellant's brief is due on 07/17/2024, with the appellant's appendix due within seven days of the filing date of the appellant's brief. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 06/11/2024 12:54 PM]
May 24, 2024 Filing 4 Returned Mail was received for Party Fane Lozman. IN RE: 5/24/2024 CIVIL - Notice of Docketing [Entered: 05/29/2024 02:14 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael T. Gray for USA Related cases? No. [24-11477] (ECF: Michael Gray) [Entered: 05/20/2024 09:37 AM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 2 Appellate fee was paid on 05/07/2024 as to Appellant Fane Lozman. [Entered: 05/09/2024 05:16 PM]
May 7, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Fane Lozman on 05/07/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/28/2024 as to Appellant Fane Lozman. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/06/2024 as to Appellee United States of America [Entered: 05/09/2024 05:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Fane Lozman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida
Represented By: Michael Thomas Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FANE LOZMAN
Represented By: Fane Lozman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?