Darline Spencer v. Future Infrastrusture Holdings, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: DARLINE S. SPENCER
Defendant: HAZES AND SAWYER, FUTURE INFRASTRUSTURE HOLDINGS, LLC, FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT, HOLLYWOOD UTILITY, CARDINAL CONTRACTORS, INC., Bill Moore, Executive Vice President, PRIMORIS, MAN-CON, INC., CARDINAL CONTRACTORS, INC., Don Mullaney, Proj. Mgr. and LANZO CONSTRUCTION CO., FLORIDA
Case Number: 24-12539
Filed: August 6, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Pursuant to the 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Darline S. Spencer failed to comply with the rules on Certificates of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statements within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 09/17/2024 11:57 AM]
September 10, 2024 Filing 21 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Darline S. Spencer. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/15/2024. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 09/10/2024 09:31 AM]
September 10, 2024 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Glenda Powers, Filer: Darline S. Spencer, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 07/16/2024. [Entered: 09/10/2024 09:29 AM]
September 5, 2024 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Joseph Zavoral for Hazen and Sawyer D.P.C.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-12539] (ECF: Joseph Zavoral) [Entered: 09/05/2024 12:01 PM]
September 5, 2024 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Laura K. Wendell for Appellee Hollywood Utility. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-12539] (ECF: Laura Wendell) [Entered: 09/05/2024 11:43 AM]
September 5, 2024 Filing 17 Transcripts were due to be filed on 09/04/2024 by Court Reporter Glenda Powers and are overdue. A 10% discount is required after 10/04/2024. A 20% discount is required after 11/03/2024. [Entered: 09/05/2024 08:55 AM]
August 28, 2024 Filing 16 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by D. Spencer Mallard for Primoris: Parent Company to Cardinal Contractors, Inc., Future Infrastructure Holdings, LLC, Cardinal Contractors, Inc. Related cases? No. [24-12539] (ECF: D. Mallard) [Entered: 08/28/2024 11:27 AM]
August 27, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Darline S. Spencer. You have failed to file the standalone CIP. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you both remedy the default(s) AND file a motion to remedy the default(s). [Entered: 08/27/2024 09:20 AM]
August 21, 2024 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-12539] (ECF: David Karp) [Entered: 08/21/2024 03:10 PM]
August 20, 2024 Filing 13 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joseph Zavoral for Hazen and Sawyer, D.P.C. Related cases? No. [24-12539] (ECF: Joseph Zavoral) [Entered: 08/20/2024 10:30 AM]
August 19, 2024 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Forrest L. Andres for APPELLEE LANZO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY'S Attorney Forrest Lee Andrews for Appellee Lanzo Construction Co., Florida. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-12539] (ECF: Forrest Andrews) [Entered: 08/19/2024 02:01 PM]
August 19, 2024 Filing 11 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Vanessa S. Johannes for Florida Power & Light. Related cases? No. [24-12539] (ECF: Vanessa Johannes) [Entered: 08/19/2024 10:28 AM]
August 12, 2024 Filing 10 Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Glenda Powers, 08/12/2024, Darline S. Spencer, Pre-Trial Proceedings 07/16/2024. [Entered: 08/12/2024 02:09 PM]
August 12, 2024 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Darline S. Spencer, Court Reporter: Glenda Powers, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 07/16/2024. [Entered: 08/12/2024 02:08 PM]
August 12, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas Neal McAliley for Cardinal Contractors, Inc., Cardinal Contractors, Inc., Florida Power & Light, Future Infrastrusture Holdings, LLC, Hazes and Sawyer, Hollywood Utility, Lanzo Construction Co., Florida and Primoris. Related cases? No. [24-12539] (ECF: Thomas McAliley) [Entered: 08/12/2024 11:04 AM]
August 12, 2024 Filing 7 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Forrest Andrews for Lanzo Construction Company Forrest Lee Andrews for Lanzo Construction Co., Florida. Related cases? No. [24-12539] (ECF: Forrest Andrews) [Entered: 08/12/2024 10:28 AM]
August 12, 2024 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel L. Abbott, Esq. for Hollywood Utility and City of Hollywood Utility Related cases? No. [24-12539] (ECF: Daniel Abbott) [Entered: 08/12/2024 10:20 AM]
August 9, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Related cases? No. [24-12539] (ECF: David Karp) [Entered: 08/09/2024 04:33 PM]
August 9, 2024 Filing 4 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Laura K. Wendell for Hollywood Utility and City of Hollywood Utility Related cases? No. [24-12539] (ECF: Laura Wendell) [Entered: 08/09/2024 03:54 PM]
August 9, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Vanessa S. Johannes for Florida Power & Light and Thomas Neal McAliley for Lanzo Construction Co., Florida, Florida Power & Light, Future Infrastrusture Holdings, LLC, Cardinal Contractors, Inc., Hazes and Sawyer, Hollywood Utility and Primoris and David A Karp for Florida Power & Light. An attorney may not electronically file through another person's ECF account. Please file each Appearance of Counsel form separately. See 11th Cir. R. 25-3(e). [Entered: 08/09/2024 02:00 PM]
August 9, 2024 Filing 2 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Related cases? No. [24-12539] (ECF: David Karp) [Entered: 08/09/2024 01:41 PM]
August 6, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Darline S. Spencer on 08/05/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 08/26/2024 as to Appellant Darline S. Spencer. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/05/2024 as to Appellee Future Infrastrusture Holdings, LLC. [Entered: 08/08/2024 09:11 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Darline Spencer v. Future Infrastrusture Holdings, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAZES AND SAWYER
Represented By: Thomas Neal McAliley
Represented By: Jeremy W. Harris
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Abbott
Represented By: Joseph T. Zavoral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUTURE INFRASTRUSTURE HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Neal McAliley
Represented By: Jeremy W. Harris
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Abbott
Represented By: D. Spencer Mallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT
Represented By: Thomas Neal McAliley
Represented By: Vanessa S. Johannes
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Abbott
Represented By: David Arnold Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLYWOOD UTILITY
Represented By: Thomas Neal McAliley
Represented By: Jeremy W. Harris
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Abbott
Represented By: Laura K. Wendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL CONTRACTORS, INC., Bill Moore, Executive Vice President
Represented By: Thomas Neal McAliley
Represented By: Jeremy W. Harris
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIMORIS
Represented By: Thomas Neal McAliley
Represented By: Jeremy W. Harris
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Abbott
Represented By: D. Spencer Mallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAN-CON, INC.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL CONTRACTORS, INC., Don Mullaney, Proj. Mgr.
Represented By: Thomas Neal McAliley
Represented By: Jeremy W. Harris
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Abbott
Represented By: D. Spencer Mallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANZO CONSTRUCTION CO., FLORIDA
Represented By: Thomas Neal McAliley
Represented By: Forrest Lee Andrews
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLINE S. SPENCER
Represented By: Darline S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?