Benedict Mohit v. City of Haines City
Plaintiff: BENEDICT MOHIT
Defendant: CITY OF HAINES CITY, a local government entity and a political subdivision of the State of Florida
Unknown: SERVICE
Case Number: 24-12945
Filed: September 12, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Appellants motions to take judicial notice of eight documents is DENIED. Appellants motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. See Touchston v. McDermott, 234 F.3d 1130, 1132 (11th Cir. 2000). [ # 15 ] [ # 13 ] [ # 11 ] [ # 14 ] [ # 12 ] [ # 10 ] CRW, JP and BCG (See attached order for complete text) [Entered: 10/25/2024 03:42 PM]
October 23, 2024 Filing 21 Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant Benedict Mohit. 2 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 10/25/2024 02:45 PM]
October 23, 2024 Filing 20 Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Appellant Benedict Mohit. [Entered: 10/25/2024 02:43 PM]
October 17, 2024 Filing 19 Appendix filed [Two (2) VOLUMES] by Appellant Benedict Mohit. [24-12945] (ECF: Benedict Mohit) [Entered: 10/17/2024 10:55 AM]
October 17, 2024 Filing 18 Appellant's brief filed by Benedict Mohit. [24-12945] (ECF: Benedict Mohit) [Entered: 10/17/2024 10:52 AM]
October 13, 2024 Filing 17 REPLY to RESPONSE to to adopt motions or responses [ # 14 ] filed by Appellant Benedict Mohit. [24-12945] (ECF: Benedict Mohit) [Entered: 10/13/2024 06:32 PM]
October 9, 2024 Filing 16 RESPONSE to filed by Appellant Benedict Mohit [ # 14 ] filed by Attorney Kayla Platt Rady for Appellee City of Haines City. [24-12945] (ECF: Kayla Platt Rady) [Entered: 10/09/2024 04:27 PM]
September 29, 2024 Filing 15 Supplemental to supplement the record [ # 12 ] filed by Appellant Benedict Mohit. [24-12945] (ECF: Benedict Mohit) [Entered: 09/29/2024 10:53 PM]
September 29, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to adopt motions or responses filed by Benedict Mohit. Motion is Opposed. [14] [24-12945] (ECF: Benedict Mohit) [Entered: 09/29/2024 10:21 PM]
September 29, 2024 Filing 13 Supplemental to supplement the record [ # 12 ] filed by Appellant Benedict Mohit. [24-12945] (ECF: Benedict Mohit) [Entered: 09/29/2024 10:15 PM]
September 29, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to supplement the record filed by Benedict Mohit. Motion is Opposed. [12] [24-12945] (ECF: Benedict Mohit) [Entered: 09/29/2024 10:07 PM]
September 29, 2024 Filing 11 Supplemental to take judicial notice [ # 10 ] filed by Appellant Benedict Mohit. [24-12945] (ECF: Benedict Mohit) [Entered: 09/29/2024 09:47 PM]
September 29, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to take judicial notice filed by Benedict Mohit. Motion is Opposed. [10] [24-12945] (ECF: Benedict Mohit) [Entered: 09/29/2024 09:28 PM]
September 26, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Linda Bond Edwards for City of Haines City. Related cases? No. [24-12945] (ECF: Linda Edwards) [Entered: 09/26/2024 02:50 PM]
September 24, 2024 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Kayla Platt Rady for Appellee City of Haines City. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-12945] (ECF: Kayla Platt Rady) [Entered: 09/24/2024 11:53 AM]
September 24, 2024 Filing 7 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kayla Platt Rady for City of Haines City. Related cases? No. [24-12945] (ECF: Kayla Platt Rady) [Entered: 09/24/2024 11:47 AM]
September 23, 2024 Filing 6 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Benedict Mohit. The appellant's brief is due on or before 10/22/2024. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 09/23/2024 05:21 PM]
September 23, 2024 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Party Benedict Mohit. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 09/23/2024 05:20 PM]
September 20, 2024 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Party Benedict Mohit. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [24-12945] (ECF: Benedict Mohit) [Entered: 09/20/2024 10:39 AM]
September 20, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mohit, Benedict - Appellant Party Benedict Mohit. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-12945] (ECF: Benedict Mohit) [Entered: 09/20/2024 10:33 AM]
September 12, 2024 Filing 2 Appellate fee was paid on 09/10/2024 as to Appellant Benedict Mohit. [Entered: 09/12/2024 03:34 PM]
September 12, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Benedict Mohit on 09/10/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/30/2024 as to Appellant Benedict Mohit. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/10/2024 as to Appellee City of Haines City. [Entered: 09/12/2024 03:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Benedict Mohit v. City of Haines City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENEDICT MOHIT
Represented By: Benedict Mohit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: SERVICE
Represented By: Stephen R. Senn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF HAINES CITY, a local government entity and a political subdivision of the State of Florida
Represented By: Kayla Platt Rady
Represented By: Linda Bond Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?