Lois Somerville v. Department of Health and Human Services, et al
Plaintiff: LOIS M. SOMERVILLE
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNKNOWN OTHERS, U.S. ATTORNEY, U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION
Case Number: 24-14185
Filed: December 26, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 21, 2025 Lois Somerville v. Department of Health and Human Services, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2025 Filing 13 Appellees' brief is currently due on 02/24/2025. Over the phone 30-day extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Collette B. Cunningham for Appellees U.S. Attorney General, Department of Health and Human Services and U.S. Attorney. Appellees' brief is now due on 03/26/2025 as to Appellees Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 02/14/2025 02:30 PM]
January 30, 2025 Filing 12 Received 4 paper copies of Brief, filed by Appellant Lois M. Somerville. [Entered: 02/11/2025 04:17 PM]
January 27, 2025 Filing 11 Briefing Notice issued to Appellee Department of Health and Human Services. Appellee's brief is due on or before 02/24/2025. [Entered: 01/27/2025 10:07 AM]
January 27, 2025 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Party Lois M. Somerville. No hearings. USDC states "no transcripts requested" [Entered: 01/27/2025 10:00 AM]
January 25, 2025 Filing 9 Appellant's brief filed by Lois M. Somerville. [24-14185] (ECF: Lois Somerville) [Entered: 01/25/2025 05:24 PM]
January 25, 2025 Filing 8 Court Reporter Notice of Transcripts Filed by Lois M. Somerville. [24-14185] (ECF: Lois Somerville) [Entered: 01/25/2025 04:40 PM]
January 24, 2025 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Collette B. Cunningham for Appellees Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-14185] (ECF: Collette Cunningham) [Entered: 01/24/2025 12:12 PM]
January 23, 2025 Filing 6 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Collette B. Cunningham for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney for the Middle District of Florida, and U.S. Attorney General Related cases? No. [24-14185] (ECF: Collette Cunningham) [Entered: 01/23/2025 03:34 PM]
January 15, 2025 Filing 5 The Transcript Order Form has not been filed as to Appellant Lois M. Somerville. The appellant is hereby notified that, pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless the appellant files in the District Court a completed Transcript Order Form OR a certificate stating no transcript will be ordered. [Entered: 01/15/2025 03:02 PM]
January 13, 2025 Filing 4 Notice of deficient Application to appeal In Forma Pauperis filed by Lois M. Somerville. Incorrect Event used to file a document. We have docketed your Certificate of Interested Persons, however, no action will be taken on the Application to appeal In Forma Pauperis as the fee was paid on 12/23/24 upon filing the Notice of Appeal. [Entered: 01/13/2025 03:37 PM]
January 13, 2025 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lois M. Somerville, Pro Se. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [24-14185] (ECF: Lois Somerville) [Entered: 01/13/2025 03:02 PM]
December 30, 2024 Filing 2 Removed from case: Attorney U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida for Appellees U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney in 24-14185. [Entered: 12/30/2024 10:24 AM]
December 26, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Lois M. Somerville on 12/23/2025. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 01/13/2025 as to Appellant Lois M. Somerville. [Entered: 12/26/2024 02:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lois Somerville v. Department of Health and Human Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Collette B. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN OTHERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ATTORNEY
Represented By: U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Florida
Represented By: Collette B. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Collette B. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOIS M. SOMERVILLE
Represented By: Lois M. Somerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?