National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc. v. United States Department of Defense, et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL RANGER MEMORIAL FOUNDATION INC.
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, SECRETARY OF DEFENSE, WILLIAM LAPLANTE, DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, SECRETARY OF THE ARMY, THE NAMING COMMISSION, MICHELLE HOWARD, TY SEIDULE, THOMAS P. BOSTICK and JERRY BUCHANAN
Case Number: 25-10112
Filed: January 14, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc. is GRANTED by clerk [ # 13 ]. Appellant's brief is due on 04/01/2025. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 02/26/2025 04:14 PM]
February 24, 2025 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 04/01/2025 filed by National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc.. Motion is Unopposed. [13] [25-10112] (ECF: Shannon Holliday) [Entered: 02/24/2025 07:05 PM]
February 3, 2025 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Ashley Cheung Honold for Appellees Thomas P. Bostick, Jerry Buchanan, Michelle Howard, Ty Seidule and The Naming Commission. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [25-10112] (ECF: Ashley Honold) [Entered: 02/03/2025 01:52 PM]
February 3, 2025 Filing 11 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ashley C. Honold for appellees Related cases? No. [25-10112] (ECF: Ashley Honold) [Entered: 02/03/2025 11:57 AM]
February 3, 2025 Filing 10 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel Tenny for appellees Related cases? No. [25-10112] (ECF: Daniel Tenny) [Entered: 02/03/2025 11:14 AM]
January 31, 2025 Filing 9 Briefing Notice issued to Appellant National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/11/2025. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 01/31/2025 01:51 PM]
January 31, 2025 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh, Filer: National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc., Dt. all Trans. Filed: 01/30/2025. [Entered: 01/31/2025 01:42 PM]
January 31, 2025 Filing 7 Court Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Joan Drammeh, 01/29/2025, National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc.. [Entered: 01/31/2025 01:37 PM]
January 30, 2025 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc., Court Reporter: Joan Drammeh. [Entered: 01/30/2025 03:38 PM]
January 29, 2025 Filing 5 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Shannon L. Holliday for Appellant National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc.. Related cases? No. [25-10112] (ECF: Shannon Holliday) [Entered: 01/29/2025 04:07 PM]
January 29, 2025 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Shannon L. Holliday for Appellant National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [25-10112] (ECF: Shannon Holliday) [Entered: 01/29/2025 04:05 PM]
January 28, 2025 Filing 3 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shannon L. Holliday for National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc.. Related cases? No. [25-10112] (ECF: Shannon Holliday) [Entered: 01/28/2025 05:57 PM]
January 15, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PARTIES: Due to the large number of parties associated with this appeal, not all parties from the district court docket have been entered on this Court's docket at this time. The parties may consult the relevant notice(s) of appeal, other case documents, and the district court docket to identify all parties. If any party objects to not having all parties listed on the docket, the party may file an objection stating its reasoning within 14 days after the date of this notice. [Entered: 01/15/2025 11:40 AM]
January 14, 2025 Filing 1 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc. on 01/14/2025. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/03/2025 as to Appellant National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/12/2025 as to Appellee United States Department of Defense. [Entered: 01/15/2025 11:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: National Ranger Memorial Foundation Inc. v. United States Department of Defense, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL RANGER MEMORIAL FOUNDATION INC.
Represented By: Shannon L. Holliday
Represented By: Jonathan Corley
Represented By: Robert Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Sarah Suwanda
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Sarah Suwanda
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM LAPLANTE
Represented By: Sarah Suwanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Represented By: Sarah Suwanda
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY OF THE ARMY
Represented By: Sarah Suwanda
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NAMING COMMISSION
Represented By: Sarah Suwanda
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Ashley Cheung Honold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE HOWARD
Represented By: Sarah Suwanda
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Ashley Cheung Honold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TY SEIDULE
Represented By: Sarah Suwanda
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Ashley Cheung Honold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS P. BOSTICK
Represented By: Sarah Suwanda
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Ashley Cheung Honold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY BUCHANAN
Represented By: Sarah Suwanda
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Ashley Cheung Honold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?