Richardson v. Hartford Public Library Featured Case

claim of discrimination by children's librarian

Plaintiff - Appellant: Maxine Richardson
Defendant - Appellee: Hartford Public Library
Case Number: 10-1066
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: CIVIL RIGHTS-Jobs

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2010 Filing 47 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 11/09/2010, disposing of the appeal to DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT, ISSUED.[Mandate][164236] [10-1066]
November 9, 2010 Filing 46 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 11/09/2010, to District Court , ISSUED.[142825] [10-1066]
November 9, 2010 Filing 45 SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, Vacated and Remanded, by JAC DC SRU, FILED.[142530] [10-1066]
November 9, 2010 Filing 44 NEW CASE MANAGER, Anna Steglich, ASSIGNED.[142519] [10-1066]
November 4, 2010 Filing 39 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Maxine Richardson, FILED. Service date 11/04/2010 by US mail. [140332] [10-1066]
October 7, 2010 Filing 36 MOTION ORDER, Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file reply brief is GRANTED. The reply brief is due November 3, 2010 [33], FILED. [121152][36] [10-1066]
September 29, 2010 Filing 33 MOTION, to file reply briefs out of time, on behalf of Appellant Maxine Richardson, FILED. Service date 09/21/2010 by US mail.[115721] [10-1066]
September 27, 2010 Filing 32 SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[113243] [10-1066]
September 24, 2010 Filing 31 CASE CALENDARING, 11/5/2010, SET.,ON SUBMISSION.[112914] [10-1066]
August 23, 2010 Filing 27 BRIEF & APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellee Hartford Public Library, FILED. Service date 08/23/2010 by US mail. [93809] [10-1066]
August 23, 2010 Filing 26 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Hartford Public Library, FILED. Service date 08/23/2010 by CM/ECF, US mail. [93480] [10-1066]
July 20, 2010 Filing 21 BRIEF & APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Maxine Richardson, FILED. Service date 07/19/2010 by US mail. [72086] [10-1066]
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, dated 06/11/2010, Schedule Default Order, Appellants brief due 07/19/2010, FILED.[51514] [10-1066]
May 6, 2010 Filing 18 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[34655] [10-1066]
April 20, 2010 Filing 17 NEW CASE MANAGER, Deborah Holmes, ASSIGNED.[27024] [10-1066]
April 15, 2010 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Peter Arvydas Janus for Hartford Public Library, in case 10-1066 , [10], ADDED.[25106] [10-1066]
April 15, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Hartford Public Library, FILED. Service date 04/15/2010 by US mail, email. [25100] [10-1066]
April 14, 2010 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Maxine Richardson for Appellant Maxine Richardson, FILED. Service date 04/16/2010 by CM/ECF.[25488] [10-1066]
April 14, 2010 Filing 12 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Maxine Richardson, FILED. Service date 04/08/2010 by US mail.[25487] [10-1066]
April 14, 2010 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Hartford Public Library, FILED. Service date 04/14/2010 by email, US mail.[24707] [10-1066]
April 14, 2010 Filing 8 ATTORNEY, Glenn A. Duhl, [7], in place of attorney Melanie E. Dunn, SUBSTITUTED.[24696] [10-1066]
April 14, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Hartford Public Library, FILED. Service date 04/14/2010 by email, US mail. [24692] [10-1066]
April 1, 2010 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[19444] [10-1066]
March 23, 2010 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[19440] [10-1066]
March 23, 2010 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/17/2010, RECEIVED.[19439] [10-1066]
March 23, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, and district court docket on behalf of Appellant Maxine Richardson, FILED. [19427] [10-1066]

Search for this case: Richardson v. Hartford Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Maxine Richardson
Represented By: Maxine Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Hartford Public Library
Represented By: Glenn Alan Duhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?