Viacom International, Inc. v. Youtube, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellant: Viacom International, Inc., Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Black Entertainment Television, LLC
Defendant - Appellee: Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC and Google, Inc.
Case Number: 10-3270
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: PROPERTY RIGHTS-Copyright

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 5, 2012 Summary Viacom International, Inc., et al. v. Youtube, Inc., et al.; The Football Assoc. Premier League Ltd., et al. v. Tur, et al.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2012 Filing 526 ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 04/05/2012, by RJM, JAC, DAL. FILED.[650567] [10-3270]
May 2, 2012 Filing 525 ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 04/05/2012, by RJM, JAC, DAL. FILED.[596526] [10-3270]
April 27, 2012 Filing 524 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[593348] [10-3270]
April 13, 2012 Filing 523 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[592444] [10-3270]
April 6, 2012 Filing 522 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[592443] [10-3270]
April 5, 2012 Filing 521 JUDGMENT, FILED.[583559] [10-3270]
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 516 OPINION, affirmed and remanded, by RJM, JAC, DAL FILED.[571927] [10-3270]
January 11, 2012 Filing 512 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 01/11/2012, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 01/11/2012 by CM/ECF.[495302] [10-3270]
January 9, 2012 Filing 510 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 01/09/2012, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 01/09/2012 by CM/ECF.[492467] [10-3270]
December 28, 2011 Filing 507 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 12/28/2011, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 12/28/2011 by CM/ECF.[483420] [10-3270]
December 22, 2011 Filing 505 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 12/22/2011, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 12/22/2011 by CM/ECF.[480170] [10-3270]
December 15, 2011 Filing 504 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file document [54] filed by Appellant Viacom International, Inc., Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Black Entertainment Television, LLC, by RCW, FILED. [474573][504] [10-3270]
November 14, 2011 Filing 503 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[457786] [10-3270]
November 8, 2011 Filing 500 POST ARGUMENT BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/08/2011 by CM/ECF. [442223] [10-3270]
November 4, 2011 Filing 499 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[438356] [10-3270]
November 4, 2011 Filing 498 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[438355] [10-3270]
November 2, 2011 Filing 502 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[457785] [10-3270]
November 1, 2011 Filing 496 POST ARGUMENT BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 11/01/2011 by CM/ECF. [435447] [10-3270]
October 27, 2011 Filing 495 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[430394] [10-3270]
October 27, 2011 Filing 494 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[430393] [10-3270]
October 25, 2011 Filing 493 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED.[428617] [10-3270]
October 25, 2011 Filing 492 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[428616] [10-3270]
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER, dated 10/25/2011, parties are to submit letter briefs, defendants response due 11/01/2011, and plaintiffs response due 11/08/2011 FILED.[427766] [10-3270]
October 18, 2011 Filing 488 LETTER, dated 10/17/2011, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 10/18/2011 by CM/ECF.[421416] [10-3270]
October 18, 2011 Filing 487 LETTER, dated 10/17/2011, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 10/18/2011 by CM/ECF.[421387] [10-3270]
October 18, 2011 Filing 486 CASE, before RJM, JAC*, DAL, C.JJ., HEARD.[420259] [10-3270]
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER, dated 10/18/2011, approving counsel Scott B. Wilkens to bring a laptop to the Courtroom, FILED.[419658] [10-3270]
October 13, 2011 Filing 483 LETTER, dated 10/12/2011, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 10/13/2011 by CM/ECF.[415904] [10-3270]
October 13, 2011 Filing 481 LETTER, dated 10/12/2011, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 10/13/2011 by CM/ECF.[415542] [10-3270]
September 28, 2011 Filing 476 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Vobile International Inc., FILED. Service date 09/28/2011 by CM/ECF.[403568] [10-3270]
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER, dated 09/27/2011, In anticipation of oral argument on October 18, 2011, counsel of record in the captioned cases are invited to consult with each other with respect to the allocation of time within the parameters established by the Court, FILED.[402457] [10-3270]
September 27, 2011 Filing 470 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. (MPAA), FILED. Service date 09/27/2011 by CM/ECF.[402446] [10-3270]
September 27, 2011 Filing 469 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Audible Magic Corporation, FILED. Service date 09/27/2011 by CM/ECF.[402412] [10-3270]
September 27, 2011 Filing 468 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Public Knowledge, FILED. Service date 09/27/2011 by CM/ECF.[402380] [10-3270]
September 27, 2011 Filing 467 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Ass'n (CCIA) and NetCoalition, FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF, US mail.[401941] [10-3270]
September 26, 2011 Filing 462 MOTION ORDER, granting the motion filed by The International Intellectual Property to file amicus curiae brief [90], FILED. [401173][462] [10-3270]
September 23, 2011 Filing 466 MOTION ORDER, granting the motion filed by Public Knowledge to file amicus curiae brief [273], FILED. [401283][466] [10-3270]
September 23, 2011 Filing 465 MOTION ORDER, granting the motion filed by Audible Magic Corporation to file amicus curiae brief [117], FILED. [401254][465] [10-3270]
September 23, 2011 Filing 464 MOTION ORDER, granting the motion filed by Picture Association of America to file amicus curiae brief [83], FILED. [401233][464] [10-3270]
September 23, 2011 Filing 463 MOTION ORDER, granting the motion filed by Vobile, Inc., to file amicus curiae brief [127], FILED. [401221][463] [10-3270]
September 23, 2011 Filing 461 MOTION ORDER, granting non pty am mot to file amicus curiae brief [298], FILED. [401135][461] [10-3270]
September 21, 2011 Filing 460 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 09/21/2011 by CM/ECF. [396812] [10-3270]
September 14, 2011 Filing 457 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/14/2011 by CM/ECF. [391319] [10-3270]
September 14, 2011 Filing 456 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[390720] [10-3270]
September 14, 2011 Filing 455 ATTORNEY, Partha Chattoraj for Audible Magic Corporation, in case 10-3270 , [116], ADDED.[390510] [10-3270]
September 14, 2011 Filing 454 LETTER, dated 09/14/2011, on behalf of Movant Audible Magic Corporation, RECEIVED. Service date 09/14/2011 by CM/ECF.[390392] [10-3270]
September 13, 2011 Filing 453 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 10/18/2011, A Panel, SET.[389881] [10-3270]
September 2, 2011 Filing 451 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 09/02/2011, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 09/02/2011 by CM/ECF.[381530] [10-3270]
August 30, 2011 Filing 448 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 08/30/2011, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 08/30/2011 by CM/ECF.[378826] [10-3270]
August 28, 2011 Filing 445 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 08/26/2011, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 08/28/2011 by CM/ECF.[376672] [10-3270]
August 26, 2011 Filing 443 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 08/26/2011, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 08/26/2011 by CM/ECF.[376152] [10-3270]
August 26, 2011 Filing 441 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 08/26/2011, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 08/26/2011 by CM/ECF.[375647] [10-3270]
August 24, 2011 Filing 438 LETTER, dated 08/24/2011, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 08/24/2011 by CM/ECF.[373306] [10-3270]
August 18, 2011 Filing 436 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 10/18/2011, PROPOSED.[369511] [10-3270]
August 17, 2011 Filing 435 ATTORNEY, Maura L. Rees for Youtube, Inc. Youtube, LLC Google, Inc., in case 10-3270 , [434], ADDED.[367667] [10-3270]
August 16, 2011 Filing 434 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 08/16/2011 by CM/ECF. [367022] [10-3270]
July 21, 2011 Filing 431 LETTER, dated 07/21/2011, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 07/21/2011 by CM/ECF.[345129] [10-3270]--[Edited 07/22/2011 by DH]
July 6, 2011 Filing 427 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 09/19/2011,B, PROPOSED.[331826] [10-3270]
June 17, 2011 Filing 422 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 06/17/2011, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 06/17/2011 by CM/ECF.[318585] [10-3270]
June 14, 2011 Filing 419 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 06/14/2011, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED.[315033] [10-3270]
June 13, 2011 Filing 418 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 09/12/2011, PROPOSED.[313488] [10-3270]
June 8, 2011 Filing 416 LETTER, dated 06/08/2011, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 06/08/2011 by CM/ECF.[310315] [10-3270]
May 23, 2011 Filing 415 ATTORNEY, Brian D. Ginsberg, [414], in place of attorney Jonathan Lee Marcus, SUBSTITUTED.[296722] [10-3270]
May 20, 2011 Filing 414 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Business Software Alliance, FILED. Service date 05/20/2011 by CM/ECF. [296189] [10-3270]
May 10, 2011 Filing 411 LETTER, dated 05/10/2011, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 05/10/2011 by CM/ECF.[285036] [10-3270]
May 9, 2011 Filing 408 LETTER, dated 05/09/2011, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 05/09/2011 by CM/ECF.[283887] [10-3270]
April 29, 2011 Filing 407 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (VOLUME IX), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [276986] [10-3270]
April 29, 2011 Filing 406 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume VIII), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [276981] [10-3270]
April 29, 2011 Filing 405 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume VII), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [276980] [10-3270]
April 29, 2011 Filing 404 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume VI), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [276975] [10-3270]
April 29, 2011 Filing 403 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume V), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [276973] [10-3270]
April 29, 2011 Filing 402 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume IV), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [276970] [10-3270]
April 29, 2011 Filing 401 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume III), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [276968] [10-3270]
April 29, 2011 Filing 400 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume II), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [276967] [10-3270]
April 29, 2011 Filing 399 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume I), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [276960] [10-3270]
April 28, 2011 Filing 396 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume IX), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/28/2011 by CM/ECF. [276194] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/29/2011 by DH]
April 28, 2011 Filing 395 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume VIII), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/28/2011 by CM/ECF. [276193] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/29/2011 by DH]
April 28, 2011 Filing 394 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume VII), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/28/2011 by CM/ECF. [276192] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/29/2011 by DH]
April 28, 2011 Filing 393 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume VI), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/28/2011 by CM/ECF. [276191] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/29/2011 by DH]
April 28, 2011 Filing 392 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume V), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/28/2011 by CM/ECF. [276190] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/29/2011 by DH]
April 28, 2011 Filing 391 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume IV), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/28/2011 by CM/ECF. [276189] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/29/2011 by DH]
April 28, 2011 Filing 390 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume III), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/28/2011 by CM/ECF. [276188] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/29/2011 by DH]
April 28, 2011 Filing 389 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume II), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/28/2011 by CM/ECF. [276187] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/29/2011 by DH]
April 28, 2011 Filing 388 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX, (Volume I), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/28/2011 by CM/ECF. [276184] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/29/2011 by DH]
April 28, 2011 Filing 387 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/28/2011 by CM/ECF. [276111] [10-3270]
April 25, 2011 Filing 383 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Amicus Brief[337], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Venture Capital Association, FILED.[271543] [10-3270]
April 22, 2011 Filing 382 AMICUS BRIEF, National Venture Capital Association, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[271180] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/25/2011 by DH]
April 19, 2011 Filing 379 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized reply brief filed by Appellant Viacom International, Inc., [362], by RJL, FILED. [267748][379] [10-3270]
April 15, 2011 Filing 374 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to file oversized brief [362], on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/15/2011 by CM/ECF. [264648][374] [10-3270]
April 15, 2011 Filing 368 ATTORNEY, Bart E. Volkmer for Youtube, Inc. Youtube, LLC Google, Inc., in case 10-3270 , [359], ADDED.[264177] [10-3270]
April 15, 2011 Filing 367 ATTORNEY, Michael H. Rubin for Youtube, Inc. Youtube, LLC Google, Inc., in case 10-3270 , [358], ADDED.[264170] [10-3270]
April 15, 2011 Filing 365 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae IAC/InterActiceCorp., ADDED.[264140] [10-3270]
April 15, 2011 Filing 364 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Amicus Brief[339], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Facebook, Inc., InterActiveCorp, Yahoo! Inc. and eBay Inc., FILED.[264114] [10-3270]
April 14, 2011 Filing 363 AMICUS BRIEF, <EDIT by Clerk's Office>, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[263791] [10-3270]
April 14, 2011 Filing 362 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/14/2011 by CM/ECF. [263667] [10-3270]
April 14, 2011 Filing 361 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Andrew H. Schapiro for Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/14/2011 by CM/ECF. [263476] [10-3270]
April 14, 2011 Filing 360 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Theodore B. Olson for Appellant Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/14/2011 by CM/ECF. [263393] [10-3270]
April 13, 2011 Filing 359 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/13/2011 by CM/ECF. [262369] [10-3270]
April 13, 2011 Filing 358 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/13/2011 by CM/ECF. [262365] [10-3270]
April 13, 2011 Filing 357 ATTORNEY, David H. Kramer for Youtube, Inc. Youtube, LLC Google, Inc., in case 10-3270 , [356], ADDED.[262232] [10-3270]
April 13, 2011 Filing 356 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/13/2011 by CM/ECF. [261936] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 354 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Facebook, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, Yahoo! Inc. and eBay Inc., FILED. Service date 04/12/2011 by CM/ECF. [261110] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/15/2011 by DH]--[Edited 04/15/2011 by DH]--[Edited 04/15/2011 by DH]
April 12, 2011 Filing 353 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Consumer Action, Consumers Union, National Consumers League and United States Student Association, FILED. Service date 04/12/2011 by CM/ECF.[261065] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 352 MOTION ORDER, granting non party amicus motion to file amicus curiae brief, [349], FILED. [260677][352] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 351 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Motion[350], [316], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Consumer Action, Consumers Union, National Consumers League and United States Student Association, FILED.[260650] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 350 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, [328], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Consumer Action, Consumers Union of United States, Inc., National Consumers League and United States Student Association, FILED.[260613] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 349 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date04/12/2011 by CM/ECF.[260573] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 347 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Amicus Brief [320], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Professor Michael Carrier, FILED.[260550] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 345 CD/DVD, SEALED Hyperlink, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, Received. [260486] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 344 SEALED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. [260455] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 339 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [310], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Facebook, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. and eBay Inc., FILED.[260394] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 338 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiaes eBay Inc., Facebook, Inc., InterActiveCorp and Yahoo! Inc., ADDED.[260379] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/12/2011 by DH]
April 12, 2011 Filing 337 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [309], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Venture Capital Association, FILED.[260363] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 336 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae National Venture Capital Association, ADDED.[260356] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 335 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Amicus Brief [332], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Anaheim Ballet, Adam Bahner, Michael Bassik, Dane Boedigheimer, Mathew Brown, Michael Buckley, Shay Butler, Charles Como, Iman Crosson, Philip De Villis, Rawn Erickson, Kassem Gharaibeh, Hank Green, John Green, William Louis Hyde, Khan Academy Inc., Michael Moore, Kevin Nalty, Allison Speed, Charles Todd, Charles Trippy and Barnett Zitron, FILED.[260276] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 333 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiaes Electronic Frontier Foundation, Center for Democracy and Technology, International Federation of Library Associations and Institutions, American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, ADDED.[260128] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 332 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [290], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Anaheim Ballet, Adam Bahner, Michael Bassik, Dane Boedigheimer, Mathew Brown, Michael Buckley, Shay Butler, Charles Como, Iman Crosson, Philip De Villis, Rawn Erickson, Kassem Gharaibeh, Hank Green, John Green, William Louis Hyde, Khan Academy Inc., Michael Moore, Kevin Nalty, Allison Speed, Charles Todd, Charles Trippy and Barnett Zitron, FILED.[260028] [10-3270]
April 12, 2011 Filing 331 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiaes Anaheim Ballet, Michael Moore, Khan Academy Inc., Adam Bahner, Michael Bassik, Dane Boedigheimer, Mathew Brown, Michael Buckley, Shay Butler, Charles Como, Iman Crosson, Philip De Villis, Rawn Erickson, Hank Green, John Green, Kassem Gharaibeh, William Louis Hyde, Kevin Nalty, Allison Speed, Charles Todd, Charles Trippy and Barnett Zitron, ADDED.[259980] [10-3270]
April 11, 2011 Filing 328 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date04/11/2011 by CM/ECF.[259368] [10-3270]
April 11, 2011 Filing 327 AMICUS BRIEF, Professor Michael Carrier, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[258870] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/12/2011 by DH]
April 8, 2011 Filing 325 MOTION ORDER, referring non partty amicus motion to file amicus curiae brief, [298], by, FILED. [258354][325] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/08/2011 by DH]
April 8, 2011 Filing 323 MOTION ORDER, referring non party amicus motion to file amicus curiae brief, [273], by, FILED. [258239][323] [10-3270]
April 8, 2011 Filing 322 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/08/2011 by CM/ECF. [257723] [10-3270]
April 8, 2011 Filing 321 LETTER, dated 04/08/2011, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2011 by CM/ECF.[257716] [10-3270]
April 8, 2011 Filing 320 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [276], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Professor Michael Carrier, FILED.[257701] [10-3270]
April 8, 2011 Filing 316 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, [300], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Consumer Action, Consumers Union, National Consumers League and United States Student Association, FILED.[257299] [10-3270]
April 8, 2011 Filing 315 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiaes National Consumers League, Consumer Action, United States Student Association and Consumers Union, ADDED.[257282] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 313 AMICUS BRIEF, MP3TUNES, Inc, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[257020] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/12/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 312 AMICUS BRIEF, Intellectual Property And Internet Law Professors, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[257014] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/12/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 311 AMICUS BRIEF, Human Rights Watch, Freedom House, Reporters Without Borders and Access, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[257005] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/12/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 310 AMICUS BRIEF, Ebay Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivie and Yahoo! Inc., FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[257001] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/12/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 309 AMICUS BRIEF, National Venture Capital Association, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[256993] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/12/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 307 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Ass'n (CCIA) and NetCoalition, ADDED.[256982] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 305 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae National Alliance for Media Art & Culture and The Alliance for Community Media, ADDED.[256938] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 304 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Alliance for Media Art & Culture and The Alliance for Community Media, FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [256927] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 303 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Human Rights Watch, Freedom House, Reporters Without Borders, Access, ADDED.[256921] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 301 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Human Rights Watch, Freedom House, Reporters Without Borders, Access , FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [256870] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 300 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date04/07/2011 by CM/ECF.[256842] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 299 AMICUS BRIEF, Anaheim Ballet, Michael Moore, Khan Academy Inc., Adam Bahner, Michael Bassik, Dane Boedigheimer, Matthew Brown, Michael Buckley, Shay Butler, Charles Como, Iman Crosson, Philip De Vellis, Rawn Erickson, Hank Green, John Green, Kassem Gharaibeh, Williams Louis Hyde, Kevin Nalty, Allison Speed, Charles Todd, Charles Trippy and Barnett Zitron FILED. Service date serviceTextdate, .,SKIP)[256815] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/12/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 298 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date04/07/2011 by CM/ECF.[256806] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 297 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Electronic Frontier Foundation, Center For Democracy And Technology, International Federation Of Library Associations And Institutions, American Library Association, Association Of College And Research Libraries, And Association Of Research Libraries, FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [256731] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/12/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 296 AMICUS BRIEF, Elecronic Frontier Foundation, Center For Democracy And Technology, International Federation Of Library Associations And Institution, American Library Association, Association Of College And Research Libraries And Association Of Research Libraries, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[256716] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/12/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 295 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Consumers League, Consumer Action, United States Student Association, Consumers Union , FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [256706] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 294 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, eBay, Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/InterActive Corp., and Yahoo! Inc., FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [256681] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 293 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Computer & Communications Industry Ass'n (CCIA) and NetCoaltion, FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [256665] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 292 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Venture Capital Association , FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [256641] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 291 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel [283], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property and Internet Law Professors, FILED.[256633] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 290 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of, Anaheim Ballet, Michael Moore, Khan Academy Inc., Adam Bahner, Michael Bassik, Dane Boedigheimer, Mathew Brown, Michael Buckley, Shay Butler, Charles Como, Iman Crosson Philip De Villis, Rawn Erickson, Hank Green, John Green, Kassem Gharaibeh, William Louis Hyde, Kevin Nalty, Allison Speed, Charles Todd, Charles Trippy, Barnett Zitron, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[256620] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/11/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 289 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Intellectual Property and Internet Law Professors, FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [256612] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 288 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Anaheim Ballet, Michael Moore, Khan Academy Inc., Adam Bahner, Michael Bassik, Dane Boedigheimer, Mathew Brown, Michael Buckley, Shay Butler, Charles Como, Iman Crosson Philip De Villis, Rawn Erickson, Hank Green, John Green, Kassem Gharaibeh, William Louis Hyde, Kevin Nalty, Allison Speed, Charles Todd, Charles Trippy, Barnett Zitron, FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [256571] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 287 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel [281], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Professor Michael Carrier, FILED.[256547] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 285 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiaes MP3tunes, Inc., ADDED.[256540] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 284 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Professor Michael Carrier , FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [256522] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 283 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [277], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property and Internet Law Professors, FILED.[256500] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 282 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property and Internet Law Professors, ADDED.[256494] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 281 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [275], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Professor Michael Carrier, FILED.[256475] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 280 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Professor Michael Carrier, ADDED.[256471] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 278 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Public Knowledge, ADDED.[256437] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 277 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Intellectual Property and Internet Law Professors, FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [256426] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 276 AMICUS BRIEF, Professor Michael Carrier, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[256291] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 275 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Professor Michael Carrier , FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [256289] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 274 AMICUS BRIEF, National Alliance For Media Art And Culture and The Alliance For Community Media , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[256098] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 7, 2011 Filing 273 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date04/07/2011 by CM/ECF.[255704] [10-3270]
April 7, 2011 Filing 272 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Public Knowledge, FILED. Service date 04/07/2011 by CM/ECF. [255703] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/07/2011 by DH]
April 6, 2011 Filing 271 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, MP3tunes. Inc.,, FILED. Service date 04/06/2011 by CM/ECF. [255486] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/06/2011 by DH]
April 6, 2011 Filing 270 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, MP3tunes.Inc.,, FILED. Service date 04/06/2011 by CM/ECF. [255474] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/06/2011 by DH]
April 6, 2011 Filing 269 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, MP3tunes, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/06/2011 by CM/ECF. [255450] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/06/2011 by DH]
April 6, 2011 Filing 268 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [263], [264], [265], on behalf of , FILED.[255404] [10-3270]
April 6, 2011 Filing 267 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> , FILED. Service date 04/06/2011 by CM/ECF. [255265] [10-3270]
April 5, 2011 Filing 265 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> , FILED. Service date 04/05/2011 by CM/ECF. [254212] [10-3270]
April 5, 2011 Filing 264 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> , FILED. Service date 04/05/2011 by CM/ECF. [254177] [10-3270]
April 5, 2011 Filing 263 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> , FILED. Service date 04/05/2011 by CM/ECF. [254153] [10-3270]
April 4, 2011 Filing 261 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Consumer Electronics Association, ADDED.[251995] [10-3270]
April 4, 2011 Filing 259 AMICUS BRIEF, Consumer Electronics Association, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[251857] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/04/2011 by DH]
April 4, 2011 Filing 258 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Consumer Electronics Association, FILED. Service date 04/04/2011 by CM/ECF. [251842] [10-3270]--[Edited 04/04/2011 by DH]
April 1, 2011 Filing 257 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 04/01/2011 by CM/ECF. [251532] [10-3270]
March 31, 2011 Filing 256 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 03/31/2011 by CM/ECF. [249893] [10-3270]
March 23, 2011 Filing 255 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file supplemental appendix filed by Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, [251],FILED. [242629][255] [10-3270]
March 18, 2011 Filing 251 MOTION, to file supplemental appendix, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 03/18/2011 by CM/ECF. [238621] [10-3270]
March 14, 2011 Filing 250 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time filed by Appellant Viacom International, Inc., [245], by RKW, FILED. [233561][250] [10-3270]
March 4, 2011 Filing 245 MOTION, to extend time to 04/28/2011 at 11:59 pm, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/04/2011 by CM/ECF. [226847] [10-3270]
January 24, 2011 Filing 244 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief filed by Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, [237], by RAK, FILED. [192513][244] [10-3270]
January 19, 2011 Filing 237 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 01/19/2011 by CM/ECF. [189303] [10-3270]
January 14, 2011 Filing 234 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED.Service date12/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[187125] [10-3270]
January 14, 2011 Filing 233 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, David W. Hill, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[187094] [10-3270]--[Edited 01/18/2011 by DH]
January 14, 2011 Filing 232 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Amicus Brief [136], on behalf of Amicus Curiae AFM and AFTRA, FILED.[187006] [10-3270]
January 6, 2011 Filing 229 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, Motion For Pro Hac Vice and Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [226], [227], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Intellectual Property Law Association, FILED.[181331] [10-3270]
January 6, 2011 Filing 227 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED.Service date12/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[181253] [10-3270]
January 6, 2011 Filing 226 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, American Intellectual Property Law Association , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[181227] [10-3270]--[Edited 01/06/2011 by DH]
January 6, 2011 Filing 225 MOTION ORDER, granting non pty am Microsoft Corporation and Electronic Arts Inc., mot to file amicus curiae brief, [192], FILED. [181193][225] [10-3270]
January 4, 2011 Filing 219 NEW PARTY, Movant Microsoft Corporation, ADDED.[178589] [10-3270]
January 4, 2011 Filing 218 MOTION ORDER, referring non pty am Vobile, Inc. mot to file amicus curiae brief, [94], FILED. [178566][218] [10-3270]
January 4, 2011 Filing 217 MOTION ORDER, referring non pty am Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. and Independent Film & Television Alliances' mot to file amicus curiae brief, [83], FILED. [178437][217] [10-3270]
January 4, 2011 Filing 216 MOTION ORDER, referring non pty am Audible Magic Corporations mot to file amicus curiae brief, [117], FILED. [178411][216] [10-3270]
January 4, 2011 Filing 214 AMICUS BRIEF, of American Federation of Musicians, American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, Directors Guild of America, Inc., International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees, Screen Actors Guild, Inc. and Studio Transportation Drivers, Local 399, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[178291] [10-3270]--[Edited 01/04/2011 by DH]
January 4, 2011 Filing 212 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Business Software Alliance, ADDED.[178269] [10-3270]
January 4, 2011 Filing 210 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Amicus Brief [183], on behalf of Amicus Curiae John R. Allison, Robert G. Bone, Hugh C. Hansen, Michael S. Knoll, Reinier H. Kraakman, Alan Schwartz, Robert E. Scott and Matthew L. Spitzer, CURED.[178222] [10-3270]
January 3, 2011 Filing 202 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiaes Broadcast Music, Inc. (BMI), American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers (ASCAP), SESAC, Inc. (SESAC), The Society of Composers And Lyricists (SCL), The Association of Independent Music Publishers (AIMP), The Songwriters of Guild of America (SGA), The Recording Academy, The Nashville Songwriters Association International (NSAI), American Association of Independent of Independent Music (A2IM), Music Publishers' Association of the United States (MPA), Lisa Thomas Music Services, LLC, Garth Brooks, Bruce Hornsby, Boz Scaggs, Sting, Roger Waters, Glenn Frey, Don Henley, Timothy B. Schmit and Joe Walsh (The Eagles), ADDED.[177664] [10-3270]
December 29, 2010 Filing 201 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC Brief due date as 03/31/2011, FILED.[175221] [10-3270]
December 23, 2010 Filing 200 CD/DVD, Sealed Hyperlink, on behalf of Appellants Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacoe International, Inc., RECEIVED.[173913] [10-3270]
December 20, 2010 Filing 199 AMICUS BRIEF, Corrected Brief of Amicus Curiae Washington Legal Foundation, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[171290] [10-3270]--[Edited 12/29/2010 by DH]
December 17, 2010 Filing 195 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Intellectual Property Law Association, ADDED.[169297] [10-3270]
December 16, 2010 Filing 193 LETTER, dated , on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 12/16/2010 by US mail, CM/ECF.[169088] [10-3270]
December 16, 2010 Filing 192 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date12/16/2010 by CM/ECF.[169069] [10-3270]
December 16, 2010 Filing 191 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Broadcast Music, Inc., American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers (ASCAP), SESAC, Inc., Society of Composers and Lyricists ("SCL"), Association of Independent Music Publishers ("AIMP"), Songwriters Guild of America ("SGA"), The Recording Academy, Nashville Songwriters Association International ("NSAI"), American Association of Independent Music ("A2IM"), Music Publishers Association of the United States ("MPA"), Lisa Thomas Music Services, LLC, and Garth Brooks, Bruce Hornsby, Boz Scaggs, Sting, Roger Waters, Glenn Frey, Don Henley, Timothy B. Schmit, Joe Walsh (the Eagles), FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[169030] [10-3270]--[Edited 12/29/2010 by DH]
December 16, 2010 Filing 186 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Microsoft Corporation, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[168775] [10-3270]--[Edited 12/29/2010 by DH]
December 16, 2010 Filing 185 LETTER, dated , on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 12/16/2010 by CM/ECF.[168724] [10-3270]
December 16, 2010 Filing 184 AMICUS BRIEF, Matthew L. Spitzer, John R. Allison, Robert G. Bone, Hugh C. Hansen, Michael S. Knoll, Reinier H. Kraakman, Alan Schwartz, And Robert E. Scott, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[168722] [10-3270]--[Edited 12/29/2010 by DH]
December 16, 2010 Filing 183 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [95], on behalf of Amicus Curiae John R. Allison, Robert G. Bone, Hugh C. Hansen, Hugh C. Hansen, Michael S. Knoll, Reinier H. Kraakman, Alan Schwartz, Robert E. Scott and Matthew L. Spitzer, FILED.[168687] [10-3270]
December 16, 2010 Filing 182 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiaes Matthew L. Spitzer, John R. Allison, Robert G. Bone, Hugh C. Hansen, Reinier H. Kraakman, Alan Schwartz, Michael S. Knoll and Robert E. Scott, ADDED.[168678] [10-3270]
December 16, 2010 Filing 180 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion For Pro Hac Vice, [119], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Intellectual Property Law Association, FILED.[168620] [10-3270]
December 16, 2010 Filing 179 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiaes Stuart N. Brotman, Ronald A Cass and Raymond T. Nimmer, ADDED.[168533] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 176 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Washington Post, ADDED.[168327] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 175 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Sports Right Owners Coalition, ADDED.[168326] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 174 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The E.W. Scripps Company, ADDED.[168324] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 173 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Rosetta Stone Ltd., ADDED.[168323] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 172 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Radio Television Digital News Association, ADDED.[168320] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 171 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Professional Photographer of America, ADDED.[168319] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 170 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Picture Archive Council of America, ADDED.[168317] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 169 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Newspaper Association of America, ADDED.[168315] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 168 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The National Football League, ADDED.[168313] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 167 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae National Association of Black Owned Broadcasters, ADDED.[168309] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 166 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Minority Media & Telecommunications Council, Inc., ADDED.[168307] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 165 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Media Institute, ADDED.[168305] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 164 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The McClatchy Company, ADDED.[168304] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 163 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Ladies Professional Golf Association, ADDED.[168302] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 162 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Institute for Policy Innovation, ADDED.[168299] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 161 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae ICBC Broadcast Holdings, Inc., ADDED.[168296] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 160 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Gannett Co., Inc., ADDED.[168283] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 159 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Center for the Rule of Law, ADDED.[168278] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 158 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Associated Press, ADDED.[168274] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 157 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Association of American Universtiy Presses, ADDED.[168266] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 156 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Association of American Publishers, ADDED.[168261] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 155 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Advance Publications, Inc., ADDED.[168252] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 153 NEW PARTY, Movant Vobile Inc., --[Edited 12/16/2010 by DH]ADDED.[168209] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 150 NEW PARTY, Movant Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. (MPAA), ADDED.[168105] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 149 MOTION ORDER, referring non pty am mot to file amicus curiae brief, [90], FILED. [168090][149] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 148 AMICUS BRIEF, Corrected Brief for Amicus Curiae the Business Software Alliance in Support of Reversal--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH], FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[167963] [10-3270]
December 15, 2010 Filing 145 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae International Property Law Professors: Howard B. Abrams, Zoe Argento, Bruce E. Boyden, Hugh C. Hansen, William D. Henslee, Connie Davis Powell and Tracey L. Reilly, ADDED.[167355] [10-3270]
December 14, 2010 Filing 140 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [99], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Washington Legal Foundation, FILED.[167176] [10-3270]
December 14, 2010 Filing 139 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Washington Legal Foundation, ADDED.[167165] [10-3270]
December 14, 2010 Filing 137 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae CBS Corporation, ADDED.[167094] [10-3270]
December 14, 2010 Filing 136 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [91], on behalf of Amicus Curiae AFM, AFTRA, DGA, IATSE, SAG and Teamsters Local 399, FILED.[167078] [10-3270]
December 14, 2010 Filing 135 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, International Intellectual Property Institute--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH], FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[167030] [10-3270]
December 14, 2010 Filing 134 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiaes AFTRA, DGA, IATSE, SAG, AFM and Teamsters Local 399, ADDED.[167026] [10-3270]
December 14, 2010 Filing 133 ATTORNEY, Jeremy H. Stern , [116], ADDED.[166869] [10-3270]
December 14, 2010 Filing 129 NEW PARTY, Movant International Intellectual Property Institute, ADDED.[166784] [10-3270]
December 13, 2010 Filing 142 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property Law Professors: Howard B. Abrams, Zoe Argento, Bruce E. Boyden, Hugh C. Hansen, William D. Henslee, Connie Davis Powell, Tracey L. Reilly, ADDED.[167313] [10-3270]
December 13, 2010 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae International Property Law Professors: Howard B. Abrams, Zoe Argento, Bruce E. Boyden, Hugh C. hansen, William D. Henselee, Connie Davis Powell, Tracey L. Reilly , FILED. [Edited 12/15/2010 by AM][166054] [10-3270]
December 13, 2010 Filing 127 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date12/13/2010 by CM/ECF.[166039] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 132 NEW PARTY, Movant Audible Magic Corporation, ADDED.[166860] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 126 APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/10/2010 by CM/ECF. [165101] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 125 APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/10/2010 by CM/ECF. [165098] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 124 APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/10/2010 by CM/ECF. [165096] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 123 APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/10/2010 by CM/ECF. [165093] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 122 APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/10/2010 by CM/ECF. [165092] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 121 APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/10/2010 by CM/ECF. [165091] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 120 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[165088] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 119 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Intellectual Property Law Association, FILED.Service date12/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[165087] [10-3270]---[Edited 12/17/2010 by AM]
December 10, 2010 Filing 118 AMICUS BRIEF, for Broadcast Music, Inc., (BMI), American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers (ASCAP), SESAC, Inc., (SESAC), The Society of Composers and Lyricists (SCL), The Association of Independent Music Publishers (AIMP), The S--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH]ongwriters Guild of America (SGA), The Recording Academy, The Nashville Songwriters Association International (NSAI), American Association of Independent Music (A2IM), Music Publishers' Association of the United States (MPA), Lisa Thomas Music Services, LLC, Garth Brooks, Bruce Hornsby, Boz Scaggs, Sting, Roger Waters; Glenn Frey, Don Henley, Timothy B. Schmit, Joe Walsh (The Eagels), FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[165086] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 117 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Audible Magic Corporation, FILED. Service date12/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[165080] [10-3270]--[Edited 12/14/2010 by AM]
December 10, 2010 Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Audible Magic Corporation , FILED. Service date 12/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[165074] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, CBS Corporation--[Edited 12/14/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[165052] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 114 AMICUS BRIEF, CBS Corporation--[Edited 12/14/2010 by DH], FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[165050] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 113 AMICUS BRIEF, for the Business Software Alliance--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH], FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[165046] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 112 AMICUS BRIEF, of Microsoft Corporation and Electronic Arts Inc., FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[165042] [10-3270]--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH]
December 10, 2010 Filing 111 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date12/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[165038] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Zuffa, LLC--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[165033] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Zuffa, LLC--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[165027] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Zuffa, LLC--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[165026] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 107 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of , FILED. Service date 12/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[165023] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 106 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Hon. Bruce A. Lehman--[Edited 12/14/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[165010] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, International Intellectual Property Institute--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[165002] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Washington Legal Foundation--[Edited 12/14/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164987] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 103 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 03/31/2011, RECEIVED. Service date 12/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[164983] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 102 AMICUS BRIEF, of Stuart N. Brotman, Ronald A. Cass, And Raymond T. Nimmer, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164974] [10-3270]--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH]
December 10, 2010 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Business Software Alliance--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164943] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, International Intellectual Property Institute--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164942] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 99 AMICUS BRIEF, Washington Legal Foundation--[Edited 12/14/2010 by DH], FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164937] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 97 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Intellectual Property Law Professors: Howard B. Abrams, Zoe Argento, Bruce E. Boyden, Hugh C. Hansen, William D. Henslee, Connie Davis Powell, Tracey L. Reilly, FILED. Service date 12/10/2010 by CM/ECF[164906] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 96 AMICUS BRIEF, for The International Intellectual Property Institute--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH], FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164878] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 95 AMICUS BRIEF, of Matthew L. Spitzer, John R. Allison, Ro--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH]bert G. Bone, Hugh C. Hansen, Michael S. Knoll, Reinier H. Kraakman, Alan Schwartz, And Robert E. Scott, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164862] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 94 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date12/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[164856] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 93 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date12/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[164846] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Vobile, Inc., --[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164838] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 91 AMICUS BRIEF, AFTRA, DGA, IATSE, SAG, AFM and Teamsters Local 399--[Edited 12/14/2010 by DH], FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164820] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 90 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date12/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[164784] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Matthew L. Spitzer, John R. Allison, Robert G. Bone, Hugh C. Hansen, Michael S. Knoll, Reinier H. Kraakman, Alan Schwartz, and Robert E. Scott--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164775] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, International Intellectual Property Institute , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164696] [10-3270]--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH]
December 10, 2010 Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Stuart N. Brotman, Ronald A. Cass, and Raymond T. Nimmer--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH], FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164677] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Advance Publications, Inc., Association of American Publishers, Association of Amercian University Presses, The Associated Press, The Center for the Rule of Law, Gannett Co., Inc., ICBC--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH] Broadcast Holdings, Inc., Institute for Policy Innovation, The Ladies Professional Golf Association, The McClatchy Company, The Media Institute, Minority Media & Telecommunications Council, Inc., National Association of Black owned Broadcasters, The National Foodball League, Newspaper Association of America, Picture Archive Council of America, Professional Photographers of America, Radio Television Digital News Association, Rosetta Stone Ltd., The E.W. Scripps Company, Sports Right Owners Coalition, and The Washington Post, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164583] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 85 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Advance Publications, Inc., Association of American --[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH]publishers, Association of American University Presses, The Associated Press, The Center for the Rule of Law, Gannett Co., Inc., ICBC Broadcast Holdings, Inc., Institute for Policy Innovation, The Ladies Professional Golf Association, The McClatchy Company, The Media Institute, Minority Media & Telecommunications Council, Inc., National Association of Black Owned Broadcasters, The National Football League, Newspaper Association of America, Picture Archive Council of America, Professional Photographers of America, Radio Television Digital News Association, Rosetta Stone Ltd., The E.W. Scripps Company, Sports Right Owners Coalition, and The Washington Post, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164575] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Advance Publications, Inc., Association of American Publishers, Association of American University Presses, The Associated Press, The Center for the Rule of Law, Gannett Co., Inc., ICBC Broadcast Holdings, Inc., Institute for Policy Innovation, The Ladies Professional Golf Association, The McClatchy Company, The Media Institute, Minority Media & Telecommunications Council, Inc., National Association of Black Owned Broadcasters, The National Football League, Newspaper Association of America, Picture Archive Council of America, Professional Photographers of Amer--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH]icas, Radio Television Digital News Association, Rosetta Stone Ltd., The E.W. Scripps Company, Sports Rights Owners Coalition, and The Washington Post, FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164570] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 83 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date12/10/2010 by CM/ECF.[164562] [10-3270]
December 10, 2010 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. (MPAA)--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[164556] [10-3270]
December 9, 2010 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Audible Magic Corporation--[Edited 12/15/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[163700] [10-3270]
December 9, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Peter D. DeChiara--[Edited 12/14/2010 by DH] , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[163294] [10-3270]
December 9, 2010 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> , FILED. Service date serviceTextdate,.,SKIP)[163161] [10-3270]
December 8, 2010 Filing 75 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Intellectual Property Law Association, ADDED.[162414] [10-3270]
December 8, 2010 Filing 74 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/03/2010 by CM/ECF.[162387] [10-3270]
December 8, 2010 Filing 72 SEALED APPENDIX, Vol. 6 on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [162290] [10-3270]
December 8, 2010 Filing 71 SEALED APPENDIX, Vol. 5 on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [162287] [10-3270]
December 8, 2010 Filing 70 SEALED APPENDIX, Vol. 4 on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [162284] [10-3270]
December 8, 2010 Filing 69 SEALED APPENDIX, Vol. 3 on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [162280] [10-3270]
December 8, 2010 Filing 68 SEALED APPENDIX, Vol. 2 on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [162279] [10-3270]
December 8, 2010 Filing 67 SEALED APPENDIX, Vol. 1--[Edited 12/08/2010 by DH]on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [162265] [10-3270]
December 8, 2010 Filing 64 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Brief [62], on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., CURED.[162203] [10-3270]
December 7, 2010 Filing 63 CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/07/2010 by CM/ECF. [162064] [10-3270]
December 7, 2010 Filing 62 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief, [59], on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., FILED.[161716] [10-3270]
December 3, 2010 Filing 61 AMICUS BRIEF, American Intellectual Property Law Association, FILED. Service date 12/03/2010--[Edited 12/08/2010 by DH])[159637] [10-3270]--
December 3, 2010 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE , on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc. and Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 12/03/2010 by CM/ECF. [159636] [10-3270]
December 3, 2010 Filing 59 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/03/2010 by CM/ECF.[159159] [10-3270]
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER, Granting the motion by Appellants The Football Association Premier League Ltd. et al., (1) for permission to file one double-captioned joint appendix for dockets 10-3270 and 10-3342 and to deem the paper versions filed on one docket to be filed in both cases, by RCW, FILED.[144233] [10-3270]
November 4, 2010 Filing 54 MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/04/2010 by CM/ECF. [140371] [10-3270]
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER directing appeals 10-3270 & 10-3342 to be heard in tandem, FILED. See motion order filed 10/18/2010. [10-3270]
October 18, 2010 Filing 51 MOTION ORDER, granting in part motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellee Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, [42], by RCW, FILED. [126589][51] [10-3270]
October 14, 2010 Filing 45 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to consolidate appeals [42], on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/14/2010 by CM/ECF, US mail. [124903][45] [10-3270]
October 5, 2010 Filing 42 MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellee Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 10/05/2010 by CM/ECF. [119068] [10-3270]
September 22, 2010 Filing 40 CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 09/23/2010, Start Time: 3:30 PM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[110541] [10-3270]
September 21, 2010 Filing 39 ATTORNEY, Matthew McGill for Viacom International, Inc., in case 10-3270 , [37], ADDED.[109637] [10-3270]
September 21, 2010 Filing 38 ATTORNEY, Theodore Olson for Viacom International, Inc., in case 10-3270 , [36], ADDED.[109631] [10-3270]
September 20, 2010 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/20/2010 by US mail. [109188] [10-3270]
September 20, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/20/2010 by US mail. [109180] [10-3270]
September 14, 2010 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, William M. Hohengarten for Appellant Comedy Partners Country Music Television, Inc. Paramount Pictures Corporation Viacom International, Inc. Black Entertainment Television, LLC, in case 10-3270 , [33], ADDED.[105825] [10-3270]
September 14, 2010 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, A. John Peter Mancini for Appellee Youtube, Inc. Youtube, LLC Google, Inc., in case 10-3270 , [32], ADDED.[105822] [10-3270]
September 14, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/14/2010 by CM/ECF. [105772] [10-3270]
September 13, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 09/13/2010 by CM/ECF. [105170] [10-3270]
September 13, 2010 Filing 31 ATTORNEY, Scott Wilkens for Comedy Partners Country Music Television, Inc. Paramount Pictures Corporation Viacom International, Inc. Black Entertainment Television, LLC, in case 10-3270 , [30], ADDED.[104939] [10-3270]
September 13, 2010 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/13/2010 by CM/ECF. [104530] [10-3270]
September 9, 2010 Filing 29 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc.: Brief due on 12/03/2010. Joint Appendix due on 12/03/2010, FILED.[103083] [10-3270]
September 8, 2010 Filing 25 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 12/03/2010, RECEIVED. Service date 09/08/2010 by CM/ECF.[102005] [10-3270]
August 30, 2010 Filing 24 CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 09/17/2010, Start Time: 3:00 PM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[97349] [10-3270]
August 26, 2010 Filing 21 NEW CASE MANAGER, Erin Murphy, ASSIGNED.[96020] [10-3270]
August 26, 2010 Filing 18 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT Forms C and D [15], on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., CURED.[95799] [10-3270]
August 26, 2010 Filing 17 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/26/2010 by CM/ECF.[95657] [10-3270]
August 26, 2010 Filing 16 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/26/2010 by CM/ECF.[95651] [10-3270]
August 26, 2010 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Forms C and D, [13], [14], on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED.[95509] [10-3270]
August 25, 2010 Filing 14 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/25/2010 by CM/ECF.[95378] [10-3270]
August 25, 2010 Filing 13 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/25/2010 by CM/ECF.[95352] [10-3270]
August 19, 2010 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/19/2010 by CM/ECF.[92160] [10-3270]
August 19, 2010 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Andrew H. Schapiro for Youtube, Inc. Youtube, LLC Google, Inc., in case 10-3270 , [9], ADDED.[92019] [10-3270]
August 19, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 08/19/2010 by CM/ECF. [91995] [10-3270]
August 18, 2010 Filing 8 ATTORNEY, Susan J. Kohlmann for Comedy Partners Country Music Television, Inc. Paramount Pictures Corporation Viacom International, Inc. Black Entertainment Television, LLC, in case 10-3270 , [7], ADDED.[90737] [10-3270]
August 17, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/17/2010 by CM/ECF. [90708] [10-3270]
August 17, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE , on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 08/17/2010 by CM/ECF. [90621] [10-3270]
August 11, 2010 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[88692] [10-3270]
August 11, 2010 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 06/23/2010, RECEIVED.[88691] [10-3270]
August 11, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [88677] [10-3270]

Search for this case: Viacom International, Inc. v. Youtube, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Viacom International, Inc.
Represented By: Paul March Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Comedy Partners
Represented By: Paul March Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Country Music Television, Inc.
Represented By: Paul March Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Represented By: Paul March Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Black Entertainment Television, LLC
Represented By: Paul March Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Youtube, Inc.
Represented By: A. John Peter Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Youtube, LLC
Represented By: A. John Peter Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Google, Inc.
Represented By: A. John Peter Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?