In Re Madoff Securities
Defendant: Neil N. Lapidus, John Nessel, Ascot Partners, L.P., Stepheny B. Riemer, Northern Trust, N.A., Miles &Shirley Fiterman Charitable Foundation, et al., Meredith Goldberg, Sylvia W. Lock Declaration of Trust, Dated April 13, 1982, Alyssa Goldberg, Lorraine Lock Nosworthy, Stanley J. Bernstein, Mistral (SPC), Pamela W. Goldberg, Russell J. DeLucia, I.I. Kotzen Company, Joshua Elkin, Melvin B. Nessel Revocable Trust, Amanda Goldberg Snyderman, Gail Nessel, Jay Gaines, Marcia Kotzen 2002 Revocable Trust, Susan Siegal, Estate of Sylvia W. Lock, Estate of Gilbert M. Kotzen, Joan Elkin Madison, Gregory Antoniazzi, Melvin B. Nessel 2006 Trust u/a/d, Gilbert M. Kotzen 1982 Trust, Frederic J. Perlen, Marital Trust created under Revocable Trust of Marvin G. Graybow, Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al., Fiterman Investment Fund, et al., Paul Rampell, Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al., Sumitomo Mitsui Trust Bank, Limited, Sharon L. Graybow, Jeremy Goldberg, Elena Elkin, Defendants' listed in Appendix A of the Court's April 13, 2012 Order, Melvin N. Lock Trust, James Nosworthy, Frank A. Petito, DBA The Petito Investment Group, Zephyros Limited, Metro Motor Imports, Inc., et al, Frederick Goldberg and Linda S. Paresky
Petitioner: Financial Institution Defendants and Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
Defendant / Appellee: Estate of Sarah E. Pearce, Diane Ringler, Jelris & Associates, L.P., Daniel Schneider, Isaac Jimmy Mayer, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Janice M. Calesa 1984 Trust, Merlin & Associates, Ltd., BDG Daniel Street, LLC, Leslie Aufzein Levine, David Ivan Lustig, Neal Goldman, David Kostin, EDB Capital, LLC, Gordon Mackenzie, ALICE ROSENWALD FUND, PetCareRx, Inc., Ashby Investment Services Limited, Brad Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust, BCC II, LLC, Double B Squared LLC, Pioneer Alternative Investment Management Limited, Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, u/a/d May 2, 2000, Hilda Hausner, Marcia Koff, Laurie Frenchman, Meredith Aufzien Bauer, METROPOLITAN PHILANTHROPIC FUND, INC., Evelyn Fisher, individually and as trustee, AMERICAN SECURITIES GROUP, L.L.C., Chester Management Cayman Limited, Elizabeth R. Varet Defined Benefit Plan & Trust, Macher Family Partnership, Nina Rosenwald, individually and as trustee of the Apollo Trust for Elizabeth R. Varet UAD as trustee of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Alice Rosenwald, as trustee of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Elizabeth R. Varet, as trustee of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO B, LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, LLC, UniCredit Bank Austria AG, Kingate Euro Fund, Ltd., Joel Yanowitz, BDG DWD Associates, LLC, AMERICAN PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION, Glantz-Ostrin Trust I, 1995 Jack Parker Descendant Trust No. 1, in 12-cv-2875, Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, El Prela Trading Investments Limited, David R. Varet, Richard Spring, Norman K. Aufzien, Ashby Holding Services Limited, PIPARTNERS, Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust, Kenneth Macher, David I. Lustig, Charles Murphy, LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, L.P., Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, in her capacity as Trustee for the Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, David Blumenfeld Family Trust, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Cynthia A. Delles, Stephen H. Stern, BDG Lake Grove I, LLC, American Securities Management, L.P., FKA American Securities, L.P., Banco Itau Europa International, Jeanne T. Spring Trust, Blumco Setauket, LLC, Santiago Reyes, Sherry Gaines, EJS, BDG Yaphank, LLC, Adam P. Glick, in 12-cv-2875, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., DOS BFS FAMILY PARTNERSHIP II, L.P., DONALD AND BETTE STEIN FAMILY TRUST, DONALD O. STEIN, WILLIAM STEIN, JAMIE STEIN WALKER, and BARBARA STEIN JAFFE, Serene Warren, as co-trustee of the Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Alan S. Gordon, Mark B. Evenstad, in his capacity as Grantor and Trustee for the Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, BDG 115 Broadhollow, L.P., Vista Management Company, Jeff E. Calesa, Daniel Lipton, ANCHORAGE CHARITABLE FUND, Benjamin R. Sigelman, individually and as beneficiary of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO, as beneficiary of the Trust UAD FBO Benjamin R. Sigelman, Elizabeth R. Varet Money Purchase Pension Plan, Stacy L. Koff, Buckmaster Farms, L.P., Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A., Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Deborah Madoff, Individually and in her capacity as Guardian for A.M. and E.M., Thelma Glantz Living Trust, Estate of Elena Jalon, Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Fern Creek Limited Partnership, SPAssociates, James Greiff, Blanchefleur Macher, Jonathan R. Sigelman, individually and as beneficiary of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO, as beneficiary of the Trust UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman, C. Ray Johnson, Mary Ann Stefanelli, Ringler Partners, L.P., Regina Fisher, individually and as General Partner of RMGF Ltd. Partnership, BDG Construction Corp., John Reisman, in 12-cv-2875, Arthur and Rochelle Belfer Foundation, Inc, Stuart H. Coleman, as trustee of the Apollo Trust for Elizabeth R. Varet UAD of the Apollo Trust FBO Nina Rosenwald, as trustee of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Nina Rosenwald, of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Elizabeth R. Varet, of Issue 1 Trust UAD 8/30, Alexander G. Anagnos, as trustee of the 2004 V Trust and as trustee of Trust (A. Anagnos et al, trustees), BDG Commack, LLC, James R. Ledley, as trustee of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman, as trustee of the Trust UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman, Brad Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee, David Abel, Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd., McKool Smith,1 Bryant Park,47th Floor, New York, NY 10036, 212-402-9400, Lisa Aufzien, El Prela Trust, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Hausner Group, Harold Greisman, Estate of Jesse L. Sigelman, Lustig Family 1990 Trust, Fairfield Greenwich (UK) Limited, Scott Ostrin Trust, Alexandra E. Hausner Cave, Port of Hercules Trustees Limited, Elizabeth R. Varet IRA Rollover, Jeffrey Hinte, Ostrin Family Partnership, Cyril Jalon, South Sea Holdings L.P., Michael Frenchman, Sew General, LLC, Philip Toub, Maxrob, L.P., Tensyr Limited, Bonnie J. Kansler, UniCredit SPA, Michael Fisher, as Limited Partner of RMGF Ltd. Partnership, Edward Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee, Tesuji Partners, LLC, in 12-cv-2875, Trust f/b/o David Blumenfeld, PSAssociates, Amy Metzenbaum, First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Denise M. Angeja, Edward Blumenfeld and Susan Blumenfeld, Roberta Cohen, DWD Associates, LLC, American Securities Holdings Corp., American Securities Opportunity Fund, L.P., BDG Larkfield Associates, LLC, Robert H. Book, Jay Gaines &Co., Inc. Profit Sharing Plan, Glantz Family Foundation, Dogwood Realty Group, Richard M. Glantz, Calesa Associates L.P., Gregory Fisher, as Limited Partner of RMGF Ltd. Partnership, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, R.H. Book, LLC, Barclays Bank S.A., Ellen J. Wertheim, B-4 Partnership, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Stephanie S. Mack, c/o Cooley LLP, 1114 Avenue of the Americas, NY, NY 10036, 212-479-6000, Jerald Ostrin, Estate of Elaine Cooper, Steven Mnuchin, Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Steven Mnuchin, Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Trust FBO Ste, Andrew Kostin, Freda Epstein Revocable Trust, Norton S. Rosensweig, Daniel Land Co. LLC, 500 Bi-County Associates, L.P., David Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust, M. Harvey Rubin Trust of, Belfer Corporation, DECIMAL INVESTMENTS, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Elaine Ostrin, JRAG, LLC, in 12-cv-2876, Jonathan P. Rosensweig, Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Foundation, Grace & Company, Jerald Ostrin Trust, Grace B. Evenstad, Zia Inayat Khan, KBC Investments Limited, 125 Bethpage Associates, Tesuji Partners, LLC, in 12-cv-2876, Other Listed Defendants, Anthony E. Stefanelli, BWI, Coblum Setauket, LLC, Andrew Smith, David B. Pearce, Linda Rosensweig, Ronald J. Stein, as trustee of the Trust UAD FBO Benjamin R. Sigelman, as trustee of the Trust UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman, Pergament Equities, LLC, Edward Blumenfeld, et al, II, Trust U/T/A, BDG Deer Park Associates, LLC, Kara Fishbein Goldman, Jeff E. Calesa Trust 1989, Financiere Agache, Kim Dickstein, in 12-cv-2875, Harvey Cohen, individually, and as Trustee, David Silver, Joseph R. Varet, individually and as beneficiary and as trustee of the Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO Joseph R. Varet, Howard M. Koff, individually and in his capacity as Trustee of the Koff Living Trust, RMGF LTD. Partnership, Freda B. Epstein, Scott Ostrin, Trust F/B/O Alexandra E. Hausner Cave, Michael A. Varet, individually and as beneficial owner of one or more IRAs, as custodian for David R. Varet and Sara R. Varet, as trustee of the Michael A. Varet Trust UAD, Robert Roman, Brad Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust, Robert Nystrom, Trust U/W/O David L. Fisher, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, as a Limited Partner of MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Austin Bosarge, Francine Fishman, as Limited Partners of RMGF Ltd. Partnership, Ashby Trust, Spring Family Trust, Alice Rosenwald, individually and as custodian for Jonathan Sigelman, as custodian for Benjamon R. Sigelman, as trustee and beneficiary of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Alice Rosenwald, as trustee and beneficiary of Issue Trust 6 UAD FBO, AKA Alice R. Sigelm, Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation, Jennifer Spring McPherson, Estate of Thelma Glantz, Lourdes Barreneche, ELLEN V. GREENSPAN, as trustee of the Trust (A. Anagnos et al., trustes), Mark McKeefrey, Alpine Trustees Limited, 45 South Service Road, LLC, Susan Blumenfeld Interiors, Ltd., Kostin Company, Elizabeth R. Varet, individually, and as custodian for Joseph R. Varet, as custodian and/or trustee of the Elizabeth R. Varet Money Purchase Pension Plan, as grantor of the 2004 V Trust, as trustee and beneficiary of the Apollo Trust for Elizabeth R., Michael N. Rosen, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, Randi C. Crawford, Christopher Warren, as co-trustee of the Serene Warren Revocable Trust, JJG FOUNDATION, INC., Naidot & Co., David Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee, HUDSON CHARITABLE FUND, Kenneth Kreger, Randi M. Calesa 1986 Trust, Patricia Silver, Estate of Edward R. Glantz, Pioneer Global Asset Management S.p.A., Jonathan M. Aufzien, S.H. & Helen R. Scheuer Family Foundation, Inc., El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, Edward F. Calesa, Janice M. Calesa, Sarah R. Varet, individually and as trustee and as beneficiary of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO Sarah R. Varet, Kathy Hausner Grossman, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Cheryl K. Tomchin, Steven Goldman, Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, Joint Tenancy of Phyllis Guenzburger and Fabian Guenzburger, Charitable Remainder Trust F/B/O Vivien Svigals, Citrus Investment Holdings Ltd., Robert Blum, Bull Market Fund, Michael Most, Susan Kostin, Migs Woodside, Edward Blumenfeld and Susan Blumenfeld 2007 Charitable Lead Trust, Morton Kurzrok, Susan Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee, Julie Schwartz, Peri Arenas, in 12-cv-2875, Kingate Global Fund, Ltd., Marjorie Most, MBE General LLC, as the General Partner of MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Harold Anfang, in 12-cv-2875, Peter Pearman, as trustee for the Concorde 1987 Trust DTD, Visiting Nurse Service of New York, Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch, FKA Blubank Ltd Panama Branch, Joan Roman, Belinda F. Clarke, as trustee for the Concorde 1987 Trust DTD, David I. Koff, individually as settlor and beneficiary of the David I. Koff Investment Trust, Richard M. Glantz 1991 Living Trust, Harold J. Hein, Enhancement Group, Edward R. Glantz Living Trust, BDG 125th Street, LLC, Deborah Weinstein, Jerry Yanowitz, BDG Piscataway, LLC, 10 Michael Drive Associates, L.P., Maurice Harvey Rubin, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Estate of Kay Frankel, WIlliam Rosenwald Family Fund, Inc., Boxwood Realty Group, Jay Gaines In His Fiduciary Capacity As Trustee Of The Jay Gaines & Co. Profit Sharing Plan, Lakeview Investment, LP, Jacqueline Harary, Gotham Plaza Associates, LLC, Robert A. Belfer, as Trustee of The Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation, Edward Blumenfeld Gerald Y Mordfin, et al, BDG Kingsbridge, LLC, Blumenfeld Development Group, Ltd., Kenneth L. Evenstad, in his capacity as Grantor and Trustee for the Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, individually, Joint Tenancy of Robert Pinchou and Fabian Guenzburger, Marvin L. Olshan, Jill Fischer, in 12-cv-2875, Susan Blumenfeld GST Trust, Trust f/b/o Brad Blumenfeld, Richard Landsberger, THE ABSTRACTION FUND, Taj Inayat, Banca Carige S.P.A., in 12-cv-02408, Trust f/b/o Susan Blumenfeld, ARC-BDG Setauket Enterprise, Charleston Enterprises, LLC, Glantz-Ostrin Trust II, Linda Sohn, Brad Blumenfeld Family Foundation, Daniel F. Lindley, in 12-cv-2875 and Audax Group LP, Audax Management Co. LLC, 101 Huntington Holdings LLC, Marc B. Wolpow, Geoffrey S. Rehnert, Richard T. Joseph; Carol Nelson; Gordon Associates, Bruce Gordon; Robert M. Siff; Robert Ros
Plaintiff / Appellant: Securities Investor Protection Corporation and Irving H. Picard
Amicus Curiae: National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees
Case Number: 12-2616
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2015 Filing 372 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 06/22/2015, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 14-1129, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[1538274] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 06/23/2015 11:02 AM]
March 17, 2015 Filing 371 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 03/17/2015, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 14-1129, RECEIVED.[1464851] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/19/2015 12:04 PM]
March 17, 2015 Filing 370 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 03/17/2015, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 14-1128, RECEIVED.[1464845] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/19/2015 11:58 AM]
March 3, 2015 Filing 369 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting Appellant Irving H. Picard extension to file Writ of Certiorari, FILED.[1452928] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/05/2015 08:54 AM]
January 23, 2015 Filing 368 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1422735] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/23/2015 02:57 PM]
January 20, 2015 Filing 367 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 01/20/2015, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1419391] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/20/2015 04:05 PM]
January 20, 2015 Filing 366 STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, FILED.[1419373] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/20/2015 03:58 PM]
January 15, 2015 Filing 364 ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 12/08/2014, by BDP, FILED.[1417094] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/15/2015 04:05 PM]
December 29, 2014 Filing 360 LETTER, dated 12/16/2014, on behalf of Defendants-Appellees, the M & B Weiss Family Limited Partnership of 1996, Melvyn I. Weiss, Barbara J. Weiss, Stephen A. Weiss, Leslie Weiss and Gary Weiss, RECEIVED. Service date 12/16/2014 by email.[1404042] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/29/2014 02:51 PM]
December 17, 2014 Filing 358 ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 12/17/2014 by CM/ECF.[1396087] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/17/2014 10:29 AM]
December 8, 2014 Filing 357 JUDGMENT, FILED.[1387527] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/08/2014 02:28 PM]
December 8, 2014 Filing 353 OPINION, judgment of the district court is affirmed, by BDP, GEL, CFD, FILED.[1386985] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/08/2014 10:25 AM]
December 8, 2014 Filing 351 NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[1386858] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/08/2014 09:33 AM]
October 28, 2014 Filing 350 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED to Christopher J. Major.[1356194] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/28/2014 03:42 PM]
October 16, 2014 Filing 349 LETTER, dated 10/07/2014, on behalf of Christopher J. Major - Meister Seelig and Fein LLP requesting CD of Oral Argument. Fee Paid. Forwarded to Calendar Team. Receipt # 220366. , RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2014 by US mail.[1346590] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/16/2014 04:13 PM]
August 15, 2014 Filing 348 ATTORNEY, Scott M. Grossman, [ # 347 ], in place of attorney Barbra R. Parlin, SUBSTITUTED.[1296848] [12-2616, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/15/2014 05:44 PM]
August 14, 2014 Filing 347 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Pergament Equities, LLC in 12-2616, FILED. Service date 08/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1295360] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 08/14/2014 01:02 PM]
May 5, 2014 Filing 344 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[1216989] [12-3585, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582] [Entered: 05/05/2014 06:07 PM]
April 16, 2014 Filing 340 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from LOWENSTEIN SANDLER with fee, RECEIVED.[1203278] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 04/16/2014 10:31 AM]
April 15, 2014 Filing 343 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED to Michael Hackett.[1215449] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/02/2014 12:17 PM]
April 15, 2014 Filing 342 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED to Andrew Sherman.[1215447] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/02/2014 12:15 PM]
April 8, 2014 Filing 338 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD From SILLS CUMMIS & GROSS with fee, RECEIVED.[1196866] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 04/08/2014 11:03 AM]
March 31, 2014 Filing 337 LETTER, dated 03/28/2014, on behalf of Michael R. Hackett from Proskauer Rose LLP requesting CD of the Oral Argument. Fee Paid. Forwarded to Calendar Team. Receipt # 219830. , RECEIVED. Service date 03/31/2014 by US mail.[1190824] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/31/2014 04:24 PM]
March 27, 2014 Filing 335 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[1188763] [12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/27/2014 04:56 PM]
March 21, 2014 Filing 331 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from FRESHFIELDS ET AL with fee, RECEIVED.[1184255] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/21/2014 01:56 PM]
March 13, 2014 Filing 327 LETTER, dated 03/12/2014, on behalf of Carmen M. Cruz from Bergher Singerman LLP requesting CD of the Oral Argument. Fee Paid. Forwarded to Calendar Team. Receipt # 219763. , RECEIVED. Service date 03/13/2014 by FEDERAL EXPRESS. [1177601] [12-2497, 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/13/2014 02:43 PM]
March 11, 2014 Filing 326 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from BINGHAM with fee, RECEIVED.[1175718] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/11/2014 04:04 PM]
March 11, 2014 Filing 324 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee from LOEB & LOEB RECEIVED.[1175690] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/11/2014 03:53 PM]
March 10, 2014 Filing 323 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD From SCHULTE ROTH ZABEL with fee, RECEIVED.[1174617] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/10/2014 05:34 PM]
March 7, 2014 Filing 320 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD From MILBANK TWEED Et al. with fee, RECEIVED.[1172971] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/07/2014 10:52 AM]
March 7, 2014 Filing 319 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD From ANDREW MAYO with fee, RECEIVED.[1172952] [12-2497, 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/07/2014 10:41 AM]
March 7, 2014 Filing 318 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from DUANE MORRIS with fee, RECEIVED.[1172943] [12-2497, 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/07/2014 10:36 AM]
March 5, 2014 Filing 317 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD with fee from DAVIS POLK, RECEIVED.[1171609] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/05/2014 06:32 PM]
March 5, 2014 Filing 316 LETTER, dated 03/05/2014, on behalf of Bill Sweeney from CKM Legal requesting CD of the Oral Argument. Fee Paid. Forwarded to Calendar Team. Receipt # 219723. RECEIVED. Service date 03/05/2014 by hand delivery.[1171332] [12-2500, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/05/2014 02:23 PM]
March 5, 2014 Filing 315 CASE, before BDP, GEL, CFD, C.JJ. , HEARD.[1170995] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/05/2014 11:31 AM]
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER, dated 02/24/2014, authorizing court reporter to bring a laptop to the Courtroom, FILED.[1163253] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 02/24/2014 11:12 AM]
February 6, 2014 Filing 304 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1151640] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 02/06/2014 02:55 PM]
January 31, 2014 Filing 302 CURED DEFECTIVE Amicus Brief, [ # 1147177-2 ], on behalf of Amicus Financial Institution Defendants in 12-3422, FILED.[1147531] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/31/2014 04:37 PM]
January 30, 2014 Filing 301 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief of Amici Curiae , [ # 1145387-2 ], on behalf of Financial Institution, FILED.[1145539] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/30/2014 09:14 AM]
January 29, 2014 Filing 300 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 1070220-2 ] in 12-2557, FILED. [1144502][300] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/29/2014 10:43 AM]
January 29, 2014 Filing 299 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 139 ] filed by Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2557, FILED. [1144485][299] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/29/2014 10:32 AM]
January 16, 2014 Filing 298 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 03/05/2014, B Panel, SET.[1135711] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/16/2014 12:06 PM]
December 18, 2013 Filing 297 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 03/03/2014, B, PROPOSED.[1118330] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/18/2013 04:36 PM]
December 12, 2013 Filing 296 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Shaya M. Berger, Esq. for Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 12/12/2013 by CM/ECF. [1113441] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/12/2013 01:11 PM]
November 22, 2013 Filing 293 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Reply Brief of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, FILED. Service date 11/22/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[1099365] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 11/22/2013 11:53 AM]
November 22, 2013 Filing 292 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, FILED. Service date 11/22/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF. [1099359] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 11/22/2013 11:49 AM]
November 22, 2013 Filing 291 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 11/22/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail. [1099358] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 11/22/2013 11:44 AM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 288 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 1070220-2 ] in 12-2557, FILED. [1081554][288] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 11/01/2013 11:37 AM]
October 28, 2013 Filing 283 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Letter from Richard Levy, Jr. Concerning Filing of Compendium of FRAP 26.1 Disclosure Statements (ECF No. 321), and Compendium of Defendants-Appellees Corporate Disclosure Statements Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 26.1 (ECF Nos. 322-324), on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/28/2013 by CM/ECF, email.[1077405] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/28/2013 06:38 PM]
October 25, 2013 Filing 282 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Letter dated Oct. 25, 2013 (ECF No. 317), and Corrected Joint Brief of Customer Appellees (ECF No. 318), on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/25/2013 by email.[1076047] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/25/2013 05:34 PM]
October 25, 2013 Filing 281 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee M. Harvey Rubin Trust of 11/11/92 and Maurice Harvey Rubin in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/25/2013 by CM/ECF.[1075476] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 10/25/2013 12:24 PM]
October 25, 2013 Filing 280 CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/25/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party. [1075412] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/25/2013 11:43 AM]
October 24, 2013 Filing 279 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file document [ # 249 ] filed by Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants, by RCW, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1074341][279] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/24/2013 11:59 AM]
October 23, 2013 Filing 275 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, ADDENDUM, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, [ # 237 ], [ # 238 ], on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman and Steven Goldman in 12-2616, FILED.[1073077] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/23/2013 10:55 AM]
October 22, 2013 Filing 272 NEW PARTY, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-2497, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-2500, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-2557, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-2616, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-3422, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-3440, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-3582 and Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-3585, ADDED.[1072206] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/22/2013 02:24 PM]
October 21, 2013 Filing 269 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Richard Levy, Jr. for Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [1070994] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/21/2013 01:36 PM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 268 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Financial Institution Defendants, FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1070177] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/18/2013 05:36 PM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 267 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Peter Gregory Schwed, Esq. for Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, MBE General LLC, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Mark B. Evenstad, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Sew General, LLC, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Serene Warren, Christopher Warren, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC,, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, Alan S. Gordon, C. Ray Johnson, Stacy L. Koff, David I. Koff, The Koff Living Trust, Howard M. Koff, Marcia Koff, Leslie Aufzein Levine, Lisa Aufzien, Norman K. Aufzien, Meredith Aufzien Bauer and Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, Attorney Peter Gregory Schwed, Esq. for Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, MBE General LLC, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Mark B. Evenstad, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Sew General, LLC, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Serene Warren, Christopher Warren, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC,, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, Alan S. Gordon, C. Ray Johnson, Stacy L. Koff, David I. Koff, Howard M. Koff, Marcia Koff, Leslie Aufzein Levine, Lisa Aufzien, Norman K. Aufzien, Meredith Aufzien Bauer and Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1070026] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/18/2013 04:22 PM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 266 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for (ECF No. 287) Motion for Leave to File Corrected Schedule of Appellees Joining the Joint Brief of Customer Appellees, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[1069814] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/18/2013 03:17 PM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 264 ATTORNEY, Alan E Schoenfeld for Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, in case 12-2500 , [ # 245 ], ADDED.[1069636] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/18/2013 01:45 PM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 263 ATTORNEY, Danielle M. Spinelli for Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, in case 12-2557 , [ # 244 ], ADDED.[1069629] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/18/2013 01:40 PM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 262 NEW PARTY, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-2497, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-2500, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-2557, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-2616, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-3422, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-3440, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-3582 and Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-3585, ADDED.[1069609] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/18/2013 01:18 PM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 255 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, ADDENDUM, [ # 237 ], [ # 238 ], on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman and Steven Goldman, and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED.[1068868] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/17/2013 05:56 PM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 252 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [ # 242 ], on behalf of Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, PSAssociates, Joan Roman and Robert Roman in 12-2557, Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, PSAssociates, Joan Roman, Robert Roman and SPAssociates in 12-2616, FILED.[1068854] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/17/2013 05:31 PM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 249 MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/17/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF. [1068596] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/17/2013 03:41 PM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 248 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Josephine Wang, Esq. for Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, FILED. Service date 10/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [1068481] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/17/2013 03:15 PM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 247 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Helen Davis Chaitman, Esq. for Appellee James Greiff, David Abel, Joan Roman, Robert Roman, PSAssociates and SPAssociates in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [1068404] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/17/2013 02:47 PM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 246 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. David J. Sheehan, Esq. for Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 10/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [1068289] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/17/2013 01:21 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 245 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, FILED. Service date 10/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1067589] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/16/2013 06:33 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 244 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, FILED. Service date 10/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1067588] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/16/2013 06:31 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 243 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, FILED. Service date 10/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1067587] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/16/2013 06:30 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 242 CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, PSAssociates, Joan Roman, Robert Roman and SPAssociates in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1066725] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/16/2013 11:21 AM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 241 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, PSAssociates, Joan Roman, Robert Roman and SPAssociates in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [1066188] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/15/2013 04:55 PM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 239 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Brief for Defendant-Appellee PerCareRx, on behalf of Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[1065344] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/15/2013 11:24 AM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 238 ADDENDUM, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail.[1065260] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/15/2013 10:57 AM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 237 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail. [1065253] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/15/2013 10:55 AM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 236 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, and ADDENDUM, [230], [232], on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman and Steven Goldman in 12-2557, FILED.[1065130] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/15/2013 10:00 AM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 235 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [229], on behalf of Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, Joan Roman, Robert Roman and SPAssociates in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED.[1065036] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/15/2013 09:34 AM]
October 14, 2013 Filing 233 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Joint Brief of Customer Appellees (ECF No. 265) and Addendum to Joint Brief of Customer Appellees (ECF No. 267), on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by email.[1064885] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/14/2013 04:38 PM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 232 ADDENDUM, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1064724] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/11/2013 04:39 PM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 231 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien, Lisa Aufzien, Norman K. Aufzien, Meredith Aufzien Bauer, Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Alan S. Gordon, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, C. Ray Johnson, Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, David I. Koff, Howard M. Koff, Marcia Koff, Stacy L. Koff, Leslie Aufzein Levine, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, The Koff Living Trust, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC,, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien, Lisa Aufzien, Norman K. Aufzien, Meredith Aufzien Bauer, Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Alan S. Gordon, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, C. Ray Johnson, Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, David I. Koff, Howard M. Koff, Marcia Koff, Stacy L. Koff, Leslie Aufzein Levine, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC,, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail. [1064720] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/11/2013 04:37 PM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 230 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF. [1064706] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/11/2013 04:28 PM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 229 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, PSAssociates, Joan Roman, Robert Roman and SPAssociates in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF. [1064266] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/11/2013 12:56 PM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 228 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF. [1064117] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/11/2013 11:41 AM]
October 4, 2013 Filing 225 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file a separate addendum to appellees' brief [ # 187 ] filed by Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants, by Debra Ann Livingston, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1058621][225] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/04/2013 11:55 AM]
October 4, 2013 Filing 223 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 10/04/2013 by CM/ECF.[1058537] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/04/2013 11:11 AM]
October 4, 2013 Filing 222 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 10/04/2013 by CM/ECF.[1058534] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/04/2013 11:08 AM]
October 2, 2013 Filing 221 NEW PARTY, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2497, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2500, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2557, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2616, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-3422, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-3440, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-3582 and Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-3585, ADDED.[1057056] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/02/2013 05:34 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 218 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien, Lisa Aufzien, Norman K. Aufzien, Meredith Aufzien Bauer, Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Alan S. Gordon, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, C. Ray Johnson, Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, David I. Koff, Howard M. Koff, Marcia Koff, Stacy L. Koff, Leslie Aufzein Levine, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, The Koff Living Trust, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC,, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien, Lisa Aufzien, Norman K. Aufzien, Meredith Aufzien Bauer, Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Alan S. Gordon, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, C. Ray Johnson, Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, David I. Koff, Howard M. Koff, Marcia Koff, Stacy L. Koff, Leslie Aufzein Levine, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC,, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 10/01/2013 by CM/ECF.[1055481] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 03:04 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 217 NEW PARTY, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-2497, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-2500, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-2557, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-2616, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-3422, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-3440, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-3582 and Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055459] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:49 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 216 NEW PARTY, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-2497, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-2500, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-2557, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-2616, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-3422, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-3440, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-3582 and Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055455] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:48 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 215 NEW PARTY, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-2497, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-2500, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-2557, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-2616, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-3422, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-3440, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-3582 and Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055451] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:46 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 214 NEW PARTY, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-2497, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-2500, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-2557, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-2616, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-3422, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-3440, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-3582 and Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055447] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:44 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 213 NEW PARTY, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-2497, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-2500, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-2557, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-2616, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-3422, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-3440, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-3582 and Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055444] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:42 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 212 NEW PARTY, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-2497, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-2500, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-2557, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-2616, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-3422, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-3440, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-3582 and Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055442] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:41 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 211 NEW PARTY, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-2497, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-2500, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-2557, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-2616, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-3422, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-3440, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-3582 and Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055439] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:38 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 210 NEW PARTY, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-2497, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-2500, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-2557, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-2616, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-3422, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-3440, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-3582 and Appellee David I. Koff in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055431] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:35 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 209 NEW PARTY, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-2497, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-2500, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-2557, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-2616, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-3422, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-3440, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-3582 and Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055429] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:32 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 208 NEW PARTY, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-2497, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-2500, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-2557, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-2616, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-3422, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-3440, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-3582 and Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055423] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:31 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 207 NEW PARTY, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-2497, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-2500, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-2557, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-2616, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-3422, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-3440, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-3582 and Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055417] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:28 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 206 NEW PARTY, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-2497, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-2500, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-2557, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-2616, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-3422, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-3440, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-3582 and Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055414] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:24 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 205 NEW PARTY, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-2497, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-2500, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-2557, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-2616, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-3422, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-3440, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-3582 and Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055410] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:23 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 204 NEW PARTY, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-2497, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-2500, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-2557, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-2616, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-3422, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-3440, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-3582 and Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055408] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:20 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 203 NEW PARTY, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-2497, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-2500, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-2557, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-2616, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-3422, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-3440, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-3582 and Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055404] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:18 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 202 NEW PARTY, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-2497, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-2500, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-2557, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-2616, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-3422, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-3440, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-3582 and Appellee Serene Warren in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055399] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:16 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 201 NEW PARTY, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-2497, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-2500, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-2557, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-2616, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-3422, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-3440, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-3582 and Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055392] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:12 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 200 NEW PARTY, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2497, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2500, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2557, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2616, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3422, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3440, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3582 and Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055383] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:09 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 199 NEW PARTY, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-2497, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-2500, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-2557, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-2616, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-3422, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-3440, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-3582 and Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055375] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:04 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 198 NEW PARTY, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2497, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2500, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2557, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2616, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3422, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3440, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3582 and Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055360] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:00 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 197 NEW PARTY, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-2497, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-2500, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-2557, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-2616, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-3422, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-3440, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-3582 and Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055344] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:54 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 196 NEW PARTY, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-2497, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-2500, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-2557, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-2616, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-3422, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-3440, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-3582 and Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055341] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:52 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 195 NEW PARTY, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-2497, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-2500, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-2557, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-2616, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-3422, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-3440, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-3582 and Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055328] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:47 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 194 NEW PARTY, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-2497, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-2500, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-2557, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-2616, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-3422, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-3440, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-3582 and Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055323] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:43 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 193 NEW PARTY, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2497, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2500, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2557, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2616, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3422, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3440, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3582 and Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055303] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:27 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 192 NEW PARTY, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-2497, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-2500, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-2557, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-2616, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-3422, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-3440, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-3582 and Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055287] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:08 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 191 NEW PARTY, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-2497, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-2500, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-2557, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-2616, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-3422, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-3440, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-3582 and Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055276] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:01 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 190 NEW PARTY, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2497, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2500, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2557, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2616, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3422, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3440, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3582 and Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055268] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 12:52 PM]
September 28, 2013 Filing 187 MOTION, to file supplemental documents, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 09/28/2013 by CM/ECF, email, hand delivery. [1053502] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/28/2013 09:45 AM]
September 24, 2013 Filing 183 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for FRAP 26.1 disclosure form, notice and instructions, and FRAP 26.1 order, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 09/23/2013 by US mail, email.[1049240] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/24/2013 09:57 AM]
September 17, 2013 Filing 182 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for approval of procedures to facilitate defendants-appellees' compliance with the corporate disclosure requirements prescribed in FRAP 26.1. The compendium must be filed no later than October 28, 2013 [ # 177 ] filed by Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants, by Jon O. Newman, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1043781][182] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 09/17/2013 by TW] [Entered: 09/17/2013 03:51 PM]
September 17, 2013 Filing 180 NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[1043409] [12-2497, 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/17/2013 01:17 PM]
August 29, 2013 Filing 177 MOTION, for approval of procedures to facilitate defendants-appellees' compliance with the corporate disclosure requirements prescribed in FRAP 26.1, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 08/29/2013 by US mail, email. [1029823] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 09/18/2013 by TW] [Entered: 08/29/2013 05:40 PM]
August 9, 2013 Filing 176 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[1012672] [12-2497, 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/09/2013 11:07 AM]
August 9, 2013 Filing 174 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[1012651] [12-2500, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/09/2013 11:02 AM]
August 9, 2013 Filing 172 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[1012577] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/09/2013 10:37 AM]
August 9, 2013 Filing 170 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[1012539] [12-2616, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/09/2013 10:17 AM]
August 9, 2013 Filing 168 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[1012532] [12-3422, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/09/2013 10:14 AM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 165 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file opposition and reply briefs to 10/11/2013 and 11/22/2013 [ # 157 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard, Irving H. Picard, by RKW, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1005921][165] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/02/2013 09:38 AM]
July 25, 2013 Filing 163 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief by Appellants and Liaison Committee Appellees for leave to file oversized anwering briefs of up to 16,800 words, and reply briefs of up to 8,400 words, [ # 157 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard, by DAL, C.JJ., FILED. [1000072][163] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 07/25/2013 03:56 PM]
July 23, 2013 Filing 157 MOTION, to extend time, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, Irving H. Picard in 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 07/23/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail. [997939] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 07/23/2013 07:13 PM]
July 12, 2013 Filing 156 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[988795] [12-2497, 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 07/12/2013 03:49 PM]
July 12, 2013 Filing 154 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[987775] [12-3582, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3585] [Entered: 07/12/2013 10:05 AM]
July 12, 2013 Filing 152 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[987610] [12-3440, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 07/12/2013 08:59 AM]
May 23, 2013 Filing 148 ATTORNEY, Gabrielle Pretto for Bonnie J. Kansler, in case 12-2616 Gabrielle Pretto for Bonnie J. Kansler, in case 12-2557 , [ # 144 ], ADDED.[946595] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/23/2013 03:04 PM]
May 23, 2013 Filing 147 ATTORNEY, Brian Neville for Bonnie J. Kansler, in case 12-2616 Brian Neville for Other Listed Defendants Bonnie J. Kansler, in case 12-2557 , [ # 143 ], ADDED.[946590] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/23/2013 02:55 PM]
May 23, 2013 Filing 146 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 139 ], [136] filed by Amicus Curiae National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. [946387][146] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/23/2013 11:54 AM]
May 23, 2013 Filing 144 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bonnie J. Kansler in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 05/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [946246] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/23/2013 10:46 AM]
May 23, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bonnie J. Kansler in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 05/23/2013 by CM/ECF. [946243] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/23/2013 10:45 AM]
May 23, 2013 Filing 140 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: Motion to file amicus brief, [ # 138 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2497, FILED.[946005] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/23/2013 09:06 AM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 139 MOTION, to file amicus curiae brief, on behalf of Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2557, Amicus Curiae National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/22/2013 by email, CM/ECF. [945845] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/22/2013 04:59 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 138 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to file amicus curiae , [136], on behalf of Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2616, FILED.[945578] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/22/2013 03:28 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 137 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief, [136], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2557, FILED.[945514] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/22/2013 03:11 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 136 MOTION, to file amicus curiae brief, on behalf of Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/22/2013 by email, CM/ECF. [945490] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD] [Entered: 05/22/2013 03:01 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 135 NEW PARTY, Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2557, ADDED.[945415] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD] [Entered: 05/22/2013 02:34 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 134 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees , FILED. Service date 05/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [945399] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD] [Entered: 05/22/2013 02:20 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees , FILED. Service date 05/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [945395] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD] [Entered: 05/22/2013 02:18 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Association of Banruptcy Trustees , FILED. Service date 05/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [945390] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD] [Entered: 05/22/2013 02:17 PM]
May 20, 2013 Filing 131 ATTORNEY, Thomas Berndt for Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al. Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al. Fiterman Investment Fund, et al., in case 12-2616 Thomas Berndt for Miles &Shirley Fiterman Charitable Foundation, et al. Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al. Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al. Fiterman Investment Fund, et al. Metro Motor Imports, Inc., et al, in case 12-2557 , [ # 128 ], ADDED.[942150] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/20/2013 10:12 AM]
May 17, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Fiterman Investment Fund, et al., Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al., Metro Motor Imports, Inc., et al, Miles &Shirley Fiterman Charitable Foundation, et al. and Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al. in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 05/07/2013 by CM/ECF. [941238] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/17/2013 01:47 PM]
May 17, 2013 Filing 127 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616 Brief due date as 08/14/2013, FILED.[941193] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/17/2013 01:22 PM]
May 16, 2013 Filing 122 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, informing Court of proposed due date 08/14/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 05/16/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF.[939685] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/16/2013 12:17 PM]
May 15, 2013 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Brief of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, FILED. Service date 05/15/2013 by email.[938651] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/15/2013 03:16 PM]
May 15, 2013 Filing 117 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/15/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[938477] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/15/2013 01:29 PM]
May 15, 2013 Filing 115 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, FILED. Service date 05/15/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail.[937907] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/15/2013 10:07 AM]
May 15, 2013 Filing 114 ATTORNEY, Laura Kristine Clinton for Other Listed Defendants-Appellees, in case 12-2557, ADDED.[937728] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 05/15/2013 by WD] [Entered: 05/15/2013 09:06 AM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 113 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[937574] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 05:57 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 112 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 21 of 21, (pp. 5906-6109), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[937547] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 05:20 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 111 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 20 of 21, (pp. 5701-5905), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[937533] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 05:13 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 110 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 19 of 21, (pp. 5401-5700), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[937516] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 05:05 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 109 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 18 of 21, (pp. 5101-5400), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[937488] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 04:53 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 108 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 17 of 21, (pp. 4801-5100), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF.[937468] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 04:47 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 107 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 16 of 21, (pp. 4501-4800), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF.[937346] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 04:17 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 106 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 15 of 21, (pp. 4201-4500), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[937327] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 04:11 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 105 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 14 of 21, (pp. 3901-4200), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF, email.[937311] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 04:06 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 104 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 13 of 21, (pp. 3601-3900), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, CM/ECF, US mail.[937295] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 04:01 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 103 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 12 of 21, (pp. 3301-3600), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[937283] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:58 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 102 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 11 of 21, (pp. 3001-3300), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[937278] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:56 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 101 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 10 of 21, (pp. 2701-3000), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, CM/ECF, US mail.[937257] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:50 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 100 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 9 of 21, (pp. 2401-2700), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[937234] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:45 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 99 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 8 of 21, (pp. 2101-2400), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF.[937212] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:39 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 98 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 7 of 21, (pp. 1801-2100), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF, email.[937186] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:33 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 97 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 21, (pp. 1501-1800), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[937159] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:26 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 96 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 21, (pp. 1201-1500), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[937133] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:18 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 95 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 21, (pp. 901-1200), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, CM/ECF, US mail.[937120] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:11 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 94 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 21, (pp. 601-900), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[937118] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:09 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 93 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 21, (pp. 301-600), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, CM/ECF, US mail.[937110] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:07 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 92 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 21, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[937101] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:04 PM]
May 10, 2013 Filing 91 ATTORNEY, Matthew B. Lunn for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-2557, [ # 90 ], ADDED.[934463] [12-2557] [Entered: 05/10/2013 04:09 PM]
May 10, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, Irving H. Picard in 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/10/2013 by CM/ECF. [934229] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/10/2013 03:02 PM]
May 7, 2013 Filing 89 ATTORNEY, Howard L. Simon for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-2557, [ # 930333-2 ], ADDED.[930357] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/07/2013 04:20 PM]
May 3, 2013 Filing 88 LETTER, dated 05/03/2013, on behalf of UniCredit Bank Austria AG and UniCredit S.p.A., Pioneer Alternative Investment Managment Ltd., Pioneer Global Asset Managment S.p.A. in 12-3440, RECEIVED. Service date 05/03/2013 by CM/ECF.[927666] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/03/2013 05:06 PM]
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER, dated 04/16/2013, By order dated 03/04/2013 the Court denied the Liaison Committe's request to set a date for Appellant to file his brief, with leave to renew if the district court did not file by 03/25/2013 the opinion identified in the Court's 09/06/2012 order granting an extension of time to file the brief. The Appellees' Liaison Committe renewed request by letter filed 03/25/2013. Appellant opposed the request. The district court filed the pertinent opinion on 04/15/2013. The request is denied as moot., FILED.[909643] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 04/16/2013 by WD] [Entered: 04/16/2013 04:57 PM]
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER, dated 03/04/2012, clarifying prior order allowing Appellant to calculate the time to file brief from the issuance of Judge Rakoff's opinion, FILED.[862831] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/04/2013 09:51 AM]
February 22, 2013 Filing 81 LETTER, dated 02/22/2013, on behalf of members of the Defendants-Appellees Liaison Committee, RECEIVED. Service date 02/22/2013 by CM/ECF.[853299] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 02/22/2013 09:32 AM]
December 20, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 77 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2616, granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 762734-2 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard, Irving H. Picard in 12-2497, 12-2500, granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 762765-2 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. [800043][80] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/20/2012 05:19 PM]
November 28, 2012 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Hinte and Robert Nystrom in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 11/28/2012 by CM/ECF. [779970] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 11/28/2012 12:14 PM]
November 7, 2012 Filing 77 MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 11/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [762747] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 11/07/2012 04:51 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 76 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Apperance as Additional Counsel, [73], on behalf of Defendants ,Gregory Antoniazzi, Ascot Partners L.P., Stanley J. Bernstein, Russell J. DeLucia, Defendants' listed in Appendix A of the Court's April 13, 2012 Order, Defendants' listed in Appendix A of the Court's April 13, 2012 Order, Elena Elkin, Joshua Elkin, Estate of Gilbert M. Kotzen, Estate of Sylvia W. Lock, Fiterman Investment Fund, et al., Jay Gaines, Gilbert M. Kotzen 1982 Trust, Alyssa Goldberg, Frederick Goldberg, Jeremy Goldberg, Meredith Goldberg, Pamela W. Goldberg, Sharon L. Graybow, Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al., I.I. Kotzen Company, Neil N. Lapidus, Joan Elkin Madison, Marcia Kotzen 2002 Revocable Trust, Marital Trust created under Revocable Trust of Marvin G. Graybow, Melvin B. Nessel 2006 Trust u/a/d 3/14/06, Melvin B. Nessel Revocable Trust, Melvin N. Lock Trust, Metro Motor Imports, Inc., et al, Miles &Shirley Fiterman Charitable Foundation, et al., Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al., Mistral (SPC), Gail Nessel, John Nessel, John Nessel, Northern Trust, N.A., James Nosworthy, Lorraine Lock Nosworthy, Linda S. Paresky, Frederic J. Perlen, Frank A. Petito, Paul Rampell, Stepheny B. Riemer, Susan Siegal, Amanda Goldberg Snyderman, Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd., Sylvia W. Lock Declaration of Trust, Dated April 13, 1982, Zephyros Limited, Appellant Irving H. Picard, Securities Investor Protection Corporation and Appellee 10 Michael Drive Associates, L.P., 125 Bethpage Associates, 1995 Jack Parker Descendant Trust No. 1, 45 South Service Road, LLC, 500 Bi-County Associates, L.P., ALICE ROSENWALD FUND, AMERICAN PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION, AMERICAN SECURITIES GROUP, L.L.C., ANCHORAGE CHARITABLE FUND, ARC-BDG Setauket Enterprise, David Abel, Financiere Agache, Alpine Trustees Limited, American Securities Holdings Corp., American Securities Management, L.P., American Securities Opportunity Fund, L.P., Alexander G. Anagnos, Harold Anfang, Denise M. Angeja, Peri Arenas, Arthur and Rochelle Belfer Foundation, Inc, Ashby Holding Services Limited, Ashby Investment Services Limited, Ashby Trust, Audax Group LP, Audax Management Co. LLC, 101 Huntington Holdings LLC, Marc B. Wolpow, Geoffrey S. Rehnert, Richard T. Joseph; Carol Nelson; Gordon Associates, Bruce Gordon; Robert M. Siff; Robert Ros, B-4 Partnership, BCC II, LLC, BDG 115 Broadhollow, L.P., BDG 125th Street, LLC, BDG Commack, LLC, BDG Construction Corp., BDG DWD Associates, LLC, BDG Daniel Street, LLC, BDG Deer Park Associates, LLC, BDG Kingsbridge, LLC, BDG Lake Grove I, LLC, BDG Larkfield Associates, LLC, BDG Piscataway, LLC, BDG Yaphank, LLC, BWI, Banca Carige S.P.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, Banco Itau Europa International, Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A., Bank Julius Baer &Co. Ltd., Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Barclays Bank S.A., Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, Lourdes Barreneche, Belfer Corporation, Robert Blum, Blumco Setauket, LLC, Brad Blumenfeld, David Blumenfeld, Edward Blumenfeld, Edward Blumenfeld, Susan Blumenfeld, Blumenfeld Development Group, Ltd., Robert H. Book, Austin Bosarge, Boxwood Realty Group, Brad Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust, Brad Blumenfeld Family Foundation, Brad Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust, Buckmaster Farms, L.P., Bull Market Fund, Edward F. Calesa, Janice M. Calesa, Jeff E. Calesa, Calesa Associates L.P., Alexandra E. Hausner Cave, Charitable Remainder Trust F/B/O Vivien Svigals, Charleston Enterprises, LLC, Chester Management Cayman Limited, Citrus Investment Holdings Ltd., Belinda F. Clarke, Coblum Setauket, LLC, Harvey Cohen, Roberta Cohen, Stuart H. Coleman, Randi C. Crawford, DECIMAL INVESTMENTS, L.L.C., DOS BFS FAMILY PARTNERSHIP II, L.P., DONALD AND BETTE STEIN FAMILY TRUST, DONALD O. STEIN, WILLIAM STEIN, JAMIE STEIN WALKER, and BARBARA STEIN JAFFE, DWD Associates, LLC, Daniel Land Co. LLC, David Blumenfeld Family Trust, David Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust, Cynthia A. Delles, Kim Dickstein, Dogwood Realty Group, Double B Squared LLC, EDB Capital, LLC, EJS, ELIZABETH R. VARET DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN & TRUST, ELIZABETH R. VARET IRA ROLLOVER, ELIZABETH R. VARET MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN, Edward Blumenfeld Gerald Y Mordfin, Edward Blumenfeld and Susan Blumenfeld, Edward Blumenfeld and Susan Blumenfeld 2007 Charitable Lead Trust, Edward R. Glantz Living Trust, Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust, Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Foundation, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, El Prela Trading Investments Limited, El Prela Trust, Enhancement Group, Freda B. Epstein, Estate of Edward R. Glantz, Estate of Elaine Cooper, Steven Mnuchin, Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Steven Mnuchin, Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Trust FBO Ste, Estate of Elena Jalon, Estate of Jesse L. Sigelman, Estate of Kay Frankel, Estate of Sarah E. Pearce, Estate of Thelma Glantz, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (UK) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Fern Creek Limited Partnership, First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Jill Fischer, Evelyn Fisher, Gregory Fisher, Michael Fisher, Regina Fisher, Francine Fishman, Freda Epstein Revocable Trust, Laurie Frenchman, Michael Frenchman, ELLEN V. GREENSPAN, Sherry Gaines, Richard M. Glantz, Glantz Family Foundation, Glantz-Ostrin Trust I, Glantz-Ostrin Trust II, Adam P. Glick, Kara Fishbein Goldman, Neal Goldman, Steven Goldman, Gotham Plaza Associates, LLC, Grace & Company, James Greiff, Harold Greisman, Kathy Hausner Grossman, HUDSON CHARITABLE FUND, Jacqueline Harary, Hilda Hausner, Hausner Group, Harold J. Hein, Jeffrey Hinte, Taj Inayat, Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch, JJG FOUNDATION, INC., JRAG, LLC, Cyril Jalon, Janice M. Calesa 1984 Trust, Jay Gaines &Co., Inc. Profit Sharing Plan, Jay Gaines In His Fiduciary Capacity As Trustee Of The Jay Gaines & Co. Profit Sharing Plan, Jeanne T. Spring Trust, Jeff E. Calesa Trust 1989, Jelris & Associates, L.P., Jerald Ostrin Trust, Joint Tenancy of Phyllis Guenzburger and Fabian Guenzburger, Joint Tenancy of Robert Pinchou and Fabian Guenzburger, KBC Investments Ltd., Bonnie J. Kansler, Zia Inayat Khan, Kingate Euro Fund, Ltd., Kingate Global Fund, Ltd., Andrew Kostin, David Kostin, Susan Kostin, Kostin Company, Kenneth Kreger, Morton Kurzrok, LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, L.P., LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, LLC, Lakeview Investment, LP, Richard Landsberger, James R. Ledley, Daniel F. Lindley, Daniel Lipton, David I. Lustig, David Ivan Lustig, Lustig Family 1990 Trust, M. Harvey Rubin Trust of 11/11/92, METROPOLITAN PHILANTHROPIC FUND, INC., Blanchefleur Macher, Kenneth Macher, Macher Family Partnership, Stephanie S. Mack, Gordon Mackenzie, Deborah Madoff, Maxrob, L.P., Isaac Jimmy Mayer, Mark McKeefrey, Jennifer Spring McPherson, Merlin & Associates, Ltd., Amy Metzenbaum, Marjorie Most, Michael Most, Charles Murphy, Naidot & Co., Robert Nystrom, Marvin L. Olshan, Elaine Ostrin, Jerald Ostrin, Scott Ostrin, Ostrin Family Partnership, Other Listed Defendants, PIPARTNERS, PSAssociates, David B. Pearce, Peter Pearman, Pergament Equities, LLC, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Pioneer Alternative Investment Management Ltd., Pioneer Global Asset Management S.p.A., Port of Hercules Trustees Limited, R.H. Book, LLC, RMGF LTD. Partnership, Randi M. Calesa 1986 Trust, John Reisman, Santiago Reyes, Richard M. Glantz 1991 Living Trust, Diane Ringler, Ringler Partners, L.P., Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation, Robert A. Belfer, as Trustee of The Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation, Joan Roman, Robert Roman, Michael N. Rosen, Jonathan P. Rosensweig, Linda Rosensweig, Norton S. Rosensweig, Alice Rosenwald, Nina Rosenwald, Maurice Harvey Rubin, S.H. & Helen R. Scheuer Family Foundation, Inc., SPAssociates, Daniel Schneider, Julie Schwartz, Scott Ostrin Trust, Benjamin R. Sigelman, Jonathan R. Sigelman, David Silver, Patricia Silver, Andrew Smith, Linda Sohn, South Sea Holdings L.P., Richard Spring, Spring Family Trust, Anthony E. Stefanelli, Mary Ann Stefanelli, Ronald J. Stein, Stephen H. Stern, Susan Blumenfeld GST Trust, Susan Blumenfeld Interiors, Ltd., THE ABSTRACTION FUND, Tensyr Limited, Tesuji Partners, LLC, Tesuji Partners, LLC, Thelma Glantz Living Trust, Cheryl K. Tomchin, Philip Toub, Trust F/B/O Alexandra E. Hausner Cave, Trust U/T/A 8/20/90, Trust U/W/O David L. Fisher, Trust f/b/o Brad Blumenfeld, Trust f/b/o David Blumenfeld, Trust f/b/o Susan Blumenfeld, UniCredit Bank Austria AG, UniCredit S.p.A., David R. Varet, Elizabeth R. Varet, Joseph R. Varet, Michael A. Varet, Sarah R. Varet, Visiting Nurse Service of New York, Vista Management Co., Vista Management Company, WIlliam Rosenwald Family Fund, Inc., Deborah Weinstein, Ellen J. Wertheim, Migs Woodside, Jerry Yanowitz and Joel Yanowitz in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. FILED.[724581] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 09/19/2012 02:56 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 75 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [56], on behalf of Fiterman Investment Fund, et al., Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al., Metro Motor Imports, Inc., et al, Miles &Shirley Fiterman Charitable Foundation, et al. and Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al. in 12-2557, FILED.[724542] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 09/19/2012 02:42 PM]
September 13, 2012 Filing 74 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 70 ], on behalf of Appellee Belfer Corporation, Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation and Robert A. Belfer, as Trustee of The Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED.[718491] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 09/13/2012 09:41 AM]
September 11, 2012 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Gregory Antoniazzi, Ascot Partners L.P., Stanley J. Bernstein, Russell J. DeLucia, Defendants' listed in Appendix A of the Court's April 13, 2012 Order, Defendants' listed in Appendix A of the Court's April 13, 2012 Order, Elena Elkin, Joshua Elkin, Estate of Gilbert M. Kotzen, Estate of Sylvia W. Lock, Fiterman Investment Fund, et al., Jay Gaines, Gilbert M. Kotzen 1982 Trust, Alyssa Goldberg, Frederick Goldberg, Jeremy Goldberg, Meredith Goldberg, Pamela W. Goldberg, Sharon L. Graybow, Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al., I.I. Kotzen Company, Neil N. Lapidus, Joan Elkin Madison, Marcia Kotzen 2002 Revocable Trust, Marital Trust created under Revocable Trust of Marvin G. Graybow, Melvin B. Nessel 2006 Trust u/a/d 3/14/06, Melvin B. Nessel Revocable Trust, Melvin N. Lock Trust, Metro Motor Imports, Inc., et al, Miles &Shirley Fiterman Charitable Foundation, et al., Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al., Mistral (SPC), Gail Nessel, John Nessel, John Nessel, Northern Trust, N.A., James Nosworthy, Lorraine Lock Nosworthy, Linda S. Paresky, Frederic J. Perlen, Frank A. Petito, Paul Rampell, Stepheny B. Riemer, Susan Siegal, Amanda Goldberg Snyderman, Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd., Sylvia W. Lock Declaration of Trust, Dated April 13, 1982, Zephyros Limited, Appellant Irving H. Picard, Securities Investor Protection Corporation and Appellee 10 Michael Drive Associates, L.P., 125 Bethpage Associates, 1995 Jack Parker Descendant Trust No. 1, 45 South Service Road, LLC, 500 Bi-County Associates, L.P., ALICE ROSENWALD FUND, AMERICAN PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION, AMERICAN SECURITIES GROUP, L.L.C., ANCHORAGE CHARITABLE FUND, ARC-BDG Setauket Enterprise, David Abel, Financiere Agache, Alpine Trustees Limited, American Securities Holdings Corp., American Securities Management, L.P., American Securities Opportunity Fund, L.P., Alexander G. Anagnos, Harold Anfang, Denise M. Angeja, Peri Arenas, Arthur and Rochelle Belfer Foundation, Inc, Ashby Holding Services Limited, Ashby Investment Services Limited, Ashby Trust, Audax Group LP, Audax Management Co. LLC, 101 Huntington Holdings LLC, Marc B. Wolpow, Geoffrey S. Rehnert, Richard T. Joseph; Carol Nelson; Gordon Associates, Bruce Gordon; Robert M. Siff; Robert Ros, B-4 Partnership, BCC II, LLC, BDG 115 Broadhollow, L.P., BDG 125th Street, LLC, BDG Commack, LLC, BDG Construction Corp., BDG DWD Associates, LLC, BDG Daniel Street, LLC, BDG Deer Park Associates, LLC, BDG Kingsbridge, LLC, BDG Lake Grove I, LLC, BDG Larkfield Associates, LLC, BDG Piscataway, LLC, BDG Yaphank, LLC, BWI, Banca Carige S.P.A., Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, Banco Itau Europa International, Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A., Bank Julius Baer &Co. Ltd., Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Barclays Bank S.A., Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, Lourdes Barreneche, Belfer Corporation, Robert Blum, Blumco Setauket, LLC, Brad Blumenfeld, David Blumenfeld, Edward Blumenfeld, Edward Blumenfeld, Susan Blumenfeld, Blumenfeld Development Group, Ltd., Robert H. Book, Austin Bosarge, Boxwood Realty Group, Brad Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust, Brad Blumenfeld Family Foundation, Brad Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust, Buckmaster Farms, L.P., Bull Market Fund, Edward F. Calesa, Janice M. Calesa, Jeff E. Calesa, Calesa Associates L.P., Alexandra E. Hausner Cave, Charitable Remainder Trust F/B/O Vivien Svigals, Charleston Enterprises, LLC, Chester Management Cayman Limited, Citrus Investment Holdings Ltd., Belinda F. Clarke, Coblum Setauket, LLC, Harvey Cohen, Roberta Cohen, Stuart H. Coleman, Randi C. Crawford, DECIMAL INVESTMENTS, L.L.C., DOS BFS FAMILY PARTNERSHIP II, L.P., DONALD AND BETTE STEIN FAMILY TRUST, DONALD O. STEIN, WILLIAM STEIN, JAMIE STEIN WALKER, and BARBARA STEIN JAFFE, DWD Associates, LLC, Daniel Land Co. LLC, David Blumenfeld Family Trust, David Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust, Cynthia A. Delles, Kim Dickstein, Dogwood Realty Group, Double B Squared LLC, EDB Capital, LLC, EJS, ELIZABETH R. VARET DEFINED BENEFIT PLAN & TRUST, ELIZABETH R. VARET IRA ROLLOVER, ELIZABETH R. VARET MONEY PURCHASE PENSION PLAN, Edward Blumenfeld Gerald Y Mordfin, Edward Blumenfeld and Susan Blumenfeld, Edward Blumenfeld and Susan Blumenfeld 2007 Charitable Lead Trust, Edward R. Glantz Living Trust, Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust, Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Foundation, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, El Prela Trading Investments Limited, El Prela Trust, Enhancement Group, Freda B. Epstein, Estate of Edward R. Glantz, Estate of Elaine Cooper, Steven Mnuchin, Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Steven Mnuchin, Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Trust FBO Ste, Estate of Elena Jalon, Estate of Jesse L. Sigelman, Estate of Kay Frankel, Estate of Sarah E. Pearce, Estate of Thelma Glantz, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (UK) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Fern Creek Limited Partnership, First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Jill Fischer, Evelyn Fisher, Gregory Fisher, Michael Fisher, Regina Fisher, Francine Fishman, Freda Epstein Revocable Trust, Laurie Frenchman, Michael Frenchman, ELLEN V. GREENSPAN, Sherry Gaines, Richard M. Glantz, Glantz Family Foundation, Glantz-Ostrin Trust I, Glantz-Ostrin Trust II, Adam P. Glick, Kara Fishbein Goldman, Neal Goldman, Steven Goldman, Gotham Plaza Associates, LLC, Grace & Company, James Greiff, Harold Greisman, Kathy Hausner Grossman, HUDSON CHARITABLE FUND, Jacqueline Harary, Hilda Hausner, Hausner Group, Harold J. Hein, Jeffrey Hinte, Taj Inayat, Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch, JJG FOUNDATION, INC., JRAG, LLC, Cyril Jalon, Janice M. Calesa 1984 Trust, Jay Gaines &Co., Inc. Profit Sharing Plan, Jay Gaines In His Fiduciary Capacity As Trustee Of The Jay Gaines & Co. Profit Sharing Plan, Jeanne T. Spring Trust, Jeff E. Calesa Trust 1989, Jelris & Associates, L.P., Jerald Ostrin Trust, Joint Tenancy of Phyllis Guenzburger and Fabian Guenzburger, Joint Tenancy of Robert Pinchou and Fabian Guenzburger, KBC Investments Ltd., Bonnie J. Kansler, Zia Inayat Khan, Kingate Euro Fund, Ltd., Kingate Global Fund, Ltd., Andrew Kostin, David Kostin, Susan Kostin, Kostin Company, Kenneth Kreger, Morton Kurzrok, LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, L.P., LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, LLC, Lakeview Investment, LP, Richard Landsberger, James R. Ledley, Daniel F. Lindley, Daniel Lipton, David I. Lustig, David Ivan Lustig, Lustig Family 1990 Trust, M. Harvey Rubin Trust of 11/11/92, METROPOLITAN PHILANTHROPIC FUND, INC., Blanchefleur Macher, Kenneth Macher, Macher Family Partnership, Stephanie S. Mack, Gordon Mackenzie, Deborah Madoff, Maxrob, L.P., Isaac Jimmy Mayer, Mark McKeefrey, Jennifer Spring McPherson, Merlin & Associates, Ltd., Amy Metzenbaum, Marjorie Most, Michael Most, Charles Murphy, Naidot & Co., Robert Nystrom, Marvin L. Olshan, Elaine Ostrin, Jerald Ostrin, Scott Ostrin, Ostrin Family Partnership, Other Listed Defendants, PIPARTNERS, PSAssociates, David B. Pearce, Peter Pearman, Pergament Equities, LLC, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Pioneer Alternative Investment Management Ltd., Pioneer Global Asset Management S.p.A., Port of Hercules Trustees Limited, R.H. Book, LLC, RMGF LTD. Partnership, Randi M. Calesa 1986 Trust, John Reisman, Santiago Reyes, Richard M. Glantz 1991 Living Trust, Diane Ringler, Ringler Partners, L.P., Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation, Robert A. Belfer, as Trustee of The Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation, Joan Roman, Robert Roman, Michael N. Rosen, Jonathan P. Rosensweig, Linda Rosensweig, Norton S. Rosensweig, Alice Rosenwald, Nina Rosenwald, Maurice Harvey Rubin, S.H. & Helen R. Scheuer Family Foundation, Inc., SPAssociates, Daniel Schneider, Julie Schwartz, Scott Ostrin Trust, Benjamin R. Sigelman, Jonathan R. Sigelman, David Silver, Patricia Silver, Andrew Smith, Linda Sohn, South Sea Holdings L.P., Richard Spring, Spring Family Trust, Anthony E. Stefanelli, Mary Ann Stefanelli, Ronald J. Stein, Stephen H. Stern, Susan Blumenfeld GST Trust, Susan Blumenfeld Interiors, Ltd., THE ABSTRACTION FUND, Tensyr Limited, Tesuji Partners, LLC, Tesuji Partners, LLC, Thelma Glantz Living Trust, Cheryl K. Tomchin, Philip Toub, Trust F/B/O Alexandra E. Hausner Cave, Trust U/T/A 8/20/90, Trust U/W/O David L. Fisher, Trust f/b/o Brad Blumenfeld, Trust f/b/o David Blumenfeld, Trust f/b/o Susan Blumenfeld, UniCredit Bank Austria AG, UniCredit S.p.A., David R. Varet, Elizabeth R. Varet, Joseph R. Varet, Michael A. Varet, Sarah R. Varet, Visiting Nurse Service of New York, Vista Management Co., Vista Management Company, WIlliam Rosenwald Family Fund, Inc., Deborah Weinstein, Ellen J. Wertheim, Migs Woodside, Jerry Yanowitz and Joel Yanowitz in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 09/11/2012 by CM/ECF. [715753] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 09/11/2012 09:32 AM]
September 6, 2012 Filing 72 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [ # 707989-2 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, by RKW, Circuit Judge; FILED. [712689][72] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 09/06/2012 04:00 PM]
September 6, 2012 Filing 70 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, acknowledgment and notice of appearance, [61], [ # 708222-2 ], on behalf of Appellee Belfer Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED.[712104] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 09/06/2012 11:38 AM]
September 6, 2012 Filing 69 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM, [ # 708835-2 ], on behalf of Appellee Citrus Investment Holdings Ltd. in 12-2557, FILED.[711966] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 09/06/2012 10:56 AM]
September 6, 2012 Filing 68 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 708000-2 ], on behalf of Appellee Citrus Investment Holdings Ltd. in 12-2557, FILED.[711949] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 09/06/2012 10:47 AM]
September 5, 2012 Filing 67 ATTORNEY, Richard H. Dolan for Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation Belfer Corporation Robert A. Belfer, as Trustee of The Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation Arthur and Rochelle Belfer Foundation, Inc, in case 12-2616 Richard H. Dolan for Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation Belfer Corporation Robert A. Belfer, as Trustee of The Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation Arthur and Rochelle Belfer Foundation, Inc, in case 12-2557 , [ # 63 ], ADDED.[711116] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 09/05/2012 12:48 PM]
August 31, 2012 Filing 66 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citrus Investment Holdings Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/31/2012 by CM/ECF.[708838] [12-2616] [Entered: 08/31/2012 02:19 PM]
August 31, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Arthur and Rochelle Belfer Foundation, Inc, Belfer Corporation, Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation and Robert A. Belfer, as Trustee of The Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation in 12-2616, FILED. Service date 08/31/2012 by CM/ECF. [708445] [12-2616, 12-2557] [Entered: 08/31/2012 11:35 AM]
August 31, 2012 Filing 61 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Arthur and Rochelle Belfer Foundation, Inc, Belfer Corporation, Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation and Robert A. Belfer, as Trustee of The Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation, FILED. Service date 08/31/2012 by CM/ECF.[708221] [12-2616] [Entered: 08/31/2012 10:08 AM]
August 30, 2012 Filing 60 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citrus Investment Holdings Ltd., FILED. Service date 08/30/2012 by CM/ECF.[708001] [12-2616] [Entered: 08/30/2012 06:43 PM]
August 30, 2012 Filing 58 ATTORNEY, Brian H. Polovoy, in place of attorney David J. McLean, SUBSTITUTED.[707712] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 08/30/2012 03:46 PM]
August 29, 2012 Filing 57 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Citrus Investment Holdings Ltd., RECEIVED. Service date 08/29/2012 by CM/ECF.[706497] [12-2616] [Entered: 08/29/2012 05:07 PM]
August 14, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Fiterman Investment Fund, et al., Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al., Metro Motor Imports, Inc., et al, Miles &Shirley Fiterman Charitable Foundation, et al. and Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al. in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 08/14/2012 by CM/ECF. [691223] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 08/14/2012 11:14 AM]
August 10, 2012 Filing 55 ATTORNEY, Thomas J. Fleming for Charitable Remainder Trust F/B/O Vivien Svigals Marvin L. Olshan Daniel Schneider Visiting Nurse Service of New York Estate of Kay Frankel, in case 12-2616 Thomas J. Fleming for Charitable Remainder Trust F/B/O Vivien Svigals Marvin L. Olshan Daniel Schneider Visiting Nurse Service of New York Estate of Kay Frankel, in case 12-2557 , [ # 54 ], ADDED.[688341] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 08/10/2012 11:11 AM]
August 10, 2012 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Charitable Remainder Trust F/B/O Vivien Svigals, Estate of Kay Frankel, Marvin L. Olshan, Daniel Schneider and Visiting Nurse Service of New York in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 08/10/2012 by CM/ECF. [688249] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 08/10/2012 10:31 AM]
August 10, 2012 Filing 53 ATTORNEY, Seth Langer Rosenberg for Robert Nystrom, in case 12-2616 Seth Langer Rosenberg for Robert Nystrom, in case 12-2557 , [ # 687829-2 ], ADDED.[687927] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 08/10/2012 08:50 AM]
August 9, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Robert Nystrom, FILED. Service date 08/09/2012 by CM/ECF. [687828] [12-2616] [Entered: 08/09/2012 05:26 PM]
August 9, 2012 Filing 51 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Hinte, FILED. Service date 08/09/2012 by CM/ECF.[687827] [12-2616] [Entered: 08/09/2012 05:24 PM]
August 8, 2012 Filing 50 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Freda B. Epstein, Freda Epstein Revocable Trust, Jeanne T. Spring Trust, Jennifer Spring McPherson and S.H. & Helen R. Scheuer Family Foundation, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/08/2012 by CM/ECF.[685985] [12-2616] [Entered: 08/08/2012 01:50 PM]
August 6, 2012 Filing 49 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Gregory Fisher, Michael Fisher, Regina Fisher, Francine Fishman and RMGF LTD. Partnership, FILED. Service date 08/06/2012 by CM/ECF.[683306] [12-2616] [Entered: 08/06/2012 11:29 AM]
August 2, 2012 Filing 47 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Pergament Equities, LLC, FILED. Service date 08/02/2012 by CM/ECF.[680747] [12-2616] [Entered: 08/02/2012 12:44 PM]
August 1, 2012 Filing 46 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Harold J. Hein, FILED. Service date 08/01/2012 by CM/ECF.[679785] [12-2616] [Entered: 08/01/2012 03:16 PM]
July 27, 2012 Filing 45 ATTORNEY,Thomas J. Fleming, [ # 44 ], in place of attorney Joshua S. Androphy, SUBSTITUTED.[676522] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/27/2012 04:53 PM]
July 27, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Charitable Remainder Trust F/B/O Vivien Svigals, Estate of Kay Frankel, Marvin L. Olshan, Daniel Schneider and Visiting Nurse Service of New York in 12-2616, FILED. Service date 07/27/2012 by CM/ECF. [676498] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/27/2012 04:39 PM]
July 19, 2012 Filing 43 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, Joan Roman and Robert Roman, FILED. Service date 07/19/2012 by CM/ECF.[668865] [12-2616] [Entered: 07/19/2012 04:24 PM]
July 19, 2012 Filing 42 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Harold J. Hein, FILED. Service date 07/19/2012 by CM/ECF.[668504] [12-2616] [Entered: 07/19/2012 01:33 PM]
July 19, 2012 Filing 41 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants, FILED. Service date 07/19/2012 by CM/ECF.[668502] [12-2616] [Entered: 07/19/2012 01:32 PM]
July 17, 2012 Filing 40 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557 Brief due date as 10/04/2012;. Joint Appendix due date as 10/04/2012, FILED.[666409] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/17/2012 04:53 PM]
July 17, 2012 Filing 39 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557 Brief due date as 10/04/2012;. Joint Appendix due date as 10/04/2012, FILED.[666386] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/17/2012 04:41 PM]
July 17, 2012 Filing 38 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2616, informing Court of proposed due date 10/04/2012, RECEIVED. Service date 07/17/2012 by email, CM/ECF, US mail.[666294] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/17/2012 04:20 PM]
July 10, 2012 Filing 37 NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[659461] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/10/2012 04:27 PM]
July 9, 2012 Filing 33 NEW CASE MANAGER, Hezekiah James Toft, ASSIGNED.[657625] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/09/2012 12:21 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 27 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 07/05/2012 by CM/ECF.[656014] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/05/2012 11:24 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 26 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 07/05/2012 by CM/ECF.[656013] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/05/2012 11:23 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 25 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 07/05/2012 by CM/ECF.[656012] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/05/2012 10:07 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 24 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 07/05/2012 by CM/ECF.[656011] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/05/2012 10:05 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 07/05/2012 by CM/ECF.[655988] [12-2616] [Entered: 07/05/2012 06:26 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 22 ATTORNEY, Lauren T. Attard for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, in case 12-2616 Lauren T. Attard for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, in case 12-2557 , [ # 14 ], ADDED.[655658] [12-2616, 12-2557] [Entered: 07/05/2012 03:29 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 21 ATTORNEY, Josephine Wang for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, in case 12-2616 Josephine Wang for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, in case 12-2557 , [ # 13 ], ADDED.[655655] [12-2616, 12-2557] [Entered: 07/05/2012 03:28 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Carrie A Longstaff for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-2616 Carrie A Longstaff for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-2557 , [ # 11 ], ADDED.[655649] [12-2616, 12-2557] [Entered: 07/05/2012 03:26 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 19 ATTORNEY, Tatiana Markel for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-2616 Tatiana Markel for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-2557 , [ # 10 ], ADDED.[655645] [12-2616, 12-2557] [Entered: 07/05/2012 03:25 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-2616 Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-2557 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[655641] [12-2616, 12-2557] [Entered: 07/05/2012 03:25 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, David J. Sheehan for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-2616 David J. Sheehan for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-2557 , [ # 8 ], ADDED.[655637] [12-2616, 12-2557] [Entered: 07/05/2012 03:23 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 07/05/2012 by CM/ECF. [655173] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/05/2012 11:45 AM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 07/05/2012 by CM/ECF. [655165] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/05/2012 11:42 AM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2616, FILED. Service date 07/05/2012 by CM/ECF. [655078] [12-2616, 12-2557] [Entered: 07/05/2012 11:05 AM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2616, FILED. Service date 07/05/2012 by CM/ECF. [655060] [12-2616, 12-2557] [Entered: 07/05/2012 11:00 AM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 07/05/2012 by CM/ECF.[655051] [12-2616] [Entered: 07/05/2012 10:57 AM]
July 3, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 07/03/2012 by CM/ECF. [654729] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/03/2012 08:48 PM]
July 3, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 07/03/2012 by CM/ECF. [654728] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/03/2012 08:45 PM]
July 3, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 07/03/2012 by CM/ECF. [654727] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/03/2012 08:40 PM]
July 3, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 07/03/2012 by CM/ECF. [654726] [12-2557, 12-2616] [Entered: 07/03/2012 08:36 PM]
July 2, 2012 Filing 5 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Robert Alan Abrams, Esq. for Appellee Richard Spring, Spring Family Trust, Jeanne T. Spring Trust, Freda Epstein Revocable Trust, Freda B. Epstein, Jennifer Spring McPherson and S.H. & Helen R. Scheuer Family Foundation, Inc., Joshua S. Androphy, Esq. for Appellee Estate of Kay Frankel, Charitable Remainder Trust F/B/O Vivien Svigals, Daniel Schneider, Visiting Nurse Service of New York and Marvin L. Olshan, Michael Richard Dal Lago, Esq. for Appellee David Silver and Patricia Silver, Elise Scherr Frejka, Esq. for Appellee Audax Group LP, Audax Management Co. LLC, 101 Huntington Holdings LLC, Marc B. Wolpow, Geoffrey S. Rehnert, Richard T. Joseph; Carol Nelson; Gordon Associates, Bruce Gordon; Robert M. Siff; Robert Ros and Estate of Elaine Cooper, Steven Mnuchin, Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Steven Mnuchin, Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Trust FBO Ste, Timothy P. Harkness, Esq. for Appellee El Prela Trust, Alpine Trustees Limited, Port of Hercules Trustees Limited, First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Ashby Trust, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, Ashby Holding Services Limited, Ashby Investment Services Limited and El Prela Trading Investments Limited, Mickee M. Hennessy, Esq. for Appellee DOS BFS FAMILY PARTNERSHIP II, L.P., DONALD AND BETTE STEIN FAMILY TRUST, DONALD O. STEIN, WILLIAM STEIN, JAMIE STEIN WALKER, and BARBARA STEIN JAFFE, Kenneth Alan Hicks, Esq. for Appellee Maurice Harvey Rubin and M. Harvey Rubin Trust of 11/11/92, George R. Hirsch, Esq. for Appellee Jay Gaines &Co., Inc. Profit Sharing Plan, Jay Gaines In His Fiduciary Capacity As Trustee Of The Jay Gaines & Co. Profit Sharing Plan and Sherry Gaines, Fran R. Hoffinger, Esq. for Appellee Cyril Jalon, Estate of Elena Jalon, Joint Tenancy of Phyllis Guenzburger and Fabian Guenzburger and Joint Tenancy of Robert Pinchou and Fabian Guenzburger, Virginia Iglesia, Esq. for Appellee Bank Julius Baer &Co. Ltd. and John Reisman, Robert Scott Loigman, Esq. for Appellee Kingate Euro Fund, Ltd. and Kingate Global Fund, Ltd., David J. McLean, Esq. for Appellee Citrus Investment Holdings Ltd., Jeffrey Alan Miller, Esq. for Appellee Morton Kurzrok, David Joseph Onorato, Esq. for Appellee Tensyr Limited, Kimberly Joan Robinson, Esq. for Appellee Financiere Agache, Joanna Shally, Esq. for Appellee Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch, Naidot & Co., Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A. and Banco Itau Europa International and Eugene E. Stearns, Esq. for Appellee Isaac Jimmy Mayer in 12-2616, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[652684] [12-2616, 12-2557] [Entered: 07/02/2012 11:41 AM]
June 22, 2012 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[652640] [12-2616] [Entered: 07/02/2012 11:33 AM]
June 22, 2012 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/24/2012, RECEIVED.[652634] [12-2616] [Entered: 07/02/2012 11:32 AM]
June 22, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2616, FILED. [652616] [12-2616, 12-2557] [Entered: 07/02/2012 11:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re Madoff Securities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Estate of Sarah E. Pearce
Represented By: Eric Rieder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Diane Ringler
Represented By: Paul H. Aloe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jelris & Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel Schneider
Represented By: Thomas J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Isaac Jimmy Mayer
Represented By: Eugene E. Stearns Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Serene Warren Revocable Trust
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Janice M. Calesa 1984 Trust
Represented By: Robert J. Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Merlin & Associates, Ltd.
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BDG Daniel Street, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Leslie Aufzein Levine
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Ivan Lustig
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Neal Goldman
Represented By: Terence William McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Kostin
Represented By: Bernard James Garbutt Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDB Capital, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gordon Mackenzie
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALICE ROSENWALD FUND
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PetCareRx, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah Skakel Esq.
Represented By: Shaya M. Berger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ashby Investment Services Limited
Represented By: Timothy P. Harkness Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brad Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BCC II, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Double B Squared LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pioneer Alternative Investment Management Limited
Represented By: Marco Schnabl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, u/a/d May 2, 2000
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Hilda Hausner
Represented By: Paul H. Aloe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Marcia Koff
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Laurie Frenchman
Represented By: Paul H. Aloe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Meredith Aufzien Bauer
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: METROPOLITAN PHILANTHROPIC FUND, INC.
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Evelyn Fisher, individually and as trustee
Represented By: Terence William McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN SECURITIES GROUP, L.L.C.
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chester Management Cayman Limited
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Elizabeth R. Varet Defined Benefit Plan & Trust
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Macher Family Partnership
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nina Rosenwald, individually and as trustee of the Apollo Trust for Elizabeth R. Varet UAD as trustee of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Alice Rosenwald, as trustee of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Elizabeth R. Varet, as trustee of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO B
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UniCredit Bank Austria AG
Represented By: Franklin B. Velie Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kingate Euro Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Scott Loigman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joel Yanowitz
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BDG DWD Associates, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Glantz-Ostrin Trust I
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 1995 Jack Parker Descendant Trust No. 1, in 12-cv-2875
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited
Represented By: Marc J. Gottridge Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: El Prela Trading Investments Limited
Represented By: Timothy P. Harkness Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David R. Varet
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard Spring
Represented By: Robert Alan Abrams Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Norman K. Aufzien
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ashby Holding Services Limited
Represented By: Timothy P. Harkness Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PIPARTNERS
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kenneth Macher
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David I. Lustig
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Charles Murphy
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, in her capacity as Trustee for the Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Blumenfeld Family Trust
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cynthia A. Delles
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephen H. Stern
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BDG Lake Grove I, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Securities Management, L.P., FKA American Securities, L.P.
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Banco Itau Europa International
Represented By: Joanna Shally Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeanne T. Spring Trust
Represented By: Robert Alan Abrams Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Blumco Setauket, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Santiago Reyes
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sherry Gaines
Represented By: George R. Hirsch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EJS
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BDG Yaphank, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Adam P. Glick, in 12-cv-2875
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield International Managers, Inc.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOS BFS FAMILY PARTNERSHIP II, L.P., DONALD AND BETTE STEIN FAMILY TRUST, DONALD O. STEIN, WILLIAM STEIN, JAMIE STEIN WALKER, and BARBARA STEIN JAFFE
Represented By: Mickee M. Hennessy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Serene Warren, as co-trustee of the Serene Warren Revocable Trust
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alan S. Gordon
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark B. Evenstad, in his capacity as Grantor and Trustee for the Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BDG 115 Broadhollow, L.P.
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vista Management Company
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeff E. Calesa
Represented By: Robert J. Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel Lipton
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANCHORAGE CHARITABLE FUND
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Benjamin R. Sigelman, individually and as beneficiary of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO, as beneficiary of the Trust UAD FBO Benjamin R. Sigelman
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Elizabeth R. Varet Money Purchase Pension Plan
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stacy L. Koff
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Buckmaster Farms, L.P.
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A.
Represented By: Joanna Shally Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sew Preferred Limited Partnership
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deborah Madoff, Individually and in her capacity as Guardian for A.M. and E.M.
Represented By: Daniel H. Tabak Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thelma Glantz Living Trust
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Estate of Elena Jalon
Represented By: Fran R. Hoffinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A.
Represented By: Marc J. Gottridge Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fern Creek Limited Partnership
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPAssociates
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Greiff
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Blanchefleur Macher
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jonathan R. Sigelman, individually and as beneficiary of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO, as beneficiary of the Trust UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. Ray Johnson
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mary Ann Stefanelli
Represented By: James B. Glucksman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ringler Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Paul H. Aloe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Regina Fisher, individually and as General Partner of RMGF Ltd. Partnership
Represented By: William L. Prickett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BDG Construction Corp.
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Reisman, in 12-cv-2875
Represented By: Virginia Iglesia Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Arthur and Rochelle Belfer Foundation, Inc
Represented By: Richard H. Dolan
Represented By: Bennette Deacy Kramer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stuart H. Coleman, as trustee of the Apollo Trust for Elizabeth R. Varet UAD of the Apollo Trust FBO Nina Rosenwald, as trustee of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Nina Rosenwald, of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Elizabeth R. Varet, of Issue 1 Trust UAD 8/30
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alexander G. Anagnos, as trustee of the 2004 V Trust and as trustee of Trust (A. Anagnos et al, trustees)
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BDG Commack, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James R. Ledley, as trustee of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman, as trustee of the Trust UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brad Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Abel
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd., McKool Smith,1 Bryant Park,47th Floor, New York, NY 10036, 212-402-9400
Represented By: Virginia Iglesia Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lisa Aufzien
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: El Prela Trust
Represented By: Timothy P. Harkness Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MBE Preferred Limited Partnership
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Hausner Group
Represented By: Paul H. Aloe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Harold Greisman
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Estate of Jesse L. Sigelman
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lustig Family 1990 Trust
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Greenwich (UK) Limited
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Ostrin Trust
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alexandra E. Hausner Cave
Represented By: Paul H. Aloe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Port of Hercules Trustees Limited
Represented By: Timothy P. Harkness Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Elizabeth R. Varet IRA Rollover
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffrey Hinte
Represented By: William Paul Weintraub Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ostrin Family Partnership
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cyril Jalon
Represented By: Fran R. Hoffinger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: South Sea Holdings L.P.
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Frenchman
Represented By: Paul H. Aloe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sew General, LLC
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Philip Toub
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Maxrob, L.P.
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tensyr Limited
Represented By: David Joseph Onorato Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bonnie J. Kansler
Represented By: Barry R. Lax Esq.
Represented By: Brian Neville Esq.
Represented By: Gabrielle Pretto Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UniCredit SPA
Represented By: Marco Schnabl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Fisher, as Limited Partner of RMGF Ltd. Partnership
Represented By: William L. Prickett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edward Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tesuji Partners, LLC, in 12-cv-2875
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Trust f/b/o David Blumenfeld
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PSAssociates
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Amy Metzenbaum
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: First Peninsula Trustees Limited
Represented By: Timothy P. Harkness Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Denise M. Angeja
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edward Blumenfeld and Susan Blumenfeld
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Roberta Cohen
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DWD Associates, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Securities Holdings Corp.
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Securities Opportunity Fund, L.P.
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BDG Larkfield Associates, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert H. Book
Represented By: David Harrison McGill Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jay Gaines &Co., Inc. Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By: George R. Hirsch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Glantz Family Foundation
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dogwood Realty Group
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard M. Glantz
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Calesa Associates L.P.
Represented By: Robert J. Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gregory Fisher, as Limited Partner of RMGF Ltd. Partnership
Represented By: William L. Prickett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R.H. Book, LLC
Represented By: David Harrison McGill Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barclays Bank S.A.
Represented By: Marc J. Gottridge Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ellen J. Wertheim
Represented By: Paul H. Aloe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B-4 Partnership
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Corina Noel Piedrahita
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephanie S. Mack, c/o Cooley LLP, 1114 Avenue of the Americas, NY, NY 10036, 212-479-6000
Represented By: Alan Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jerald Ostrin
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Estate of Elaine Cooper, Steven Mnuchin, Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Steven Mnuchin, Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Trust FBO Ste
Represented By: Elise S. Frejka Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Kostin
Represented By: Bernard James Garbutt Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Freda Epstein Revocable Trust
Represented By: Robert Alan Abrams Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Norton S. Rosensweig
Represented By: Eric Rieder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel Land Co. LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 500 Bi-County Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. Harvey Rubin Trust of
Represented By: Kenneth Alan Hicks Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Belfer Corporation
Represented By: Richard H. Dolan
Represented By: Bennette Deacy Kramer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DECIMAL INVESTMENTS, L.L.C.
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Greenwich Limited
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Elaine Ostrin
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JRAG, LLC, in 12-cv-2876
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jonathan P. Rosensweig
Represented By: Eric Rieder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Foundation
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Grace & Company
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jerald Ostrin Trust
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Grace B. Evenstad
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Zia Inayat Khan
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KBC Investments Limited
Represented By: Alan M. Unger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 125 Bethpage Associates
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tesuji Partners, LLC, in 12-cv-2876
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Other Listed Defendants
Represented By: Richard Levy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anthony E. Stefanelli
Represented By: James B. Glucksman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BWI
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Coblum Setauket, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Smith
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David B. Pearce
Represented By: Eric Rieder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Linda Rosensweig
Represented By: Eric Rieder Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ronald J. Stein, as trustee of the Trust UAD FBO Benjamin R. Sigelman, as trustee of the Trust UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pergament Equities, LLC
Represented By: Scott M. Grossman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edward Blumenfeld, et al, II
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Trust U/T/A
Represented By: Terence William McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BDG Deer Park Associates, LLC
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kara Fishbein Goldman
Represented By: Richard Levy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeff E. Calesa Trust 1989
Represented By: Robert J. Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Financiere Agache
Represented By: Kimberly Joan Robinson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kim Dickstein, in 12-cv-2875
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Harvey Cohen, individually, and as Trustee
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Silver
Represented By: Michael Richard Dal Lago Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joseph R. Varet, individually and as beneficiary and as trustee of the Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO Joseph R. Varet
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Howard M. Koff, individually and in his capacity as Trustee of the Koff Living Trust
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RMGF LTD. Partnership
Represented By: William L. Prickett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Freda B. Epstein
Represented By: Robert Alan Abrams Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Ostrin
Represented By: Richard Ernest Signorelli Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Trust F/B/O Alexandra E. Hausner Cave
Represented By: Paul H. Aloe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael A. Varet, individually and as beneficial owner of one or more IRAs, as custodian for David R. Varet and Sara R. Varet, as trustee of the Michael A. Varet Trust UAD
Represented By: William B. Pollard Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Roman
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brad Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Nystrom
Represented By: Seth Langer Rosenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Trust U/W/O David L. Fisher
Represented By: Terence William McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |