Bernard L. Madoff Investment S
Defendant: David Silver, Neil N. Lapidus, UniCredit SPA, Audax Group LP, Audax Management Co. LLC, 101 Huntington Holdings LLC, Marc B. Wolpow, Geoffrey S. Rehnert, Richard T. Joseph; Carol Nelson; Gordon Associates, Bruce Gordon; Robert M. Siff; Robert Ros, John Nessel, Kingate Euro Fund, Ltd., Jelris & Associates, L.P., Citrus Investment Holdings Ltd., Ascot Partners, L.P., Stepheny B. Riemer, Amy Metzenbaum, BWI, Sherry Gaines In Her Fiduciary Capacity As Trustee Of The Jay Gaines & Co. Profit Sharing Plan, Edward Blumenfeld, II, Fullerton Capital PTE Ltd., Blanchefleur Macher, Joyce C. Auerbach, DOS BFS FAMILY PARTNERSHIP II, L.P., DONALD AND BETTE STEIN FAMILY TRUST, DONALD O. STEIN, WILLIAM STEIN, JAMIE STEIN WALKER, and BARBARA STEIN JAFFE, The Jeanne T. Spring Trust, Peri Arenas, in 12-cv-2875, Tesuji Partners, LLC, in 12-cv-2875, Barclays Bank S.A., Northern Trust, N.A., Ashby Investment Services Limited, Edward Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee, Miles &Shirley Fiterman Charitable Foundation, et al., Peter Pearman, as trustee for the Concorde 1987 Trust DTD, The Glantz-Ostrin Trust II, Norton S. Rosensweig, The Hausner Group, The Spring Family Trust, ELLEN V. GREENSPAN, as trustee of the Trust (A. Anagnos et al., trustes), Enhancement Group, WIlliam Rosenwald Family Fund, Inc., David Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee, JRAG, LLC, in 12-cv-2876, Harold Greisman, Edward Blumenfeld Gerald Y Mordfin, Thomas D. Kearns, David Abel, Financial Institution Defendants, Trust f/b/o Brad Blumenfeld, BSI AG, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, P&I Partners, Sarah R. Varet, individually and as trustee and as beneficiary of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO Sarah R. Varet, CRS Revocable Trust, Trust f/b/o David Blumenfeld, Elizabeth R. Varet, individually, and as custodian for Joseph R. Varet, as custodian and/or trustee of the Elizabeth R. Varet Money Purchase Pension Plan, as grantor of the 2004 V Trust, as trustee and beneficiary of the Apollo Trust for Elizabeth R., The Joint Tenancy of Robert Pinchou and Fabian Guenzburger, The Lustig Family 1990 Trust, James R. Ledley, as trustee of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman, as trustee of the Trust UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman, Thema Fund Limited, Cardinal Management, Inc., The Estate of Gilbert M. Kotzen, Harold J. Hein, The Roberth Auerbach Revocable Trust, The Estate of Elena Jalon, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, Patrick Littaye, Luc D. Estenne, LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, LLC, Migs Woodside, Thema International Fund PLC, Bull Market Fund, Janice M. Calesa, EJS, Pioneer Global Asset Management S.p.A., The Joint Tenancy of Phyllis Guenzburger and Fabian Guenzburger, Charles Murphy, Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust, Kingate Global Fund, Ltd., Robert Auerback, The Edward R. Glantz Living Trust, Stephanie S. Mack, c/o Cooley LLP 1114 Avenue of the Americas NY, NY 10036 212-479-6000, HUDSON CHARITABLE FUND, Marjorie Most, Harvey Cohen, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Banca Carige S.P.A., in 12-cv-02408, RMGF LTD. Partnership, South Sea Holdings L.P., Randi C. Crawford, Financiere Agache, Chester Global Strategy Fund Limited, Philip Toub, Michael A. Varet, individually and as beneficial owner of one or more IRAs, as custodian for David R. Varet and Sara R. Varet, as trustee of the Michael A. Varet Trust UAD, Blumco Setauket, LLC, Grace & Company, Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, Scott Ostrin, BDG Larkfield Associates, LLC, Chester Global Strategy Fund, LP, Lorraine Lock Nosworthy, Francine Fishman, as Limited Partners of RMGF Ltd. Partnership, Stanley J. Bernstein, The Estate of Jesse L. Sigelman, Ellen J. Wertheim, First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Robert Nystrom, Joan Roman, Calesa Associates L.P., Trust U/W/O David L. Fisher, Elizabeth R. Varet Money Purchase Pension Plan, Visiting Nurse Service of New York, Fairfield Investment Fund Limited, Nicole Girard, The S. James Coppersmith Charitable Remainder Unitrust, Mary Ann Stefanelli, Mistral (SPC), Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd., McKool Smith 1 Bryant Park 47th Floor New York, NY 10036 212-402-9400, Deborah Weinstein, Freda B. Epstein, The Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Foundation, Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation, R.H. Book, LLC, Austin Bosarge, Pamela W. Goldberg, BDG DWD Associates, LLC, Allan R. Tessler, Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch, FKA Blubank Ltd Panama Branch, Janice G. Coppersmith, Pierre Delandmeter, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Kostin Company, Macher Family Partnership, Alexandra E. Hausner Cave, Brad Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust, Kenneth Macher, Russell J. DeLucia, Fairfield Greenwich (UK) Limited, ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd., FKA Fortis Prime Fund Solutions Bank (Ireland) Ltd., Freda Epstein Revocable Trust, Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, Access Management Luxembourg SA, Zia Inayat Khan, I.I. Kotzen Company, El Prela Trust, Joshua Elkin, Marvin L. Olshan, Jonathan P. Rosensweig, The Marcia Kotzen 2002 Revocable Trust, SNS Global Custody B.V., 125 Bethpage Associates, Kathy Hausner Grossman, Hermes International Fund Limited, Merrill Lynch Bank (Suisse) SA, The Trust FBO Nicole Girard U/A/D, Linda Rosensweig, Sherry Gaines, Jeffrey Hinte, Pergament Equities, LLC, Linda Sohn, Joel Yanowitz, Steven Goldman, Melvin B. Nessel Revocable Trust, ARC-BDG Setauket Enterprise, David Ivan Lustig, Joseph R. Varet, individually and as beneficiary and as trustee of the Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO Joseph R. Varet, Kim Dickstein, in 12-cv-2875, Amanda Goldberg Snyderman, Partners Advisers S.A., Merlin & Associates, Ltd., BCC II, LLC, Daniel Schneider, Belinda F. Clarke, as trustee for the Concorde 1987 Trust DTD, PICTET ET CIE, Fred A. Daibes Madoff Securities Trust, Michael Most, ANCHORAGE CHARITABLE FUND, The Brad Blumenfeld Family Foundation, Kara Fishbein Goldman, Subsequent Transferee Defendants, ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., KBC Investments Limited, Neal Goldman, David I. Lustig, Jennifer Spring McPherson, B-4 Partnership, ABN AMRO Bank, N.V., The Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Gregory Fisher, as Limited Partner of RMGF Ltd. Partnership, Denise M. Angeja, Mr. Harvey Rubin Trust of, Susan Kostin, ALICE ROSENWALD FUND, 500 Bi-County Associates, L.P., Gail Nessel, Robert S. Bernstein, Thema Wise Investments Limited, Daniel Land Co. LLC, Andrew Kostin, 45 South Service Road, LLC, Fairfield Investors (Euro) Ltd., Jerry Yanowitz, Gotham Plaza Associates, LLC, Metro Motor Imports, Inc., et al, BDG 125th Street, LLC, Regina Fisher, individually and as General Partner of RMGF Ltd. Partnership, Elaine Ostrin, SNS Bank N.V., Richard M. Glantz 1991 Living Trust, Alexander G. Anagnos, Arthur M. Siskind, The Estate of Thelma Glantz, Michael N. Rosen, Kenneth Kreger, Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A., BDG Construction Corp., LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, L.P., Joan Elkin Madison, Chester Management Cayman Limited, Charitable Remainder Trust F/B/O Vivien Svigals, Geo Currencies S.A., The Estate of Edward R. Glantz, Susan Siegal, THE ABSTRACTION FUND, Taj Inayat, Ostrin Family Partnership, Michael Frenchman, Trust U/T/A, Maxrob, L.P., Robert A. Belfer, as Trustee of The Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation, Harold Anfang, in 12-cv-2875, Randi M. Calesa 1986 Trust, Lakeview Investment, LP, BDG Kingsbridge, LLC, Jay Gaines, DWD Associates, LLC, David R. Varet, Jeff E. Calesa, Charleston Enterprises, LLC, The Estate of Sylvia W. Lock, Susan Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee, Cheryl K. Tomchin, Janice M. Calesa 1984 Trust, Morton Kurzrok, Bonnie J. Kansler, Double B Squared LLC, Edith G. Sisler, Elizabeth R. Varet IRA Rollover, Santiago Reyes, Deborah Madoff, Individually and in her capacity as Guardian for A.M. and E.M., Brad Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust, BDG Deer Park Associates, LLC, Melvin B. Nessel 2006 Trust u/a/d, Gutmacher Enterprises, LP, Gordon Mackenzie, Maurice Harvey Rubin, Tensyr Limited, Robert Blum, Remaining 546(e) Parties, Cynthia A. Delles, BDG Lake Grove I, LLC, Antecedent Debt Defendants Listed in Appendix A od the Court's May 12, 2012 Order, Citibank, N.A., Alice Rosenwald, individually and as custodian for Jonathan Sigelman, as custodian for Benjamon R. Sigelman, as trustee and beneficiary of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Alice Rosenwald, as trustee and beneficiary of Issue Trust 6 UAD FBO, AKA Alice R. Sigelm, Frederic J. Perlen, Dogwood Realty Group, Fern Creek Limited Partnership, BDG Daniel Street, LLC, Richard M. Glantz, Marital Trust created under Revocable Trust of Marvin G. Graybow, Buckmaster Farms, L.P., Gerald Blumenthal, and related Defendants listed in Appendix A to the Blumenthal Notice of Appearance, BDG Commack, LLC, Brad Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee, Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al., Trust F/B/O Alexandra E. Hausner Cave, John Reisman, in 12-cv-2875, Estate of Elaine Cooper, Steven Mnuchin, Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Generation Skipping Transfer Trust FBO Steven Mnuchin, Trust FBO Alan Mnuchin, Trust FBO Ste, Fiterman Investment Fund, et al., Square Asset Management Ltd., Ringler Partners, L.P., Gregory Antoniazzi, HHI Investment Trust #2, and related Defendants listed in Appendix A, Naidot & Co., Lourdes Barreneche, Kathryn R. Siggins, Paul Rampell, The Scott Ostrin Trust, Stuart H. Coleman, as trustee of the Apollo Trust for Elizabeth R. Varet UAD of the Apollo Trust FBO Nina Rosenwald, as trustee of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Nina Rosenwald, of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Elizabeth R. Varet, of Issue 1 Trust UAD 8/30/, AMERICAN PHILANTHROPIC FOUNDATION, Nancy Abraham, Pioneer Alternative Investment Management Limited, Square One Fund Ltd., Belfer Corporation, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, Alpine Trustees Limited, David Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust, Evelyn Fisher, Indiv. and as Trustee, Stable Fund LP, Mark McKeefrey, Jay Gaines &Co., Inc. Profit Sharing Plan, Patricia Silver, Ashby Holding Services Limited, The Barbara Girard Testamentary Trust FBO Nicole Girard, Jacqueline Harary, Blumenfeld Development Group, Ltd., P&S Associates, AMERICAN SECURITIES GROUP, L.L.C., El Prela Trading Investments Limited, The Melvin N. Lock trust, Elizabeth R. Varet Defined Benefit Plan & Trust, Jerald Ostrin, Alyssa Goldberg, Coblum Setauket, LLC, Boxwood Realty Group, Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al., Sumitomo Mitsui Trust Bank, Limited, S. James Coppersmith, The Sylvia W. Lock Declaration of Trust, Dated April 13, 1982, Jeff E. Calesa Trust 1989, American Securities Management, L.P., FKA American Securities, L.P., Port of Hercules Trustees Limited, George S. Kaufman, Banco Itau Europa International, Richard Spring, BDG 115 Broadhollow, L.P., The Gilbert M. Kotzen 1982 Trust, Andrew Smith, Good Faith Defendants, Anthony E. Stefanelli, Sharon L. Graybow, American Securities Holdings Corp., Dakota Global Investments, Ltd., The David Blumenfeld Family Foundation, Merrill Lynch International, Jeremy Goldberg, Isaac Jimmy Mayer, The Joyce C. Auerback Revocable Trust, Elena Elkin, Defendants' listed in Appendix A of the Court's April 13, 2012 Order, Robert Roman, Irongate Global Strategy Fund Limited, Diane Ringler, The Arthur and Rochelle Belfer Foundation, Inc., Daniel F. Lindley, in 12-cv-2875, Constance R. Sisler, Julie Schwartz, Jonathan R. Sigelman, individually and as beneficiary of Issue Trust UAD FBO, as beneficiary of the Trust UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman, The Jerald Ostrin Trust, James Greiff, Edward Blumenfeld and Susan Blumenfeld, Hilda Hausner, The 1995 Jack Parker Descendant Trust No. 1, in 12-cv-2875, Meredith Goldberg, David Kostin, Michael Fisher, as Limited Partner of RMGF Ltd. Partnership, DECIMAL INVESTMENTS, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Fund (Luxembourg), James Nosworthy, James Abraham, Citibank North America, Inc., EDB Capital, LLC, The Ashby Trust, Vista Management Company, Frank A. Petito, DBA The Petito Investment Group, METROPOLITAN PHILANTHROPIC FUND, INC., Estate of Rose Gutmacher, Robert H. Book, Zephyros Limited, The Glantz Family Foundation, Nina Rosenwald, individually and as trustee of the Apollo Trust for Elizabeth R. Varet UAD as trustee of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Alive Rosenwald, as trustee of Issue 1 Trust UAD FBO Elizabeth R. Varet, as trustee of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO B, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Estate of Kay Frankel, Jay Gaines In His Fiduciary Capacity As Trustee Of The Jay Gaines & Co. Profit Sharing Plan, UniCredit Bank Austria AG, Cyril Jalon, Estate of Helene Abraham, Susan Blumenfeld Interiors, Ltd., 10 Michael Drive Associates, L.P., Seymour W. Zises, Richard Landsberger, Lillian Berman Goldfarb, Edward Blumenfeld and Susan Blumenfeld 2007 Charitable Lead Trust, Lagoon Investment Limited, for itself and as Trustee of the Lagoon Investment Trust, Laurie Frenchman, Edward F. Calesa, Jill Fischer, in 12-cv-2875, Stephen H. Stern, Ambassador Shoe Corporation, BDG Piscataway, LLC, Other Listed Defendants, David B. Pearce, Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Richard Weinberger, JJG FOUNDATION, INC., The Estate of Sarah E. Pearce, Ronald J. Stein, as trustee of the Trust UAD FBO Benjamin R. Sigelman, as trustee of the Trust UAD FBO Jonathan R. Singelman, Adam P. Glick, in 12-cv-2875, BDG Yaphank, LLC, S&P Associates, Susan Blumenfeld GST Trust, Frederick Goldberg, S.H. & Helen R. Scheuer Family Foundation, Inc., Elbert R. Brown Trust, and related Defendants listed in Appendix A, Daniel Lipton, American Securities Opportunity Fund, L.P., Linda S. Paresky, The Thelma Glantz Living Trust, Trust f/b/o Susan Blumenfeld, Tesuji Partners, LLC, in 12-cv-2876 and Roberta Cohen
Petitioner: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
Defendant / Appellee: Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, u/a/d May 2, 2000, Marcia Koff, Meredith Aufzien Bauer, Norman K. Aufzien, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, in her capacity as Trustee for the Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren, as co-trustee of the Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Mark B. Evenstad, in his capacity as Grantor and Trustee for the Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Stacy L. Koff, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Howard M. Koff, individually and in his capacity as Trustee of the Koff Living Trust, C. Ray Johnson, Thomas H. Lee, PetCareRx, Inc., Lisa Aufzien, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, Sew General, LLC, Blue Star Investors, LLC, Alan S. Gordon, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Leslie Aufzein Levine, Grace B. Evenstad, The Koff Living Trust, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, as a Limited Partner of MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren, as co-trustee of the Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Jonathan M. Aufzien, MBE General LLC, as the General Partner of MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, David I. Koff, individually as settlor and beneficiary of the David I. Koff Investment Trust and Kenneth L. Evenstad, in his capacity as Grantor and Trustee for the Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, individually
Plaintiff / Appellant: Securities Investor Protection Corporation and Irving H. Picard
Amicus Curiae: National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees
Debtor: In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Case Number: 12-3440
Filed: August 27, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2015 Filing 351 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 06/22/2015, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 14-1129, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[1538274] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 06/23/2015 11:02 AM]
March 17, 2015 Filing 350 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 03/17/2015, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 14-1129, RECEIVED.[1464851] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/19/2015 12:04 PM]
March 17, 2015 Filing 349 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 03/17/2015, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 14-1128, RECEIVED.[1464845] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/19/2015 11:58 AM]
March 3, 2015 Filing 348 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting Appellant Irving H. Picard extension to file Writ of Certiorari, FILED.[1452928] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/05/2015 08:54 AM]
January 23, 2015 Filing 347 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1422735] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/23/2015 02:57 PM]
January 20, 2015 Filing 346 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 01/20/2015, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1419391] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/20/2015 04:05 PM]
January 20, 2015 Filing 345 STATEMENT OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, FILED.[1419373] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/20/2015 03:58 PM]
January 15, 2015 Filing 343 ERRATA SHEET, for Opinion dated 12/08/2014, by BDP, FILED.[1417094] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/15/2015 04:05 PM]
December 29, 2014 Filing 339 LETTER, dated 12/16/2014, on behalf of Defendants-Appellees, the M & B Weiss Family Limited Partnership of 1996, Melvyn I. Weiss, Barbara J. Weiss, Stephen A. Weiss, Leslie Weiss and Gary Weiss, RECEIVED. Service date 12/16/2014 by email.[1404042] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/29/2014 02:51 PM]
December 17, 2014 Filing 337 ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 12/17/2014 by CM/ECF.[1396087] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/17/2014 10:29 AM]
December 8, 2014 Filing 336 JUDGMENT, FILED.[1387527] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/08/2014 02:28 PM]
December 8, 2014 Filing 332 OPINION, judgment of the district court is affirmed, by BDP, GEL, CFD, FILED.[1386985] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/08/2014 10:25 AM]
December 8, 2014 Filing 330 NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[1386858] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/08/2014 09:33 AM]
October 28, 2014 Filing 329 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED to Christopher J. Major.[1356194] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/28/2014 03:42 PM]
October 16, 2014 Filing 328 LETTER, dated 10/07/2014, on behalf of Christopher J. Major - Meister Seelig and Fein LLP requesting CD of Oral Argument. Fee Paid. Forwarded to Calendar Team. Receipt # 220366. , RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2014 by US mail.[1346590] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/16/2014 04:13 PM]
August 15, 2014 Filing 327 ATTORNEY, Scott M. Grossman, [ # 1295360-2 ], in place of attorney Barbra R. Parlin, SUBSTITUTED.[1296848] [12-2616, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/15/2014 05:44 PM]
May 5, 2014 Filing 324 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[1216989] [12-3585, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582] [Entered: 05/05/2014 06:07 PM]
April 16, 2014 Filing 320 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from LOWENSTEIN SANDLER with fee, RECEIVED.[1203278] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 04/16/2014 10:31 AM]
April 15, 2014 Filing 323 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED to Michael Hackett.[1215449] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/02/2014 12:17 PM]
April 15, 2014 Filing 322 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED to Andrew Sherman.[1215447] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/02/2014 12:15 PM]
April 8, 2014 Filing 318 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD From SILLS CUMMIS & GROSS with fee, RECEIVED.[1196866] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 04/08/2014 11:03 AM]
March 31, 2014 Filing 317 LETTER, dated 03/28/2014, on behalf of Michael R. Hackett from Proskauer Rose LLP requesting CD of the Oral Argument. Fee Paid. Forwarded to Calendar Team. Receipt # 219830. , RECEIVED. Service date 03/31/2014 by US mail.[1190824] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/31/2014 04:24 PM]
March 27, 2014 Filing 315 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[1188763] [12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/27/2014 04:56 PM]
March 21, 2014 Filing 311 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from FRESHFIELDS ET AL with fee, RECEIVED.[1184255] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/21/2014 01:56 PM]
March 13, 2014 Filing 307 LETTER, dated 03/12/2014, on behalf of Carmen M. Cruz from Bergher Singerman LLP requesting CD of the Oral Argument. Fee Paid. Forwarded to Calendar Team. Receipt # 219763. , RECEIVED. Service date 03/13/2014 by FEDERAL EXPRESS. [1177601] [12-2497, 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/13/2014 02:43 PM]
March 11, 2014 Filing 306 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from BINGHAM with fee, RECEIVED.[1175718] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/11/2014 04:04 PM]
March 11, 2014 Filing 304 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee from LOEB & LOEB RECEIVED.[1175690] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/11/2014 03:53 PM]
March 10, 2014 Filing 303 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD From SCHULTE ROTH ZABEL with fee, RECEIVED.[1174617] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/10/2014 05:34 PM]
March 7, 2014 Filing 300 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD From MILBANK TWEED Et al. with fee, RECEIVED.[1172971] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/07/2014 10:52 AM]
March 7, 2014 Filing 299 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD From ANDREW MAYO with fee, RECEIVED.[1172952] [12-2497, 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/07/2014 10:41 AM]
March 7, 2014 Filing 298 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from DUANE MORRIS with fee, RECEIVED.[1172943] [12-2497, 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/07/2014 10:36 AM]
March 5, 2014 Filing 297 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD with fee from DAVIS POLK, RECEIVED.[1171609] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/05/2014 06:32 PM]
March 5, 2014 Filing 296 LETTER, dated 03/05/2014, on behalf of Bill Sweeney from CKM Legal requesting CD of the Oral Argument. Fee Paid. Forwarded to Calendar Team. Receipt # 219723. RECEIVED. Service date 03/05/2014 by hand delivery.[1171332] [12-2500, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/05/2014 02:23 PM]
March 5, 2014 Filing 295 CASE, before BDP, GEL, CFD, C.JJ. , HEARD.[1170995] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/05/2014 11:31 AM]
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER, dated 02/24/2014, authorizing court reporter to bring a laptop to the Courtroom, FILED.[1163253] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 02/24/2014 11:12 AM]
February 6, 2014 Filing 284 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1151640] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 02/06/2014 02:55 PM]
January 31, 2014 Filing 282 CURED DEFECTIVE Amicus Brief, [ # 1147177-2 ], on behalf of Amicus Financial Institution Defendants in 12-3422, FILED.[1147531] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/31/2014 04:37 PM]
January 30, 2014 Filing 281 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief of Amici Curiae , [ # 1145387-2 ], on behalf of Financial Institution, FILED.[1145539] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/30/2014 09:14 AM]
January 29, 2014 Filing 280 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 1070220-2 ] in 12-2557, FILED. [1144502][280] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/29/2014 10:43 AM]
January 29, 2014 Filing 279 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 119 ] filed by Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2557, FILED. [1144485][279] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/29/2014 10:32 AM]
January 16, 2014 Filing 278 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 03/05/2014, B Panel, SET.[1135711] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 01/16/2014 12:06 PM]
December 18, 2013 Filing 277 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 03/03/2014, B, PROPOSED.[1118330] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/18/2013 04:36 PM]
December 12, 2013 Filing 276 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Shaya M. Berger, Esq. for Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 12/12/2013 by CM/ECF. [1113441] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/12/2013 01:11 PM]
November 22, 2013 Filing 273 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Reply Brief of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, FILED. Service date 11/22/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[1099365] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 11/22/2013 11:53 AM]
November 22, 2013 Filing 272 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, FILED. Service date 11/22/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF. [1099359] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 11/22/2013 11:49 AM]
November 22, 2013 Filing 271 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 11/22/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail. [1099358] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 11/22/2013 11:44 AM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 268 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 1070220-2 ] in 12-2557, FILED. [1081554][268] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 11/01/2013 11:37 AM]
October 28, 2013 Filing 263 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Letter from Richard Levy, Jr. Concerning Filing of Compendium of FRAP 26.1 Disclosure Statements (ECF No. 321), and Compendium of Defendants-Appellees Corporate Disclosure Statements Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 26.1 (ECF Nos. 322-324), on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/28/2013 by CM/ECF, email.[1077405] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/28/2013 06:38 PM]
October 25, 2013 Filing 262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Letter dated Oct. 25, 2013 (ECF No. 317), and Corrected Joint Brief of Customer Appellees (ECF No. 318), on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/25/2013 by email.[1076047] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/25/2013 05:34 PM]
October 25, 2013 Filing 261 CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/25/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party. [1075412] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/25/2013 11:43 AM]
October 24, 2013 Filing 260 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file document [ # 230 ] filed by Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants, by RCW, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1074341][260] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/24/2013 11:59 AM]
October 23, 2013 Filing 256 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, ADDENDUM, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, [ # 218 ], [ # 219 ], on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman and Steven Goldman in 12-2616, FILED.[1073077] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/23/2013 10:55 AM]
October 22, 2013 Filing 253 NEW PARTY, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-2497, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-2500, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-2557, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-2616, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-3422, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-3440, Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-3582 and Movant Financial Institution Defendants in 12-3585, ADDED.[1072206] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/22/2013 02:24 PM]
October 21, 2013 Filing 250 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Richard Levy, Jr. for Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [1070994] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/21/2013 01:36 PM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 249 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Financial Institution Defendants, FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1070177] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/18/2013 05:36 PM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 248 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Peter Gregory Schwed, Esq. for Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, MBE General LLC, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Mark B. Evenstad, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Sew General, LLC, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Serene Warren, Christopher Warren, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC,, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, Alan S. Gordon, C. Ray Johnson, Stacy L. Koff, David I. Koff, The Koff Living Trust, Howard M. Koff, Marcia Koff, Leslie Aufzein Levine, Lisa Aufzien, Norman K. Aufzien, Meredith Aufzien Bauer and Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, Attorney Peter Gregory Schwed, Esq. for Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, MBE General LLC, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Mark B. Evenstad, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Sew General, LLC, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Serene Warren, Christopher Warren, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC,, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, Alan S. Gordon, C. Ray Johnson, Stacy L. Koff, David I. Koff, Howard M. Koff, Marcia Koff, Leslie Aufzein Levine, Lisa Aufzien, Norman K. Aufzien, Meredith Aufzien Bauer and Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1070026] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/18/2013 04:22 PM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 247 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for (ECF No. 287) Motion for Leave to File Corrected Schedule of Appellees Joining the Joint Brief of Customer Appellees, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[1069814] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/18/2013 03:17 PM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 245 ATTORNEY, Alan E Schoenfeld for Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, in case 12-2500 , [ # 226 ], ADDED.[1069636] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/18/2013 01:45 PM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 244 ATTORNEY, Danielle M. Spinelli for Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, in case 12-2557 , [ # 225 ], ADDED.[1069629] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/18/2013 01:40 PM]
October 18, 2013 Filing 243 NEW PARTY, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-2497, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-2500, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-2557, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-2616, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-3422, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-3440, Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-3582 and Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in 12-3585, ADDED.[1069609] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/18/2013 01:18 PM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 236 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, ADDENDUM, [ # 218 ], [ # 219 ], on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman and Steven Goldman, and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED.[1068868] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/17/2013 05:56 PM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 233 CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [ # 223 ], on behalf of Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, PSAssociates, Joan Roman and Robert Roman in 12-2557, Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, PSAssociates, Joan Roman, Robert Roman and SPAssociates in 12-2616, FILED.[1068854] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/17/2013 05:31 PM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 230 MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/17/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF. [1068596] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/17/2013 03:41 PM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 229 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Josephine Wang, Esq. for Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, FILED. Service date 10/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [1068481] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/17/2013 03:15 PM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 228 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Helen Davis Chaitman, Esq. for Appellee James Greiff, David Abel, Joan Roman, Robert Roman, PSAssociates and SPAssociates in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [1068404] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/17/2013 02:47 PM]
October 17, 2013 Filing 227 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. David J. Sheehan, Esq. for Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 10/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [1068289] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/17/2013 01:21 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 226 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, FILED. Service date 10/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1067589] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/16/2013 06:33 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 225 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, FILED. Service date 10/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1067588] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/16/2013 06:31 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 224 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, FILED. Service date 10/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1067587] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/16/2013 06:30 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 223 CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, PSAssociates, Joan Roman, Robert Roman and SPAssociates in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1066725] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/16/2013 11:21 AM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 222 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, PSAssociates, Joan Roman, Robert Roman and SPAssociates in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [1066188] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/15/2013 04:55 PM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 220 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Brief for Defendant-Appellee PerCareRx, on behalf of Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[1065344] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/15/2013 11:24 AM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 219 ADDENDUM, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail.[1065260] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/15/2013 10:57 AM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 218 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail. [1065253] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/15/2013 10:55 AM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 217 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, and ADDENDUM, [211], [213], on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman and Steven Goldman in 12-2557, FILED.[1065130] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/15/2013 10:00 AM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 216 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, BRIEF, [210], on behalf of Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, Joan Roman, Robert Roman and SPAssociates in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED.[1065036] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/15/2013 09:34 AM]
October 14, 2013 Filing 214 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Joint Brief of Customer Appellees (ECF No. 265) and Addendum to Joint Brief of Customer Appellees (ECF No. 267), on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by email.[1064885] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/14/2013 04:38 PM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 213 ADDENDUM, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF.[1064724] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/11/2013 04:39 PM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 212 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien, Lisa Aufzien, Norman K. Aufzien, Meredith Aufzien Bauer, Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Alan S. Gordon, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, C. Ray Johnson, Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, David I. Koff, Howard M. Koff, Marcia Koff, Stacy L. Koff, Leslie Aufzein Levine, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, The Koff Living Trust, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC,, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien, Lisa Aufzien, Norman K. Aufzien, Meredith Aufzien Bauer, Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Alan S. Gordon, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, C. Ray Johnson, Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, David I. Koff, Howard M. Koff, Marcia Koff, Stacy L. Koff, Leslie Aufzein Levine, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC,, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail. [1064720] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/11/2013 04:37 PM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 211 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF. [1064706] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/11/2013 04:28 PM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 210 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee David Abel, James Greiff, PSAssociates, Joan Roman, Robert Roman and SPAssociates in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF. [1064266] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/11/2013 12:56 PM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 209 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF. [1064117] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/11/2013 11:41 AM]
October 4, 2013 Filing 206 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file a separate addendum to appellees' brief [ # 167 ] filed by Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants, by Debra Ann Livingston, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1058621][206] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/04/2013 11:55 AM]
October 4, 2013 Filing 204 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 10/04/2013 by CM/ECF.[1058537] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/04/2013 11:11 AM]
October 4, 2013 Filing 203 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 10/04/2013 by CM/ECF.[1058534] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/04/2013 11:08 AM]
October 2, 2013 Filing 202 NEW PARTY, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2497, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2500, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2557, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-2616, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-3422, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-3440, Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-3582 and Appellee PetCareRx, Inc. in 12-3585, ADDED.[1057056] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/02/2013 05:34 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 199 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien, Lisa Aufzien, Norman K. Aufzien, Meredith Aufzien Bauer, Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Alan S. Gordon, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, C. Ray Johnson, Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, David I. Koff, Howard M. Koff, Marcia Koff, Stacy L. Koff, Leslie Aufzein Levine, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, The Koff Living Trust, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC,, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien, Lisa Aufzien, Norman K. Aufzien, Meredith Aufzien Bauer, Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Alan S. Gordon, Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, C. Ray Johnson, Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust, David I. Koff, Howard M. Koff, Marcia Koff, Stacy L. Koff, Leslie Aufzein Levine, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC,, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 10/01/2013 by CM/ECF.[1055481] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 03:04 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 198 NEW PARTY, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-2497, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-2500, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-2557, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-2616, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-3422, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-3440, Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-3582 and Appellee Jonathan M. Aufzien in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055459] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:49 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 197 NEW PARTY, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-2497, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-2500, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-2557, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-2616, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-3422, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-3440, Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-3582 and Appellee Meredith Aufzien Bauer in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055455] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:48 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 196 NEW PARTY, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-2497, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-2500, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-2557, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-2616, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-3422, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-3440, Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-3582 and Appellee Norman K. Aufzien in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055451] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:46 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 195 NEW PARTY, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-2497, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-2500, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-2557, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-2616, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-3422, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-3440, Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-3582 and Appellee Lisa Aufzien in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055447] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:44 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 194 NEW PARTY, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-2497, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-2500, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-2557, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-2616, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-3422, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-3440, Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-3582 and Appellee Leslie Aufzein Levine in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055444] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:42 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 193 NEW PARTY, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-2497, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-2500, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-2557, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-2616, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-3422, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-3440, Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-3582 and Appellee Marcia Koff in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055442] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:41 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 192 NEW PARTY, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-2497, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-2500, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-2557, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-2616, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-3422, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-3440, Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-3582 and Appellee Howard M. Koff in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055439] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:38 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 191 NEW PARTY, Appellee The Koff Living Trust in 12-2497, Appellee The Koff Living Trust in 12-2500, Appellee The Koff Living Trust in 12-2557, Appellee The Koff Living Trust in 12-3422, Appellee The Koff Living Trust in 12-3440, Appellee The Koff Living Trust in 12-3582 and Appellee The Koff Living Trust in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055434] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:36 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 190 NEW PARTY, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-2497, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-2500, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-2557, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-2616, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-3422, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-3440, Appellee David I. Koff in 12-3582 and Appellee David I. Koff in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055431] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:35 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 189 NEW PARTY, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-2497, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-2500, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-2557, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-2616, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-3422, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-3440, Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-3582 and Appellee Stacy L. Koff in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055429] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:32 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 188 NEW PARTY, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-2497, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-2500, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-2557, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-2616, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-3422, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-3440, Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-3582 and Appellee C. Ray Johnson in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055423] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:31 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 187 NEW PARTY, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-2497, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-2500, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-2557, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-2616, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-3422, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-3440, Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-3582 and Appellee Alan S. Gordon in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055417] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:28 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 186 NEW PARTY, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-2497, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-2500, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-2557, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-2616, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-3422, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-3440, Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-3582 and Appellee The David I. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055414] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:24 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 185 NEW PARTY, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-2497, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-2500, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-2557, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-2616, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-3422, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-3440, Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-3582 and Appellee The Stacy L. Koff Investment Trust, a member of Gorvis, LLC, in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055410] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:23 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 184 NEW PARTY, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-2497, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-2500, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-2557, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-2616, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-3422, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-3440, Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-3582 and Appellee Gorvis LLC, a California Limited Liability Company in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055408] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:20 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 183 NEW PARTY, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-2497, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-2500, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-2557, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-2616, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-3422, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-3440, Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-3582 and Appellee Christopher Warren in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055404] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:18 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 182 NEW PARTY, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-2497, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-2500, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-2557, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-2616, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-3422, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-3440, Appellee Serene Warren in 12-3582 and Appellee Serene Warren in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055399] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:16 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 181 NEW PARTY, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-2497, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-2500, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-2557, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-2616, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-3422, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-3440, Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-3582 and Appellee Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055392] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:12 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 180 NEW PARTY, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2497, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2500, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2557, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2616, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3422, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3440, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3582 and Appellee Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055383] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:09 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 179 NEW PARTY, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-2497, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-2500, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-2557, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-2616, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-3422, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-3440, Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-3582 and Appellee Sew General, LLC in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055375] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:04 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 178 NEW PARTY, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2497, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2500, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2557, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2616, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3422, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3440, Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3582 and Appellee Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055360] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 02:00 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 177 NEW PARTY, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-2497, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-2500, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-2557, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-2616, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-3422, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-3440, Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-3582 and Appellee Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055344] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:54 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 176 NEW PARTY, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-2497, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-2500, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-2557, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-2616, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-3422, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-3440, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-3582 and Appellee Mark B. Evenstad in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055341] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:52 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 175 NEW PARTY, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-2497, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-2500, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-2557, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-2616, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-3422, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-3440, Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-3582 and Appellee Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003 in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055328] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:47 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 174 NEW PARTY, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-2497, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-2500, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-2557, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-2616, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-3422, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-3440, Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-3582 and Appellee MBE General LLC in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055323] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:43 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 173 NEW PARTY, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2497, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2500, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2557, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-2616, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3422, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3440, Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3582 and Appellee MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055303] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:27 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 172 NEW PARTY, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-2497, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-2500, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-2557, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-2616, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-3422, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-3440, Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-3582 and Appellee Grace B. Evenstad in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055287] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:08 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 171 NEW PARTY, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-2497, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-2500, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-2557, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-2616, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-3422, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-3440, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-3582 and Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055276] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 01:01 PM]
October 1, 2013 Filing 170 NEW PARTY, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2497, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2500, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2557, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-2616, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3422, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3440, Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3582 and Appellee Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 12-3585, ADDED.[1055268] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 10/01/2013 12:52 PM]
September 28, 2013 Filing 167 MOTION, to file supplemental documents, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 09/28/2013 by CM/ECF, email, hand delivery. [1053502] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/28/2013 09:45 AM]
September 24, 2013 Filing 163 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for FRAP 26.1 disclosure form, notice and instructions, and FRAP 26.1 order, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 09/23/2013 by US mail, email.[1049240] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/24/2013 09:57 AM]
September 17, 2013 Filing 162 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for approval of procedures to facilitate defendants-appellees' compliance with the corporate disclosure requirements prescribed in FRAP 26.1. The compendium must be filed no later than October 28, 2013 [ # 157 ] filed by Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants, by Jon O. Newman, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1043781][162] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 09/17/2013 by TW] [Entered: 09/17/2013 03:51 PM]
September 17, 2013 Filing 160 NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[1043409] [12-2497, 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/17/2013 01:17 PM]
August 29, 2013 Filing 157 MOTION, for approval of procedures to facilitate defendants-appellees' compliance with the corporate disclosure requirements prescribed in FRAP 26.1, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, FILED. Service date 08/29/2013 by US mail, email. [1029823] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 09/18/2013 by TW] [Entered: 08/29/2013 05:40 PM]
August 9, 2013 Filing 156 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[1012672] [12-2497, 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/09/2013 11:07 AM]
August 9, 2013 Filing 154 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[1012651] [12-2500, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/09/2013 11:02 AM]
August 9, 2013 Filing 152 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[1012577] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/09/2013 10:37 AM]
August 9, 2013 Filing 150 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[1012539] [12-2616, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/09/2013 10:17 AM]
August 9, 2013 Filing 148 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[1012532] [12-3422, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/09/2013 10:14 AM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 145 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file opposition and reply briefs to 10/11/2013 and 11/22/2013 [ # 137 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard, Irving H. Picard, by RKW, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1005921][145] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 08/02/2013 09:38 AM]
July 25, 2013 Filing 143 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief by Appellants and Liaison Committee Appellees for leave to file oversized anwering briefs of up to 16,800 words, and reply briefs of up to 8,400 words, [ # 137 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard, by DAL, C.JJ., FILED. [1000072][143] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 07/25/2013 03:56 PM]
July 23, 2013 Filing 137 MOTION, to extend time, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, Irving H. Picard in 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 07/23/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail. [997939] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 07/23/2013 07:13 PM]
July 12, 2013 Filing 136 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[988795] [12-2497, 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 07/12/2013 03:49 PM]
July 12, 2013 Filing 134 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[987775] [12-3582, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3585] [Entered: 07/12/2013 10:05 AM]
July 12, 2013 Filing 132 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[987610] [12-3440, 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 07/12/2013 08:59 AM]
May 23, 2013 Filing 128 ATTORNEY, Gabrielle Pretto for Bonnie J. Kansler, in case 12-2616 Gabrielle Pretto for Bonnie J. Kansler, in case 12-2557 , [ # 124 ], ADDED.[946595] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/23/2013 03:04 PM]
May 23, 2013 Filing 127 ATTORNEY, Brian Neville for Bonnie J. Kansler, in case 12-2616 Brian Neville for Other Listed Defendants Bonnie J. Kansler, in case 12-2557 , [ # 123 ], ADDED.[946590] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/23/2013 02:55 PM]
May 23, 2013 Filing 126 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 119 ], [116] filed by Amicus Curiae National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. [946387][126] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/23/2013 11:54 AM]
May 23, 2013 Filing 124 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bonnie J. Kansler in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 05/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [946246] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/23/2013 10:46 AM]
May 23, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bonnie J. Kansler in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 05/23/2013 by CM/ECF. [946243] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/23/2013 10:45 AM]
May 23, 2013 Filing 120 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: Motion to file amicus brief, [ # 118 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2497, FILED.[946005] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/23/2013 09:06 AM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 119 MOTION, to file amicus curiae brief, on behalf of Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2557, Amicus Curiae National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/22/2013 by email, CM/ECF. [945845] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/22/2013 04:59 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 118 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to file amicus curiae , [116], on behalf of Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2616, FILED.[945578] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/22/2013 03:28 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 117 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief, [116], on behalf of Amicus Curiae National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2557, FILED.[945514] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/22/2013 03:11 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 116 MOTION, to file amicus curiae brief, on behalf of Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/22/2013 by email, CM/ECF. [945490] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD] [Entered: 05/22/2013 03:01 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 115 NEW PARTY, Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees in 12-2557, ADDED.[945415] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD] [Entered: 05/22/2013 02:34 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees , FILED. Service date 05/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [945399] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD] [Entered: 05/22/2013 02:20 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees , FILED. Service date 05/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [945395] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD] [Entered: 05/22/2013 02:18 PM]
May 22, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Association of Banruptcy Trustees , FILED. Service date 05/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [945390] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 05/22/2013 by WD] [Entered: 05/22/2013 02:17 PM]
May 20, 2013 Filing 111 ATTORNEY, Thomas Berndt for Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al. Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al. Fiterman Investment Fund, et al., in case 12-2616 Thomas Berndt for Miles &Shirley Fiterman Charitable Foundation, et al. Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al. Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al. Fiterman Investment Fund, et al. Metro Motor Imports, Inc., et al, in case 12-2557 , [ # 108 ], ADDED.[942150] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/20/2013 10:12 AM]
May 17, 2013 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Fiterman Investment Fund, et al., Hess Kline Rev. Trust, et al., Metro Motor Imports, Inc., et al, Miles &Shirley Fiterman Charitable Foundation, et al. and Miles Q. Fiterman Revocable Trust, et al. in 12-2557, FILED. Service date 05/07/2013 by CM/ECF. [941238] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/17/2013 01:47 PM]
May 17, 2013 Filing 107 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616 Brief due date as 08/14/2013, FILED.[941193] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/17/2013 01:22 PM]
May 16, 2013 Filing 102 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Kara Fishbein Goldman, Steven Goldman and Other Listed Defendants in 12-2557, 12-2616, informing Court of proposed due date 08/14/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 05/16/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF.[939685] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/16/2013 12:17 PM]
May 15, 2013 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Brief of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, FILED. Service date 05/15/2013 by email.[938651] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/15/2013 03:16 PM]
May 15, 2013 Filing 97 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/15/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[938477] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/15/2013 01:29 PM]
May 15, 2013 Filing 95 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-2557, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, FILED. Service date 05/15/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail.[937907] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/15/2013 10:07 AM]
May 15, 2013 Filing 94 ATTORNEY, Laura Kristine Clinton for Other Listed Defendants-Appellees, in case 12-2557, ADDED.[937728] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 05/15/2013 by WD] [Entered: 05/15/2013 09:06 AM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 93 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[937574] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 05:57 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 92 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 21 of 21, (pp. 5906-6109), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[937547] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 05:20 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 91 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 20 of 21, (pp. 5701-5905), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[937533] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 05:13 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 90 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 19 of 21, (pp. 5401-5700), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[937516] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 05:05 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 89 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 18 of 21, (pp. 5101-5400), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[937488] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 04:53 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 88 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 17 of 21, (pp. 4801-5100), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF.[937468] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 04:47 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 87 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 16 of 21, (pp. 4501-4800), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF.[937346] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 04:17 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 86 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 15 of 21, (pp. 4201-4500), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[937327] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 04:11 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 85 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 14 of 21, (pp. 3901-4200), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF, email.[937311] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 04:06 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 84 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 13 of 21, (pp. 3601-3900), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, CM/ECF, US mail.[937295] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 04:01 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 83 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 12 of 21, (pp. 3301-3600), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[937283] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:58 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 82 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 11 of 21, (pp. 3001-3300), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[937278] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:56 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 81 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 10 of 21, (pp. 2701-3000), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, CM/ECF, US mail.[937257] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:50 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 80 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 9 of 21, (pp. 2401-2700), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, US mail, email.[937234] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:45 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 79 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 8 of 21, (pp. 2101-2400), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, US mail, CM/ECF.[937212] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:39 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 78 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 7 of 21, (pp. 1801-2100), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF, email.[937186] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:33 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 77 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 21, (pp. 1501-1800), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[937159] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:26 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 76 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 21, (pp. 1201-1500), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[937133] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:18 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 75 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 21, (pp. 901-1200), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, CM/ECF, US mail.[937120] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:11 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 74 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 21, (pp. 601-900), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by CM/ECF, email, US mail.[937118] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:09 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 73 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 21, (pp. 301-600), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by email, CM/ECF, US mail.[937110] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:07 PM]
May 14, 2013 Filing 72 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 21, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/14/2013 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[937101] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/14/2013 03:04 PM]
May 10, 2013 Filing 71 ATTORNEY, Matthew B. Lunn for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-2557, [ # 70 ], ADDED.[934463] [12-2557] [Entered: 05/10/2013 04:09 PM]
May 10, 2013 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2497, Irving H. Picard in 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 05/10/2013 by CM/ECF. [934229] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/10/2013 03:02 PM]
May 7, 2013 Filing 69 ATTORNEY, Howard L. Simon for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-2557, [ # 930333-2 ], ADDED.[930357] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/07/2013 04:20 PM]
May 3, 2013 Filing 68 LETTER, dated 05/03/2013, on behalf of UniCredit Bank Austria AG and UniCredit S.p.A., Pioneer Alternative Investment Managment Ltd., Pioneer Global Asset Managment S.p.A. in 12-3440, RECEIVED. Service date 05/03/2013 by CM/ECF.[927666] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 05/03/2013 05:06 PM]
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER, dated 04/16/2013, By order dated 03/04/2013 the Court denied the Liaison Committe's request to set a date for Appellant to file his brief, with leave to renew if the district court did not file by 03/25/2013 the opinion identified in the Court's 09/06/2012 order granting an extension of time to file the brief. The Appellees' Liaison Committe renewed request by letter filed 03/25/2013. Appellant opposed the request. The district court filed the pertinent opinion on 04/15/2013. The request is denied as moot., FILED.[909643] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585]--[Edited 04/16/2013 by WD] [Entered: 04/16/2013 04:57 PM]
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER, dated 03/04/2012, clarifying prior order allowing Appellant to calculate the time to file brief from the issuance of Judge Rakoff's opinion, FILED.[862831] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 03/04/2013 09:51 AM]
February 22, 2013 Filing 61 LETTER, dated 02/22/2013, on behalf of members of the Defendants-Appellees Liaison Committee, RECEIVED. Service date 02/22/2013 by CM/ECF.[853299] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 02/22/2013 09:32 AM]
December 20, 2012 Filing 60 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 762747-2 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-2557, 12-2616, granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 762734-2 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard, Irving H. Picard in 12-2497, 12-2500, granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 59 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. [800043][60] [12-2557, 12-2497, 12-2500, 12-2616, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 12/20/2012 05:19 PM]
November 7, 2012 Filing 59 MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585, FILED. Service date 11/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [762765] [12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 11/07/2012 04:57 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 57 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-3585 Brief due date as 11/26/2012;. Joint Appendix due date as 11/26/2012, FILED.[724825] [12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/19/2012 04:39 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 56 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Thomas H. Lee, FILED. Service date 09/19/2012 by CM/ECF.[724433] [12-3440] [Entered: 09/19/2012 01:41 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 55 ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3585 Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3582 Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3422 Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3440 , [ # 724139-2 ], ADDED.[724411] [12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/19/2012 01:30 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 54 ATTORNEY, Tatiana Markel for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3585 Tatiana Markel for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3582 Tatiana Markel for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3422 Tatiana Markel for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3440 , [ # 724164-2 ], ADDED.[724399] [12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/19/2012 01:26 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 53 ATTORNEY, David J. Sheehan for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3585 David J. Sheehan for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3582 David J. Sheehan for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3422 David J. Sheehan for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3440 , [ # 724220-2 ], ADDED.[724396] [12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/19/2012 01:24 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 09/19/2012 by CM/ECF. [724228] [12-3440] [Entered: 09/19/2012 12:10 PM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 09/19/2012 by CM/ECF. [724177] [12-3440] [Entered: 09/19/2012 11:51 AM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 09/19/2012 by CM/ECF. [724144] [12-3440] [Entered: 09/19/2012 11:42 AM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 48 ATTORNEY, Carrie A Longstaff for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3585 Carrie A Longstaff for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3582 Carrie A Longstaff for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3422 Carrie A Longstaff for Irving H. Picard, in case 12-3440 , [ # 723971-2 ], ADDED.[724030] [12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/19/2012 10:53 AM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 09/19/2012 by CM/ECF. [724019] [12-3440] [Entered: 09/19/2012 10:49 AM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 46 AMENDED CAPTION PAGE, SENT.[723946] [12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/19/2012 10:23 AM]
September 19, 2012 Filing 43 NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[723735] [12-3582, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/19/2012 08:49 AM]
September 18, 2012 Filing 41 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-3585, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, informing Court of proposed due date 11/26/2012, RECEIVED. Service date 09/18/2012 by email, CM/ECF.[723127] [12-3585, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582] [Entered: 09/18/2012 02:06 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 40 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-3440 Brief due date as 11/26/2012;. Joint Appendix due date as 11/26/2012, FILED.[720985] [12-3422, 12-3440] [Entered: 09/14/2012 04:50 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 39 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-3440 Brief due date as 11/26/2012;. Joint Appendix due date as 11/26/2012, FILED.[720961] [12-3422, 12-3440] [Entered: 09/14/2012 04:43 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 37 ATTORNEY, Josephine Wang for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, in case 12-3440 Josephine Wang for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, in case 12-3422 , [ # 36 ], ADDED.[720425] [12-3422, 12-3440] [Entered: 09/14/2012 01:22 PM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-3585, FILED. Service date 09/14/2012 by CM/ECF. [720011] [12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582, 12-3585] [Entered: 09/14/2012 10:24 AM]
September 14, 2012 Filing 35 NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[719747] [12-3585, 12-3422, 12-3440, 12-3582] [Entered: 09/14/2012 08:47 AM]
September 13, 2012 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 09/13/2012 by CM/ECF.[719670] [12-3440] [Entered: 09/13/2012 05:46 PM]
September 13, 2012 Filing 32 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/27/2012 by email.[719520] [12-3440] [Entered: 09/13/2012 04:07 PM]
September 13, 2012 Filing 31 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/27/2012 by email.[719511] [12-3440] [Entered: 09/13/2012 04:05 PM]
September 12, 2012 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Josephine Wang, [ # 22 ], in place of attorney Kevin H. Bell, SUBSTITUTED.[717844] [12-3422, 12-3440] [Entered: 09/12/2012 02:38 PM]
September 12, 2012 Filing 27 NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[717808] [12-3422, 12-3440] [Entered: 09/12/2012 02:23 PM]
September 11, 2012 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Blue Star Investors, LLC, FILED. Service date 09/11/2012 by CM/ECF.[716038] [12-3440] [Entered: 09/11/2012 11:07 AM]
September 10, 2012 Filing 24 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, informing Court of proposed due date 11/26/2012, RECEIVED. Service date 09/10/2012 by CM/ECF.[715422] [12-3440] [Entered: 09/10/2012 04:22 PM]
September 10, 2012 Filing 23 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-3422, 12-3440, informing Court of proposed due date 11/26/2012, RECEIVED. Service date 09/10/2012 by email, CM/ECF.[715372] [12-3422, 12-3440] [Entered: 09/10/2012 04:03 PM]
September 10, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 12-3440, FILED. Service date 09/10/2012 by CM/ECF. [715346] [12-3422, 12-3440] [Entered: 09/10/2012 03:57 PM]
September 6, 2012 Filing 12 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/27/2012 by email.[711790] [12-3440] [Entered: 09/06/2012 09:22 AM]
September 6, 2012 Filing 11 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/27/2012 by email.[711788] [12-3440] [Entered: 09/06/2012 09:20 AM]
August 27, 2012 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[711338] [12-3440, 12-3422] [Entered: 09/05/2012 02:39 PM]
August 27, 2012 Filing 7 DISTRICT COURT FINAL JUDGMENT, dated 07/27/2012, RECEIVED.[711336] [12-3440, 12-3422] [Entered: 09/05/2012 02:39 PM]
August 27, 2012 Filing 6 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-3422, district court receipt # 0208-7728283, FILED.[711329] [12-3440, 12-3422] [Entered: 09/05/2012 02:37 PM]
August 27, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 12-3422, FILED. [711279] [12-3440, 12-3422] [Entered: 09/05/2012 02:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bernard L. Madoff Investment S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil N. Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UniCredit SPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audax Group LP, Audax Management Co. LLC, 101 Huntington Holdings LLC, Marc B. Wolpow, Geoffrey S. Rehnert, Richard T. Joseph; Carol Nelson; Gordon Associates, Bruce Gordon; Robert M. Siff; Robert Ros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingate Euro Fund, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jelris & Associates, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citrus Investment Holdings Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascot Partners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stepheny B. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Metzenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Gaines In Her Fiduciary Capacity As Trustee Of The Jay Gaines & Co. Profit Sharing Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Blumenfeld, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fullerton Capital PTE Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanchefleur Macher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce C. Auerbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOS BFS FAMILY PARTNERSHIP II, L.P., DONALD AND BETTE STEIN FAMILY TRUST, DONALD O. STEIN, WILLIAM STEIN, JAMIE STEIN WALKER, and BARBARA STEIN JAFFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jeanne T. Spring Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peri Arenas, in 12-cv-2875
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesuji Partners, LLC, in 12-cv-2875
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Trust, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashby Investment Services Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles &Shirley Fiterman Charitable Foundation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Pearman, as trustee for the Concorde 1987 Trust DTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Glantz-Ostrin Trust II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norton S. Rosensweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hausner Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Spring Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLEN V. GREENSPAN, as trustee of the Trust (A. Anagnos et al., trustes)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhancement Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIlliam Rosenwald Family Fund, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRAG, LLC, in 12-cv-2876
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Greisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Blumenfeld Gerald Y Mordfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D. Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Institution Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust f/b/o Brad Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSI AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&I Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah R. Varet, individually and as trustee and as beneficiary of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO Sarah R. Varet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRS Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust f/b/o David Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth R. Varet, individually, and as custodian for Joseph R. Varet, as custodian and/or trustee of the Elizabeth R. Varet Money Purchase Pension Plan, as grantor of the 2004 V Trust, as trustee and beneficiary of the Apollo Trust for Elizabeth R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Joint Tenancy of Robert Pinchou and Fabian Guenzburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lustig Family 1990 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Ledley, as trustee of Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman, as trustee of the Trust UAD FBO Jonathan R. Sigelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thema Fund Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Gilbert M. Kotzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold J. Hein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roberth Auerbach Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Elena Jalon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Littaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luc D. Estenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Migs Woodside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thema International Fund PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bull Market Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice M. Calesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EJS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Global Asset Management S.p.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Joint Tenancy of Phyllis Guenzburger and Fabian Guenzburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingate Global Fund, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Auerback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Edward R. Glantz Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie S. Mack, c/o Cooley LLP 1114 Avenue of the Americas NY, NY 10036 212-479-6000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUDSON CHARITABLE FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield International Managers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banca Carige S.P.A., in 12-cv-02408
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMGF LTD. Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Sea Holdings L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randi C. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financiere Agache
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Global Strategy Fund Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Toub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Varet, individually and as beneficial owner of one or more IRAs, as custodian for David R. Varet and Sara R. Varet, as trustee of the Michael A. Varet Trust UAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blumco Setauket, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ostrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDG Larkfield Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Global Strategy Fund, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Lock Nosworthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francine Fishman, as Limited Partners of RMGF Ltd. Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley J. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Jesse L. Sigelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen J. Wertheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Peninsula Trustees Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Nystrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calesa Associates L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust U/W/O David L. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth R. Varet Money Purchase Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visiting Nurse Service of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Investment Fund Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Girard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The S. James Coppersmith Charitable Remainder Unitrust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Stefanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mistral (SPC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd., McKool Smith 1 Bryant Park 47th Floor New York, NY 10036 212-402-9400
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freda B. Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Edward and Susan Blumenfeld Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.H. Book, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Bosarge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela W. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDG DWD Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan R. Tessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch, FKA Blubank Ltd Panama Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice G. Coppersmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierre Delandmeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Greenwich Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kostin Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macher Family Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra E. Hausner Cave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Blumenfeld Charitable Lead Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Macher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell J. DeLucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Greenwich (UK) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd., FKA Fortis Prime Fund Solutions Bank (Ireland) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freda Epstein Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Management Luxembourg SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zia Inayat Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.I. Kotzen Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Prela Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin L. Olshan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan P. Rosensweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Marcia Kotzen 2002 Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNS Global Custody B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 125 Bethpage Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Hausner Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hermes International Fund Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Bank (Suisse) SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trust FBO Nicole Girard U/A/D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Rosensweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hinte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pergament Equities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Yanowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin B. Nessel Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARC-BDG Setauket Enterprise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ivan Lustig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Varet, individually and as beneficiary and as trustee of the Issue Trust 5 UAD FBO Joseph R. Varet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Dickstein, in 12-cv-2875
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Goldberg Snyderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners Advisers S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merlin & Associates, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCC II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda F. Clarke, as trustee for the Concorde 1987 Trust DTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PICTET ET CIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred A. Daibes Madoff Securities Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHORAGE CHARITABLE FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Brad Blumenfeld Family Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Fishbein Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subsequent Transferee Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KBC Investments Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David I. Lustig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Spring McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B-4 Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABN AMRO Bank, N.V., The Royal Bank of Scotland N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Fisher, as Limited Partner of RMGF Ltd. Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise M. Angeja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Harvey Rubin Trust of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Kostin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALICE ROSENWALD FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 500 Bi-County Associates, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Nessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thema Wise Investments Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Land Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Kostin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 45 South Service Road, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Investors (Euro) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Yanowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gotham Plaza Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Motor Imports, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDG 125th Street, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Fisher, individually and as General Partner of RMGF Ltd. Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Ostrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNS Bank N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Glantz 1991 Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander G. Anagnos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur M. Siskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Thelma Glantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael N. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDG Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaGuardia Corporate Center Associates, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Elkin Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Management Cayman Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charitable Remainder Trust F/B/O Vivien Svigals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo Currencies S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Edward R. Glantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Siegal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ABSTRACTION FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taj Inayat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ostrin Family Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Frenchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust U/T/A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxrob, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Belfer, as Trustee of The Robert A. Belfer and Renee E. Belfer Family Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Anfang, in 12-cv-2875
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randi M. Calesa 1986 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Investment, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDG Kingsbridge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWD Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Varet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff E. Calesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Sylvia W. Lock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Blumenfeld, individually, and as Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl K. Tomchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice M. Calesa 1984 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton Kurzrok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie J. Kansler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double B Squared LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith G. Sisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth R. Varet IRA Rollover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santiago Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Madoff, Individually and in her capacity as Guardian for A.M. and E.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Blumenfeld Farmingdale Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDG Deer Park Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin B. Nessel 2006 Trust u/a/d
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gutmacher Enterprises, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Harvey Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tensyr Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remaining 546(e) Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia A. Delles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDG Lake Grove I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets