Anwar v. Fairfield Greenwich Limited
Plaintiff: Positano Investment Ltd., Arjan Mohandas Bhatia, Bharat Mohandas, Catalina Mejia, PFA Pension A/S, Harvest Dawn International Inc., El Prado Trading, Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, Bahia del Rio S.A., Nadav Zohar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Loana Ltd., Fairfield Sentry Ltd., Joaquina Teresa Barbacha Herrero, Blythel Associated Corp., Alicia Gaviria Rivera, Julia Anwar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated investors in the Greenwich Sentry, L.P. private investment limited partnership, Moises Lou Martinez, Tradwaves, Ltd., Wong Yuk Hing De Lou, Roberto Cioci, Maria Akriby Valladolid, Headway Investment Corp., Muniandy Nalaiah, Frank E. Pierce, Calwell Investment S.A., Vandna Patel, Eduardo Child Escobar, AXA Private Management, BPV Finance (International) Ltd., Neelam P. Daryani, Landville Capital Management S.A., Sandra Marchi Cioci, Josefina Santos Urzola, Vikas P. Daryani, Taurus the Fourth Ltd., Nikesh P. Daryani, Carmel Ventures Ltd., Wall Street Securities, S.A., Dilip Damodardas Raipancholia, Lila Neemberry, Parasram Daryani, Mandakini Gajaria, Blockbend Ltd., Centro Inspection Agency, Cesar Mejia, The Alpha and Omega Partnership, LP, Kishin Mohandas Bhatia, Jose Antonio Pujals, individually and in their representative capacities for all those similarly situated, Richmon Company Ltd., Moshe Podhorzer, Rajendrakumar Patel, Diversified Investments Associates Class A Units, 20/20 Investments, Inter-American Trust, Pasha S. Anwar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated investors in the Greenwich Sentry, L.P. private investment limited partnership, ABN AMRO LIFE S.A., Banco General, S.A., Kishu Nathurmal Uttamchandani, Enrique Santos, Eastfork Assets Ltd, Fundacion Virgilio Barco, Carlos Gauch, Aarvee Ltd., E. Thomas Dougherty Novella, Rajeshkumar Damodardas Raipancholia, Ulrich Blass, Jitendra Bhatia, Frank E. Pierce Ira, Stanchart Securities International, Inc., Kivory Corporation, Ricardo Lopez, Mailand Inevstment Inc., Suresh M. Bhatia, Bevington Management, Ltd., Zenn Assets Holding, Ltd., Kalandar International, Elvira 1950 Trust, Gopal Bhatia, The Knight Services Holdings Limited, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Ricardo Rodriguez Caso, Shimon Laor, Felipe J. Benavides, Enrique Santos Calderon, Jayshree Bhatia, Ronit Zohar, Chandrashekar Gupta, ABR Capital Fixed Option/Income Strategic Fund LP, Kishanchand Bhatia, Sand Overseas Limited, Jacqueline Urzola, David Hopkins, Bonaire Limited, Maridom Limited, a Foreign Corporation, Omawa Investment Corporation, Rosa Julieta A De Pujals, individually and in their representative capacities for all those similarly situated, Ashokkumar Damodardas Raipancholia, R. Wickneswari V. Ratnam, Prerna Vinod Uttamchandani, North Club, Incorporated, Baymall Investments Ltd, Deepa Gupta, Gerico Investments, Inc., David I. Ferber, Hedge Strategy Fund LLC, John Paul Dougherty, Peter A. & Rita M. Carfagna Irrevocable Charitable Remainder UniTrust, R.M. Rademaker, Traconcorp, Diamond Hills Inc., Carlos Mattos and Marrekesh Resources
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Petitioner: Irving H. Picard
Defendant / Appellee: Citco Canada Inc., Miguel Calvo, Citco Global Custody N.V., PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Julia Luongo, Standard Chartered Bank, Robert Blum, Fairfield Greenwich Group, Greenwich Sentry, L.P., Fairfield Greenwich Corp., David Horn, Jeffrey Tucker, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Harold Greisman, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Pricewaterhousecoopers International Limited, Samuel Perruchoud, Matthew C. Brown, EFG Capital International Corp., Corina Noel Piedrahita, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Mark Mckeefry, Pricewaterhousecoopers LLP Chartered Accountants, GlobeOp Financial Services LLC, Rodolfo Pages, CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, Carlos Gadala-Maria, Andrew Smith, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Lion Fairfield Capital Management Limited, Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, a Foreign entity, Charles Murphy, Philip Toub, Vianney D'hendecourt, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Robert Friedman, Raul Mas, Ian Pilgrim, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Standard Chartered PLC, Jacqueline Hararay, Andres Piedrahita, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, a Cayman Island company, Lourdes Barreneche, Jacqueline Harary, Citco Group Limited, Cornelis Boele, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, American Express Bank, Ltd., Fairfield Sentry Limited, Santiago Reyes, Richard Landsberger, Pricewaterhousecoopers Bermuda, David Lipton, Luisa Serena, John G. Dutkowski, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vigayvergia, Standard Chartered International (USA) Ltd., Brian Francouer, Gregory Bowes, Walter M. Noel, Jr. and Standard Chartered Private Bank, Foreign entity, and a private banking division of Standard Chartered Bank
Plaintiff / Appellee: Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, On behalf of Itself, Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School
Plaintiff / Appellant: Morning Mist Holdings Limited and Miguel Lomeli
Case Number: 13-1581
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2013 Filing 159 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1120195] [13-1581] [Entered: 12/20/2013 03:43 PM]
December 6, 2013 Filing 158 NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[1108553] [13-1581] [Entered: 12/06/2013 10:59 AM]
November 26, 2013 Filing 156 SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, AFFIRMED, by DJ, BDP, DC, FILED.[1101408] [13-1581] [Entered: 11/26/2013 09:57 AM]
November 22, 2013 Filing 154 CASE, before DJ, BDP, DC, C.JJ., HEARD.[1099433] [13-1581] [Entered: 11/22/2013 12:40 PM]
November 20, 2013 Filing 151 LETTER, regarding time allottment at oral argument, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, Philip Toub and Amit Vigayvergia, RECEIVED. Service date 11/20/2013 by CM/ECF.[1097607] [13-1581]--[Edited 11/20/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/20/2013 03:00 PM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 150 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for judicial notice [ # 146 ] filed by Appellant Morning Mist Holdings Limited and Miguel Lomeli, FILED. [1092604][150] [13-1581] [Entered: 11/14/2013 02:58 PM]
November 7, 2013 Filing 146 MOTION, for judicial notice, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 11/07/2013 by CM/ECF. [1086726] [13-1581] [Entered: 11/07/2013 12:29 PM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 145 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF. [1063981] [13-1581] [Entered: 10/11/2013 10:53 AM]
October 10, 2013 Filing 144 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, FILED. Service date 10/10/2013 by CM/ECF. [1063654] [13-1581] [Entered: 10/10/2013 06:19 PM]
October 10, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Robert Blum, Cornelis Boele, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Group, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Hararay, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, David Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, Philip Toub and Amit Vigayvergia, FILED. Service date 10/10/2013 by CM/ECF. [1063619] [13-1581] [Entered: 10/10/2013 05:19 PM]
October 10, 2013 Filing 142 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1063515] [13-1581] [Entered: 10/10/2013 04:24 PM]
September 24, 2013 Filing 141 MOTION ORDER, denying motion for appeals to be heard in tandem[ # 115 ] filed by Appellant Morning Mist Holdings Limited and Miguel Lomeli, FILED. [1050402][141] [13-1581] [Entered: 09/25/2013 09:40 AM]
September 17, 2013 Filing 137 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 09/17/2013, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, RECEIVED. Service date 09/17/2013 by CM/ECF.[1043012] [13-1581] [Entered: 09/17/2013 10:55 AM]
September 16, 2013 Filing 135 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 11/22/2013, SET.[1042180] [13-1581] [Entered: 09/16/2013 03:27 PM]
September 16, 2013 Filing 133 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 09/16/2013, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, RECEIVED. Service date 09/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1041813] [13-1581] [Entered: 09/16/2013 12:11 PM]
September 13, 2013 Filing 131 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 09/13/2013, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, RECEIVED. Service date 09/13/2013 by CM/ECF.[1041284] [13-1581] [Entered: 09/13/2013 08:06 PM]
September 10, 2013 Filing 129 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 124 ], on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 09/10/2013 by CM/ECF.[1037071][129] [13-1581] [Entered: 09/10/2013 11:09 AM]
September 4, 2013 Filing 126 LETTER, joining in on opposition to motion to be heard in tandem with 13-2340, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, Philip Toub and Amit Vigayvergia, RECEIVED. Service date 09/04/2013 by CM/ECF.[1033015] [13-1581]--[Edited 09/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 09/04/2013 04:57 PM]
September 4, 2013 Filing 124 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to be heard in tandem with 13-2340 [ # 115 ], on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, FILED. Service date 09/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [1032846][124] [13-1581]--[Edited 09/04/2013 by DE] [Entered: 09/04/2013 03:49 PM]
September 3, 2013 Filing 122 CURED DEFECTIVE Letter [ # 120 ], [ # 121 ], on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED.[1031974] [13-1581] [Entered: 09/03/2013 04:56 PM]
September 3, 2013 Filing 121 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 09/03/2013, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, RECEIVED. Service date 09/03/2013 by CM/ECF.[1031760] [13-1581] [Entered: 09/03/2013 03:04 PM]
September 3, 2013 Filing 120 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter, [119], on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED.[1031691] [13-1581] [Entered: 09/03/2013 02:33 PM]
September 3, 2013 Filing 119 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, RECEIVED. Service date 09/03/2013 by CM/ECF.[1031567] [13-1581] [Entered: 09/03/2013 01:17 PM]
August 22, 2013 Filing 115 MOTION, to be heard in tandem with 13-2340, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 08/22/2013 by CM/ECF. [1024061] [13-1581]--[Edited 08/23/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/22/2013 04:21 PM]
August 22, 2013 Filing 114 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 11/18/2013, PROPOSED.[1023936] [13-1581] [Entered: 08/22/2013 03:41 PM]
July 17, 2013 Filing 109 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. David A. Barrett, Esq. for Appellee Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., St. Stephen's School, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd. and Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, FILED. Service date 07/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [992948] [13-1581] [Entered: 07/17/2013 03:33 PM]
July 17, 2013 Filing 108 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Robert Alan Wallner, Esq. for Appellant Morning Mist Holdings Limited and Miguel Lomeli, FILED. Service date 07/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [992539] [13-1581] [Entered: 07/17/2013 12:46 PM]
July 17, 2013 Filing 107 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 07/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [992479] [13-1581] [Entered: 07/17/2013 12:25 PM]
July 17, 2013 Filing 105 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mark G. Cunha for Appellee Charles Murphy, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Group, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C., Amit Vigayvergia, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, Philip Toub, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Vianney D'hendecourt, Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, David Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Santiago Reyes, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Daniel Lipton, Jacqueline Hararay, Robert Blum and Corina Noel Piedrahita, FILED. Service date 07/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [991969] [13-1581] [Entered: 07/17/2013 09:37 AM]
July 3, 2013 Filing 99 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, FILED. Service date 07/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [982622] [13-1581] [Entered: 07/03/2013 09:22 PM]
July 3, 2013 Filing 98 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Group, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Hararay, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, Philip Toub and Amit Vigayvergia, joining in on Appellee brief filed on 07/03/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 07/03/2013 by CM/ECF.[982621] [13-1581]--[Edited 07/08/2013 by DE] [Entered: 07/03/2013 07:49 PM]
July 3, 2013 Filing 97 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Group, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Hararay, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, Philip Toub and Amit Vigayvergia, FILED. Service date 07/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [982619] [13-1581] [Entered: 07/03/2013 07:21 PM]
July 2, 2013 Filing 96 ATTORNEY, Howard L. Vickery II, Stuart H. Singer for Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust St. Stephen's School Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd. Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust Harel Insurance Company, Ltd. Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, in case 13-1581 , [ # 94 ], [ # 95 ], ADDED.[980951] [13-1581] [Entered: 07/02/2013 03:09 PM]
July 2, 2013 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, FILED. Service date 07/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [980788] [13-1581] [Entered: 07/02/2013 02:03 PM]
July 2, 2013 Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, FILED. Service date 07/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [980771] [13-1581] [Entered: 07/02/2013 01:54 PM]
June 7, 2013 Filing 93 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited and David Lipton, FILED. Service date 06/07/2013 by CM/ECF.[959201] [13-1581] [Entered: 06/07/2013 01:47 PM]
June 6, 2013 Filing 91 ATTORNEY, David S. Hoffner, Neil A. Steiner for Andres Piedrahita, in case 13-1581, [ # 88 ], [ # 89 ], ADDED.[957296] [13-1581] [Entered: 06/06/2013 08:30 AM]
June 5, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andres Piedrahita, FILED. Service date 06/05/2013 by CM/ECF. [957253] [13-1581] [Entered: 06/05/2013 11:47 PM]
June 5, 2013 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andres Piedrahita, FILED. Service date 06/05/2013 by CM/ECF. [957251] [13-1581] [Entered: 06/05/2013 11:37 PM]
June 5, 2013 Filing 87 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Andres Piedrahita, FILED. Service date 06/05/2013 by CM/ECF.[957248] [13-1581] [Entered: 06/05/2013 11:20 PM]
June 4, 2013 Filing 82 NOTICE, to Appellee American Express Bank Ltd., Matthew C. Brown, CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Miguel Calvo, Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited, Citgo Global Custody N.V., John G. Dutkowski, EFG Capital International Corp., Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Group, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Fairfield Sentry Limited, Brian Francouer, Robert Friedman, Carlos Gadala-Maria, GlobeOp Financial Services LLC., Greenwich Sentry, L.P., Lion Fairfield Capital Management Limited, David Lipton, Raul Mas, Rodolfo Pages, Samuel Perruchoud, Andres Piedrahita, Ian Pilgrim, Pricewaterhouse Coopers Accountants N.V., PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants Netherlands N.V., Pricewaterhousecoopers Bermuda, Pricewaterhousecoopers International Limited, Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., Pricewaterhousecoopers LLP (US), Pricewaterhousecoopers LLP Chartered Accountants, Luisa Serena, Andrew Smith, Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, Standard Chartered International (USA) Ltd., Standard Chartered PLC, Standard Chartered Private Bank and Standard Chartererd Bank , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[955176] [13-1581] [Entered: 06/04/2013 11:25 AM]
June 3, 2013 Filing 81 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [954217] [13-1581] [Entered: 06/03/2013 01:29 PM]
June 3, 2013 Filing 80 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 3, (pp. 595-889), on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF.[954215] [13-1581] [Entered: 06/03/2013 01:28 PM]
June 3, 2013 Filing 79 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 3, (pp. 297-594), on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF.[954211] [13-1581] [Entered: 06/03/2013 01:25 PM]
June 3, 2013 Filing 78 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 3, (pp. 1-296), on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF.[954197] [13-1581] [Entered: 06/03/2013 01:20 PM]
May 17, 2013 Filing 77 ATTORNEY, Mark Cunha, for Appellee Robert Blum, TERMINATED.[940607] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/17/2013 09:11 AM]
May 17, 2013 Filing 76 ATTORNEY, Sean O'Shea, [ # 46 ], in place of attorney Mark Cunha, SUBSTITUTED.[940601] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/17/2013 09:09 AM]
May 16, 2013 Filing 75 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, Philip Toub and Amit Vigayvergia, RECEIVED. Service date 05/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[940334] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/16/2013 04:22 PM]
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER, vacating previous order [ # 21 ] dated 05/08/2013, FILED.[940028] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/16/2013 03:00 PM]
May 16, 2013 Filing 73 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellants' brief due date as 06/03/2013, appellees' brief due date as 07/03/2013,TRANSMITTED.[940005] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/16/2013 02:54 PM]
May 16, 2013 Filing 72 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to expedite appeal [ # 47 ] filed by Appellee Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., St. Stephen's School, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust and Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust; denying motion to hold appeal in abeyance [ # 57 ] filed by Appellant Morning Mist Holdings Limited and Miguel Lomeli, by CFD, FILED. [940000][72] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/16/2013 02:51 PM]
May 15, 2013 Filing 66 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 58 ], on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, FILED. Service date 05/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[938307][66] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/15/2013 12:04 PM]
May 15, 2013 Filing 65 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to hold appeal in abeyance [ # 57 ], to expedite appeal [ # 47 ], on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, FILED. Service date 05/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [938118][65] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/15/2013 11:04 AM]
May 15, 2013 Filing 63 ATTORNEY, Mark G. Cunha, [ # 27 ], in place of attorney Helen V. Cantwell, SUBSTITUTED.[937689] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/15/2013 08:52 AM]
May 13, 2013 Filing 58 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to expedite appeal [ # 47 ], on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 05/13/2013 by CM/ECF. [935953][58] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/13/2013 04:40 PM]
May 13, 2013 Filing 57 MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 05/13/2013 by CM/ECF. [935947] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/13/2013 04:38 PM]
May 13, 2013 Filing 56 FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellant Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 05/13/2013 by CM/ECF.[935885] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/13/2013 04:20 PM]
May 13, 2013 Filing 55 CAPTION, adding Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School as Appellees per Acknowledgment forms dated 04/29/2013 & 05/09/2013, AMENDED.[935446] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/13/2013 01:29 PM]
May 13, 2013 Filing 54 ATTORNEY, Jennifer Leigh Young for Miguel Lomeli Morning Mist Holdings Limited, in case 13-1581, [ # 53 ], ADDED.[934830] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/13/2013 09:26 AM]
May 10, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 05/10/2013 by CM/ECF. [934647] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/10/2013 07:09 PM]
May 10, 2013 Filing 50 LETTER, on behalf of -- Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, RECEIVED. Service date 05/10/2013 by CM/ECF.[933733] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/10/2013 10:50 AM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 47 MOTION, to expedite appeal, on behalf of -- Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, FILED. Service date 05/09/2013 by CM/ECF. [933279] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 08:01 PM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cornelis Boele, FILED. Service date 05/09/2013 by CM/ECF. [933214] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 04:51 PM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 45 ATTORNEY, Daniel Jeffrey Fetterman for Jeffrey Tucker, in case 13-1581, [ # 25 ], ADDED.[933192] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 04:40 PM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 44 ATTORNEY, Marc Kasowitz, [ # 24 ], in place of attorney Adam Grant, SUBSTITUTED.[933140] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 04:21 PM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 43 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of -- Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, FILED. Service date 05/09/2013 by CM/ECF.[933132] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 04:18 PM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 42 ATTORNEY, Andrew Hammond for Walter M. Noel Jr., in case 13-1581, [ # 41 ], ADDED.[932857] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 03:00 PM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Walter M. Noel, Jr., FILED. Service date 05/09/2013 by CM/ECF. [932825] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 02:47 PM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 40 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Walter M. Noel, Jr., FILED. Service date 05/09/2013 by CM/ECF.[932815] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 02:42 PM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 39 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Robert Blum and David Horn, FILED. Service date 05/09/2013 by CM/ECF.[932669] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 01:17 PM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 38 ATTORNEY, Nicholas Shea Davis for Corina Noel Piedrahita Charles Murphy Julia Luongo Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited Philip Toub Jacqueline Hararay Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo Mark Mckeefry Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C. Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC Lourdes Barreneche Richard Landsberger Amit Vigayvergia Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd. Yanko Dellaw Schiava Jacqueline Harary Santiago Reyes Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C. Harold Greisman Andrew Smith Fairfield Greenwich Limited Vianney D'hendecourt Daniel Lipton Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., in case 13-1581 , [ # 32 ], ADDED.[932105] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 09:37 AM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 37 ATTORNEY, Jeffrey Edward Baldwin for Corina Noel Piedrahita Charles Murphy Julia Luongo Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited Philip Toub Jacqueline Hararay Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo Mark Mckeefry Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C. Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC Lourdes Barreneche Richard Landsberger Amit Vigayvergia Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd. Yanko Dellaw Schiava Jacqueline Harary Santiago Reyes Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C. Harold Greisman Andrew Smith Fairfield Greenwich Limited Vianney D'hendecourt Daniel Lipton Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., in case 13-1581 , [ # 31 ], ADDED.[932101] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 09:35 AM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 36 ATTORNEY, Jeffrey Lawrence Roether for Corina Noel Piedrahita Charles Murphy Julia Luongo Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited Philip Toub Jacqueline Hararay Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo Mark Mckeefry Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C. Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC Lourdes Barreneche Richard Landsberger Amit Vigayvergia Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd. Yanko Dellaw Schiava Jacqueline Harary Santiago Reyes Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C. Harold Greisman Andrew Smith Fairfield Greenwich Limited Vianney D'hendecourt Daniel Lipton Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., in case 13-1581 , [ # 30 ], ADDED.[932097] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 09:33 AM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, Peter E. Kazanoff for Corina Noel Piedrahita Charles Murphy Julia Luongo Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited Philip Toub Jacqueline Hararay Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo Mark Mckeefry Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C. Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC Lourdes Barreneche Richard Landsberger Amit Vigayvergia Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd. Yanko Dellaw Schiava Jacqueline Harary Santiago Reyes Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C. Harold Greisman Andrew Smith Fairfield Greenwich Limited Vianney D'hendecourt Daniel Lipton Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., in case 13-1581, [ # 29 ], ADDED.[932090] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/09/2013 09:31 AM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Gregory Bowes, FILED. Service date 05/08/2013 by CM/ECF.[931915] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 07:02 PM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, Andrew Smith, Philip Toub and Amit Vigayvergia, FILED. Service date 05/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [931781] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 04:31 PM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, Andrew Smith, Philip Toub and Amit Vigayvergia, FILED. Service date 05/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [931743] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 04:24 PM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, Andrew Smith, Philip Toub and Amit Vigayvergia, FILED. Service date 05/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [931688] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 04:11 PM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava, Andrew Smith, Philip Toub and Amit Vigayvergia, FILED. Service date 05/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [931673] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 04:06 PM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 28 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Vianney D'hendecourt, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C., Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC, Fairfield Risk Services Ltd., Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Julia Luongo, Mark Mckeefry, Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo, Charles Murphy, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Yanko Dellaw Schiava and Philip Toub, FILED. Service date 05/08/2013 by CM/ECF.[931631] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 03:52 PM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Amit Vigayvergia, FILED. Service date 05/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [931599] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 03:45 PM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Tucker, FILED. Service date 05/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [931095] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 12:12 PM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Tucker, FILED. Service date 05/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [931093] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 12:08 PM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Tucker, FILED. Service date 05/08/2013 by CM/ECF.[931083] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 12:01 PM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[930895] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 10:38 AM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 21 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited Brief due date as 08/06/2013; Joint Appendix due date as 08/06/2013, FILED.[930875] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 10:33 AM]
May 8, 2013 Filing 18 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[930803] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/08/2013 10:13 AM]
May 7, 2013 Filing 10 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, informing Court of proposed due date 08/06/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 05/07/2013 by CM/ECF.[929492] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/07/2013 11:04 AM]
May 7, 2013 Filing 9 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 05/07/2013 by CM/ECF.[929480] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/07/2013 10:57 AM]
May 6, 2013 Filing 8 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 05/06/2013 by CM/ECF.[928478] [13-1581] [Entered: 05/06/2013 12:36 PM]
April 29, 2013 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. Service date 04/29/2013 by CM/ECF.[921803] [13-1581] [Entered: 04/29/2013 03:20 PM]
April 26, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited, Citgo Global Custody N.V., Pricewaterhouse Coopers Accountants N.V. and Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. in 13-1642, FILED. [924350] [13-1642, 13-1581] [Entered: 05/01/2013 12:23 PM]
April 25, 2013 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[921479] [13-1581] [Entered: 04/29/2013 01:00 PM]
April 25, 2013 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/25/2013, RECEIVED.[921477] [13-1581] [Entered: 04/29/2013 12:59 PM]
April 25, 2013 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, district court receipt # 0208-8445744, FILED.[921475] [13-1581] [Entered: 04/29/2013 12:58 PM]
April 25, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Miguel Lomeli and Morning Mist Holdings Limited, FILED. [921411] [13-1581] [Entered: 04/29/2013 12:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Anwar v. Fairfield Greenwich Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Positano Investment Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arjan Mohandas Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bharat Mohandas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catalina Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFA Pension A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvest Dawn International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Prado Trading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahia del Rio S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadav Zohar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loana Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairfield Sentry Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquina Teresa Barbacha Herrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blythel Associated Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Gaviria Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Anwar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated investors in the Greenwich Sentry, L.P. private investment limited partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Lou Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tradwaves, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wong Yuk Hing De Lou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Cioci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Akriby Valladolid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Headway Investment Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muniandy Nalaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank E. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calwell Investment S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vandna Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Child Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXA Private Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BPV Finance (International) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neelam P. Daryani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landville Capital Management S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Marchi Cioci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefina Santos Urzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vikas P. Daryani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taurus the Fourth Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikesh P. Daryani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmel Ventures Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wall Street Securities, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dilip Damodardas Raipancholia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lila Neemberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parasram Daryani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandakini Gajaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blockbend Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centro Inspection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Alpha and Omega Partnership, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kishin Mohandas Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Pujals, individually and in their representative capacities for all those similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richmon Company Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Podhorzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajendrakumar Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diversified Investments Associates Class A Units
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 20/20 Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inter-American Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasha S. Anwar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated investors in the Greenwich Sentry, L.P. private investment limited partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABN AMRO LIFE S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banco General, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kishu Nathurmal Uttamchandani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastfork Assets Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fundacion Virgilio Barco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Gauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aarvee Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. Thomas Dougherty Novella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajeshkumar Damodardas Raipancholia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulrich Blass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jitendra Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank E. Pierce Ira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanchart Securities International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kivory Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mailand Inevstment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suresh M. Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bevington Management, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenn Assets Holding, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalandar International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvira 1950 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gopal Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Knight Services Holdings Limited, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Rodriguez Caso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shimon Laor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe J. Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Santos Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayshree Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronit Zohar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandrashekar Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABR Capital Fixed Option/Income Strategic Fund LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kishanchand Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sand Overseas Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Urzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonaire Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maridom Limited, a Foreign Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omawa Investment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Julieta A De Pujals, individually and in their representative capacities for all those similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashokkumar Damodardas Raipancholia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Wickneswari V. Ratnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prerna Vinod Uttamchandani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Club, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baymall Investments Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deepa Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerico Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David I. Ferber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hedge Strategy Fund LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paul Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter A. & Rita M. Carfagna Irrevocable Charitable Remainder UniTrust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.M. Rademaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traconcorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Hills Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Mattos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marrekesh Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citco Canada Inc.
Represented By: Allan J. Arffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Miguel Calvo
Represented By: Stephen L. Weinstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citco Global Custody N.V.
Represented By: Allan J. Arffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V.
Represented By: Gabrielle S. Marshall Esq.
Represented By: William R. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Greenwich Advisors L.L.C.
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Maria Teresa Pulido Mendozo
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Julia Luongo
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Standard Chartered Bank
Represented By: Sharon Nelles Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Blum
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Edward Spiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Greenwich Group
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Greenwich Sentry, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Greenwich Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Horn
Represented By: Edward Spiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffrey Tucker
Represented By: Marc Kasowitz Esq.
Represented By: Daniel Jeffrey Fetterman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Ltd.
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield International Managers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Harold Greisman
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pricewaterhousecoopers International Limited
Represented By: Brad E. Konstandt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Samuel Perruchoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Matthew C. Brown
Represented By: Glenn M. Kurtz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EFG Capital International Corp.
Represented By: Joseph Clay Coates Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Corina Noel Piedrahita
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Risk Services Ltd.
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mark Mckeefry
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pricewaterhousecoopers LLP Chartered Accountants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GlobeOp Financial Services LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Rodolfo Pages
Represented By: Ricardo Alejandro Gonzalez Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch
Represented By: Allan J. Arffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carlos Gadala-Maria
Represented By: Ricardo Alejandro Gonzalez Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Smith
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Greenwich Advisors, L.L.C.
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lion Fairfield Capital Management Limited
Represented By: Lawrence P. Eagel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, a Foreign entity
Represented By: Sharon Nelles Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Charles Murphy
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Philip Toub
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vianney D'hendecourt
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V.
Represented By: Allan J. Arffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P.
Represented By: Andrew Genser Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Friedman
Represented By: Ricardo Alejandro Gonzalez Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Raul Mas
Represented By: Ricardo Alejandro Gonzalez Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ian Pilgrim
Represented By: Allan J. Arffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Heathcliff Capital LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited
Represented By: Allan J. Arffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Standard Chartered PLC
Represented By: Sharon Nelles Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jacqueline Hararay
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andres Piedrahita
Represented By: David S. Hoffner Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Joshua Levander Esq.
Represented By: Neil A. Steiner Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Greenwich Limited, a Cayman Island company
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lourdes Barreneche
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jacqueline Harary
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citco Group Limited
Represented By: Allan J. Arffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cornelis Boele
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Sean F. O'Shea Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Yanko Dellaw Schiava
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: American Express Bank, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fairfield Sentry Limited
Represented By: David Molton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Santiago Reyes
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard Landsberger
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Pricewaterhousecoopers Bermuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Lipton
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Luisa Serena
Represented By: Ricardo Alejandro Gonzalez Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John G. Dutkowski
Represented By: Ricardo Alejandro Gonzalez Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel Lipton
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Amit Vigayvergia
Represented By: Nicholas Shea Davis Esq.
Represented By: Mark G. Cunha
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Baldwin Esq.
Represented By: Peter E. Kazanoff Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lawrence Roether Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Standard Chartered International (USA) Ltd.
Represented By: Sharon Nelles Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brian Francouer
Represented By: Kenneth A. Zitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gregory Bowes
Represented By: Bruce Allen Baird Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Walter M. Noel, Jr.
Represented By: Glenn M. Kurtz Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Standard Chartered Private Bank, Foreign entity, and a private banking division of Standard Chartered Bank
Represented By: Sharon Nelles Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer Esq.
Represented By: Howard L. Vickery Esq. II
Represented By: David A. Barrett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, On behalf of Itself
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer Esq.
Represented By: Howard L. Vickery Esq. II
Represented By: David A. Barrett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Harel Insurance Company Ltd.
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer Esq.
Represented By: Howard L. Vickery Esq. II
Represented By: David A. Barrett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd.
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer Esq.
Represented By: Howard L. Vickery Esq. II
Represented By: David A. Barrett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Securities & Investment Company Bahrain
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer Esq.
Represented By: Howard L. Vickery Esq. II
Represented By: David A. Barrett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: St. Stephen's School
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer Esq.
Represented By: Howard L. Vickery Esq. II
Represented By: David A. Barrett Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Morning Mist Holdings Limited
Represented By: Robert Alan Wallner Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Young Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Miguel Lomeli
Represented By: Robert Alan Wallner Esq.
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Young Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Irving H. Picard
Represented By: Andrew M. Grossman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?