Viacom International, Inc. v. Youtube, Inc.
Petitioner: Football Association Premier League Limited, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis and Bourne Co.
Amicus Curiae: Hank Green, Anaheim Ballet, Raymond T. Nimmer, Kevin Nalty, Adam Bahner, Facebook, Inc., Ronald A. Cass, American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada, The Media Institute, Kartemquin Films, Intellectual Property and Internet Law Professors, Rawn Erickson, Studio Transportation Drivers, Local 399, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Consumer Action, Allison Trippy, eBay Inc., Access, International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Computer & Communications Industry Association, Freedom House, Charles Trippy, Human Rights Watch, Charles Todd, Stuart N. Brotman, The Copyright Alliance, Michael Bassik, The Learning About Multimedia Project, Inc., Tumblr, Inc., Independent Film & Television Alliance, Barnett Zitron, National Consumers League, Recording Industry Association of America, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, John Green, Dane Boedigheimer, American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers, Public Knowledge, Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, National Alliance for Media Art & Culture, Consumer Electronics Association, Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., The Alliance for Community Media, Broadcast Music, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Minority Media & Telecommunications Council, Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation and SESAC, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Comedy Partners, Viacom Inc., Country Music Television, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC and Paramount Pictures Corporation
Defendant / Appellee: YouTube LLC and Google Inc.
Case Number: 13-1720
Filed: May 3, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2014 Filing 245 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD B. SCHOFIELD with fee, RECEIVED.[1185170] [13-1720] [Entered: 03/24/2014 01:25 PM]
March 19, 2014 Filing 244 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 03/19/2014, disposing of the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1181689] [13-1720] [Entered: 03/19/2014 12:51 PM]
March 19, 2014 Filing 243 FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[1181686] [13-1720] [Entered: 03/19/2014 12:48 PM]
March 19, 2014 Filing 242 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[1181679] [13-1720] [Entered: 03/19/2014 12:47 PM]
March 18, 2014 Filing 237 FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2014 by CM/ECF.[1180739] [13-1720] [Entered: 03/18/2014 02:50 PM]
February 24, 2014 Filing 234 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1163998] [13-1720] [Entered: 02/24/2014 04:23 PM]
February 24, 2014 Filing 233 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1163794] [13-1720] [Entered: 02/24/2014 03:01 PM]
February 24, 2014 Filing 232 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1163670] [13-1720] [Entered: 02/24/2014 01:53 PM]
February 14, 2014 Filing 231 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 03/24/2014, SET.[1156671] [13-1720] [Entered: 02/14/2014 10:43 AM]
February 5, 2014 Filing 228 LETTER, regarding availability for oral argument, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 02/05/2014 by CM/ECF.[1149957] [13-1720]--[Edited 02/05/2014 by DE] [Entered: 02/05/2014 09:06 AM]
February 4, 2014 Filing 226 LETTER, regarding availability for oral argument, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 02/04/2014 by CM/ECF.[1149795] [13-1720]--[Edited 02/04/2014 by DE] [Entered: 02/04/2014 04:28 PM]
January 21, 2014 Filing 225 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 03/24/2014, PROPOSED.[1145794] [13-1720] [Entered: 01/30/2014 10:55 AM]
January 16, 2014 Filing 220 LETTER, updating availability for oral argument, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 01/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1135848] [13-1720]--[Edited 01/16/2014 by DE] [Entered: 01/16/2014 01:03 PM]
January 15, 2014 Filing 217 LETTER, updating availability for oral argument, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 01/15/2014 by CM/ECF.[1135188] [13-1720]--[Edited 01/16/2014 by DE] [Entered: 01/15/2014 07:56 PM]
December 5, 2013 Filing 213 LETTER, updating Court with availability for oral argument, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 12/05/2013 by CM/ECF.[1107582] [13-1720]--[Edited 12/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 12/05/2013 11:54 AM]
November 18, 2013 Filing 210 LETTER, regarding oral argument unavailability, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 11/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[1094801] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/18/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/18/2013 10:50 AM]
November 18, 2013 Filing 208 MOTION ORDER, deeming motion to file amicus curiae brief withdrawn [ # 99 ], FILED. [1094723][208] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/18/2013 10:11 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 206 CURED DEFECTIVE Amicus Brief [ # 192 ], [ # 193 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Consumer Electronics Association, FILED.[1092882] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/14/2013 04:40 PM]
November 13, 2013 Filing 202 CURED DEFECTIVE Reply Brief [ # 196 ], [ # 197 ], on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED.[1091533] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/13/2013 05:26 PM]
November 13, 2013 Filing 200 CURED DEFECTIVE Amicus Brief [ # 198 ], [ # 199 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association, FILED.[1091528] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/13/2013 05:20 PM]
November 13, 2013 Filing 199 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Computer & Communications Industry Association, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1090821] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/13/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/13/2013 12:56 PM]
November 12, 2013 Filing 198 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [169], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association, FILED.[1089961] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/12/2013 05:03 PM]
November 12, 2013 Filing 197 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/12/2013 by CM/ECF. [1089942] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/12/2013 04:57 PM]
November 12, 2013 Filing 196 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Reply Brief, [191], on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED.[1089883] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/12/2013 04:30 PM]
November 12, 2013 Filing 194 LETTER, withdrawing motion to file amicus brief, on behalf of Movant Bourne Co., Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Federation Francaise De Tennis, Football Association Premier League Limited, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc. and X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 11/12/2013 by CM/ECF.[1089597] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/12/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/12/2013 03:04 PM]
November 12, 2013 Filing 193 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Consumer Electronics Association, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1089403] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/14/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/12/2013 01:30 PM]
November 12, 2013 Filing 192 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [179], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Consumer Electronics Association, FILED.[1089326] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/12/2013 12:55 PM]
November 8, 2013 Filing 191 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 11/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [1087959] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/08/2013 12:00 PM]
November 6, 2013 Filing 188 CURED DEFECTIVE Amicus Brief [ # 187 ], [ # 177 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Access, Consumer Action, Freedom House, Human Rights Watch and National Consumers League, FILED.[1085238] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/06/2013 11:05 AM]
November 6, 2013 Filing 187 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [167], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Access, Consumer Action, Freedom House, Human Rights Watch and National Consumers League, FILED.[1085229] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/06/2013 11:02 AM]
November 4, 2013 Filing 182 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Intellectual Property and Internet Law Professors, ADDED.[1082387] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/04/2013 08:57 AM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 181 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Intellectual Property and Internet Law Professors, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1082329] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/04/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 07:54 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 180 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Intellectual Property and Internet Law Professors, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1082328] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/04/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 07:52 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 179 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Consumer Electronics Association, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1082315] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/04/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 05:44 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 178 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1082229] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/04/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 04:36 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 177 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of National Consumers League, Consumer Action, Access, Freedom House and Human Rights Watch, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1082137] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/04/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 04:10 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 176 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association, ADDED.[1082055] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/01/2013 03:48 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 175 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae eBay Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, Tumblr, Inc. and Yahoo! Inc., ADDED.[1082042] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/01/2013 03:43 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 174 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of National Alliance for Media Art & Culture, The Alliance for Community Media and Kartemquin Films, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1082019] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 03:34 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 173 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae National Consumers League, Consumer Action, Access, Freedom House and Human Rights Watch, ADDED.[1082014] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/01/2013 03:31 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 172 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Anaheim Ballet, Adam Bahner, Michael Bassik, Dane Boedigheimer, Rawn Erickson, Hank Green, John Green, The Learning About Multimedia Project, Inc., Kevin Nalty, Charles Todd, Allison Trippy, Barnett Zitron and Charles Trippy, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081992] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 03:25 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 171 ATTORNEY, Michael Barclay for Electronic Frontier Foundation Public Knowledge, in case 13-1720, [ # 161 ], ADDED.[1081982] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/01/2013 03:21 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 170 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge, ADDED.[1081966] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/01/2013 03:17 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 169 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Computer & Communications Industry Association, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081891] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 02:43 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 168 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Computer & Communications Industry Association, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081884] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 02:39 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 167 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of National Consumers League, Consumer Action, Access, Freedom House and Human Rights Watch, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081825] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 01:59 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 166 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of National Consumers League, Consumer Action, Access, Freedom House and Human Rights Watch, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081805] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 01:44 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of National Consumers League, Consumer Action, Access, Freedom House and Human Rights Watch, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081798] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 01:40 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 164 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of National Consumers League, Consumer Action, Access, Freedom House and Human Rights Watch, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081783] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 01:33 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 163 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of eBay Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, Tumblr, Inc. and Yahoo! Inc., FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081746] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 01:05 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 162 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of eBay Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, Tumblr, Inc. and Yahoo! Inc., FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081736] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 01:01 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 161 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081727] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 12:56 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 160 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081711] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 12:46 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 159 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Anaheim Ballet, Adam Bahner, Michael Bassik, Dane Boedigheimer, Rawn Erickson, Hank Green, John Green, The Learning About Multimedia Project, Inc., Kevin Nalty, Charles Todd, Allison Trippy, Barnett Zitron and Charles Trippy, ADDED.[1081459] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/01/2013 11:04 AM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 158 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Consumer Electronics Association, ADDED.[1081424] [13-1720] [Entered: 11/01/2013 10:49 AM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 157 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Anaheim Ballet, Adam Bahner, Michael Bassik, Dane Boedigheimer, Rawn Erickson, Hank Green, John Green, The Learning About Multimedia Project, Inc., Kevin Nalty, Charles Todd, Allison Trippy, Barnett Zitron and Charles Trippy, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081419] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 10:45 AM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 156 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Consumer Electronics Association, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081408] [13-1720]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by DE] [Entered: 11/01/2013 10:34 AM]
October 31, 2013 Filing 155 CURED DEFECTIVE Notices of Appearance as Amicus Counsel [ # 149 ], [ # 150 ], [ # 151 ], on behalf of Movant Kartemquin Films, National Alliance for Media Art & Culture and The Alliance for Community Media, FILED.[1080157] [13-1720] [Entered: 10/31/2013 09:32 AM]
October 30, 2013 Filing 153 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Andrew H. Schapiro, Esq. for Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 10/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [1079819] [13-1720] [Entered: 10/30/2013 03:55 PM]
October 30, 2013 Filing 152 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Scott Wilkens, Esq. for Appellant Viacom International, Inc., Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Black Entertainment Television, LLC, FILED. Service date 10/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [1079714] [13-1720] [Entered: 10/30/2013 03:14 PM]
October 30, 2013 Filing 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of National Alliance for Media Art & Culture, The Alliance for Community Media and Kartemquin Films, FILED. Service date 10/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [1079704] [13-1720]--[Edited 10/31/2013 by DE] [Entered: 10/30/2013 03:08 PM]
October 30, 2013 Filing 150 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of National Alliance for Media Art & Culture, The Alliance for Community Media and Kartemquin Films, FILED. Service date 10/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [1079660] [13-1720]--[Edited 10/31/2013 by DE] [Entered: 10/30/2013 02:52 PM]
October 30, 2013 Filing 149 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notices of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [146], [147], on behalf of Movant Kartemquin Films, National Alliance for Media Art & Culture and The Alliance for Community Media, FILED.[1079608] [13-1720] [Entered: 10/30/2013 02:34 PM]
October 30, 2013 Filing 148 NEW PARTY, Movants National Alliance for Media Art & Culture, The Alliance for Community Media and Kartemquin Films, ADDED.[1079606] [13-1720] [Entered: 10/30/2013 02:33 PM]
October 30, 2013 Filing 147 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of National Alliance for Media Art & Culture, The Alliance for Community Media and Kartemquin Films, FILED. Service date 10/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [1079523] [13-1720]--[Edited 10/30/2013 by DE] [Entered: 10/30/2013 01:24 PM]
October 30, 2013 Filing 146 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of National Alliance for Media Art & Culture, The Alliance for Community Media and Kartemquin Films, FILED. Service date 10/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [1079504] [13-1720]--[Edited 10/30/2013 by DE] [Entered: 10/30/2013 01:10 PM]
October 25, 2013 Filing 143 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 10/25/2013 by CM/ECF. [1076055] [13-1720] [Entered: 10/25/2013 06:24 PM]
August 29, 2013 Filing 138 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 08/29/2013, on behalf of Movant Bourne Co., Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Federation Francaise De Tennis, Football Association Premier League Limited, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc. and X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 08/29/2013 by CM/ECF.[1029759] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/29/2013 04:36 PM]
August 15, 2013 Filing 136 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to file amicus curiae brief [ # 99 ], on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 08/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [1018118][136] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/15/2013 04:40 PM]
August 7, 2013 Filing 131 CURED DEFECTIVE Amicus Brief [ # 114 ], [ # 122 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Stuart N. Brotman, Ronald A. Cass and Raymond T. Nimmer, FILED.[1010720] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/07/2013 03:18 PM]
August 6, 2013 Filing 128 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file amicus curiae brief to panel that will determine the merits of the appeal [ # 99 ], filed on behalf of Movants Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc. and Federation Francaise De Tennis, FILED. [1009410][128] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/06/2013 03:33 PM]
August 6, 2013 Filing 125 CURED DEFECTIVE Notices of Appearance as Additional Counsel [ # 108 ], [ # 123 ], [ # 124 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Independent Film & Television Alliance and Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED.[1008575] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/06/2013 09:16 AM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 124 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Independent Film & Television Alliance, FILED. Service date 08/05/2013 by CM/ECF. [1008411] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/06/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/05/2013 05:11 PM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/05/2013 by CM/ECF. [1008408] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/06/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/05/2013 05:11 PM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 122 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Ronald A. Cass, Raymond T. Nimmer and Stuart N. Brotman, FILED. Service date 08/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [1007887] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/05/2013 02:12 PM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 121 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Ronald A. Cass, Raymond T. Nimmer and Stuart N. Brotman, FILED. Service date 08/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [1007877] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/05/2013 02:08 PM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 120 NEW PARTY, Amici Curiae American Federation of Musicians, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Studio Transportation Drivers, Local 399, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, ADDED.[1007827] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/05/2013 01:37 PM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 118 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel [ # 116 ], [ # 117 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Minority Media & Telecommunications Council, Inc., The Copyright Alliance and The Media Institute, FILED.[1007776] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/05/2013 12:49 PM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 117 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of The Copyright Alliance, Minority Media & Telecommunications Council, Inc. and The Media Institute, FILED. Service date 08/05/2013 by CM/ECF. [1007773] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/05/2013 12:46 PM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 116 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [113], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Minority Media & Telecommunications Council, Inc., The Copyright Alliance and The Media Institute, FILED.[1007743] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/05/2013 12:33 PM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 115 NEW PARTY, Amici Curiae The Copyright Alliance, The Media Institute and Minority Media & Telecommunications Council, Inc., ADDED.[1007738] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/05/2013 12:31 PM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 114 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [94], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Stuart N. Brotman, Ronald A. Cass and Raymond T. Nimmer, FILED.[1007717] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/05/2013 12:24 PM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 113 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of The Copyright Alliance, Minority Media & Telecommunications Council, Inc. and The Media Institute, FILED. Service date 08/05/2013 by CM/ECF. [1007677] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/05/2013 12:01 PM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American Federation of Musicians, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Studio Transportation Drivers, Local 399, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, FILED. Service date 08/05/2013 by CM/ECF. [1007419] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/05/2013 10:33 AM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 110 NEW PARTY, Amici Curiae American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., Recording Industry Association of America and SESAC, Inc., ADDED.[1007275] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/05/2013 09:35 AM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 108 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notices of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [100], [101], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Independent Film & Television Alliance and Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED.[1007159] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/05/2013 09:00 AM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 107 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. and Independent Film & Television Alliance, ADDED.[1007156] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/05/2013 08:59 AM]
August 5, 2013 Filing 105 NEW PARTY, Movants Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc. and Federation Francaise De Tennis, ADDED.[1007133] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/05/2013 08:40 AM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., Recording Industry Association of America and SESAC, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/02/1013 by CM/ECF. [1007059] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/02/2013 05:36 PM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 103 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., Recording Industry Association of America and SESAC, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [1007058] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/02/2013 05:36 PM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 102 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. and Independent Film & Television Alliance, FILED. Service date 02/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [1007039] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/02/2013 05:03 PM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [1007016] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/02/2013 04:50 PM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [1007008] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/02/2013 04:49 PM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 99 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date08/02/2013 by CM/ECF.[1006927] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/02/2013 04:19 PM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc. and Federation Francaise De Tennis, FILED. Service date 08/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [1006919] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/02/2013 04:17 PM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 97 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of American Federation of Musicians, Directors Guild of America, Inc., Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Studio Transportation Drivers, Local 399, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, FILED. Service date 08/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [1006677] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/02/2013 03:01 PM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 96 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of The Copyright Alliance, Minority Media & Telecommunications Council, Inc. and The Media Institute, FILED. Service date 08/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [1006413] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/02/2013 12:58 PM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 95 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Ronald A. Cass, Raymond T. Nimmer and Stuart N. Brotman, ADDED.[1006396] [13-1720] [Entered: 08/02/2013 12:51 PM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 94 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Ronald A. Cass, Raymond T. Nimmer and Stuart N. Brotman, FILED. Service date 08/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [1006217] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/02/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/02/2013 11:47 AM]
August 2, 2013 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Ronald A. Cass, Raymond T. Nimmer and Stuart N. Brotman, FILED. Service date 08/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [1006209] [13-1720]--[Edited 08/02/2013 by DE] [Entered: 08/02/2013 11:45 AM]
July 30, 2013 Filing 92 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC Brief due date as 10/25/2013, FILED.[1003226] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/30/2013 04:25 PM]
July 30, 2013 Filing 89 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 10/25/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 07/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[1002987] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/30/2013 12:48 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 83 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 23 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002074] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:16 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 82 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 22 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002072] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:16 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 81 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 21 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002069] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:16 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 80 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 20 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002067] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:15 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 79 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 19 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002066] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:15 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 78 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 18 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002065] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:14 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 77 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 17 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002064] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:14 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 76 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 16 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002063] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:14 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 75 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 15 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002060] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:13 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 74 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 14 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002059] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:12 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 73 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 13 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002057] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:11 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 72 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 12 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002056] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:11 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 71 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 11 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002055] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:10 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 70 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 10 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002054] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:10 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 69 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 9 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002053] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:10 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 68 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 8 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002052] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:09 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 67 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 7 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002050] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:08 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 66 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 6 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002048] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:08 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 65 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 5 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002047] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:08 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 64 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 4 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002045] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:07 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 63 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 3 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002042] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:07 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 62 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 2 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002040] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:06 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 61 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 1 of 23, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [1002039] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/29/2013 11:06 AM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Joint Appendix Volumes I-XXIII Filed Under Seal, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party.[1001380] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 03:39 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 59 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 23 of 23, (pp. 5763-6047), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party.[1001363] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 03:34 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 58 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 22 of 23, (pp. 5477-5762), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001354] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 03:31 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 57 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 21 of 23, (pp. 5195-5476), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party.[1001342] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 03:28 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 56 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 20 of 23, (pp. 5009-5194), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party.[1001336] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 03:27 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 55 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 19 of 23, (pp. 4726-5008), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001323] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 03:25 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 54 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 18 of 23, (pp. 4470 -4725), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001321] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 03:24 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 53 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 17 of 23, (pp. 4199-4469), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001315] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 03:22 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 52 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 16 of 23, (pp. 3932-4198), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001311] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 03:20 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 51 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 15 of 23, (pp. 3652-3931), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001305] [13-1720]--[Edited 07/29/2013 by DE] [Entered: 07/26/2013 03:17 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 50 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 14 of 23, (pp. 3370-3651), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party.[1001291] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 03:15 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 49 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 13 of 23, (pp. 3084-3369), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001284] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 03:12 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 48 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 12 of 23, (pp. 2800-3083), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001195] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:38 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 47 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 11 of 23, (pp. 2510-2799), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party.[1001194] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:36 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 46 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 10 of 23, (pp. 2360-2509), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party.[1001193] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:35 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 45 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 9 of 23, (pp. 2158-2359), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party.[1001191] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:34 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 44 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 8 of 23, (pp. 1861-2157), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party.[1001188] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:32 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 43 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 7 of 23, (pp. 1606-1860), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001181] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:30 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 42 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 23, (pp. 1381-1605), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001174] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:28 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 41 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 23, (pp. 1099-1380), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001169] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:23 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 40 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 23, (pp. 812-1098), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party.[1001167] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:21 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 39 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 23, (pp. 532-811), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party.[1001163] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:19 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 38 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 23, (pp. 260-531), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001159] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:18 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 37 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 23, (pp. 1-259), on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by 3rd party, CM/ECF.[1001155] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:15 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 36 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by CM/ECF, 3rd party.[1001148] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:13 PM]
July 26, 2013 Filing 35 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/26/2013 by CM/ECF.[1001125] [13-1720] [Entered: 07/26/2013 02:00 PM]
May 20, 2013 Filing 33 CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 06/13/2013, Start Time: 3:00 PM, Conference Note: Conference type changed to telephonic, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[942532] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/20/2013 12:23 PM]
May 20, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[942237] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/20/2013 10:44 AM]
May 20, 2013 Filing 31 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc. Brief due date as 07/26/2013; Joint Appendix due date as 07/26/2013, FILED.[942225] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/20/2013 10:42 AM]
May 17, 2013 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Brian M. Willen, David H. Kramer for Youtube, Inc. Youtube, LLC Google, Inc., in case 13-1720, [ # 27 ], [ # 28 ], ADDED.[941688] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/17/2013 04:55 PM]
May 17, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 05/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [941676] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/17/2013 04:48 PM]
May 17, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 05/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [941654] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/17/2013 04:38 PM]
May 17, 2013 Filing 25 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 07/26/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 05/17/2013 by CM/ECF.[941580] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/17/2013 04:10 PM]
May 13, 2013 Filing 24 CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: In-Person, Scheduled Date of Conference: 06/13/2013, Start Time: 3:00 PM, endorsed by Lisa J. Greenberg, FILED.[935325] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/13/2013 12:24 PM]
May 10, 2013 Filing 23 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[934592] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/10/2013 04:57 PM]
May 10, 2013 Filing 18 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/10/2013 by CM/ECF.[933935] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/10/2013 12:49 PM]
May 10, 2013 Filing 17 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/10/2013 by CM/ECF.[933934] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/10/2013 12:48 PM]
May 10, 2013 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Susan J. Kohlmann for Comedy Partners Country Music Television, Inc. Paramount Pictures Corporation Viacom International, Inc. Black Entertainment Television, LLC, in case 13-1720 , [ # 14 ], ADDED.[933300] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/10/2013 07:33 AM]
May 10, 2013 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Scott Wilkens for Comedy Partners Country Music Television, Inc. Paramount Pictures Corporation Viacom International, Inc. Black Entertainment Television, LLC, in case 13-1720 , [ # 13 ], ADDED.[933299] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/10/2013 07:32 AM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/09/2013 by CM/ECF. [933258] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/09/2013 05:48 PM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/09/2013 by CM/ECF. [933257] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/09/2013 05:45 PM]
May 9, 2013 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/09/2013 by CM/ECF.[933252] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/09/2013 05:40 PM]
May 3, 2013 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, David Bernard Schwartz for Youtube, Inc. Youtube, LLC Google, Inc., in case 13-1720 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[927087] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/03/2013 12:46 PM]
May 3, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 05/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [927030] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/03/2013 12:14 PM]
May 3, 2013 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC, FILED. Service date 05/03/2013 by CM/ECF.[927025] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/03/2013 12:12 PM]
May 3, 2013 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[926791] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/03/2013 10:39 AM]
May 3, 2013 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/29/2013, RECEIVED.[926790] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/03/2013 10:38 AM]
May 3, 2013 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 04/18/2013, RECEIVED.[926789] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/03/2013 10:38 AM]
May 3, 2013 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., district court receipt # 0208-8464503, FILED.[926787] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/03/2013 10:38 AM]
May 3, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc., FILED. [926759] [13-1720] [Entered: 05/03/2013 10:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viacom International, Inc. v. Youtube, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hank Green
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Anaheim Ballet
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Raymond T. Nimmer
Represented By: Lawrence A. Sucharow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kevin Nalty
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Adam Bahner
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ronald A. Cass
Represented By: Lawrence A. Sucharow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Federation of Musicians of the United States and Canada
Represented By: Joseph Vitale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Media Institute
Represented By: Eleanor M. Lackman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kartemquin Films
Represented By: Jennifer M. Urban Esq.
Represented By: Brianna L. Schofield Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Intellectual Property and Internet Law Professors
Represented By: Rebecca S. Engrav Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rawn Erickson
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Studio Transportation Drivers, Local 399, International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: Joseph Vitale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Consumer Action
Represented By: Deepak Gupta Esq.
Represented By: Anthony P. Schoenberg Esq.
Represented By: Erik C. Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Allison Trippy
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: eBay Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Access
Represented By: Deepak Gupta Esq.
Represented By: Anthony P. Schoenberg Esq.
Represented By: Erik C. Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees
Represented By: Joseph Vitale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Directors Guild of America, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Vitale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Computer & Communications Industry Association
Represented By: Jonathan Band Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Freedom House
Represented By: Deepak Gupta Esq.
Represented By: Anthony P. Schoenberg Esq.
Represented By: Erik C. Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Charles Trippy
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Human Rights Watch
Represented By: Deepak Gupta Esq.
Represented By: Anthony P. Schoenberg Esq.
Represented By: Erik C. Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Charles Todd
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Stuart N. Brotman
Represented By: Lawrence A. Sucharow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Copyright Alliance
Represented By: Eleanor M. Lackman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michael Bassik
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Learning About Multimedia Project, Inc.
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tumblr, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Independent Film & Television Alliance
Represented By: Susan Cleary Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Barnett Zitron
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Consumers League
Represented By: Deepak Gupta Esq.
Represented By: Anthony P. Schoenberg Esq.
Represented By: Erik C. Olson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Recording Industry Association of America, Inc.
Represented By: Russell J. Frackman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IAC/InterActiveCorp
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: John Green
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dane Boedigheimer
Represented By: Ron Lazebnik Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers
Represented By: Russell J. Frackman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Knowledge
Represented By: Corynne M. McSherry Esq.
Represented By: Michael Barclay Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Screen Actors Guild-American Federation of Television and Radio Artists
Represented By: Joseph Vitale Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Alliance for Media Art & Culture
Represented By: Jennifer M. Urban Esq.
Represented By: Brianna L. Schofield Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Consumer Electronics Association
Represented By: Kenneth B. Wilson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Motion Picture Association of America, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly M. Klaus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Alliance for Community Media
Represented By: Jennifer M. Urban Esq.
Represented By: Brianna L. Schofield Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Russell J. Frackman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Minority Media & Telecommunications Council, Inc.
Represented By: Eleanor M. Lackman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Corynne M. McSherry Esq.
Represented By: Michael Barclay Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SESAC, Inc.
Represented By: Russell J. Frackman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Comedy Partners
Represented By: Susan J. Kohlmann Esq.
Represented By: Paul M. Smith Esq.
Represented By: Scott Wilkens Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Susan J. Kohlmann Esq.
Represented By: Paul M. Smith Esq.
Represented By: Scott Wilkens Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Country Music Television, Inc.
Represented By: Susan J. Kohlmann Esq.
Represented By: Paul M. Smith Esq.
Represented By: Scott Wilkens Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Black Entertainment Television, LLC
Represented By: Susan J. Kohlmann Esq.
Represented By: Paul M. Smith Esq.
Represented By: Scott Wilkens Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Represented By: Susan J. Kohlmann Esq.
Represented By: Paul M. Smith Esq.
Represented By: Scott Wilkens Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YouTube LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro Esq.
Represented By: David Bernard Schwartz Esq.
Represented By: Brian M. Willen Esq.
Represented By: David H. Kramer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Google Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro Esq.
Represented By: David Bernard Schwartz Esq.
Represented By: Brian M. Willen Esq.
Represented By: David H. Kramer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Football Association Premier League Limited
Represented By: Charles S. Sims Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cal IV Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Sims Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Murbo Music Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Sims Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: X-Ray Dog Music, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Sims Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Federation Francaise De Tennis
Represented By: Charles S. Sims Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bourne Co.
Represented By: Charles S. Sims Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?