J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellant: J.T. Colby & Company, Inc., DBA Brick Towers Press, J. Boyston & Company, Publishers LLC and Ipicturebooks LLC
Defendant - Appellee: Apple Inc., AKA Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 13-2227
Filed: June 6, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: PROPERTY RIGHTS-Trademark
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2014 Filing 134 PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 10/14/2014 by CM/ECF.[1343478] [13-2227]
September 29, 2014 Filing 131 SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, order of the district court is affirmed, by DAL, GEL, CFD, FILED.[1330685] [13-2227]
September 29, 2014 Filing 130 NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[1330675] [13-2227]
September 25, 2014 Filing 128 ARGUMENT CD, TRANSMITTED to Bonnie Jarrett.[1328986] [13-2227]
September 18, 2014 Filing 127 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD FROM KIRKLAND & ELLIS, with fee, RECEIVED.[1323830] [13-2227]
September 11, 2014 Filing 126 CASE, before DAL, GEL, CFD, C.JJ., HEARD.[1317555] [13-2227]
July 17, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., FILED. Service date 07/17/2014 by CM/ECF. [1274184] [13-2227]
July 17, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 07/17/2014 by CM/ECF. [1273938] [13-2227]
July 17, 2014 Filing 123 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1273631] [13-2227]
July 16, 2014 Filing 121 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 09/11/2014, SET.[1272456] [13-2227]
June 30, 2014 Filing 120 ATTORNEY, Paul T. Crane, for Apple Inc., TERMINATED.[1259802] [13-2227]
June 27, 2014 Filing 119 LETTER, advising the Court of attorney Crane's withdrawal, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 06/27/2014 by CM/ECF.[1259721] [13-2227]--[Edited 06/30/2014 by JW]
June 20, 2014 Filing 118 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 09/08/2014, PROPOSED.[1253634] [13-2227]
May 23, 2014 Filing 115 LETTER, advising the Court of unavailability dates, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 05/23/2014 by CM/ECF.[1232587] [13-2227]--[Edited 05/23/2014 by JW]
May 1, 2014 Filing 112 LETTER, advising the Court of unavailability dates, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 05/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1214539] [13-2227]--[Edited 05/01/2014 by JW]
April 2, 2014 Filing 108 LETTER, advising the Court of unavailability dates, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 04/02/2014 by CM/ECF.[1192768] [13-2227]--[Edited 04/02/2014 by JW]
April 1, 2014 Filing 107 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 06/23/2014, PROPOSED.[1191180] [13-2227]
March 20, 2014 Filing 104 LETTER, updating the Court on unavailability dates, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 03/20/2014 by CM/ECF.[1182973] [13-2227]--[Edited 03/20/2014 by JW]
March 19, 2014 Filing 100 LETTER, updating the Court on unavailability dates, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 03/19/2014 by CM/ECF.[1182299] [13-2227]--[Edited 03/20/2014 by JW]
February 25, 2014 Filing 97 LETTER, updating the Court on unavailability dates, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 02/25/2014 by CM/ECF.[1164312] [13-2227]--[Edited 02/25/2014 by JW]
February 11, 2014 Filing 92 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 02/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1155126] [13-2227]
February 11, 2014 Filing 91 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., FILED. Service date 02/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1155033] [13-2227]
February 11, 2014 Filing 90 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 02/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1154943] [13-2227]
January 28, 2014 Filing 87 DEFERRED SEALED APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. [1149587] [13-2227]
January 28, 2014 Filing 86 DEFERRED SEALED APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. [1149585] [13-2227]
January 28, 2014 Filing 85 DEFERRED SEALED APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. [1149583] [13-2227]
January 28, 2014 Filing 84 DEFERRED SEALED APPENDIX, volume 3 of 6, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. [1149576] [13-2227]
January 28, 2014 Filing 83 DEFERRED SEALED APPENDIX, volume 2 of 6, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. [1149574] [13-2227]--[Edited 02/04/2014 by JW]
January 28, 2014 Filing 82 DEFERRED SEALED APPENDIX, volume 1 of 6, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. [1149572] [13-2227]
January 28, 2014 Filing 80 DEFERRED SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 01/28/2014 by CM/ECF.[1144061] [13-2227]--[Edited 01/30/2014 by JW]
January 28, 2014 Filing 79 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 01/28/2014 by CM/ECF.[1144057] [13-2227]
January 28, 2014 Filing 78 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 01/28/2014 by CM/ECF.[1144044] [13-2227]
January 28, 2014 Filing 77 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 01/28/2014 by CM/ECF.[1144040] [13-2227]
January 28, 2014 Filing 76 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 3 of 6, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 01/28/2014 by CM/ECF.[1144034] [13-2227]
January 28, 2014 Filing 75 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 2 of 6, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 01/28/2014 by CM/ECF.[1144019] [13-2227]
January 28, 2014 Filing 74 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 1 of 6, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 01/28/2014 by CM/ECF.[1144003] [13-2227]
January 21, 2014 Filing 71 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 01/21/2014 by CM/ECF. [1138378] [13-2227]
December 31, 2013 Filing 68 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Robert Lloyd Raskopf, Esq. for Appellant J.T. Colby & Company, Inc., J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 12/31/2013 by CM/ECF. [1124035] [13-2227]
December 30, 2013 Filing 66 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Richard P. Bress for Appellee Apple Inc., FILED. Service date 12/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [1123289] [13-2227]
December 18, 2013 Filing 65 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., FILED. Service date 12/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1118425] [13-2227]
December 18, 2013 Filing 64 ATTORNEY, Matthew W. Walch, Paul T. Crane III, and Richard P. Bress for Apple Inc., in case 13-2227 , [63], [62], [61], ADDED.[1118222] [13-2227]
December 18, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., FILED. Service date 12/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1117902] [13-2227]
December 18, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., FILED. Service date 12/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1117897] [13-2227]
December 18, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., FILED. Service date 12/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1117891] [13-2227]
October 4, 2013 Filing 60 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file reply brief and deferred appendix , [56] filed by Appellant J.T. Colby & Company, Inc., J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. [1058955][60] [13-2227]
September 30, 2013 Filing 56 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 09/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [1054173] [13-2227]
September 25, 2013 Filing 55 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Apple Inc. Page Proof Brief due date as 12/18/2013, FILED.[1050582] [13-2227]
September 24, 2013 Filing 52 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 12/18/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 09/24/2013 by CM/ECF.[1050072] [13-2227]
September 18, 2013 Filing 47 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 09/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1044949] [13-2227]
August 8, 2013 Filing 46 SO-ORDERED NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, to file a deferred appendix, FILED.[1011174] [13-2227]
August 3, 2013 Filing 40 NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, re: for a deferred appendix, RECEIVED. Service date 08/03/2013 by CM/ECF.[1007086] [13-2227]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by JW]
July 31, 2013 Filing 39 NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, re: for a deferred appendix, RECEIVED. Service date 07/31/2013 by CM/ECF.[1003978] [13-2227]--[Edited 08/05/2013 by JW]
July 31, 2013 Filing 38 ATTORNEY, David Alexander Shaiman for J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC iPicturebooks LLC J.T. Colby & Company, Inc., in case 13-2227 , [37], ADDED.[1003458] [13-2227]
July 30, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 07/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [1003295] [13-2227]
July 17, 2013 Filing 36 ATTORNEY, Bonnie Jarrett for Apple Inc., in case 13-2227 , [34], ADDED.[991829] [13-2227]
July 16, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., FILED. Service date 07/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [991724] [13-2227]
July 2, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[980433] [13-2227]
July 2, 2013 Filing 32 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC Brief due date as 09/18/2013; Joint Appendix due date as 09/18/2013, FILED.[980424] [13-2227]
June 28, 2013 Filing 29 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 09/18/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[978703] [13-2227]
June 20, 2013 Filing 28 ATTORNEY, Dale Cendali, [25], in place of attorney Jennifer Barry, SUBSTITUTED.[970945] [13-2227]
June 20, 2013 Filing 27 CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/16/2013, Start Time: 3:00 PM, endorsed by Vidya Kurella, FILED.[970875] [13-2227]
June 20, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., FILED. Service date 06/20/2013 by CM/ECF. [970433] [13-2227]
June 20, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., FILED. Service date 06/20/2013 by CM/ECF. [970419] [13-2227]
June 19, 2013 Filing 23 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[969926] [13-2227]
June 19, 2013 Filing 20 AMENDED CAPTION PAGE, correction to parties names as reflected on district court order, SENT.[969826] [13-2227]
June 19, 2013 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Todd Anten for J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC iPicturebooks LLC J.T. Colby & Company, Inc., in case 13-2227 , [16], ADDED.[969787] [13-2227]
June 19, 2013 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Partha P. Chattoraj for J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC iPicturebooks LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc., in case 13-2227 , [15], ADDED.[969786] [13-2227]
June 19, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 06/19/2013 by CM/ECF. [969605] [13-2227]
June 19, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. and iPicturebooks LLC, FILED. Service date 06/19/2013 by CM/ECF. [969597] [13-2227]
June 19, 2013 Filing 14 ATTORNEY, Perry Viscounty for Apple Inc., in case 13-2227 , [13], ADDED.[969587] [13-2227]
June 19, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., FILED. Service date 06/19/2013 by CM/ECF. [969525] [13-2227]
June 19, 2013 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Apple Inc., FILED. Service date 06/19/2013 by CM/ECF.[969519] [13-2227]
June 19, 2013 Filing 11 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant iPicturebooks LLC, J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/19/2013 by CM/ECF, email.[969489] [13-2227]
June 19, 2013 Filing 10 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant iPicturebooks LLC, J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/19/2013 by CM/ECF, email.[969477] [13-2227]
June 19, 2013 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant iPicturebooks LLC, J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/19/2013 by email, CM/ECF.[969461] [13-2227]
June 6, 2013 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[958960] [13-2227]
June 6, 2013 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant iPicturebooks LLC, J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc., district court receipt # 0208-8575614, FILED.[958959] [13-2227]
June 6, 2013 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/09/2013, RECEIVED.[958958] [13-2227]
June 6, 2013 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/08/2013, RECEIVED.[958954] [13-2227]
June 6, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant iPicturebooks LLC, J. Boylston & Company, Publishers LLC, J.T. Colby & Company, Inc., FILED. [958945] [13-2227]

Search for this case: J.T. Colby & Company, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: J.T. Colby & Company, Inc., DBA Brick Towers Press
Represented By: Partha P. Chattoraj
Represented By: Robert L. Raskopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: J. Boyston & Company
Represented By: Partha P. Chattoraj
Represented By: Robert L. Raskopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Publishers LLC
Represented By: Partha P. Chattoraj
Represented By: Robert L. Raskopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Ipicturebooks LLC
Represented By: Partha P. Chattoraj
Represented By: Robert L. Raskopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Apple Inc., AKA Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Barry
Represented By: Claudia E. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?