Anwar v. Fairfield Greenwich Limited
Defendant: GlobeOp Financial Services LLC
Plaintiff / Appellee: Pasha S. Anwar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated investors in the Greenwich Sentry, L.P. private investment limited partnership, Julia Anwar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated investors in the Greenwich Sentry, L.P. private investment limited partnership, Inter-American Trust, Elvira 1950 Trust, Bonaire Limited, Carlos Gauch, Loana Ltd., Wall Street Securities, S.A., Banco General, S.A., Harvest Dawn International Inc., El Prado Trading, Omawa Investment Corporation, Carmel Ventures Ltd., Traconcorp, Blythel Associated Corp., Marrekesh Resources, Centro Inspection Agency, Kalandar International, Landville Capital Management S.A., 20/20 Investments, AXA Private Management, St. Stephen's School, Diversified Investments Associates Class A Units, ABR Capital Fixed Option/Income Strategic Fund LP, Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Miguel Lomeli, Jitendra Bhatia, Gopal Bhatia, Kishanchand Bhatia, Jayshree Bhatia, Mandakini Gajaria, ABN AMRO LIFE S.A., Bahia del Rio S.A., Diamond Hills Inc., Kivory Corporation, North Club, Incorporated, PFA Pension A/S, Taurus the Fourth Ltd., Zenn Assets Holding, Ltd., Carlos Mattos, Chandrashekar Gupta, Ulrich Blass, Roberto Cioci, Sandra Marchi Cioci, John Paul Dougherty, Lila Neemberry, Peter A. & Rita M. Carfagna Irrevocable Charitable Remainder UniTrust, Moshe Podhorzer, R. Wickneswari V. Ratnam, Enrique Santos, Enrique Santos Calderon, Jacqueline Urzola, Josefina Santos Urzola, Felipe J. Benavides, Fundacion Virgilio Barco, David Hopkins, Catalina Mejia, Cesar Mejia, R.M. Rademaker, The Alpha and Omega Partnership, LP, Richmon Company Ltd., Positano Investment Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, On behalf of Itself, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, Shimon Laor, David I. Ferber, The Knight Services Holdings Limited, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Frank E. Pierce, Frank E. Pierce Ira, Nadav Zohar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Ronit Zohar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Fairfield Sentry Ltd., Headway Investment Corp., BPV Finance (International) Ltd., Jose Antonio Pujals, individually and in their representative capacities for all those similarly situated, Rosa Julieta A De Pujals, individually and in their representative capacities for all those similarly situated, Maridom Limited, a Foreign Corporation, Ricardo Lopez, Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, Stanchart Securities International, Inc., Maria Akriby Valladolid, Ricardo Rodriguez Caso, Wong Yuk Hing de Lou, Moises Lou Martinez, Joaquina Teresa Barbachano Herrero, Sand Overseas Limited, Blockbend Ltd., Baymall Investments Ltd, Eastfork Assets Ltd, Gerico Investments, Inc., Alicia Gaviria Rivera, Eduardo Child Escobar, Mailand Inevstment Inc., Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, Harel Insurance Company Ltd., Bevington Management, Ltd., Calwell Investment S.A., Hedge Strategy Fund LLC, Deepa Gupta, E. Thomas Dougherty Novella and Muniandy Nalaiah
Defendant / Appellant: PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V., CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, Citco Canada Inc., Citco Global Custody N.V., Citco Group Limited, Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited and Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P.
Case Number: 13-2345
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: TORTS PERSONAL PROPERTY-Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2014 Filing 244 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[1267353] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/10/2014 09:19 AM]
June 19, 2014 Filing 242 NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[1252940] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/19/2014 04:14 PM]
June 19, 2014 Filing 239 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/19/2014, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1251913] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/19/2014 08:33 AM]
June 19, 2014 Filing 238 SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, vacating the class certification order and remanding for futher proceedings in the district court, by RSP, RR, DC, FILED.[1251908] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/19/2014 08:28 AM]
May 14, 2014 Filing 236 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD From HUGHES et al with fee, RECEIVED.[1224966] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 05/14/2014 06:20 PM]
May 5, 2014 Filing 235 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD From BOIES ET AL., with fee, RECEIVED.[1216991] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 05/05/2014 06:14 PM]
May 2, 2014 Filing 234 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP with fee, RECEIVED.[1215779] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 05/02/2014 04:05 PM]
May 2, 2014 Filing 233 CASE, before RSP, RR, DC, C.JJ., HEARD.[1215408] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 05/02/2014 11:49 AM]
April 29, 2014 Filing 231 LETTER, advising the Court of an omission of a citation in the reply brief, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited, RECEIVED. Service date 04/29/2014 by CM/ECF.[1212577] [13-2345]--[Edited 04/29/2014 by JW] [Entered: 04/29/2014 04:21 PM]
April 3, 2014 Filing 230 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, [ # 1193279-2 ], on behalf of Appellant PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V. and Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. in 13-2340, FILED.[1193609] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 04/03/2014 10:42 AM]
April 2, 2014 Filing 229 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain and St. Stephen's School, FILED. Service date 04/02/2014 by CM/ECF. [1193280] [13-2345] [Entered: 04/02/2014 05:13 PM]
April 2, 2014 Filing 228 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V. and Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 04/02/2014 by CM/ECF.[1193055] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 04/02/2014 03:21 PM]
April 2, 2014 Filing 227 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1192730] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 04/02/2014 12:11 PM]
March 20, 2014 Filing 226 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 05/02/2014, SET.[1183314] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 03/20/2014 04:07 PM]
February 27, 2014 Filing 225 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 04/28/2014, PROPOSED.[1167099] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 02/27/2014 04:02 PM]
February 18, 2014 Filing 223 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 04/28/2014, PROPOSED.[1158195] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 02/18/2014 12:12 PM]
January 30, 2014 Filing 218 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 04/07/2014, B, PROPOSED.[1145807] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 01/30/2014 11:01 AM]
January 16, 2014 Filing 215 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 03/17/2014, PROPOSED.[1135548] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 01/16/2014 10:58 AM]
November 15, 2013 Filing 213 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to seal reply brief and to publicly file a redacted version [ # 207 ] filed by Appellant Citco Group Limited, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, Citco Canada Inc. and Citco Global Custody N.V. in 13-2340, by DAL, FILED. [1093832][213] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 11/15/2013 02:26 PM]
November 6, 2013 Filing 214 SEALED REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1095942] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 11/19/2013 10:23 AM]
November 6, 2013 Filing 210 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 11/06/2013 by US mail, CM/ECF. [1086093] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 11/06/2013 08:35 PM]
November 6, 2013 Filing 209 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V. and Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 11/06/2013 by CM/ECF. [1085570] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 11/06/2013 01:25 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 207 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081964] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 11/01/2013 03:17 PM]
October 29, 2013 Filing 205 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 10/29/2013 by CM/ECF. [1078822] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/29/2013 06:06 PM]
October 28, 2013 Filing 202 ATTORNEY, Victor Edwin Stewart for Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust St. Stephen's School Harel Insurance Company, Ltd. Securities & Investment Company Bahrain[ # 201 ], ADDED.[1076846] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/28/2013 01:35 PM]
October 28, 2013 Filing 201 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2345, FILED. Service date 10/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [1076710] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/28/2013 12:23 PM]
October 26, 2013 Filing 200 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2345, FILED. Service date 10/26/2013 by CM/ECF. [1076069] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/26/2013 03:52 PM]
October 25, 2013 Filing 199 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Walter Rieman, Esq. for Appellant Citco Group Limited, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, Citco Canada Inc. and Citco Global Custody N.V. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 10/25/2013 by CM/ECF. [1076051] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/25/2013 06:03 PM]
October 24, 2013 Filing 198 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Stuart H. Singer, Esq. for Appellee Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., St. Stephen's School and Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 10/24/2013 by CM/ECF. [1074959] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/24/2013 05:15 PM]
October 24, 2013 Filing 197 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Sarah Loomis Cave, Esq. for Appellant PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V. in 13-2340, FILED. Service date 10/24/2013 by CM/ECF. [1074796] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/24/2013 04:03 PM]
October 24, 2013 Filing 195 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Christopher Landau for Appellant Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. and PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V. in 13-2340, FILED. Service date 10/24/2013 by CM/ECF. [1074276] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/24/2013 11:29 AM]
October 21, 2013 Filing 194 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, Appellee Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2345, FILED. Service date 10/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [1071374] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/21/2013 04:23 PM]
October 21, 2013 Filing 193 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2345, FILED. Service date 10/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [1070916] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/21/2013 12:45 PM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 190 SEALED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2345, FILED. [1068565] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/17/2013 03:35 PM]
October 15, 2013 Filing 189 CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2345, FILED. Service date 10/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [1065231] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/15/2013 10:39 AM]
October 11, 2013 Filing 188 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2345, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF. [1064842] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/11/2013 09:49 PM]
October 8, 2013 Filing 185 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2345, FILED. Service date 10/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [1061560] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 10/08/2013 05:06 PM]
September 24, 2013 Filing 179 MOTION, to extend time, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2345, FILED. Service date 09/24/2013 by CM/ECF. [1050210] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 09/24/2013 06:31 PM]
August 28, 2013 Filing 175 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[1028027] [13-2345] [Entered: 08/28/2013 11:10 AM]
August 28, 2013 Filing 173 MOTION, for Denial of Motion for Argument in Tandem with 13-1581, on behalf of Appellant PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V. and Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [1027910] [13-2340, 13-2345]--[Edited 08/28/2013 by JW] [Entered: 08/28/2013 10:27 AM]
August 27, 2013 Filing 172 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2345, informing Court of proposed due date 10/04/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 08/27/2013 by CM/ECF.[1027291] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/27/2013 03:17 PM]
August 19, 2013 Filing 111 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 9 of 48, (pp. 2401-2700), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/19/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019939] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 12:02 PM]
August 19, 2013 Filing 110 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 8 of 48, (pp. 2101-2400), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/19/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019923] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 11:58 AM]
August 19, 2013 Filing 109 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 7 of 48, (pp. 1801-2100), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/19/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019910] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 11:55 AM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 170 SEALED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1024442] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/23/2013 10:25 AM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 161 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 48 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020564] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:58 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 160 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 47 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020555] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:55 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 159 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 46 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020551] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:54 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 158 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 45 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020550] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:54 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 157 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 44 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020547] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:54 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 156 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 43 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020545] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:53 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 155 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 42 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020543] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:53 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 154 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 41 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020541] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:52 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 153 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 40 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020539] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:52 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 152 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 39 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020537] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:51 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 151 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 38 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020536] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:51 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 150 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 37 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020534] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:51 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 149 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 36 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020531] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:50 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 148 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 35 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020529] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:49 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 147 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 34 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020527] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:49 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 146 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 33 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020525] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:48 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 145 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 32 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020523] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:48 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 144 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 31 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020522] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:47 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 143 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 30 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020519] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:47 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 142 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 29 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020517] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:47 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 141 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 28 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020516] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:46 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 140 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 27 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020514] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:45 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 139 SEALED APPENDIX, voume 26 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020511] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:45 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 138 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 25 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020509] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:45 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 137 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 24 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020497] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:37 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 136 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 23 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020495] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:37 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 135 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 22 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020494] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:36 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 134 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 21 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020492] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:36 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 133 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 20 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020464] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:27 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 132 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 19 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020459] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:26 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 131 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 18 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020457] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:26 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 130 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 17 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020455] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:25 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 129 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 16 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020437] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:19 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 128 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 15 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020434] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:19 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 127 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 14 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020433] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:18 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 126 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 13 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020430] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:18 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 125 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 12 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020427] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:17 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 124 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 11 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020426] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:17 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 123 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 10 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020423] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:16 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 122 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 9 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020421] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:15 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 121 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 8 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020420] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:15 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 120 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 7 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020414] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:12 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 119 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 6 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020410] [13-2340, 13-2345]--[Edited 08/19/2013 by JW] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:11 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 118 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 5 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020406] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:10 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 117 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 4 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020404] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:09 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 116 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 3 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020399] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:09 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 115 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 2 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020396] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:08 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 114 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 1 of 48, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. [1020393] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/19/2013 04:07 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 108 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Sealed Joint Appendix Volumes 1-48 and the unredacted Brief of Defendants-Appellants, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019363] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 07:51 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 107 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1019361] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 07:01 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 106 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 48 of 48, (pp. 14101-14320), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019359] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:36 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 105 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 47 of 48, (pp. 13801-14100), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019357] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:34 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 104 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 46 of 48, (pp. 13501-13800), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019356] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:33 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 103 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 45 of 48, (pp. 13201-13500), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019355] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:31 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 102 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 44 of 48, (pp. 12901-13200), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019354] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:29 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 101 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 43 of 48, (pp. 12601-12900), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019353] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:27 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 100 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 42 of 48, (pp. 12301-12600), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019352] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:25 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 99 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 41 of 48, (pp. 12001-12300), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019351] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:24 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 98 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 40 of 48, (pp. 11701-12000), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019350] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:22 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 97 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 39 of 48, (pp. 11401-11700), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019349] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:21 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 96 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 38 of 48, (pp. 11101-11400), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019348] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:19 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 95 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 37 of 48, (pp. 10801-11100), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019347] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:17 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 94 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 36 of 48, (pp. 10501-10800), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019346] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:15 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 93 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 35 of 48, (pp. 10201-10500), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019345] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:14 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 92 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 34 of 48, (pp. 9901-10200), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019344] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:12 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 91 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 33 of 48, (pp. 9601-9900), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019343] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:11 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 90 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 32 of 48, (pp. 9301-9600), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019342] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:09 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 89 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 31 of 48, (pp. 9001-9300), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019341] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:08 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 88 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 30 of 48, (pp. 8701-9000), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019340] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:06 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 87 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 29 of 48, (pp. 8401-8700), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019338] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:04 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 86 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 28 of 48, (pp. 8101-8400), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019337] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:02 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 85 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 27 of 48, (pp. 7801-8100), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019336] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 06:00 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 84 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 26 of 48, (pp. 7501-7800), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019335] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:58 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 83 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 25 of 48, (pp. 7201-7500), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019334] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:56 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 82 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 24 of 48, (pp. 6901-7200), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019333] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:53 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 81 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 23 of 48, (pp. 6601-6900), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019330] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:52 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 80 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 22 of 48, (pp. 6301-6600), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019327] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:50 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 79 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 21 of 48, (pp. 6001-6300), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019326] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:48 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 78 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 20 of 48, (pp. 5701-6000), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019325] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:46 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 77 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 19 of 48, (pp. 5401-5700), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019322] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:44 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 76 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 18 of 48, (pp. 5101-5400), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019321] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:42 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 75 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 17 of 48, (pp. 4801-5100), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019319] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:40 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 74 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 16 of 48, (pp. 4501-4800), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019317] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:38 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 73 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 15 of 48, (pp. 4201-4500), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019316] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:36 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 72 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 14 of 48, (pp. 3901-4200), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019315] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:34 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 71 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 13 of 48, (pp. 3601-3900), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 04/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019313] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:32 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 70 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 12 of 48, (pp. 3301-3600), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019310] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:30 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 69 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 11 of 48, (pp. 3001-3300), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019307] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:27 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 68 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 10 of 48, (pp. 2701-3000), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019306] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:24 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 67 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 9 of 48, (pp. 2605-2700), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019300] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:18 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 66 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 9 of 48, (pp. 2401-2700), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019296] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:16 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 65 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 8 of 48, (pp. 2201-2400), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019295] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:14 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 64 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 8 of 48, (pp. 2101-2400), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019294] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:12 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 63 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 7 of 48, (pp. 1967-2100), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019292] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:09 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 62 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 7 of 48, (pp. 1801-2100), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019289] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:07 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 61 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 48, (pp. 1501-1800), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019284] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:04 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 60 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 48, (pp. 1201-1500), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019279] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:02 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 59 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 48, (pp. 901-1200), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019276] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 05:00 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 58 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 48, (pp. 601-900), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019271] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 04:58 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 57 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 48, (pp. 301-600), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019265] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 04:56 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 56 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 48, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019256] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 04:53 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 54 FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1019050] [13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 03:18 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 53 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Global Custody N.V. and Citco Group Limited in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1019043] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 03:14 PM]
August 16, 2013 Filing 52 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V. and Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 08/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1018967] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/16/2013 02:37 PM]
August 8, 2013 Filing 50 CAPTION, consolidated defendants added, AMENDED.[1011892] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 08/08/2013 02:33 PM]
July 18, 2013 Filing 49 CAPTION, Appellees outside of seven active parties terminated, AMENDED.[993501] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/18/2013 10:14 AM]
July 18, 2013 Filing 47 Appellees outside seven certified class representatives, TERMINATED.[993470] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/18/2013 10:03 AM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 46 ATTORNEY, Patrick James Somers for CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V. Citgo Global Custody N.V. Citco Group Limited Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited Citco Canada Inc. CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, in case 13-2345 Patrick James Somers for CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V. Citgo Global Custody N.V. Citco Group Limited Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited Citco Canada Inc. CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, in case 13-2340 , [ # 29 ], ADDED.[979920] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/01/2013 04:03 PM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 45 ATTORNEY, Gregory Laufer for CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V. Citgo Global Custody N.V. Citco Group Limited Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited Citco Canada Inc. CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, in case 13-2345 Gregory Laufer for CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V. Citgo Global Custody N.V. Citco Group Limited Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited Citco Canada Inc. CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, in case 13-2340 , [ # 28 ], ADDED.[979916] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/01/2013 04:02 PM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 44 ATTORNEY, Andrew Gordon for CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V. Citgo Global Custody N.V. Citco Group Limited Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited Citco Canada Inc. CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, in case 13-2345 Andrew Gordon for CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V. Citgo Global Custody N.V. Citco Group Limited Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited Citco Canada Inc. CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, in case 13-2340 , [ # 27 ], ADDED.[979911] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/01/2013 04:00 PM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 43 ATTORNEY, Leslie Gordon Fagen for CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V. Citgo Global Custody N.V. Citco Group Limited Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited Citco Canada Inc. CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, in case 13-2345 Leslie Gordon Fagen for CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V. Citgo Global Custody N.V. Citco Group Limited Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited Citco Canada Inc. CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, in case 13-2340 , [ # 26 ], ADDED.[979905] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/01/2013 03:57 PM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 42 ATTORNEY, Brad S. Karp for CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V. Citgo Global Custody N.V. Citco Group Limited Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited Citco Canada Inc. CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, in case 13-2345 Brad S. Karp for CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V. Citgo Global Custody N.V. Citco Group Limited Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited Citco Canada Inc. CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, in case 13-2340 , [ # 25 ], ADDED.[979901] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/01/2013 03:56 PM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 41 ATTORNEY, Stuart H. Singer for Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust St. Stephen's School Harel Insurance Company, Ltd. Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, in case 13-2345 Stuart H. Singer for Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust St. Stephen's School Harel Insurance Company, Ltd. Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, in case 13-2340 , [ # 23 ], ADDED.[979637] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/01/2013 01:57 PM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 40 ATTORNEY, Howard L. Vickery II for Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust St. Stephen's School Harel Insurance Company, Ltd. Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, in case 13-2345 Howard L. Vickery II for Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust St. Stephen's School Harel Insurance Company, Ltd. Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, in case 13-2340 , [ # 22 ], ADDED.[979635] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/01/2013 01:56 PM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 38 Appellee AXA Private Management, TERMINATED.[979604] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/01/2013 01:27 PM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 35 Appellees outside seven certified class representatives, TERMINATED.[979576] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/01/2013 01:05 PM]
July 1, 2013 Filing 33 CURED DEFECTIVE: SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION LETTER [ # 978704-2 ], [ # 19 ], [ # 978584-2 ], on behalf of Appellants PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V. and Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED.[979509] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 07/01/2013 12:20 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 32 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited and Citgo Global Custody N.V. in 13-2340, 13-2345, informing Court of proposed due date 08/16/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[978918] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 09:28 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 31 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited and Citgo Global Custody N.V. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[978916] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 09:25 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 30 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited and Citgo Global Custody N.V. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[978915] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 09:21 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited and Citgo Global Custody N.V. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [978914] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 09:16 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited and Citgo Global Custody N.V. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [978913] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 09:14 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited and Citgo Global Custody N.V. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [978911] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 09:09 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited and Citgo Global Custody N.V. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [978910] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 09:07 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited and Citgo Global Custody N.V. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [978908] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 09:03 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited and Citgo Global Custody N.V. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[978907] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 08:59 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [978856] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 05:25 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [978852] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 05:17 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Harel Insurance Company, Ltd., Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd., Pacific West Health Medical Center, Inc. Employee's Retirement Trust, Securities & Investment Company Bahrain, St. Stephen's School and St. Stephen's School in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[978811] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 04:37 PM]
June 28, 2013 Filing 19 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION FORM, [ # 978584-2 ], on behalf of Appellants PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V. and Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. in 13-2340, FILED.[978613] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/28/2013 03:29 PM]
June 24, 2013 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Sarah Loomis Cave for PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V., in case 13-2345 Sarah Loomis Cave for PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V., in case 13-2340 , [ # 16 ], ADDED.[973483] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/24/2013 02:59 PM]
June 21, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants Netherlands N.V. in 13-2340, FILED. Service date 06/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [971957] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/21/2013 12:42 PM]
June 21, 2013 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants Netherlands N.V. in 13-2340, FILED. Service date 06/21/2013 by CM/ECF.[971935] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/21/2013 12:32 PM]
June 21, 2013 Filing 13 ATTORNEY, Emily Porter Hughes for Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., in case 13-2345 Emily Porter Hughes for Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P., in case 13-2340 , [ # 12 ], ADDED.[971783] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/21/2013 11:21 AM]
June 21, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. in 13-2340, FILED. Service date 06/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [971519] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/21/2013 09:12 AM]
June 21, 2013 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/21/2013 by CM/ECF.[971514] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/21/2013 09:09 AM]
June 21, 2013 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. in 13-2340, 13-2345, FILED. Service date 06/21/2013 by CM/ECF.[971511] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/21/2013 09:07 AM]
June 20, 2013 Filing 9 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants Netherlands N.V. and Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P. in 13-2340, district court receipt # 465401070215, FILED.[970731] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/20/2013 12:37 PM]
June 19, 2013 Filing 8 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited and Citgo Global Custody N.V. in 13-2345, district court receipt # 465401069936, FILED.[968919] [13-2345, 13-2340] [Entered: 06/19/2013 09:44 AM]
June 14, 2013 Filing 6 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/30/2012, RECEIVED.[966891] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/17/2013 01:57 PM]
June 14, 2013 Filing 5 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/06/2013, RECEIVED.[966887] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/17/2013 01:54 PM]
June 14, 2013 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/25/2013, RECEIVED.[966884] [13-2340, 13-2345] [Entered: 06/17/2013 01:53 PM]
June 14, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch, CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V., Citco Canada Inc., Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited, Citco Group Limited and Citgo Global Custody N.V. in 13-2345, FILED. [966725] [13-2345, 13-2340] [Entered: 06/17/2013 12:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Anwar v. Fairfield Greenwich Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Pasha S. Anwar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated investors in the Greenwich Sentry, L.P. private investment limited partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Julia Anwar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated investors in the Greenwich Sentry, L.P. private investment limited partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Inter-American Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Elvira 1950 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bonaire Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carlos Gauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Loana Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Wall Street Securities, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Banco General, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Harvest Dawn International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: El Prado Trading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Omawa Investment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carmel Ventures Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Traconcorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Blythel Associated Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Marrekesh Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Centro Inspection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kalandar International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Landville Capital Management S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: 20/20 Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AXA Private Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: St. Stephen's School
Represented By: David A. Barrett Esq.
Represented By: James Abram Harrod Esq.
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer Esq.
Represented By: Victor Edwin Stewart Esq.
Represented By: Howard L. Vickery Esq. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Diversified Investments Associates Class A Units
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ABR Capital Fixed Option/Income Strategic Fund LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Harel Investment and Financial Services Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Miguel Lomeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jitendra Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gopal Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kishanchand Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jayshree Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mandakini Gajaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ABN AMRO LIFE S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bahia del Rio S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Diamond Hills Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kivory Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: North Club, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PFA Pension A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Taurus the Fourth Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Zenn Assets Holding, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Carlos Mattos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Chandrashekar Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ulrich Blass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Roberto Cioci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sandra Marchi Cioci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Paul Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lila Neemberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Peter A. & Rita M. Carfagna Irrevocable Charitable Remainder UniTrust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Moshe Podhorzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: R. Wickneswari V. Ratnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Enrique Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Enrique Santos Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jacqueline Urzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Josefina Santos Urzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Felipe J. Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Fundacion Virgilio Barco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Catalina Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cesar Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: R.M. Rademaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: The Alpha and Omega Partnership, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richmon Company Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Positano Investment Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, On behalf of Itself
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Pacific West Health Medical Center Inc. Employees Retirement Trust, on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Carl Lester Stine Esq.
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer Esq.
Represented By: Victor Edwin Stewart Esq.
Represented By: Howard L. Vickery Esq. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shimon Laor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David I. Ferber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: The Knight Services Holdings Limited, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Frank E. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Frank E. Pierce Ira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Nadav Zohar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ronit Zohar, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Fairfield Sentry Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Headway Investment Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BPV Finance (International) Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jose Antonio Pujals, individually and in their representative capacities for all those similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rosa Julieta A De Pujals, individually and in their representative capacities for all those similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Maridom Limited, a Foreign Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ricardo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Stanchart Securities International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Maria Akriby Valladolid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ricardo Rodriguez Caso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Wong Yuk Hing de Lou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Moises Lou Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Joaquina Teresa Barbachano Herrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sand Overseas Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Blockbend Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Baymall Investments Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Eastfork Assets Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Gerico Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Alicia Gaviria Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Eduardo Child Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mailand Inevstment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Securities & Investment Company Bahrain
Represented By: David A. Barrett Esq.
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer Esq.
Represented By: Victor Edwin Stewart Esq.
Represented By: Howard L. Vickery Esq. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Harel Insurance Company Ltd.
Represented By: David A. Barrett Esq.
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer Esq.
Represented By: Victor Edwin Stewart Esq.
Represented By: Howard L. Vickery Esq. II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bevington Management, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Calwell Investment S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Hedge Strategy Fund LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Deepa Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: E. Thomas Dougherty Novella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Muniandy Nalaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlobeOp Financial Services LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Kim
Represented By: Jonathan D. Cogan
Represented By: David Harrison McGill Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PricewaterhouseCoopers Accountants N.V.
Represented By: Timothy A. Duffy Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Landau
Represented By: William R. Maguire
Represented By: Sarah L. Cave Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CITCO Fund Services (Europe) B.V.
Represented By: Walter Rieman Esq.
Represented By: Leslie Gordon Fagen
Represented By: Andrew Gordon
Represented By: Brad S. Karp Esq.
Represented By: Gregory Laufer Esq.
Represented By: Patrick James Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CITCO Bank Nederland N.V. Dublin Branch
Represented By: Walter Rieman Esq.
Represented By: Leslie Gordon Fagen
Represented By: Andrew Gordon
Represented By: Brad S. Karp Esq.
Represented By: Gregory Laufer Esq.
Represented By: Patrick James Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Citco Canada Inc.
Represented By: Walter Rieman Esq.
Represented By: Leslie Gordon Fagen
Represented By: Andrew Gordon
Represented By: Brad S. Karp Esq.
Represented By: Gregory Laufer Esq.
Represented By: Patrick James Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Citco Global Custody N.V.
Represented By: Walter Rieman Esq.
Represented By: Leslie Gordon Fagen
Represented By: Andrew Gordon
Represented By: Brad S. Karp Esq.
Represented By: Gregory Laufer Esq.
Represented By: Patrick James Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Citco Group Limited
Represented By: Walter Rieman Esq.
Represented By: Leslie Gordon Fagen
Represented By: Andrew Gordon
Represented By: Brad S. Karp Esq.
Represented By: Gregory Laufer Esq.
Represented By: Patrick James Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Citco Fund Services (Bermuda) Limited
Represented By: Walter Rieman Esq.
Represented By: Leslie Gordon Fagen
Represented By: Andrew Gordon
Represented By: Brad S. Karp Esq.
Represented By: Gregory Laufer Esq.
Represented By: Patrick James Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Pricewaterhousecoopers L.L.P.
Represented By: Timothy A. Duffy Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Landau
Represented By: William R. Maguire
Represented By: Emily Porter Hughes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?