United States of America v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case
Defendant: Hachette Book Group, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH, Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC, DBA Macmillan, The Penguin Group, A Division of Pearson PLC and Penguin Group (USA), Inc.
Plaintiff - Appellee: United States of America
Defendant - Appellant: Simon & Schuster, Inc. and Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 13-3748
Filed: October 7, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: STATUTES-Antitrust
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2014 Filing 253 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 12/15/2014, PROPOSED.[1342644] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
September 10, 2014 Filing 250 ATTORNEY, Malcolm Lay Stewart for United States of America, in case 13-3741 Malcolm Lay Stewart for United States of America, in case 13-3748 Malcolm Lay Stewart for United States of America, in case 13-3783 , [248], ADDED.[1316892] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
September 10, 2014 Filing 249 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Finnuala K. Tessier for Appellee United States of America in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 09/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1316740] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
September 10, 2014 Filing 248 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 09/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1316716] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
August 19, 2014 Filing 246 ATTORNEY, Andrew W. Amend for State of New York, in case 13-3867 Andrew W. Amend for State of New York, in case 13-3857 Andrew W. Amend for State of New York, in case 13-3741 Andrew W. Amend for State of New York, in case 13-3864 , [1298686-2], [1298691-2], ADDED.[1299064] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 15, 2014 Filing 232 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee United States of America in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 07/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1271553] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 15, 2014 Filing 231 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee State of Texas in 13-3741, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 07/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1271538] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 15, 2014 Filing 230 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3741, 13-3783, Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC in 13-3857, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 07/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1271411] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 15, 2014 Filing 229 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3741, 13-3783, Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC in 13-3857, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 07/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1271407] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 15, 2014 Filing 227 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3741, Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, FILED. Service date 07/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1271246] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 15, 2014 Filing 226 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3741, Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, FILED. Service date 07/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1271241] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 14, 2014 Filing 224 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1270737] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 14, 2014 Filing 223 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1270735] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 9, 2014 Filing 221 CURED DEFECTIVE PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, [218], on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, Apple Inc. in 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED.[1267114] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 218 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 06/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1262235] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 217 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for SEALED APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262225] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 216 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262222] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 215 SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262220] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 214 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 12 of 12, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262219] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 213 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 11 of 12, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262217] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 212 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 10 of 12, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262215] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 211 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 9 of 12, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262213] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 210 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 8 of 12, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262211] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 209 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 7 of 12, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262210] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 208 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 6 of 12, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262207] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 207 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 5 of 12, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262205] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 206 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 4 of 12, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262204] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 205 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 3 of 12, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262202] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 204 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 2 of 12, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262200] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
July 1, 2014 Filing 203 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 1 of 12, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 07/01/2014 by CM/ECF.[1262198] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 30, 2014 Filing 202 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, [197], on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, Apple Inc. in 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED.[1260274] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 25, 2014 Filing 199 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief [192] filed by Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, by RJL, Circuit Judge; FILED. [1257134][199] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 24, 2014 Filing 197 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 06/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1256725] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 24, 2014 Filing 196 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3741, 13-3783, Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC in 13-3857, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 06/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1256700] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 24, 2014 Filing 195 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3741, Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, FILED. Service date 06/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1256039] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 20, 2014 Filing 192 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 06/20/2014 by CM/ECF. [1253555] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 13, 2014 Filing 190 LETTER, dated 05/29/2014, on behalf of Eric Lipman - Assistant Attorney General requesting CD of the Oral Argument. Fee Paid. Forwarded to Calendar Team. Receipt # 220047. RECEIVED. Service date 06/13/2014 by US mail.[1248377] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 10, 2014 Filing 188 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Andrew S. Oldham for Appellee State of Texas in 13-3741, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 06/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1244681] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 10, 2014 Filing 187 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Robert H. Kohn, Esq. for Amicus Curiae Robert H. Kohn, FILED. Service date 06/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1244578] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 10, 2014 Filing 185 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Finnuala K. Tessier for Appellee United States of America in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 06/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1244388] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 10, 2014 Filing 181 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Eamon Paul Joyce for Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3741, Attorney Mr. Eamon Paul Joyce for -- Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3748, 13-3783, Attorney Mr. Eamon Paul Joyce for Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC in 13-3857, Attorney Mr. Eamon Paul Joyce for Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC in 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 06/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1244139] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 9, 2014 Filing 180 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr., Esq. for Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 06/09/2014 by CM/ECF. [1243860] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 9, 2014 Filing 179 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. James W Quinn for Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc. and Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc. in 13-3741, Attorney Mr. James W Quinn for Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, Attorney Mr. James W Quinn for -- Simon & Schuster, Inc. and Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc. in 13-3867, FILED. Service date 06/09/2014 by CM/ECF. [1243654] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
June 9, 2014 Filing 178 SO-ORDERED NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, stating the deferred appendix will be filed seven days after the filing of Appellants' reply briefs, FILED.[1242915] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 29, 2014 Filing 174 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to stay [126] filed by Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, by BDP, DAL, CFD, C.JJ, FILED. [1236145][174] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 29, 2014 Filing 172 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file document [165] filed by Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, by CFD, Circuit Judge; FILED. [1235596][172] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 27, 2014 Filing 170 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee State of Texas in 13-3741, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 05/27/2014 by CM/ECF. [1234047] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 27, 2014 Filing 169 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee United States of America in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 05/27/2014 by CM/ECF. [1234010] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 27, 2014 Filing 168 ATTORNEY, Arthur D'Andrea for State of Texas, in case 13-3867 Arthur D'Andrea for State of Texas, in case 13-3857 Arthur D'Andrea for State of Texas, in case 13-3741 Arthur D'Andrea for State of Texas, in case 13-3864 , [164], ADDED.[1233890] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 27, 2014 Filing 165 MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 05/27/2014 by CM/ECF. [1233179] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 23, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State of Texas in 13-3741, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 05/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1232712] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 20, 2014 Filing 163 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time [160] filed by Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc. and Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc. in 13-3741, by DAL, Circuit Judge; FILED. [1229001][163] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 19, 2014 Filing 160 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3741, Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, -- Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3867, FILED. Service date 05/19/2014 by CM/ECF. [1227758] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 16, 2014 Filing 156 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief [147] filed by Appellee United States of America in 13-3741, granting motion to file oversized brief [148] filed by Appellee State of Texas in 13-3741, by DAL, Circuit Judge; FILED. [1227096][156] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 14, 2014 Filing 152 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1224790] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 13, 2014 Filing 148 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellee State of Texas in 13-3741, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 05/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1223808] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 13, 2014 Filing 147 MOTION, to file oversized brief, on behalf of Appellee United States of America in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 05/13/2014 by CM/ECF. [1223775] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
May 12, 2014 Filing 143 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [130], on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3857, 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 05/12/2014 by CM/ECF.[1222620][143] [13-3857, 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 9, 2014 Filing 140 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 05/09/2014 by CM/ECF. [1221456] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
May 5, 2014 Filing 137 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [130], on behalf of Appellee State of Texas in 13-3857, 13-3741, 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 05/05/2014 by CM/ECF.[1216986][137] [13-3857, 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3864, 13-3867]
April 25, 2014 Filing 134 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 04/25/2014, to SDNY, ISSUED.[1210992] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
April 25, 2014 Filing 133 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to stay and granting a temporary stay of the class notification, [126] filed by Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, by PWH, C.JJ; FILED. [1210953][133] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
April 25, 2014 Filing 130 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to stay [126], on behalf of Appellee State of Texas in 13-3857, 13-3741, 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 04/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1210510][130] [13-3857, 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3864, 13-3867]
April 23, 2014 Filing 126 MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3857, 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 04/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1209026] [13-3857, 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3864, 13-3867]
March 19, 2014 Filing 123 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee United States of America in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783 Brief due date as 05/27/2014, FILED.[1182252] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
March 19, 2014 Filing 122 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee State of Texas in 13-3741, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867 Brief due date as 05/27/2014, FILED.[1182245] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
March 10, 2014 Filing 117 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee United States of America in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, informing Court of proposed due date 05/27/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 03/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1174572] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
March 10, 2014 Filing 116 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee State of Texas in 13-3741, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867, informing Court of proposed due date 05/27/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 03/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1173888] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
March 6, 2014 Filing 115 ATTORNEY, Andrew S. Oldham for State of Texas, in case 13-3867 Andrew S. Oldham for State of Texas, in case 13-3857 Andrew S. Oldham for State of Texas, in case 13-3741 Andrew S. Oldham for State of Texas, in case 13-3864 , [109], ADDED.[1172645] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
March 5, 2014 Filing 113 MOTION ORDER, granting motionon behalf Washington Legal Foundation to file amicus curiae brief & 10-day extension of time until March 14, 2014 [1162851-2] in 13-3741, by Ralph K. Winter, Circuit Judge., FILED. [1171313][113] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
March 4, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Economists, FILED. Service date 03/04/2014 by CM/ECF. [1170593] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]--[Edited 03/11/2014 by JT]
March 4, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Idaho, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of New Mexico, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of South Dakota, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Vermont, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin in 13-3741, Appellee State of Texas, The Commonwealth of Massachusetts, The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, The Commonwealth of Virginia, The District of Columbia, The State of Alabama, The State of Alaska, The State of Arizona, The State of Arkansas, The State of Colorado, The State of Connecticut, The State of Delaware, The State of Idaho, The State of Illinois, The State of Iowa, The State of Kansas, The State of Louisiana, The State of Maryland, The State of Michigan, The State of Missouri, The State of Nebraska, The State of New Mexico, The State of North Dakota, The State of Ohio, The State of South Dakota, The State of Tennessee, The State of Utah, The State of Vermont, The State of West Virginia and The State of Wisconsin in 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 03/04/2014 by CM/ECF. [1170514] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
February 25, 2014 Filing 106 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 02/25/2014 by CM/ECF. [1165341] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
February 25, 2014 Filing 104 NEW PARTY, Intervenor Washington Legal Foundation in 13-3741, Intervenor Washington Legal Foundation in 13-3748, Intervenor Washington Legal Foundation in 13-3783, Intervenor Washington Legal Foundation in 13-3857, Intervenor Washington Legal Foundation in 13-3864 and Intervenor Washington Legal Foundation in 13-3867, ADDED.[1165210] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
February 24, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Washington Legal Foundation, FILED. Service date 02/24/2013 by CM/ECF. [1163584] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]--[Edited 02/25/2014 by JT]
February 20, 2014 Filing 101 CURED DEFECTIVE notice of appearance [99], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Robert H. Kohn in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED.[1160600] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
February 19, 2014 Filing 100 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,brief, [1156759-2], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Robert H. Kohn in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED.[1160216] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
February 19, 2014 Filing 99 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,notice of appearance, [96], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Robert H. Kohn in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867, FILED.[1159933] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
February 19, 2014 Filing 98 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Robert H. Kohn in 13-3741, Amicus Curiae Robert H. Kohn in 13-3748, Amicus Curiae Robert H. Kohn in 13-3783, Amicus Curiae Robert H. Kohn in 13-3857, Amicus Curiae Robert H. Kohn in 13-3864 and Amicus Curiae Robert H. Kohn in 13-3867, ADDED.[1159677] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
February 13, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Robert H. Kohn , FILED. Service date 02/13/2014 by email. [1156170] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]--[Edited 02/19/2014 by JT]
February 10, 2014 Filing 93 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to stay [71] filed by Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, by PNL, GC, GEL, Circuit Judges; FILED. [1154497][93] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
February 10, 2014 Filing 90 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jennifer Thompson, ASSIGNED.[1153495] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
February 7, 2014 Filing 89 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3741, 13-3783, Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC in 13-3857, 13-3867, FILED. Service date 02/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1153112] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
February 7, 2014 Filing 87 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Simon & Schuster Digital Sales, Inc. and Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3741, Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, FILED. Service date 02/07/2014 by CM/ECF. [1152214] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
January 31, 2014 Filing 81 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [77], on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 01/31/2014 by CM/ECF.[1147263][81] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
January 24, 2014 Filing 77 OPPOSITION TO MOTION to stay [71], on behalf of Appellee United States of America in 13-3748, 13-3741, FILED. Service date 01/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1141349][77] [13-3748, 13-3741, 13-3857]
January 17, 2014 Filing 72 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [71], on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 01/17/2014 by CM/ECF.[1137526][72] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
January 17, 2014 Filing 71 MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, FILED. Service date 01/17/2014 by CM/ECF. [1137470] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
December 13, 2013 Filing 70 SO-ORDERED NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, Appellants Verlagsgruppe Georg von Holtzbrinck GmbH and Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC's principal brief must be filed on or before February 7, 2014, FILED.[1114491] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
December 9, 2013 Filing 67 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[1109747] [13-3857, 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3864, 13-3867]
December 9, 2013 Filing 66 CAPTION, cases consolidated, parties added, AMENDED.[1109698] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, 13-3857, 13-3864, 13-3867]
December 4, 2013 Filing 64 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals [51] filed by Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, by Susan L. Carney, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1107047][64] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]--[Edited 12/05/2013 by TW]
December 4, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[1106297] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
December 4, 2013 Filing 61 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783 Brief due date as 02/07/2014; FILED.[1106294] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
December 3, 2013 Filing 59 ATTORNEY, Mark D. Taticchi for Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH, in case 13-3741 Mark D. Taticchi for Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH, in case 13-3748 Mark D. Taticchi for Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH, in case 13-3783 , [58], ADDED.[1104897] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
December 2, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3741, -- Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 12/02/2013 by CM/ECF. [1104867] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
December 2, 2013 Filing 56 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783 Brief due date as 02/25/2014; FILED.[1104031] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
November 27, 2013 Filing 53 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, informing Court of proposed due date 02/25/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 11/27/2013 by CM/ECF.[1103666] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
November 27, 2013 Filing 52 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, informing Court of proposed due date 02/07/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 11/27/2013 by CM/ECF.[1102649] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
November 26, 2013 Filing 51 MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Apple Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 11/26/2013 by CM/ECF. [1102480] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
November 25, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[1100053] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
November 25, 2013 Filing 49 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC in 13-3741 Brief due date as 01/17/2014;. Joint Appendix due date as 01/17/2014, FILED.[1100051] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
November 20, 2013 Filing 47 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, [43], on behalf of Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3741, FILED.[1097205] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
November 15, 2013 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 11/15/2013, on behalf of Appellant Apple, Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783 , informing court of transcript delays, RECEIVED. Service date 11/15/2013 by CM/ECF.[1093643] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
November 13, 2013 Filing 44 ATTORNEY, Daniel Glen Swanson for Apple, Inc., in case 13-3741 Daniel Glen Swanson for Apple, Inc., in case 13-3748 Daniel Glen Swanson for Apple, Inc., in case 13-3783 , [23], ADDED.[1090605] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
November 12, 2013 Filing 43 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3741, -- Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3748, 13-3783, informing Court of proposed due date 01/17/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 11/12/2013 by CM/ECF.[1090049] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
November 1, 2013 Filing 42 SO-ORDERED NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, to file deferred appendix pursuant to FRAP 30 (c) and Local Rule 30.1 (c), dated 11/01/2013, FILED.[1081771] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]--[Edited 11/01/2013 by TW]
October 24, 2013 Filing 38 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States of America in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 10/24/2013 by CM/ECF.[1074165] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 21, 2013 Filing 36 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[1071202] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 18, 2013 Filing 35 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3741, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[1070228] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 18, 2013 Filing 34 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3741, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[1070227] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 18, 2013 Filing 31 ATTORNEY, Gregory Silbert for Simon & Schuster, Inc., in case 13-3748 , [29], ADDED.[1069964] [13-3748]
October 18, 2013 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Yehudah Lev Buchweitz for Simon & Schuster, Inc., in case 13-3748 , [28], ADDED.[1069960] [13-3748]
October 18, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1069570] [13-3748]
October 18, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1069561] [13-3748]
October 18, 2013 Filing 27 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[1069554] [13-3748]
October 18, 2013 Filing 26 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[1069550] [13-3748]
October 18, 2013 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc., FILED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[1069547] [13-3748]
October 18, 2013 Filing 24 ATTORNEY, Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. for Apple, Inc., in case 13-3741 Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. for Apple, Inc., in case 13-3748 Theodore J. Boutrous Jr. for Apple, Inc., in case 13-3783 , [23], ADDED.[1068927] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 17, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Apple, Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 10/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [1068691] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 17, 2013 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Apple, Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 10/17/2013 by CM/ECF.[1068622] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 17, 2013 Filing 21 ATTORNEY, Cynthia E. Richman for Apple, Inc., in case 13-3741 Cynthia E. Richman for Apple, Inc., in case 13-3748 Cynthia E. Richman for Apple, Inc., in case 13-3783 , [19], ADDED.[1067651] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 17, 2013 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Orin Samuel Snyder for Apple, Inc., in case 13-3741 Orin Samuel Snyder for Apple, Inc., in case 13-3748 Orin Samuel Snyder for Apple, Inc., in case 13-3783 , [16], ADDED.[1067649] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 16, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Apple, Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 10/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1067612] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 16, 2013 Filing 18 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Apple, Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 10/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1067609] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 16, 2013 Filing 17 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Apple, Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 10/16/2013 by CM/ECF.[1067608] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 16, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Apple, Inc. in 13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 10/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1067604] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 15, 2013 Filing 15 ATTORNEY, Eamon Paul Joyce for Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH, in case 13-3741 Eamon Paul Joyce for Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH, in case 13-3748 Eamon Paul Joyce for Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH, in case 13-3783 , [14], ADDED.[1064938] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 14, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3741, -- Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3748, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 10/14/2013 by CM/ECF. [1064886] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 11, 2013 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3741, 13-3783, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF.[1064824] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 11, 2013 Filing 12 ATTORNEY, Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr., [11], in place of attorney Orin Samuel Snyder, SUBSTITUTED.[1064716] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 11, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Apple, Inc. in 13-3741, FILED. Service date 10/11/2013 by CM/ECF. [1064676] [13-3741, 13-3748, 13-3783]
October 8, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC and Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH in 13-3783, FILED. [1062821] [13-3783, 13-3741, 13-3748]
October 8, 2013 Filing 9 ATTORNEY, Robert Nicholson for United States of America, in case 13-3741 Robert Nicholson for United States of America, in case 13-3748 , [7], ADDED.[1060610] [13-3741, 13-3748]
October 8, 2013 Filing 8 ATTORNEY, Finnuala K. Tessier, [6], in place of attorney Benjamin H. Torrance, SUBSTITUTED.[1060607] [13-3741, 13-3748]
October 8, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America in 13-3741, FILED. Service date 10/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [1060590] [13-3741, 13-3748]
October 8, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America in 13-3741, FILED. Service date 10/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [1060538] [13-3741, 13-3748]
October 8, 2013 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1060479] [13-3748]
October 7, 2013 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/05/2013, RECEIVED.[1059944] [13-3748]
October 7, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Simon & Schuster, Inc. in 13-3748, FILED. [1059942] [13-3748, 13-3741]

Search for this case: United States of America v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group, Inc.
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verlagsgruppe Georg Von Holtzbrinck GMBH
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holtzbrinck Publishers, LLC, DBA Macmillan
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Penguin Group, A Division of Pearson PLC
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Group (USA), Inc.
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Orin Samuel Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?