Peterson v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Defendant: Banca UBAE SpA
Plaintiff / Appellee: Susan Ciupaska, Theresa Desjardins, Randal D. Olson, Bryan Thomas Coulman, Mary Clyde Hart, Kristin Innocenzi, Anna Beard, Warren Richardson, Vanessa Richardson, Victor Mark Prevatt, Richard Schnorf, brother, Lavon Boyett, Mary Ann Johnston, Scott Spaulding, Mary Frances Black, Shirley Martin, Harold Ghumm, Earline Miller, John Price, Estate of Larry L. Scott, Darlene Hairston, Mary Lou Meurer, Margie Bates, William Giblin, Kimberly Moore, Linda Rose Rooney, Ronald Lemnah, Robyn Wigglesworth, Faye Belmer, Freas H. Kreischer, Jr., Shirley L. Smith, Cynthia Smith, Kia Briscoe Jones, Mary Ann Cobble, Michael Prindeville, Linda Sandback Fish, Janet Williams, Donald Giblin, Olympia Carletta, Michael McMahon, Thomas S. Perron, Donnie Bates, Charles Estes, Deborah Green, Jerryl Shropshire, James Abbott, Patricia Gerlach, Sharon Parker, Heidi Crudale LeGault, Cynthia Lou Hunt, Sherry L Johnson, Barbara Gallagher, Joseph R. Livingston, III, John Wyche, Annette Belmer, Lisa H. Hudson, Sean Gallagher, Nancy LaRiviere, Liberty Quirante Gregg, Miralda Alarcon, Richard J. Wallace, Sean Prindeville, Harold Lemnah, Frances Owens, Richard Gordon, Susan J. Sinsioco, Barbara Thorstad Warwick, Joyce Stephens, Billie Jean Bolinger, Ashley Ghumm, Diane Whitner, Dennis Ray Schultz, James Thorstad, Jr., Michael John Oliver, Estate of Nora Young, Michael Giblin, Sandra Wigglesworth, Rachel Caldera, Robert Stokes, Charles F. Cook, Eugene LaRiviere, Ashley Doray, Cristina Massa, Angela Milano, Jessica Watson, David Bohannon, Stephen Thomas Zone, Kathy Nathan Stelpflug, Henry Miller, Leona Mae Vargas, Paul Innocenzi, III, June Lyon, Horace Stephens, Sr., Estate of Barbara D. Prindeville, Dawn Swinson, James Baynard, James David Shipp, Sturghill D. Sturghill, Sharon Conley Petry, Theresa Riggs Camara, Orval Hunt, Angela Dawn Farthing, Michelle Perron, Patricia Thorstad Zosso, Rebecca Bowler, Henry Caleb Sauls, Roxanne V. Garcia Pryor, Peggy Stelpflug, Richard Menkins, III, Darren Keown, Robin Copeland Jordan, Dana Spaulding, Myra Burley, Tara Smith, Cathy L. Lawton, Megan Grummer, Peter Hlywiak, Sr., Michael LaRiviere, Ronald R. Perron, Kevin James Scott, Victor Thornton Prevatt, Wiseman Wiseman, Audrey Webb, Jon Christopher Scott, Denise Voyles, Donald Elberan Woollett, Michael Callahan, Jeffrey Cosner, Nathaniel Walter Jenkins, Marie Boulos, Shawn Biellow, Avenell Callahan, Victoria Jacobus, Eric Glenn Washington and Charles Jeffrey Schnorf
Cross Defendant: Estate of Rogath Saidi Saidi, Johnny Melendez, Jr., Edwine Valentine Mathe Katunda, Estate of John Rogath Saidi, Minerva Alvarado, Valentine Mathew Katunda, Ellen Marie Bomer, Thelma Anderson, Deborah Rubin, James Bland, Angelina Mathew Rutaheshelwa and Estate of Dotio Rmadhani
3Rd Party Defendant: Estate of Eric Walker, Estate of Billy San Pedro, Douglas Pontillo, Samuel Palmer, Louise Gaddo Blatter, Estate of John Hendrickson, John Brown, Robert Dean, Estate of Louis Melendez, Daniel Joy, Keith Estler, Rose Harris, James Owens, Arnold Edmond, Dudley Decker, John R. Cuddeback, Meta Weekes, Flossie Varney, Sila V. San Pedro, Estate of Laura Virginia Copeland, Jeanette Dougherty, Michael Martinez, John Hendrickson, Barbara Cuddeback, Joyce Clifford, Cindy Holmes, Louisa Punonet, Louis Estler, Jr., Howard Sparks, Andrea Ciarla, Scott M. Lewis, Cheryl L. Blood, Yasemin B. Pressley, Estate of David A. Lewis, Elena Rozenman and Estate of Virgel Hamilton
Appellee: Estate of Millard D. Campbell, Marie R. Campbell, Alan Hayman, Estate of Irma Franklin, Thomas Morgera, Catherine Fennig, Libby Kahane, Estate of Joshua E. Woody, Bessie A. Campbell and Laura E. Johnson
Defendant / Appellee: Geraldo Alvarado, Johnny Thompson, Eloise F. Selbe, Jonica L. Woody, Robert Simpson, Grisselle Alvarado, Sandra M. Wetmore, Donald R. Pontillo, Deborah Rhosto, Senator Haun, Starlina D. Taylor, Sean McDonough, Luisa Alvarado, Renee Eileen Simpson, Betty Laise, Herman C. Marthaler, III, John E. Adams, Felicia Hairston, Robert Fluegel, Lorraine Macgroglou, Mitchell Charles Hukill, Kendall K. Kitson, Jr., Penni Joyce, Francis Heiser and Thomas Bonk
Defendant / Appellant: Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran
Respondent / Appellee: Estelle Carroll
Case Number: 13-3952
Filed: October 18, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2015 Filing 98 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 04/27/2015, disposing of the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1494841] [13-3952] [Entered: 04/27/2015 04:59 PM]
April 27, 2015 Filing 97 NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[1494832] [13-3952] [Entered: 04/27/2015 04:54 PM]
April 27, 2015 Filing 96 FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[1494828] [13-3952] [Entered: 04/27/2015 04:52 PM]
March 13, 2015 Filing 90 FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 03/13/2015 by CM/ECF.[1460729] [13-3952] [Entered: 03/13/2015 04:47 PM]
March 13, 2015 Filing 88 RESPONSE to order to show cause, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, FILED. Service date 03/13/2015 by CM/ECF.[1460055] [13-3952] [Entered: 03/13/2015 10:54 AM]
February 11, 2015 Filing 87 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 02/11/2015, to SDNY (New York City), ISSUED.[1436738] [13-3952] [Entered: 02/11/2015 01:06 PM]
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER, dated 02/11/2015, parties to show cause, within 30 days of this order, why the stay of proceedings should not be lifted, by RDS, PWH, DAL, FILED.[1436709] [13-3952] [Entered: 02/11/2015 12:42 PM]
February 6, 2015 Filing 85 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 02/06/2015, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement discussions are still ongoing, RECEIVED. Service date 02/06/2015 by CM/ECF.[1432672] [13-3952]--[Edited 02/09/2015 by DE] [Entered: 02/06/2015 12:02 PM]
January 5, 2015 Filing 84 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 01/05/2015, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement discussions are still ongoing, RECEIVED. Service date 01/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1407813] [13-3952]--[Edited 01/06/2015 by DE] [Entered: 01/05/2015 06:29 PM]
December 5, 2014 Filing 83 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 12/05/2014, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement discussions are still ongoing, RECEIVED. Service date 12/05/2014 by CM/ECF.[1386400] [13-3952]--[Edited 12/09/2014 by DE] [Entered: 12/05/2014 03:46 PM]
November 5, 2014 Filing 82 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 11/05/2014, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement discussions are still ongoing, RECEIVED. Service date 11/05/2014 by CM/ECF.[1363304] [13-3952]--[Edited 11/06/2014 by DE] [Entered: 11/05/2014 04:40 PM]
October 6, 2014 Filing 81 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 10/06/2014, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement discussions are still ongoing, RECEIVED. Service date 10/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1337659] [13-3952]--[Edited 10/07/2014 by DE] [Entered: 10/06/2014 04:19 PM]
September 5, 2014 Filing 80 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 09/05/2014, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement discussions are still ongoing, RECEIVED. Service date 09/05/2014 by CM/ECF.[1313086] [13-3952]--[Edited 09/05/2014 by DE] [Entered: 09/05/2014 01:04 PM]
August 5, 2014 Filing 79 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 08/05/2014, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement discussions are still ongoing, RECEIVED. Service date 08/05/2014 by CM/ECF.[1287258] [13-3952]--[Edited 08/06/2014 by DE] [Entered: 08/05/2014 02:34 PM]
July 7, 2014 Filing 75 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 07/07/2014, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement discussions are still ongoing, RECEIVED. Service date 07/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1264529] [13-3952]--[Edited 07/07/2014 by DE] [Entered: 07/07/2014 01:11 PM]
June 5, 2014 Filing 74 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 06/05/2014, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement discussions are still ongoing, RECEIVED. Service date 06/05/2014 by CM/ECF.[1241838] [13-3952]--[Edited 06/06/2014 by DE] [Entered: 06/05/2014 05:49 PM]
May 5, 2014 Filing 73 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 05/05/2014, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement proposal remains under consideration, RECEIVED. Service date 05/05/2014 by CM/ECF.[1216908] [13-3952]--[Edited 05/05/2014 by DE] [Entered: 05/05/2014 04:38 PM]
April 4, 2014 Filing 72 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 04/04/2014, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement proposal still remains under consideration, RECEIVED. Service date 04/04/2014 by CM/ECF.[1194885] [13-3952]--[Edited 04/04/2014 by DE] [Entered: 04/04/2014 12:34 PM]
March 5, 2014 Filing 71 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 03/05/2014, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement proposal still remains under consideration, RECEIVED. Service date 03/05/2014 by CM/ECF.[1171371] [13-3952]--[Edited 03/05/2014 by DE] [Entered: 03/05/2014 02:54 PM]
February 5, 2014 Filing 70 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 02/05/2014, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, alerting court that settlement proposal still remains under consideration, RECEIVED. Service date 02/05/2014 by CM/ECF.[1150549] [13-3952]--[Edited 02/05/2014 by DE] [Entered: 02/05/2014 03:23 PM]
January 7, 2014 Filing 66 CAPTION, to reflect unconsolidation, AMENDED.[1126933] [13-3952] [Entered: 01/07/2014 09:32 AM]
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER, staying appeal 13-3952, FILED.[1126948] [13-3952] [Entered: 01/07/2014 09:36 AM]
January 6, 2014 Filing 64 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 01/06/2014, to SDNY (New York City), ISSUED.[1126663] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 01/06/2014 05:01 PM]
January 6, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to stay 13-3952; parties shall provide status updates to Court on a monthly basis, beginning 02/05/2014; granting motion to unconsolidate appeals 13-2952 & 13-3952 [ # 59 ] filed by Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952; by RDS, PWH, DAL, FILED. [1126655][63] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 01/06/2014 04:58 PM]
December 17, 2013 Filing 60 CURED DEFECTIVE Motion to stay, to unconsolidate appeals [ # 58 ], [ # 59 ],[ # 59 ], on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-3952, FILED.[1116557] [13-2952, 13-3952] [Entered: 12/17/2013 12:27 PM]
December 17, 2013 Filing 59 MOTION, to stay, to unconsolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3952, FILED. Service date 12/17/2013 by CM/ECF. [1116516] [13-2952, 13-3952] [Entered: 12/17/2013 12:01 PM]
December 17, 2013 Filing 58 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to stay, to unconsolidate appeals, [57],[57], on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-3952, FILED.[1116065] [13-3952, 13-2952] [Entered: 12/17/2013 08:37 AM]
December 16, 2013 Filing 57 MOTION, to stay, to unconsolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, FILED. Service date 12/16/2013 by CM/ECF. [1115678] [13-3952] [Entered: 12/16/2013 02:51 PM]
December 3, 2013 Filing 56 MOTION, to withdraw appeal, on behalf of Appellant Banca UBAE SpA in 13-3133, 13-2952, 13-3952, FILED. Service date 11/27/2013 by CM/ECF. [1105313] [13-3133, 13-2952, 13-3952] [Entered: 12/03/2013 11:38 AM]
November 27, 2013 Filing 55 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee ABC, Lilla Woollett Abbey, James Abbott, Terry Abbott, Elizabeth Adams, Eileen Prindeville Ahlquist, Miralda Alarcon, Marvin Albright, Jamaal Muata Ali, Anne Allman, DiAnne Margaret Allman, John Robert Allman, Robert Allman, Margaret E. Alvarez, Margaret Angeloni, Kimberly F. Angus, Jesus Arroyo, Milagros Arroyo, Pablo Arroyo, Anthony Banks, Donnie Bates, Johnny Bates, Laura Bates, Margie Bates, Monty Bates, Ronny Kent Bates, Thomas Bates, Jr., Thomas C. Bates, Sr., Mary E. Baumgartner, Anthony Baynard, Barry Baynard, Emerson Baynard, James Baynard, Philip Baynard, Stephen Baynard, Thomasine Baynard, Timothy Baynard, Wayne Baynard, Jess W. Beamon, Anna Beard, Mary Ann Beck, Alue Belmer, Alvin Burton Belmer, Annette Belmer, Clarence Belmer, Colby Keith Belmer, Denise Belmer, Donna Belmer, Faye Belmer, Kenneth Belmer, Luddie Belmer, Shawn Biellow, Mary Frances Black, Donald Blankenship, Jr., Donald Blankenship, Sr., Richard D. Blankenship, Alice Blocker, Douglas Blocker, John R. Blocker, John W. Blocker, Robert Blocker, James Boccia, Joseph Boccia, Sr., Joseph John Boccia, Jr., Patricia Boccia, Raymond Boccia, Richard Boccia, Ronnie Boccia, Leticia Boddie, Angela Bohannon, Anthony Bohannon, Carrie Bohannon, David Bohannon, Edna Bohannon, Leon Bohannon, Leon Bohannon, Sr., Ricki Bohannon, Billie Jean Bolinger, John Bonk, Jr., Jeffrey Joseph Boulos, Joseph Boulos, Lydia Boulos, Marie Boulos, Rebecca Bowler, John Norman Boyett, Lavon Boyett, William A. Boyett, Susan Schnorf Breeden, Damion Briscoe, Christine Brown, Rosanne Brunette, Mary Lynn Buckner, Rosanne Buckner, Myra Burley, William Burley, Rodney Darrell Burnette, Kathleen Calabro, Rachel Caldera, Avenell Callahan, Michael Callahan, Paul Callahan, Patricia Calloway, Elisa Rock Camara, Mecot Camara, Theresa Riggs Camara, Candace Campbell, Bradley Campus, Clare Campus, Elaine Capobianco, Olympia Carletta, Kimberly Carpenter, Florene Martin Carter, Phyllis A. Cash, Theresa Catano, Bruce Ceasar, Franklin Ceasar, Frederick Ceasar, Robbie Neil Ceasar, Sybil Ceasar, Christine Devlin Cecca, Johnnie Cesar, Tammy Chapman, James Cherry, Sonia Cherry, Adele H. Chios, Jana M. Christian, Sharon Rose Christian, Susan Ciupaska, Leshune Stokes Clark, Rosemary Clark, Mary Ann Cobble, Karen Shipp Collard, Jennifer Collier, Melia Winter Collier, Deborah M. Coltrane, Christopher Comes, Frank Comes, Frank Comes, Sr., Joan Comes, Patrick Comes, James N. Conley, Jr., Robert Allen Conley, Roberta Li Conley, Charles Dennis Cook, Charles F. Cook, Elizabeth A. Cook, Alan Tracy Copeland, Betty Copeland, Johnny Len Copeland, Blanche Corry, David Cosner, Harold Cosner, Jeffrey Cosner, Leanna Cosner, Cheryl Cossaboom, Bryan Thomas Coulman, Christopher J. Coulman, Dennis P. Coulman, Kevin Coulman, Lorraine M. Coulman, Robert D. Coulman, Charlita Martin Covington, Deborah Crawford, Amanda Crouch, Marie Crudale, Rick Crudale, Eugene Cyzick, Russell Cyzick, Lynn Dallachie, Barbara Davis, Anne Deal, Lynn Smith Derbyshire, Theresa Desjardins, Christine Devlin, Daniel Devlin, Gabrielle Devlin, Michael Devlin, Richard Devlin, Sean Devlin, Glenn Dolphin, Rosalie Milano Donahue, Ashley Doray, Nathaniel Dorsey, Rebecca Doss, Chester Dunnigan, Timothy Dunnigan, Claudine Dunningan, Elizabeth Ann Dunningan, Michael Dunningan, William Dunningan, Brian Earle, Frederick Daniel Eaves, Janice Thorstad Edquist, Mary Ruth Ervin, Estate of Alex W. Nashton, Estate of Angela Josephine Smith, Estate of Barbara D. Prindeville, Estate of Bertha Olson, Estate of Campbell J. Nairn, Estate of Clarence Lemnah, Estate of Claude Burley, Estate of Donald Stockton, Estate of Edward Iacovino Sr., Estate of Godofredo Quirante, Estate of Ingrid M. Swinson, Estate of James Gallagher, Estate of James Otis Moore, Estate of James Owens, Estate of Jediah Ghumm, Estate of John D. Knipple, Estate of Johnney S. Moore, Estate of Joseph R. Livingston, Estate of Kenneth J. Swinson, Estate of Larry L. Scott, Estate of Marlis Molly Wheeler, Estate of Marva Lynn Cosner, Estate of Mary A. Cook, Estate of Mary Abbott, Estate of Mary Blackenship, Estate of Michael Moore, Estate of Nelson Stokes Senior, Estate of Nora Young, Estate of Norman E. Boyett, Jr., Estate of Norris Gordon, Estate of Pauline Knipple, Estate of Richard G. LaRiviere, Estate of Robert Young, Estate of Samuel Hudson, Estate of Sigurd Olson, Estate of Susan Thorstad Hudson, Estate of Synovure Jones, Estate of Theodore Allman, Estate of Thomas McCall, Estate of William Douglas Burley, Barbara Estes, Charles Estes, Danny R. Estes, Frank Estes, Angela Dawn Farthing, Arlington Ferguson, Hilton Ferguson, Linda Sandback Fish, Richard Andrew Fluegel, Nancy Brocksbank Fox, Tia Fox, Alice Warren Franklin, Lori Fransler, Tammy Freshour, Charles Frye, Michael D. Fulcher, Ruby Fulcher, Barbara Gallagher, Brian Gallagher, James Gallagher, Jr., Kevin Gallagher, Michael Gallagher, Sean Gallagher, Dimitri Gangur, George Gangur, Mary Gangur, Jess Garcia, Randall Garcia, Ronald Garcia, Roxanne Garcia, Russell Garcia, Violet Garcia, Truman Dale Garner, Suzanne Perron Garza, Jeanne Gattegno, Larry Gerlach, Megan Gerlach, Patricia Gerlach, Travis Gerlach, Arlene Ghumm, Ashley Ghumm, Bill Ghumm, Edward Ghumm, Harold Ghumm, Hildegard Ghumm, Jesse Ghumm, Leroy Ghumm, Moronica Ghumm, Donald Giblin, Jeanne Giblin, Michael Giblin, Tiffany Giblin, Timothy Giblin, Valerie Giblin, William Giblin, Thad Gilford-Smith, Rebecca Gintonio, Dawn Goff, Christina Gorchinski, Judy Gorchinski, Kevin Gorchinski, Michael Gorchinski, Valerie Gorchinski, Alice Gordon, Joseph Gordon, Linda Gordon, Paul Gordon, Richard Gordon, Andrea Grant, Deborah Graves, Davin M. Green, Deborah Green, Liberty Quirante Gregg, Alex Griffin, Catherine E. Grimsley, Megan Grummer, Lyda Woollett Guz, Darlene Hairston, Thomas Hairston, Tara Hanrahan, Mary Clyde Hart, Jeffrey Haskell, Brenda Haskill, Kathleen S. Hedge, Christopher Todd Helms, Mark Anthony Helms, Marvin R. Helms, Arminda Hernandez, Doris Hester, Stanley G. Hester, Clifton Hildreth, Donald Wayne Hildreth, Julia Hildreth, Mary Ann Hildreth, Michael Wayne Hildreth, Sharon A. Hilton, John Hlywiak, Joseph Hlywiak, Margaret Hlywiak, Paul Hlywiak, Peter Hlywiak, Jr., Peter Hlywiak, Sr., Donald Holberton, Patricia Lee Holberton, Richard Holberton, Thomas Holberton, Tangie Hollifield, Debra Horner, Elizabeth House, Joyce A. Houston, Tammy Camara Howell, John Hudson, Lisa H. Hudson, Lorenzo Hudson, Lucy Hudson, Ruth Hudson, William J. Hudson, Maurice Edward Hukill, Cynthia Lou Hunt, Orval Hunt, Nancy Tingley Hurlburt, Cynthia Perron Hurston, Edward Iacovino, Jr., Elizabeth Iacovino, Rosa Ibarro, Deborah Innocenzi, Kristin Innocenzi, Mark Paul Innocenzi, IV, Paul Innocenzi, III, Bernadette Jaccom, James Jackowski, John Jackowski, Jr., John Jackowski, Sr., Andrew Scott Jacobs, Daniel Joseph Jacobs, Danita Jacobs, Joseph P. Jacobs, Victoria Jacobus, Elaine James, Jeffrey Wilbur James, Nathalie C. Jenkins, Nathaniel Walter Jenkins, Stephen Jenkins, Linda Martin Johnson, Ray Johnson, Rennitta Stokes Johnson, Sherry Johnson, Charles Johnston, Edward Anthony Johnston, Edwin Johnston, Mary Ann Johnston, Zandra LaRiviere Johnston, Alicia Jones, Corene Martin Jones, Kia Briscoe Jones, Mark Jones, Ollie Jones, Sandra D. Jones, Steven Jones, Robin Copeland Jordan, Susan Scott Jordan, Joyce Julian, Karl Julian, Thomas Adrian Julian, Nada Jurist, Adam Keown, Bobby Keown, Sr., Darren Keown, Thomas Keown, William Keown, Mary Joe Kirker, Brian Kirkpatrick, Kathleen Kirkpatrick, Daniel Kluck, Kelly Kluck, Michael Kluck, James C. Knipple, John R. Knipple, Shirley L. Knox, Doreen Kreischer, Freas H. Kreischer, III, Freas H. Kreischer, Jr., Eugene LaRiviere, Janet LaRiviere, John M. LaRiviere, Lesley LaRiviere, Michael LaRiviere, Michael Scott LaRiviere, Nancy LaRiviere, Richard LaRiviere, Robert LaRiviere, Steven LaRiviere, William LaRiviere, Keith Laise, Cynthia D. Lake, Wendy L. Lange, James Langon, James Langon, III, Cathy L. Lawton, Heidi Crudale LeGault, Etta Lemnah, Fay Lemnah, Harold Lemnah, Marlys Lemnah, Richard Lemnah, Robert Lemnah, Ronald Lemnah, Grace Lewis, Annette R. Livingston, Joseph R. Livingston, III, Joseph R. Livingston, IV, Robin M. Lynch, Earl Lyon, Francisco Lyon, June Lyon, Maria Lyon, Paul Lyon, Jr., Paul D. Lyon, Sr., Valerie Lyon, Heather Macroglou, John Macroglou, Lisa Magnotti, Kathleen Devlin Mahoney, Kenty Maitland, Leysnal Maitland, Samuel Maitland, Jr., Samuel Maitland, Sr., Shirla Maitland, Virginia Boccia Marshall, Charlie Robert Martin, John Martin, Pacita Martin, Renerio Martin, Ruby Martin, Shirley Martin, Mary Mason, Cristina Massa, David Massa, Edmund Massa, Joao Massa, Jose Massa, Manuel Massa, Jr., Ramiro Massa, Burnham Matthews, John McCall, Mary McCall, Valerie McCall, Gail McDermott, James E. McDonough, Julia A. McFarlin, George McMahon, Michael McMahon, Timothy R. McMahon, Patty McPhee, Darren Menkins, Gregory Menkins, Margaret Menkins, Richard Menkins, III, Richard H. Menkins, Jay T. Meurer, John Meurer, John Thomas Meurer, Mary Lou Meurer, Michael Meurer, Ronald Meurer, Penny Meyer, Angela Milano, Joseph Peter Milano, Peter Milano, Jr., Earline Miller, Henry Miller, Patricia Miller, Timothy Mitchell, Wendy Mitchell, Helen Montgomery, Betty Moore, Harry Moore, Joseph Moore, Kimberly Moore, Marvin S. Moore, Mary Moore, Melissa Lea Moore, Jonnie Mae Moore-Jones, Elizabeth Phillips Moy, Debra Myers, Geneva Myers, Harry A. Myers, Harry Douglas Myers, Billie Ann Nairn, Campbell J. Nairn, Jr., David Nairn, William P. Nairn, Jeffrey Nashton, Richard Norfleet, Deborah O'Connor, Pearl Olaniji, Ashley E. Oliver, John Oliver, Kayley Oliver, Michael John Oliver, Patrick S. Oliver, Paul Oliver, Riley Oliver, John Arne Olson, Karen L. Olson, Randal D. Olson, Roger S. Olson, Ronald J. Olson, David Owens, Deanna Owens, Frances Owens, Joseph Albert Owens, Steven Owens, Connie Mack Page, Connie Ray Page, Judith K. Page, Lisa Menkins Palmer, Geraldine Paolozzi, Maureen Pare, Henry James Parker, Sharon Parker, Ulysses Gregory Parker, Helen M. Pearson, John L. Pearson, John L. Pearson, Sr., Sonia Pearson, Brett Perron, Deborah Jean Perron, Michelle Perron, Ronald R. Pe
November 19, 2013 Filing 48 CURED DEFECTIVE Brief & Special Appendix, Joint Appendix volumes 1-4 [ # 46 ], [ # 1096314-2 ], [ # 1096321-2 ], [ # 1096333-2 ], [ # 1096360-2 ], [ # 1096376-2 ], on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, FILED.[1096784] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/19/2013 04:40 PM]
November 18, 2013 Filing 46 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Brief & Special Appendix, Joint Appendix volumes 1-4, [ # 1092541-2 ], [ # 1092857-2 ], [ # 1092862-2 ], [ # 1092866-2 ], [ # 1092869-2 ], [ # 1092881-2 ], [ # 1092887-2 ], [ # 1092890-2 ], [ # 1092893-2 ], [ # 1092895-2 ], [ # 1092901-2 ], [ # 1092916-2 ], [ # 1092917-2 ], [ # 1092918-2 ], [ # 1092919-2 ], [ # 1092925-2 ], [ # 1092929-2 ], [ # 1092930-2 ], [ # 1092933-2 ], [ # 1092935-2 ], on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED.[1094893] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:26 AM]
November 15, 2013 Filing 28 MOTION, to file supplemental appendix, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Banca UBAE SpA in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. Service date 11/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [1094304] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/15/2013 05:16 PM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 45 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 21 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094877] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:20 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 44 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 20 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094874] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:19 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 43 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 19 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094873] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:18 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 42 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 18 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094872] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:18 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 41 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 17 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094870] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:17 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 40 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 16 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094866] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:17 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 39 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 15 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094865] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:16 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 38 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 14 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094863] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:15 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 37 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 13 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094862] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:15 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 36 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 12 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094860] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:14 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 35 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 11 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094858] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:13 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 34 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 10 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094854] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:12 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 33 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 9 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094851] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:12 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 32 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 8 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094849] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:11 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 31 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 7 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094846] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:10 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 30 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094844] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:10 AM]
November 14, 2013 Filing 29 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 21, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952, FILED. [1094839] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/18/2013 11:09 AM]
November 13, 2013 Filing 27 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-3952 Brief due date as 01/28/2014; FILED.[1091132] [13-2952, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/13/2013 03:05 PM]
November 13, 2013 Filing 25 CAPTION, changing Clearstream Banking, S.A.'s designation from "Defendant-Appellant" to "Defendant", AMENDED.[1091104] [13-2952, 13-3133, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/13/2013 02:57 PM]
November 13, 2013 Filing 24 CURED DEFECTIVE Scheduling Notification [ # 22 ], [ # 23 ], on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-2952, FILED.[1090835] [13-2952, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/13/2013 01:02 PM]
November 13, 2013 Filing 23 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-3952, informing Court of proposed due date 01/28/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 11/13/2013 by CM/ECF.[1090651] [13-2952, 13-3952] [Entered: 11/13/2013 12:06 PM]
November 13, 2013 Filing 22 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Scheduling Notification, [20], on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-3952, 13-2952, FILED.[1090258] [13-3952, 13-2952] [Entered: 11/13/2013 09:40 AM]
November 8, 2013 Filing 20 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, informing Court of proposed due date 01/28/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 11/08/2013 by CM/ECF.[1088515] [13-3952] [Entered: 11/08/2013 05:36 PM]
November 8, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deborah D. Peterson in 13-2952, FILED. Service date 11/08/2013 by CM/ECF. [1087778] [13-3952, 13-2952, 13-2961, 13-3133] [Entered: 11/08/2013 10:35 AM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Anna Beer, Harry Beer, Estate of Judith Greenbaum, Estate of Meir Kahane, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Sonia Kahane, Ciporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum and Danielle Lynn Teitlebaum in 13-3952, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081720] [13-3952, 13-2952, 13-2961, 13-3133] [Entered: 11/01/2013 12:51 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Anna Beer, Harry Beer, Estate of Binyamin Kahane, Estate of Judith Greenbaum, Estate of Meir Kahane, Tova Ettinger, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Sonia Kahane, Ciporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum and Danielle Lynn Teitlebaum in 13-3952, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081704] [13-3952, 13-2952, 13-2961, 13-3133] [Entered: 11/01/2013 12:42 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Anna Beer, Harry Beer, Estate of Binyamin Kahane, Estate of Judith Greenbaum, Estate of Meir Kahane, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Sonia Kahane, Ciporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum and Danielle Lynn Teitlebaum in 13-3952, Appellee Danielle Lynn Teitlebaum in 13-3133, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF. [1081668] [13-3952, 13-2952, 13-2961, 13-3133] [Entered: 11/01/2013 12:32 PM]
November 1, 2013 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Carlos Acosta, Maria Acosta, Anna Beer, Harry Beer, Estelle Carroll, Estate of Binyamin Kahane, Estate of Irma Franklin, Estate of Judith Greenbaum, Estate of Meir Kahane, Tova Ettinger, Irving Franklin, Steven M. Greenbaum, Ethel J. Griffin, Alan Hayman, Shirlee Hayman, Baruch Kahane, Libby Kahane, Norman Kahane, Sonia Kahane, Ciporah Kaplan, David Kirschenbaum, Isabelle Kirschenbaum, Jason Kirschenbaum, Joshua Kirschenbaum, Phyllis Maisel and Danielle Lynn Teitlebaum in 13-3952, FILED. Service date 11/01/2013 by CM/ECF.[1081636] [13-3952, 13-2952, 13-2961, 13-3133] [Entered: 11/01/2013 12:15 PM]
October 30, 2013 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deborah D. Peterson in 13-3133, FILED. Service date 10/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[1080009] [13-3952, 13-2952, 13-2961, 13-3133] [Entered: 10/30/2013 05:31 PM]
October 30, 2013 Filing 13 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1079320] [13-3952] [Entered: 10/30/2013 11:55 AM]
October 30, 2013 Filing 9 ATTORNEY, Andreas A. Frischknecht for Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, in case 13-3952 , [ # 8 ], ADDED.[1078887] [13-3952] [Entered: 10/30/2013 08:56 AM]
October 29, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, FILED. Service date 10/29/2013 by CM/ECF. [1078788] [13-3952] [Entered: 10/29/2013 05:22 PM]
October 29, 2013 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, FILED. Service date 10/29/2013 by CM/ECF.[1078786] [13-3952] [Entered: 10/29/2013 05:19 PM]
October 29, 2013 Filing 6 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, FILED. Service date 10/29/2013 by CM/ECF.[1078785] [13-3952] [Entered: 10/29/2013 05:18 PM]
October 29, 2013 Filing 5 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran, FILED. Service date 10/29/2013 by CM/ECF.[1078784] [13-3952] [Entered: 10/29/2013 05:17 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1071431] [13-3952] [Entered: 10/21/2013 04:55 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/08/2013, RECEIVED.[1071429] [13-3952, 13-2952, 13-2961, 13-3133] [Entered: 10/21/2013 04:55 PM]
October 16, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran in 13-3952, FILED. [1071423] [13-3952, 13-2952, 13-2961, 13-3133] [Entered: 10/21/2013 04:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Peterson v. Islamic Republic of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Susan Ciupaska
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Theresa Desjardins
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Randal D. Olson
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Bryan Thomas Coulman
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mary Clyde Hart
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kristin Innocenzi
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Anna Beard
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Warren Richardson
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Vanessa Richardson
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Victor Mark Prevatt
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Schnorf, brother
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lavon Boyett
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mary Ann Johnston
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Scott Spaulding
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mary Frances Black
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shirley Martin
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Harold Ghumm
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Earline Miller
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Price
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Estate of Larry L. Scott
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Darlene Hairston
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mary Lou Meurer
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Margie Bates
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: William Giblin
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kimberly Moore
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Linda Rose Rooney
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ronald Lemnah
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robyn Wigglesworth
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Faye Belmer
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Freas H. Kreischer, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shirley L. Smith
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cynthia Smith
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kia Briscoe Jones
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Mary Ann Cobble
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Prindeville
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Linda Sandback Fish
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Janet Williams
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Donald Giblin
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Olympia Carletta
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael McMahon
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Thomas S. Perron
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Donnie Bates
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Charles Estes
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Deborah Green
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jerryl Shropshire
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Abbott
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Patricia Gerlach
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sharon Parker
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Heidi Crudale LeGault
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cynthia Lou Hunt
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sherry L Johnson
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Barbara Gallagher
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Joseph R. Livingston, III
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: John Wyche
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Annette Belmer
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Lisa H. Hudson
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sean Gallagher
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Nancy LaRiviere
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Liberty Quirante Gregg
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Miralda Alarcon
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard J. Wallace
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sean Prindeville
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Harold Lemnah
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Frances Owens
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Gordon
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Susan J. Sinsioco
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Barbara Thorstad Warwick
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Joyce Stephens
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Billie Jean Bolinger
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ashley Ghumm
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Diane Whitner
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dennis Ray Schultz
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Thorstad, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael John Oliver
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Estate of Nora Young
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Giblin
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sandra Wigglesworth
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rachel Caldera
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robert Stokes
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Charles F. Cook
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Eugene LaRiviere
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ashley Doray
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cristina Massa
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Angela Milano
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jessica Watson
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: David Bohannon
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Stephen Thomas Zone
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kathy Nathan Stelpflug
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Henry Miller
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Leona Mae Vargas
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Paul Innocenzi, III
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: June Lyon
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Horace Stephens, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Estate of Barbara D. Prindeville
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dawn Swinson
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James Baynard
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: James David Shipp
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sturghill D. Sturghill
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Sharon Conley Petry
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Theresa Riggs Camara
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Orval Hunt
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Angela Dawn Farthing
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michelle Perron
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Patricia Thorstad Zosso
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Rebecca Bowler
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Henry Caleb Sauls
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Roxanne V. Garcia Pryor
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Peggy Stelpflug
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Menkins, III
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Darren Keown
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Robin Copeland Jordan
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Dana Spaulding
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Myra Burley
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Tara Smith
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Cathy L. Lawton
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Megan Grummer
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Peter Hlywiak, Sr.
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael LaRiviere
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Ronald R. Perron
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kevin James Scott
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Victor Thornton Prevatt
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Wiseman Wiseman
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Audrey Webb
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jon Christopher Scott
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Denise Voyles
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Donald Elberan Woollett
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Michael Callahan
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Jeffrey Cosner
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Nathaniel Walter Jenkins
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Marie Boulos
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Shawn Biellow
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Avenell Callahan
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Victoria Jacobus
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Eric Glenn Washington
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Rocco Esq.
Represented By: Susan Marlene Davies Esq.
Represented By: James P. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Charles Jeffrey Schnorf
Represented By: Mark Nathan Antar Esq.
Represented By: Liviu Vogel Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Estate of Rogath Saidi Saidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Johnny Melendez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Edwine Valentine Mathe Katunda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Estate of John Rogath Saidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Minerva Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Valentine Mathew Katunda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Ellen Marie Bomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Thelma Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Deborah Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: James Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Angelina Mathew Rutaheshelwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Estate of Dotio Rmadhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Estate of Eric Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Estate of Billy San Pedro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Douglas Pontillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Samuel Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Louise Gaddo Blatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Estate of John Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Robert Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Estate of Louis Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Daniel Joy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Keith Estler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rose Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: James Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Arnold Edmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Dudley Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John R. Cuddeback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Meta Weekes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Flossie Varney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Sila V. San Pedro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Estate of Laura Virginia Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jeanette Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Michael Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Barbara Cuddeback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Joyce Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Cindy Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Louisa Punonet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Louis Estler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Howard Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Andrea Ciarla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Scott M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Cheryl L. Blood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Yasemin B. Pressley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Estate of David A. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Elena Rozenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Estate of Virgel Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Estate of Millard D. Campbell
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Marie R. Campbell
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alan Hayman
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Represented By: Monica Hanna
Represented By: Benjamin Weathers-Lowin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Estate of Irma Franklin
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Represented By: Monica Hanna
Represented By: Benjamin Weathers-Lowin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas Morgera
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Catherine Fennig
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Libby Kahane
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Represented By: Monica Hanna
Represented By: Benjamin Weathers-Lowin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Estate of Joshua E. Woody
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bessie A. Campbell
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Laura E. Johnson
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Geraldo Alvarado
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Johnny Thompson
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eloise F. Selbe
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jonica L. Woody
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Simpson
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Grisselle Alvarado
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sandra M. Wetmore
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Donald R. Pontillo
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deborah Rhosto
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Senator Haun
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Starlina D. Taylor
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sean McDonough
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Luisa Alvarado
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Renee Eileen Simpson
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Betty Laise
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Herman C. Marthaler, III
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John E. Adams
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Felicia Hairston
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Fluegel
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lorraine Macgroglou
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mitchell Charles Hukill
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kendall K. Kitson, Jr.
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Penni Joyce
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Francis Heiser
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Richard Marc Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Birnbaum Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thomas Bonk
Represented By: Keith Martin Fleischman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Bank Markazi, the Central Bank of Iran
Represented By: David M. Lindsey Esq.
Represented By: Andreas A. Frischknecht Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Estelle Carroll
Represented By: James Bernard Esq.
Represented By: Curtis Campbell Mechling
Represented By: Monica Hanna
Represented By: Benjamin Weathers-Lowin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banca UBAE SpA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?