The Authors Guild v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Herbert Mitgang, Daniel Hoffman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Paul Dickson, The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., Association of American Publishers, Inc., Canadian Standard Association and John Wiley & Sons, Inc., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Plaintiff - Appellant: Betty Miles, Jim Bouton, The Authors Guild and Joseph Goulden, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant - Appellee: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 13-4829
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: PROPERTY RIGHTS-Copyright

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 16, 2015 Summary Authors Guild v. Google, Inc.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2014 Filing 197 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 12/03/2014 at 2:00pm, SET.[1332695] [13-4829]
September 10, 2014 Filing 194 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, RECEIVED. Service date 09/10/2014 by CM/ECF.[1316556] [13-4829]
September 9, 2014 Filing 191 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., RECEIVED. Service date 09/09/2014 by CM/ECF.[1315095] [13-4829]
July 30, 2014 Filing 187 CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF [185], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Library Assocation, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, FILED.[1282983] [13-4829]
July 29, 2014 Filing 185 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Library Assocation, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, FILED. Service date 07/29/2014 by CM/ECF. [1281561] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/30/2014 by KG]
July 28, 2014 Filing 184 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [180], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Library Assocation, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, FILED.[1281108] [13-4829]
July 24, 2014 Filing 182 SEALED REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. [1281080] [13-4829]
July 24, 2014 Filing 181 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 07/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1279110] [13-4829]
July 24, 2014 Filing 180 CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Library Assocation, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, FILED. Service date 07/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1279102] [13-4829]
July 24, 2014 Filing 175 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [137], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Library Assocation, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, FILED.[1278779] [13-4829]
July 16, 2014 Filing 171 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Seth P. Waxman for Appellee Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/16/2014 by CM/ECF. [1272879] [13-4829]
July 15, 2014 Filing 169 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Edward Rosenthal, Esq. for Appellant Betty Miles, Joseph Goulden, Jim Bouton and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 07/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1271588] [13-4829]
July 15, 2014 Filing 168 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL [161], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Center for Democracy & Technology, Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge, FILED.[1271573] [13-4829]
July 15, 2014 Filing 167 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Richard Cunningham, Richard Menke, Robert S. Means, Robyn Luney, Roger Ford, Roman Leibov, Roopika Risam, Ruby Mendenhall, Ryan Cordell, Scott Weingart, Shubha Ghosh, Sree Ganesh Thotempudi, Stephen M. Maurer, Susan Brown, Tassie Gniady, Ted Sichelman, Ted Underwood, Tyler Ochoa, Victoria Stobo, Vika Zafrin, Virginia Kuhn, Wendy J. Gordon, William G. Thomas, William M. Cross, William T. Gallagher, Yolanda M. King and Zach Cole, ADDED.[1271549] [13-4829]
July 15, 2014 Filing 166 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Mark Wolff, Matthew Jockers, Matthew K. Gold, Matthew Kirschenbaum, Matthew Sag, Matthew Wilkens, Melissa Terras, Michael D. Scott, Michael Pierce Williams, Michael Scott Cuthbert, Mikal B. Eckstrom, Millie Gonzalez, Miran Hladnik, Monika Pemic, Morris Eaves, Nicolas Suzor, Nora Martin Peterson, Paige Morgan, Patricia Hswe, Paul J. Heald, Paul N. Courant, Peter Murray-Rust, Peter Organisciak, Puneet Kishor, Raizel Liebler, Ralph D. Clifford, Ray Corrigan, Raymond Ku, Rebecca S. Curtin and Rebecca L. Tushnet, ADDED.[1271490] [13-4829]
July 15, 2014 Filing 165 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Jason Boyd, Jason Heppler, Jeannette Eileen Jones, Jeffrey T. Schnapp, Jennifer Guiliano, Jeremy Hunsinger, Jessica Silbey, Jim Pitman, John Laudun, John Unsworth, Jorge Contreras, Jorge R. Roig, Joseph Raben, Julie Ahrens, Kalani Craig, Katarina Peric, Kate Byrne, Katherine L. Walter, Kenneth M. Price, Kevin Reilly, Kurt M. Saunders, Lateef Mtima, Laurie Taylor, Leif Isaksen, Lindsey Seatter, Llewellyn Joseph Gibbons, Marco Forlivesi, Margaret Chon, Margaret Linley, Mark McKenna and Mark Sample, ADDED.[1271300] [13-4829]
July 15, 2014 Filing 164 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Collin Gifford Brooke, Courtney Lawton, Dale M. Bauer, Dan Cohen, David H. Radcliffe, David Tan, David-Antoine Williams, Dennis S. Karjala, Derek Miller, Dot Porter, Martin Paul Eve, Elijah Meeks, Elizabeth Lorang, Elton Barker, Erin McKean, Ernesto Priego, Eve V. Clark, George Oates, Gerben Zaagsma, Glen Worthey, Guy A. Rub, Herbert Hovenkamp, Ira Steven Nathenson, Jacob Eisenstein, Jacob H. Rooksby, Jacob Heil, Coltrain, James F. Williams, James Gibson and Jarom McDonald, ADDED.[1271166] [13-4829]
July 15, 2014 Filing 163 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Association for Computers and the Humanities, Canadian Society of Digital Humanities, A. Sean Pue, Aaron Plasek, Ales Vaupotic, Alex Gil, Allen Riddell, Amanda French, Amanda Visconti, Amy V. Ogden, Andrew Whalen, Annemarie Bridy, Art Neill, Ashanka Kumari, Benjamin Schmidt, Bernard D. Frischer, Bethany Nowviskie, Brandon Butler, Brandon Locke, Brian Croxall, Brian J. Love, Brian Frye, Brian L. Pytlik Zillig, Brian Rosenblum, Brian Carver, Cameron Blevins, Carol Chiodo, Carys Craig, Chandler Warren, Chris Bourg, Christof Schoech and Christopher N. Warren, ADDED.[1271049] [13-4829]
July 11, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Association for Computers and the Humanities, Canadian Society of Digital Humanities, A. Sean Pue, Aaron Plasek, Ales Vaupotic, Alex Gil, Allen Riddell, Amanda French, Amanda Visconti, Amy V. Ogden, Andrew Whalen, Annemarie Bridy, Art Neill, Ashanka Kumari, Benjamin Schmidt, Bernard D. Frischer, Bethany Nowviskie, Brandon Butler, Brandon Locke, Brian Croxall, Brian J. Love, Brian Frye, Brian L. Pytlik Zillig, Brian Rosenblum, Brian Carver, Cameron Blevins, Carol Chiodo, Carys Craig, Chandler Warren, Chris Bourg, Christof Schoech, Christopher N. Warren, Collin Gifford Brooke, Courtney Lawton, Dale M. Bauer, Dan Cohen, David H. Radcliffe, David Tan, David-Antoine Williams, Dennis S. Karjala, Derek Miller, Dot Porter, Martin Paul Eve, Elijah Meeks, Elizabeth Lorang, Elton Barker, Erin McKean, Ernesto Priego, Eve V. Clark, George Oates, Gerben Zaagsma, Glen Worthey, Guy A. Rub, Herbert Hovenkamp, Ira Steven Nathenson, Jacob Eisenstein, Jacob H. Rooksby, Jacob Heil, Coltrain, James F. Williams, James Gibson, Jarom McDonald, Jason Boyd, Jason Heppler, Jeannette Eileen Jones, Jeffrey T. Schnapp, Jennifer Guiliano, Jeremy Hunsinger, Jessica Silbey, Jim Pitman, John Laudun, John Unsworth, Jorge Contreras, Jorge R. Roig, Joseph Raben, Julie Ahrens, Kalani Craig, Katarina Peric, Kate Byrne, Katherine L. Walter, Kenneth M. Price, Kevin Reilly, Kurt M. Saunders, Lateef Mtima, Laurie Taylor, Leif Isaksen, Lindsey Seatter, Llewellyn Joseph Gibbons, Marco Forlivesi, Margaret Chon, Margaret Linley, Mark McKenna, Mark Sample, Mark Wolff, Matthew Jockers, Matthew K. Gold, Matthew Kirschenbaum, Matthew Sag, Matthew Wilkens, Melissa Terras, Michael D. Scott, Michael Pierce Williams, Michael Scott Cuthbert, Mikal B. Eckstrom, Millie Gonzalez, Miran Hladnik, Monika Pemic, Morris Eaves, Nicolas Suzor, Nora Martin Peterson, Paige Morgan, Patricia Hswe, Paul J. Heald, Paul N. Courant, Peter Murray-Rust, Peter Organisciak, Puneet Kishor, Raizel Liebler, Ralph D. Clifford, Ray Corrigan, Raymond Ku, Rebecca S. Curtin, Rebecca L. Tushnet, Richard Cunningham, Richard Menke, Robert S. Means, Robyn Luney, Roger Ford, Roman Leibov, Roopika Risam, Ruby Mendenhall, Ryan Cordell, Scott Weingart, Shubha Ghosh, Sree Ganesh Thotempudi, Stephen M. Maurer, Susan Brown, Tassie Gniady, Ted Sichelman, Ted Underwood, Tyler Ochoa, Victoria Stobo, Vika Zafrin, Virginia Kuhn, Wendy J. Gordon, William G. Thomas, William M. Cross, William T. Gallagher, Yolanda M. King and Zach Cole, FILED. Service date 07/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1269638] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/15/2014 by KG]
July 11, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge and Center for Democracy & Technology, FILED. Service date 07/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1269529] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/15/2014 by KG]
July 11, 2014 Filing 159 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [151], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Center for Democracy & Technology, Electronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge, FILED.[1269382] [13-4829]
July 11, 2014 Filing 158 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge and Center for Democracy & Technology, ADDED.[1269350] [13-4829]
July 11, 2014 Filing 157 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association, ADDED.[1269296] [13-4829]
July 11, 2014 Filing 156 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Margo A. Bagley, Carolina Botero, Dan L. Burk, Julie Elizabeth Cohen, Sean M. Fiil-Flynn, Brian Frye, Michael Geist, Dennis S. Karjala, Ariel Katz, David Levine, Yvette Joy Liebesman, Lydia Pallas Loren, Glynn Lunney, Michael J. Madison, Hiram Melendez-Juarbe, Neil Netanel, Ana Ramalho, Jessica Silbey, Christopher Sprigman, Myra Tawfik, Samuel Trosow and Deborah Tussey, ADDED.[1269272] [13-4829]
July 11, 2014 Filing 155 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Library Assocation, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, ADDED.[1268981] [13-4829]
July 11, 2014 Filing 154 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Authors Alliance, ADDED.[1268951] [13-4829]
July 10, 2014 Filing 153 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Margo A. Bagley, Carolina Botero, Dan L. Burk, Julie Elizabeth Cohen, Sean M. Fiil-Flynn, Brian Frye, Michael Geist, Dennis S. Karjala, Ariel Katz, David Levine, Yvette Joy Liebesman, Lydia Pallas Loren, Glynn Lunney, Michael J. Madison, Hiram Melendez-Juarbe, Neil Netanel, Ana Ramalho, Jessica Silbey, Christopher Sprigman, Myra Tawfik, Samuel Trosow and Deborah Tussey, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1268398] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/11/2014 by KG]
July 10, 2014 Filing 152 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge and Center for Democracy & Technology, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1268385] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/11/2014 by KG]
July 10, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge and Center for Democracy & Technology, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1268383] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/11/2014 by KG]
July 10, 2014 Filing 150 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Authors Alliance, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1268217] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/11/2014 by KG]
July 10, 2014 Filing 149 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Association for Computers and the Humanities, Canadian Society of Digital Humanities, A. Sean Pue, Aaron Plasek, Ales Vaupotic, Alex Gil, Allen Riddell, Amanda French, Amanda Visconti, Amy V. Ogden, Andrew Whalen, Annemarie Bridy, Art Neill, Ashanka Kumari, Benjamin Schmidt, Bernard D. Frischer, Bethany Nowviskie, Brandon Butler, Brandon Locke, Brian Croxall, Brian J. Love, Brian Frye, Brian L. Pytlik Zillig, Brian Rosenblum, Brian Carver, Cameron Blevins, Carol Chiodo, Carys Craig, Chandler Warren, Chris Bourg, Christof Schoech, Christopher N. Warren, Collin Gifford Brooke, Courtney Lawton, Dale M. Bauer, Dan Cohen, David H. Radcliffe, David Tan, David-Antoine Williams, Dennis S. Karjala, Derek Miller, Dot Porter, Martin Paul Eve, Elijah Meeks, Elizabeth Lorang, Elton Barker, Erin McKean, Ernesto Priego, Eve V. Clark, George Oates, Gerben Zaagsma, Glen Worthey, Guy A. Rub, Herbert Hovenkamp, Ira Steven Nathenson, Jacob Eisenstein, Jacob H. Rooksby, Jacob Heil, Coltrain, James F. Williams, James Gibson, Jarom McDonald, Jason Boyd, Jason Heppler, Jeannette Eileen Jones, Jeffrey T. Schnapp, Jennifer Guiliano, Jeremy Hunsinger, Jessica Silbey, Jim Pitman, John Laudun, John Unsworth, Jorge Contreras, Jorge R. Roig, Joseph Raben, Julie Ahrens, Kalani Craig, Katarina Peric, Kate Byrne, Katherine L. Walter, Kenneth M. Price, Kevin Reilly, Kurt M. Saunders, Lateef Mtima, Laurie Taylor, Leif Isaksen, Lindsey Seatter, Llewellyn Joseph Gibbons, Marco Forlivesi, Margaret Chon, Margaret Linley, Mark McKenna, Mark Sample, Mark Wolff, Matthew Jockers, Matthew K. Gold, Matthew Kirschenbaum, Matthew Sag, Matthew Wilkens, Melissa Terras, Michael D. Scott, Michael Pierce Williams, Michael Scott Cuthbert, Mikal B. Eckstrom, Millie Gonzalez, Miran Hladnik, Monika Pemic, Morris Eaves, Nicolas Suzor, Nora Martin Peterson, Paige Morgan, Patricia Hswe, Paul J. Heald, Paul N. Courant, Peter Murray-Rust, Peter Organisciak, Puneet Kishor, Raizel Liebler, Ralph D. Clifford, Ray Corrigan, Raymond Ku, Rebecca S. Curtin, Rebecca L. Tushnet, Richard Cunningham, Richard Menke, Robert S. Means, Robyn Luney, Roger Ford, Roman Leibov, Roopika Risam, Ruby Mendenhall, Ryan Cordell, Scott Weingart, Shubha Ghosh, Sree Ganesh Thotempudi, Stephen M. Maurer, Susan Brown, Tassie Gniady, Ted Sichelman, Ted Underwood, Tyler Ochoa, Victoria Stobo, Vika Zafrin, Virginia Kuhn, Wendy J. Gordon, William G. Thomas, William M. Cross, William T. Gallagher, Yolanda M. King and Zach Cole, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1268003] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/15/2014 by KG]
July 10, 2014 Filing 148 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1267738] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/11/2014 by KG]
July 10, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1267680] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/11/2014 by KG]
July 10, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge and Center for Democracy & Technology, FILED. Service date 07/10/2014 by CM/ECF. [1267564] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/11/2014 by KG]
July 9, 2014 Filing 145 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file reply brief, [139] filed by Appellant Betty Miles, Joseph Goulden, Jim Bouton and The Authors Guild, FILED. [1266516][145] [13-4829]
July 8, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Margo A. Bagley, Carolina Botero, Dan L. Burk, Julie Elizabeth Cohen, Sean M. Fiil-Flynn, Brian Frye, Michael Geist, Dennis S. Karjala, Ariel Katz, David Levine, Yvette Joy Liebesman, Lydia Pallas Loren, Glynn Lunney, Michael J. Madison, Hiram Melendez-Juarbe, Neil Netanel, Ana Ramalho, Jessica Silbey, Christopher Sprigman, Myra Tawfik, Samuel Trosow and Deborah Tussey, FILED. Service date 07/08/2014 by CM/ECF. [1266050] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/11/2014 by KG]
July 8, 2014 Filing 139 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 07/08/2014 by CM/ECF. [1266005] [13-4829]
July 8, 2014 Filing 138 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Library Assocation, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, FILED. Service date 07/08/2014 by CM/ECF, US mail. [1265768] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/11/2014 by KG]
July 8, 2014 Filing 137 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Library Assocation, Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, FILED. Service date 07/08/2014 by US mail, CM/ECF. [1265371] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/11/2014 by KG]
July 8, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Authors Alliance, FILED. Service date 07/08/2014 by CM/ECF. [1265273] [13-4829]--[Edited 07/11/2014 by KG]
July 3, 2014 Filing 135 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/03/2014 by CM/ECF. [1263769] [13-4829]
July 2, 2014 Filing 134 ATTORNEY, Daniel P. Kearney for Google, Inc., in case 13-4829 , [133], ADDED.[1263461] [13-4829]
July 2, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/02/2014 by CM/ECF. [1262777] [13-4829]
July 1, 2014 Filing 132 ATTORNEY, Weili Justin Shaw for Google, Inc., in case 13-4829 , [130], ADDED.[1262112] [13-4829]
July 1, 2014 Filing 131 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [129], [130], on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED.[1262110] [13-4829]
June 30, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/30/2014 by CM/ECF. [1260500] [13-4829]
June 26, 2014 Filing 129 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [128], on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED.[1258016] [13-4829]
June 24, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 06/24/2014 by CM/ECF. [1256158] [13-4829]
April 30, 2014 Filing 126 CURED DEFECTIVE LETTER [125], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Photographic Artists, American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Digital Media Licensing Association, Graphic Artists Guild, Mystery Writers of America, National Association of Science Writers, National Press Photographers Association, National Writers Union, North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Romance Writers of America, Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, Songwriters Guild of America, Inc., Text and Academic Authors Association and Western Writers of America, FILED.[1213704] [13-4829]
April 30, 2014 Filing 125 LETTER, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Photographic Artists, American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Digital Media Licensing Association, Graphic Artists Guild, Mystery Writers of America, National Association of Science Writers, National Press Photographers Association, National Writers Union, North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Romance Writers of America, Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, Songwriters Guild of America, Inc., Text and Academic Authors Association and Western Writers of America, RECEIVED. Service date 04/30/2014 by CM/ECF.[1213555] [13-4829]
April 25, 2014 Filing 123 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter, [122], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Photographic Artists, American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Digital Media Licensing Association, Graphic Artists Guild, Mystery Writers of America, National Association of Science Writers, National Press Photographers Association, National Writers Union, North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Romance Writers of America, Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, Songwriters Guild of America, Inc., Text and Academic Authors Association and Western Writers of America, FILED.[1210513] [13-4829]
April 24, 2014 Filing 122 AMENDED , on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Photographic Artists, American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Digital Media Licensing Association, Graphic Artists Guild, Mystery Writers of America, National Association of Science Writers, National Press Photographers Association, National Writers Union, North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Romance Writers of America, Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, Songwriters Guild of America, Inc., Text and Academic Authors Association and Western Writers of America, FILED. Service date 04/24/2014 by CM/ECF.[1209057] [13-4829]
April 22, 2014 Filing 119 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL AND AMICUS BRIEF [113], [118], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED.[1207329] [13-4829]
April 21, 2014 Filing 118 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/21/2014 by CM/ECF. [1206437] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/22/2014 by KG]
April 21, 2014 Filing 117 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL [115], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED.[1206356] [13-4829]
April 21, 2014 Filing 116 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [114], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED.[1206352] [13-4829]
April 17, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc.--[Edited 04/21/2014 by KG]
April 17, 2014 Filing 114 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/17/2014 by CM/ECF. [1205016] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/21/2014 by KG]
April 17, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/17/2014 by CM/ECF. [1205012] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/21/2014 by KG]
April 17, 2014 Filing 105 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [94], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED.[1204873] [13-4829]
April 17, 2014 Filing 104 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel and Amicus Brief, [93], [85], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED.[1204858] [13-4829]
April 17, 2014 Filing 103 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., ADDED.[1204849] [13-4829]
April 17, 2014 Filing 102 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Google, Inc. Brief due date as 07/03/2014, FILED.[1204597] [13-4829]
April 16, 2014 Filing 99 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 07/03/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 04/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1203682] [13-4829]
April 16, 2014 Filing 98 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Jon Baumgarten, Stuart N. Brotman, Raymond T. Nimmer, Mark Schultz and John Simson, ADDED.[1203519] [13-4829]
April 16, 2014 Filing 97 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae International Authors Forum, ADDED.[1203422] [13-4829]
April 16, 2014 Filing 96 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Photographic Artists, American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Mystery Writers of America, The National Association of Science Writers, National Press Photographers Association, National Writers Union, North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Romance Writers of America, Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, The Songwriters Guild of America, Text and Academic Authors Association, The Digital Media Licensing Association and Western Writers of America, ADDED.[1203367] [13-4829]
April 16, 2014 Filing 95 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Copyright Alliance, ADDED.[1203314] [13-4829]
April 15, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1203017] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/17/2014 by KG]
April 15, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/15/2014 by CM/ECF. [1203009] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/17/2014 by KG]
April 15, 2014 Filing 92 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae International Publishers Association, International Association of Scientific, Technical and Medical Publishers, International Federation of Reproduction Rights Organisations and Marybeth Peters, ADDED.[1203002] [13-4829]
April 15, 2014 Filing 91 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL [71], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED.[1202964] [13-4829]
April 15, 2014 Filing 90 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL [74], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED.[1202961] [13-4829]
April 15, 2014 Filing 89 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [67], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED.[1202947] [13-4829]
April 15, 2014 Filing 88 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [66], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED.[1202938] [13-4829]
April 15, 2014 Filing 87 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., ADDED.[1202925] [13-4829]
April 15, 2014 Filing 86 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Malcolm Gladwell, J. M. Coetzee, Michael Pollan, Margaret Atwood, Peter Carey, Karen Russell, Ursula Le Guin, Ron Larson, Thomas Keneally, Taylor Branch, Tracy Chevalier, Lawrence Hill, Michael Frayn, Diane McWhorter, Robert Christopherson, Tracy Kidder and Yann Martel, ADDED.[1202841] [13-4829]
April 14, 2014 Filing 85 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by 3rd party. [1201912] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/17/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 84 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Jon Baumgarten, Stuart N. Brotman, Raymond T. Nimmer, Mark Schultz and John Simson, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201863] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/16/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Jon Baumgarten, Stuart N. Brotman, Raymond T. Nimmer, Mark Schultz and John Simson, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201860] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/16/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 82 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Copyright Alliance, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF, US mail. [1201817] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/16/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Photographic Artists, American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Mystery Writers of America, The National Association of Science Writers, National Press Photographers Association, National Writers Union, North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Romance Writers of America, Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, The Songwriters Guild of America, Text and Academic Authors Association, The Digital Media Licensing Association and Western Writers of America, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201814] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/16/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Copyright Alliance, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by US mail, CM/ECF. [1201812] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/16/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Copyright Alliance, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF, US mail. [1201803] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/16/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae The Copyright Alliance, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF, US mail. [1201795] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/16/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 77 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae International Authors Forum, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201761] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/16/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae International Publishers Association, International Association of Scientific, Technical and Medical Publishers, International Federation of Reproduction Rights Organisations and Marybeth Peters, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201536] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/15/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201511] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/15/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 73 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Malcolm Gladwell, J. M. Coetzee, Michael Pollan, Margaret Atwood, Peter Carey, Karen Russell, Ursula Le Guin, Ron Larson, Thomas Keneally, Taylor Branch, Tracy Chevalier, Lawrence Hill, Michael Frayn, Diane McWhorter, Robert Christopherson, Tracy Kidder and Yann Martel, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201502] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/15/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Malcolm Gladwell, J. M. Coetzee, Michael Pollan, Margaret Atwood, Peter Carey, Karen Russell, Ursula Le Guin, Ron Larson, Thomas Keneally, Taylor Branch, Tracy Chevalier, Lawrence Hill, Michael Frayn, Diane McWhorter, Robert Christopherson, Tracy Kidder and Yann Martel, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201494] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/15/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201489] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/15/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Malcolm Gladwell, J. M. Coetzee, Michael Pollan, Margaret Atwood, Peter Carey, Karen Russell, Ursula Le Guin, Ron Larson, Thomas Keneally, Taylor Branch, Tracy Chevalier, Lawrence Hill, Michael Frayn, Diane McWhorter, Robert Christopherson, Tracy Kidder and Yann Martel, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201485] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/15/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 69 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Photographic Artists, American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Mystery Writers of America, The National Association of Science Writers, National Press Photographers Association, National Writers Union, North American Nature Photography Association, Professional Photographers of America, Romance Writers of America, Society of Children's Book Writers and Illustrators, The Songwriters Guild of America, Text and Academic Authors Association, The Digital Media Licensing Association and Western Writers of America, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201448] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/16/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201327] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/15/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201310] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/15/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 64 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [59], on behalf of The Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED.[1201276] [13-4829]
April 14, 2014 Filing 63 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [58], on behalf of The Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED.[1201253] [13-4829]
April 14, 2014 Filing 62 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [56], on behalf of The International Publishers Association, The International Association of Scientific, Technical & Medical Publishers, The International Federation of Reproduction Rights Organisations, and Marybeth Peters, FILED.[1201232] [13-4829]
April 14, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae International Authors Forum, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201190] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/16/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 60 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201114] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/15/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of The Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201110] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/14/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of The Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201104] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/14/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 57 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae International Publishers Association, International Association of Scientific, Technical and Medical Publishers, International Federation of Reproduction Rights Organisations and Marybeth Peters, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201097] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/15/2014 by KG]
April 14, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of The International Publishers Association, The International Association of Scientific, Technical & Medical Publishers, The International Federation of Reproduction Rights Organisations, and Marybeth Peters, FILED. Service date 04/14/2014 by CM/ECF. [1201095] [13-4829]--[Edited 04/14/2014 by KG]
April 11, 2014 Filing 55 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 04/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1200323] [13-4829]
April 7, 2014 Filing 49 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. [1197622] [13-4829]
April 7, 2014 Filing 48 SEALED JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. [1197621] [13-4829]
April 7, 2014 Filing 47 SEALED BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. [1197617] [13-4829]
April 7, 2014 Filing 46 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, (pp. 1501-1640), on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 04/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1196285] [13-4829]
April 7, 2014 Filing 45 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, (pp. 1201-1500), on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 04/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1196280] [13-4829]
April 7, 2014 Filing 44 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, (pp. 901-1200), on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 04/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1196263] [13-4829]
April 7, 2014 Filing 43 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 6, (pp. 601-900), on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 04/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1196256] [13-4829]
April 7, 2014 Filing 42 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 6, (pp. 301-600), on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 04/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1196248] [13-4829]
April 7, 2014 Filing 41 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 6, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 04/07/2014 by CM/ECF.[1196245] [13-4829]
March 20, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to seal document [36] filed by Appellant Betty Miles, Joseph Goulden, Jim Bouton and The Authors Guild, by RJL, FILED. [1182909][40] [13-4829]
March 18, 2014 Filing 36 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 03/18/2014 by CM/ECF. [1181027] [13-4829]
February 13, 2014 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, Paul M. Smith for Betty Miles The Authors Guild, in case 13-4829 , [34], ADDED.[1156492] [13-4829]
February 11, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 02/11/2014 by CM/ECF. [1155045] [13-4829]
January 29, 2014 Filing 33 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [31], on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED.[1144539] [13-4829]
January 29, 2014 Filing 32 ATTORNEY, Seth P. Waxman for Google, Inc., in case 13-4829 , [31], ADDED.[1144535] [13-4829]
January 28, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/28/2014 by CM/ECF. [1144022] [13-4829]
January 28, 2014 Filing 30 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [29], on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED.[1143993] [13-4829]
January 27, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/27/2014 by CM/ECF. [1142769] [13-4829]
January 27, 2014 Filing 28 ATTORNEY, Randolph Daniel Moss for Google, Inc., in case 13-4829 , [24], ADDED.[1142664] [13-4829]
January 27, 2014 Filing 27 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [26], on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED.[1142656] [13-4829]
January 24, 2014 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/24/2014 by CM/ECF.[1141285] [13-4829]
January 24, 2014 Filing 25 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [23], on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED.[1140822] [13-4829]
January 23, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/23/2014 by CM/ECF. [1140495] [13-4829]
January 23, 2014 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Google, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/23/2014 by CM/ECF.[1140479] [13-4829]
January 23, 2014 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 01/23/2014 by CM/ECF.[1140369] [13-4829]
January 22, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE, to Appellee Google, Inc. , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1138792] [13-4829]
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, dated 01/22/2014, dismissing appeal by 02/05/2014, unless Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild submit the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[1138788] [13-4829]
January 21, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[1138323] [13-4829]
January 21, 2014 Filing 18 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild Brief due date as 04/07/2014; Joint Appendix due date as 04/07/2014, FILED.[1138312] [13-4829]
January 21, 2014 Filing 15 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, informing Court of proposed due date 04/07/2014, RECEIVED. Service date 01/21/2014 by CM/ECF.[1138105] [13-4829]
January 7, 2014 Filing 13 NEW CASE MANAGER, Kimberly Gay, ASSIGNED.[1127198] [13-4829]
January 6, 2014 Filing 7 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 01/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1126650] [13-4829]
January 6, 2014 Filing 6 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles and The Authors Guild, FILED. Service date 01/06/2014 by CM/ECF.[1126648] [13-4829]
December 23, 2013 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1126620] [13-4829]
December 23, 2013 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant The Authors Guild, Betty Miles, Jim Bouton, and Joseph Goulden, district court receipt # 0208-9204161, FILED.[1126617] [13-4829]
December 23, 2013 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT AMENDED JUDGMENT, dated 12/10/2013, RECEIVED.[1126614] [13-4829]
December 23, 2013 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/27/2013, RECEIVED.[1126613] [13-4829]
December 23, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant The Authors Guild, Betty Miles, Jim Bouton, and Joseph Goulden, FILED. [1126602] [13-4829]

Search for this case: The Authors Guild v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Mitgang
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hoffman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dickson
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc.
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearson Education, Inc.
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of American Publishers, Inc.
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canadian Standard Association
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wiley & Sons, Inc., individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Betty Miles
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Represented By: Robert Joseph LaRocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Jim Bouton
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Represented By: Robert Joseph LaRocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: The Authors Guild
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Represented By: Robert Joseph LaRocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Joseph Goulden, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Represented By: Robert Joseph LaRocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?