Bernard L. Madoff Investment S
Appellant: South Ferry #2 LP, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Sidney Cole, (IRA), Abraham Wolfson, Mark B. Evenstad, Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003,, MBE General LLC, as the General Partner of MBE Preferred Limited Partnership,, Edara Partnership, Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Kenneth L. Evenstad, individually and in his capacity as Grantor and Trustee for the Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust and in his Capacity as co-trustee of the Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust,, Trust Under Will of Phillip L. Shapiro, Emmanuel Gettinger, Rosen Martin, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Trust Under Will of Phillip L. Shapiro,, Grace B. Evenstad, individually and in her capacity as Trustee for the Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust and in her capacity as co-trustee of the Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust,, Rose Gindel Trust, Betsy Mann Polatsch, Proposed Customers-Intervenors, Frederica R. French, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Abraham J. Goldberg, Li Li Ram L.P., a New York limited partnership, Stephen R. Goldenberg, James Greiff, Norma Shapiro, Individually, and in Her Capacity as Trustee for the Norma Shapiro Revocable Declaration of Trust u/a/d and the Trust Under Will of Phillip,, Sidney R. Rabb Trust, f/b/o Carol Goldberg (M. Gordon Ehrlich, Avram J. Goldberg, and Carol R. Goldberg, trustees),, Laura E. Guggenheimer Cole, Carla Goldworm, Stanley T. Miller, (IRA),, Eugene J. Ribakoff 2006 Trust, Alvin Gindel, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Alvin Gindel Revocable Trust and in his Capacity as Trustee of the Rose Gindel Trust,, S & L Partnership, a New York Partnership,, Alexander McFerran, Solely in his Capacity as Successor Trustee,, Aaron Wolfson, Luke Goldworm, The Norma Shapiro Revocable Declaration of Trust, u/a/d, Delia Gail Rosenberg, Potamkin Family Foundation I, Inc., Serene Warren Revocable Trust, u/a/d September 15, 2005,, Neil Reger, Individually and in His Capacity as Trustee of the Neil Reger Profit Sharing Keogh,, Michael Mann, Harold A. Thau, David Markin Charitable Remainder Unitrust #1, Carol R. Goldberg, Avcar Group, Ltd., Christopher Warren, as co-trustee of the Serene Warren Revocable Trust,, Bam L.P., Stephanie Ribakoff, as Trustee of the Eugene J. Ribakoff 2006 Trust, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Eugene J. Ribakoff,, Lapin Children LLC, Adam Mann, South Ferry Building Company, Norton A. Eisenberg, Linda Horowitz Spousal Trust, f/b/o Richard Horowitz (Eric B. Woldenberg, trustee),, Zev Wolfson, Neil Reger Profit Sharing Keogh, Turtle Cay Partners, Toby T. Hobish, (IRA), Rose Gindel, Individually and in Her Capacity as Trustee of the Rose Gindel Trust,, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Phillip L. Shapiro, Sew General, LLC, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Revocable Trust u/a/d May 2, 2000,, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, individually and in her capacity as Trustee for the Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust,, Estate of David R. Markin, Alvin Gindel Revocable Trust, Estate of Eugene J. Ribakoff, Mark B. Evenstad, individually and in his capacity as Grantor and Trustee for the Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust,, Barbara J. Berdon, Aspen Fine Arts Co., Estate of Ira S. Rosenberg, Serene Warren, individually and in her capacity as co-trustee of the Serene Warren Revocable Trust,, The Frederica Ripley French Revocable Trust, David R. Markin Charitable Remainder Unitrust #2, Gerald Blumenthal, America-Israel Cultural Foundation, Inc., Meryl Mann, James Lowrey, Michael Gindel, Individually,, Gary Albert, Murray Pergament 1999 Trust, f/b/o Bruce D. Pergament (Eric B. Woldenberg and Bruce Pergament, trustees), Barry Weisfeld, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Harold J. Hein, (IRA),, Melvin Knyper, Lanx Fund II, LP, The, Samuel Goldworm and MBE Preferred Limited Partnership
Debtor: In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Appellee: Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff.
Case Number: 16-4049
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2017 Filing 161 CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 04/04/2017, disposing of the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2004245] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 04/04/2017 05:08 PM]
April 4, 2017 Filing 160 NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[2004240] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 04/04/2017 05:06 PM]
April 4, 2017 Filing 159 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to dismiss [ # 154 ] filed by Appellant Abraham Wolfson, James Lowrey, South Ferry Building Company, Emmanuel Gettinger, Zev Wolfson and South Ferry #2 LP, FILED. [2004237][159] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 04/04/2017 05:06 PM]
April 3, 2017 Filing 154 MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellant James Lowrey, South Ferry Building Company, Abraham Wolfson, Emmanuel Gettinger, Zev Wolfson and South Ferry #2 LP in 16-4045, 16-4049, FILED. Service date 04/03/2017 by CM/ECF. [2003325] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 04/03/2017 05:13 PM]
March 30, 2017 Filing 152 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard in 16-4045, 16-4049, informing Court of proposed due date 06/15/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 03/30/2017 by CM/ECF.[2001186] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/30/2017 01:15 PM]
March 17, 2017 Filing 147 ATTORNEY, Graham Cronogue for Coldbrook Associates Partnership Edara Partnership South Ferry #2 LP South Ferry Building Company Wolfson Cousins, LP Estate of Marianne Lowrey Aaron Wolfson Lanx Fund II, LP Zev Wolfson Abraham Wolfson Turtle Cay Partners James Lowrey Emmanuel Gettinger, in case 16-4049 Graham Cronogue for Coldbrook Associates Partnership Edara Partnership South Ferry #2 LP South Ferry Building Company Wolfson Cousins, LP Estate of Marianne Lowrey Aaron Wolfson Lanx Fund II, LP Zev Wolfson Abraham Wolfson Turtle Cay Partners James Lowrey Emmanuel Gettinger, in case 16-4045 , [ # 140 ], ADDED.[1991392] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/17/2017 12:28 PM]
March 17, 2017 Filing 146 ATTORNEY, Raija Churchill for Coldbrook Associates Partnership Edara Partnership South Ferry #2 LP South Ferry Building Company Wolfson Cousins, LP Estate of Marianne Lowrey Aaron Wolfson Lanx Fund II, LP Zev Wolfson Abraham Wolfson Turtle Cay Partners James Lowrey Emmanuel Gettinger, in case 16-4049 Raija Churchill for Coldbrook Associates Partnership Edara Partnership South Ferry #2 LP South Ferry Building Company Wolfson Cousins, LP Estate of Marianne Lowrey Aaron Wolfson Lanx Fund II, LP Zev Wolfson Abraham Wolfson Turtle Cay Partners James Lowrey Emmanuel Gettinger, in case 16-4045 , [ # 139 ], ADDED.[1991390] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/17/2017 12:26 PM]
March 16, 2017 Filing 141 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Edara Partnership, Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Emmanuel Gettinger, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Lanx Fund II, LP, James Lowrey, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Turtle Cay Partners, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson and Zev Wolfson in 16-4045, 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[1990849] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/16/2017 06:42 PM]
March 16, 2017 Filing 140 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Wolfson Cousins, LP, Lanx Fund II, LP, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Edara Partnership, James Lowrey, Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Turtle Cay Partners, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, South Ferry Building Company, Emmanuel Gettinger, Abraham Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, South Ferry #2 LP and Aaron Wolfson in 16-4045, 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [1990774] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/16/2017 04:40 PM]
March 16, 2017 Filing 139 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Wolfson Cousins, LP, Lanx Fund II, LP, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Edara Partnership, James Lowrey, Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Turtle Cay Partners, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, South Ferry Building Company, Emmanuel Gettinger, Abraham Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, South Ferry #2 LP and Aaron Wolfson in 16-4045, 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [1990766] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/16/2017 04:35 PM]
March 16, 2017 Filing 138 ATTORNEY, Laura Kristine Clinton for Coldbrook Associates Partnership Edara Partnership South Ferry #2 LP Lanx BM Investments, LLC South Ferry Building Company Wolfson Cousins, LP Estate of Marianne Lowrey Aaron Wolfson Lanx Fund II, LP Zev Wolfson Abraham Wolfson Turtle Cay Partners James Lowrey Emmanuel Gettinger, in case 16-4049 Laura Kristine Clinton for Coldbrook Associates Partnership Edara Partnership South Ferry #2 LP Lanx BM Investments, LLC South Ferry Building Company Wolfson Cousins, LP Estate of Marianne Lowrey Aaron Wolfson Lanx Fund II, LP Zev Wolfson Abraham Wolfson Turtle Cay Partners James Lowrey Emmanuel Gettinger, in case 16-4045 , [ # 129 ], ADDED.[1990703] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/16/2017 04:08 PM]
March 16, 2017 Filing 137 ATTORNEY, Richard A. Kirby for Coldbrook Associates Partnership Edara Partnership South Ferry #2 LP Lanx BM Investments, LLC South Ferry Building Company Wolfson Cousins, LP Estate of Marianne Lowrey Aaron Wolfson Lanx Fund II, LP Zev Wolfson Abraham Wolfson Turtle Cay Partners James Lowrey Emmanuel Gettinger, in case 16-4049 Richard A. Kirby for Coldbrook Associates Partnership Edara Partnership South Ferry #2 LP Lanx BM Investments, LLC South Ferry Building Company Wolfson Cousins, LP Estate of Marianne Lowrey Aaron Wolfson Lanx Fund II, LP Zev Wolfson Abraham Wolfson Turtle Cay Partners James Lowrey Emmanuel Gettinger, in case 16-4045 , [ # 127 ], ADDED.[1990685] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/16/2017 04:03 PM]
March 16, 2017 Filing 136 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 6 of 6, (pp. 1251-1504), on behalf of Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4045, Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[1990647] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/16/2017 03:50 PM]
March 16, 2017 Filing 135 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 6, (pp. 1001-1250), on behalf of Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4045, Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[1990624] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/16/2017 03:43 PM]
March 16, 2017 Filing 134 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 6, (pp. 751-1000), on behalf of Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4045, Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[1990609] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/16/2017 03:32 PM]
March 16, 2017 Filing 133 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 6, (pp. 501-750), on behalf of Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4045, Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[1990569] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/16/2017 03:14 PM]
March 16, 2017 Filing 132 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 6, (pp. 251-500), on behalf of Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4045, Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[1990534] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/16/2017 02:56 PM]
March 16, 2017 Filing 131 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 6, (pp. 1-250), on behalf of Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4045, Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/16/2017 by CM/ECF.[1990512] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/16/2017 02:48 PM]
March 16, 2017 Filing 130 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4045, Appellant Grace B. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Kenneth L. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Mark B. Evenstad, Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust, Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, MBE General LLC, MBE Preferred Limited Partnership, Serene Warren Revocable Trust, Sew General, LLC, Sew Preferred Limited Partnership, Christopher Warren and Serene Warren in 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [1990508] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/16/2017 02:42 PM]
March 15, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Wolfson Cousins, LP, Lanx Fund II, LP, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Edara Partnership, James Lowrey, Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Turtle Cay Partners, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, South Ferry Building Company, South Ferry #2 LP, Emmanuel Gettinger, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson and Zev Wolfson in 16-4045, 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [1989855] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/15/2017 08:23 PM]
March 15, 2017 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Wolfson Cousins, LP, Lanx Fund II, LP, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Edara Partnership, James Lowrey, Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Turtle Cay Partners, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, South Ferry Building Company, South Ferry #2 LP, Emmanuel Gettinger, Abraham Wolfson, Zev Wolfson and Aaron Wolfson in 16-4045, 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [1989854] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/15/2017 08:20 PM]
March 15, 2017 Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Zev Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson, Emmanuel Gettinger, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, James Lowrey, Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Turtle Cay Partners, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Lanx Fund II, LP, Lanx BM Investments, LLC and Edara Partnership in 16-4045, 16-4049, FILED. Service date 03/15/2017 by CM/ECF. [1989853] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/15/2017 08:11 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 125 CAPTION, as per Court Order filed 03/06/2027, AMENDED.[1984310] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:47 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 124 PROPOSED CUSTOMERS-INTERVENORS, APPELLANT, TERMINATED.[1984300] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:40 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 123 NEW PARTY, Appellant Barry Weisfeld in 16-4049, ADDED.[1984288] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:34 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 122 NEW PARTY, Appellant Luke Goldworm in 16-4049, ADDED.[1984287] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:32 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 121 NEW PARTY, Appellant Samuel Goldworm in 16-4049, ADDED.[1984285] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:31 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 120 NEW PARTY, Appellant Carla Goldworm in 16-4049, ADDED.[1984283] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:30 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 119 NEW PARTY, Appellant S & L Partnership in 16-4049, ADDED.[1984282] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:29 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 118 NEW PARTY, Appellant Adam Mann in 16-4049, ADDED.[1984281] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:27 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 117 NEW PARTY, Appellant Betsy Mann Polatsch in 16-4049, ADDED.[1984280] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:26 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 116 NEW PARTY, Appellant Meryl Mann in 16-4049, ADDED.[1984279] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:24 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 115 NEW PARTY, Appellant Michael Mann in 16-4049, ADDED.[1984276] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:23 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 114 NEW PARTY, Appellant Bam L.P. in 16-4049, ADDED.[1984275] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:22 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 113 NEW PARTY, Appellant Rosen Martin in 16-4049, ADDED.[1984274] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 05:21 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 112 NEW PARTY, Appellant Phillip L. Shapiro in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983943] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 02:22 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 111 NEW PARTY, Appellant Norma Shapiro in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983927] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 02:15 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 110 NEW PARTY, Appellant Trust Under Will of Phillip L. Shapiro in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983895] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 01:41 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 109 NEW PARTY, Appellant Norma Shapiro Revocable Declaration of Trust in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983893] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 01:39 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 108 NEW PARTY, Appellant Neil Reger in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983891] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 01:37 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 107 NEW PARTY, Appellant Neil Reger Profit Sharing Keogh in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983881] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 01:32 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 106 NEW PARTY, Appellant Stanley T. Miller in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983839] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:53 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 105 NEW PARTY, Appellant David R. Markin Charitable Remainder Unitrust #2 in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983827] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:50 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 104 NEW PARTY, Appellant David Markin Charitable Remainder Unitrust #1 in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983823] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:48 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 103 NEW PARTY, Appellant Estate of David R. Markin in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983816] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:46 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 102 NEW PARTY, Appellant Lapin Children LLC in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983810] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:45 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 101 NEW PARTY, Appellant Li Li Ram L.P. in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983808] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:44 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 100 NEW PARTY, Appellant Toby T. Hobish in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983798] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:38 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 99 NEW PARTY, Appellant Harold J. Hein in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983793] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:36 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 98 NEW PARTY, Appellant James Greiff in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983790] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:35 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 97 NEW PARTY, Appellant Alexander McFerran in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983788] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:34 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 96 NEW PARTY, Appellant Frederica R. French in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983782] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:32 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 95 NEW PARTY, Appellant Frederica Ripley French Revocable Trust in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983779] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:30 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 94 NEW PARTY, Appellant Frederica Ripley French Revocable Trust in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983773] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:25 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 93 NEW PARTY, Appellant Sidney Cole in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983761] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:21 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 92 NEW PARTY, Appellant Laura E. Guggenheimer Cole in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983747] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:14 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 91 NEW PARTY, Appellant Stephanie Ribakoff in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983745] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:11 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 90 NEW PARTY, Appellant Estate of Eugene J. Ribakoff in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983739] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:09 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 89 NEW PARTY, Appellant Eugene J. Ribakoff 2006 Trust in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983736] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:07 PM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 88 NEW PARTY, Appellant Barbara J. Berdon in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983680] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 11:44 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 87 NEW PARTY, Appellant Michael Gindel in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983674] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 11:42 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 86 NEW PARTY, Appellant Rose Gindel in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983672] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 11:40 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 85 NEW PARTY, Appellant Rose Gindel Trust in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983666] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 11:38 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 84 NEW PARTY, Appellant America-Israel Cultural Foundation, Inc. in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983660] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 11:37 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 83 NEW PARTY, Appellant Alvin Gindel in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983637] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 11:30 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 82 NEW PARTY, Appellant Alvin Gindel Revocable Trust in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983617] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 11:24 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 81 NEW PARTY, Appellant Sidney R. Rabb Trust in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983613] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 11:21 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 80 NEW PARTY, Appellant Carol R. Goldberg in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983557] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 10:53 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 79 NEW PARTY, Appellant Avcar Group, Ltd. in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983524] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 10:44 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 78 NEW PARTY, Appellant Abraham J. Goldberg in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983520] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 10:42 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 77 NEW PARTY, Appellant Linda Horowitz Spousal Trust in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983501] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 10:28 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 76 NEW PARTY, Appellant Murray Pergament 1999 Trust in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983499] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 10:24 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 75 NEW PARTY, Appellant Gary Albert in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983495] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 10:19 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 74 NEW PARTY, Appellant Harold A. Thau in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983493] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 10:18 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 73 NEW PARTY, Appellant Potamkin Family Foundation I, Inc. in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983491] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 10:16 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 72 NEW PARTY, Appellant Stephen R. Goldenberg in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983487] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 10:14 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 71 NEW PARTY, Appellant Delia Gail Rosenberg in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983485] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 10:12 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 70 NEW PARTY, Appellant Estate of Ira S. Rosenberg in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983440] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 09:49 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 69 NEW PARTY, Appellant Norton A. Eisenberg in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983408] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 09:33 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 68 NEW PARTY, Appellant Gerald Blumenthal in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983404] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 09:31 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 67 NEW PARTY, Appellant Melvin Knyper in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983399] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 09:30 AM]
March 7, 2017 Filing 66 NEW PARTY, Appellant Aspen Fine Arts Co. in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983395] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/07/2017 09:29 AM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 65 NEW PARTY, Appellant Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983229] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 05:22 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 64 NEW PARTY, Appellant Sew General, LLC in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983228] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 05:20 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 63 NEW PARTY, Appellant Sew Preferred Limited Partnership in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983224] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 05:19 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 62 NEW PARTY, Appellant Serene Warren in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983219] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 05:17 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 61 NEW PARTY, Appellant Christopher Warren in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983202] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 05:10 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 60 NEW PARTY, Appellant Serene Warren Revocable Trust in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983198] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 05:08 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 59 NEW PARTY, Appellant MBE General LLC in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983196] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 05:05 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 58 NEW PARTY, Appellant MBE Preferred Limited Partnership in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983192] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 05:02 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 57 NEW PARTY, Appellant Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983188] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 05:01 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 56 NEW PARTY, Appellant Mark B. Evenstad in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983176] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 04:56 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 55 NEW PARTY, Appellant Mark B. Evenstad in 16-4049, ADDED.[1983168] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 04:53 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 54 NEW PARTY, Appellant Kenneth L. Evenstad in 16-4049, ADDED.[1982846] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 02:29 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 53 NEW PARTY, Appellant Grace B. Evenstad in 16-4049, ADDED.[1982814] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 02:01 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 52 NEW PARTY, Appellant Kenneth L. Evenstad in 16-4049, ADDED.[1982810] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:58 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 51 NEW PARTY, Appellant Aaron Wolfson in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982807] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:52 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 50 NEW PARTY, Appellant South Ferry #2 LP in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982806] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:51 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 49 NEW PARTY, Appellant Zev Wolfson in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982804] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:49 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 48 NEW PARTY, Appellant Abraham Wolfson in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982803] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:47 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 47 NEW PARTY, Appellant Emmanuel Gettinger in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982801] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:46 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 46 NEW PARTY, Appellant South Ferry Building Company in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982799] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:45 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 45 NEW PARTY, Appellant Coldbrook Associates Partnership in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982794] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:43 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 44 NEW PARTY, Appellant Turtle Cay Partners in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982789] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:41 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 43 NEW PARTY, Appellant Estate of Marianne Lowrey in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982786] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:39 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 42 NEW PARTY, Appellant James Lowrey in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982784] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:32 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 41 NEW PARTY, Appellant Edara Partnership in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982782] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:30 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 40 NEW PARTY, Appellant Lanx Fund II, LP in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982780] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:26 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 39 NEW PARTY, Appellant Wolfson Cousins, LP in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982774] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:19 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 38 NEW PARTY, Appellant Lanx BM Investments, LLC in 16-4045, ADDED.[1982770] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 01:17 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to amend caption [ # 33 ] filed by Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4045, by RSP, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1982353][37] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 03/06/2017 10:26 AM]
February 28, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4045, FILED. Service date 02/28/2017 by CM/ECF. [1979021] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 02/28/2017 09:45 PM]
December 29, 2016 Filing 32 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4045, 16-4049 Brief due date as 03/16/2017. Joint Appendix due date as 03/16/2017, FILED.[1937244] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/29/2016 11:37 AM]
December 28, 2016 Filing 31 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4045, informing Court of proposed due date 03/16/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 12/28/2016 by CM/ECF.[1936696] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/28/2016 03:44 PM]
December 27, 2016 Filing 30 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4049, 16-4045, informing Court of proposed due date 03/16/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 12/27/2016 by CM/ECF.[1935818] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 12/27/2016 04:37 PM]
December 22, 2016 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Nick Cremona for Irving H. Picard, in case 16-4049 Nick Cremona for Irving H. Picard, in case 16-4045 , [ # 27 ], ADDED.[1933848] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/22/2016 10:37 AM]
December 22, 2016 Filing 28 NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[1933845] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/22/2016 10:35 AM]
December 20, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard in 16-4045, 16-4049, FILED. Service date 12/20/2016 by CM/ECF. [1932422] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/20/2016 05:31 PM]
December 20, 2016 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4049, 16-4045, FILED. Service date 12/20/2016 by CM/ECF.[1931910] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 12/20/2016 01:44 PM]
December 19, 2016 Filing 24 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4049, 16-4045, FILED. Service date 12/19/2016 by CM/ECF.[1931105] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 12/19/2016 04:02 PM]
December 19, 2016 Filing 21 ATTORNEY, Daniel B. Besikof for Proposed Customers-Intervenors, in case 16-4049, 16-4045, [ # 16 ], ADDED.[1930261] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/19/2016 08:19 AM]
December 16, 2016 Filing 20 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4045, FILED. Service date 12/16/2016 by CM/ECF.[1930185] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/16/2016 04:59 PM]
December 16, 2016 Filing 19 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4045, FILED. Service date 12/16/2016 by CM/ECF.[1930179] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/16/2016 04:53 PM]
December 16, 2016 Filing 18 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4049, 16-4045, FILED. Service date 12/16/2016 by CM/ECF.[1930103] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 12/16/2016 04:04 PM]
December 16, 2016 Filing 17 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4049, 16-4045, FILED. Service date 12/16/2016 by CM/ECF.[1930101] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 12/16/2016 04:03 PM]
December 16, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4049, 16-4045, FILED. Service date 12/16/2016 by CM/ECF. [1930097] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 12/16/2016 04:02 PM]
December 16, 2016 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors in 16-4049, 16-4045, FILED. Service date 12/16/2016 by CM/ECF.[1930091] [16-4049, 16-4045] [Entered: 12/16/2016 03:59 PM]
December 13, 2016 Filing 13 ATTORNEY, Keith R. Murphy for Irving H. Picard, in case 16-4049, 16-4045 , [ # 12 ], ADDED.[1926715] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/13/2016 03:10 PM]
December 13, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard in 16-4045, 16-4049, FILED. Service date 12/13/2016 by CM/ECF. [1926697] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/13/2016 03:06 PM]
December 13, 2016 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Irving H. Picard, in case 16-4049, 16-4045 , [ # 10 ], ADDED.[1926592] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/13/2016 02:22 PM]
December 13, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard in 16-4045, 16-4049, FILED. Service date 12/13/2016 by CM/ECF. [1926564] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/13/2016 02:08 PM]
December 13, 2016 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard in 16-4045, 16-4049, FILED. Service date 12/13/2016 by CM/ECF.[1926541] [16-4045, 16-4049] [Entered: 12/13/2016 01:57 PM]
December 5, 2016 Filing 6 NOTE: See lead case, 16-4045, containing complete set of docket entries.[1920084] [16-4049] [Entered: 12/05/2016 12:13 PM]
December 2, 2016 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1920080] [16-4049] [Entered: 12/05/2016 12:13 PM]
December 2, 2016 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/03/2016, RECEIVED.[1920077] [16-4049] [Entered: 12/05/2016 12:12 PM]
December 2, 2016 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 11/02/2016, RECEIVED.[1920063] [16-4049] [Entered: 12/05/2016 12:01 PM]
December 2, 2016 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors, district court docket entry re: receipt # 0208-13052435, FILED.[1920062] [16-4049] [Entered: 12/05/2016 12:00 PM]
December 2, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Proposed Customers-Intervenors, FILED. [1920056] [16-4049] [Entered: 12/05/2016 11:57 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bernard L. Madoff Investment S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: South Ferry #2 LP
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wolfson Cousins, LP
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sidney Cole, (IRA)
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Abraham Wolfson
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mark B. Evenstad, Revocable Trust u/a/d January 30, 2003,
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MBE General LLC, as the General Partner of MBE Preferred Limited Partnership,
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Edara Partnership
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Estate of Marianne Lowrey
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kenneth L. Evenstad, individually and in his capacity as Grantor and Trustee for the Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust and in his Capacity as co-trustee of the Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust,
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Trust Under Will of Phillip L. Shapiro
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Emmanuel Gettinger
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rosen Martin, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Trust Under Will of Phillip L. Shapiro,
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Grace B. Evenstad, individually and in her capacity as Trustee for the Kenneth L. Evenstad Revocable Trust and in her capacity as co-trustee of the Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust,
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rose Gindel Trust
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Betsy Mann Polatsch
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Proposed Customers-Intervenors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Frederica R. French
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Coldbrook Associates Partnership
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lanx BM Investments, LLC
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Abraham J. Goldberg
Represented By: Richard Levy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Li Li Ram L.P., a New York limited partnership
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stephen R. Goldenberg
Represented By: Matthew Kupillas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James Greiff
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Norma Shapiro, Individually, and in Her Capacity as Trustee for the Norma Shapiro Revocable Declaration of Trust u/a/d and the Trust Under Will of Phillip,
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sidney R. Rabb Trust, f/b/o Carol Goldberg (M. Gordon Ehrlich, Avram J. Goldberg, and Carol R. Goldberg, trustees),
Represented By: Richard Levy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Laura E. Guggenheimer Cole
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carla Goldworm
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stanley T. Miller, (IRA),
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Eugene J. Ribakoff 2006 Trust
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alvin Gindel, in his Capacity as Trustee of the Alvin Gindel Revocable Trust and in his Capacity as Trustee of the Rose Gindel Trust,
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: S & L Partnership, a New York Partnership,
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alexander McFerran, Solely in his Capacity as Successor Trustee,
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Aaron Wolfson
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Luke Goldworm
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Norma Shapiro Revocable Declaration of Trust, u/a/d
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Delia Gail Rosenberg
Represented By: Matthew Kupillas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Potamkin Family Foundation I, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Kupillas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Serene Warren Revocable Trust, u/a/d September 15, 2005,
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Neil Reger, Individually and in His Capacity as Trustee of the Neil Reger Profit Sharing Keogh,
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael Mann
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Harold A. Thau
Represented By: Matthew Kupillas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David Markin Charitable Remainder Unitrust #1
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carol R. Goldberg
Represented By: Richard Levy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Avcar Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Richard Levy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Christopher Warren, as co-trustee of the Serene Warren Revocable Trust,
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bam L.P.
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Stephanie Ribakoff, as Trustee of the Eugene J. Ribakoff 2006 Trust, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Eugene J. Ribakoff,
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lapin Children LLC
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Adam Mann
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: South Ferry Building Company
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Norton A. Eisenberg
Represented By: Matthew Kupillas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Linda Horowitz Spousal Trust, f/b/o Richard Horowitz (Eric B. Woldenberg, trustee),
Represented By: Richard Levy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Zev Wolfson
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Neil Reger Profit Sharing Keogh
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Turtle Cay Partners
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Toby T. Hobish, (IRA)
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rose Gindel, Individually and in Her Capacity as Trustee of the Rose Gindel Trust,
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Grace B. Evenstad Revocable Trust
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Phillip L. Shapiro
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sew General, LLC
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kenneth L. Evenstad, Revocable Trust u/a/d May 2, 2000,
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Shannnon Mahoney Evenstad, individually and in her capacity as Trustee for the Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust,
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Estate of David R. Markin
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alvin Gindel Revocable Trust
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Estate of Eugene J. Ribakoff
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mark B. Evenstad, individually and in his capacity as Grantor and Trustee for the Mark B. Evenstad Revocable Trust,
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Barbara J. Berdon
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Aspen Fine Arts Co.
Represented By: Matthew Kupillas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Estate of Ira S. Rosenberg
Represented By: Matthew Kupillas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Serene Warren, individually and in her capacity as co-trustee of the Serene Warren Revocable Trust,
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Frederica Ripley French Revocable Trust
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David R. Markin Charitable Remainder Unitrust #2
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gerald Blumenthal
Represented By: Matthew Kupillas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: America-Israel Cultural Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Meryl Mann
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James Lowrey
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael Gindel, Individually,
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gary Albert
Represented By: Matthew Kupillas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Murray Pergament 1999 Trust, f/b/o Bruce D. Pergament (Eric B. Woldenberg and Bruce Pergament, trustees)
Represented By: Richard Levy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Barry Weisfeld
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sew Preferred Limited Partnership
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Harold J. Hein, (IRA),
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Melvin Knyper
Represented By: Matthew Kupillas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lanx Fund II, LP, The
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Represented By: Raija Churchill Esq.
Represented By: Graham Cronogue Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Samuel Goldworm
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MBE Preferred Limited Partnership
Represented By: Peter Gregory Schwed Esq.
Represented By: Daniel B. Besikof Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff.
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal Esq.
Represented By: Nick Cremona Esq.
Represented By: Keith R. Murphy
Represented By: David J. Sheehan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?