Bernard L. Madoff Investment
Amicus Curiae: Appendix D, Jeffrey Hinte, Amici Curiae Appendix A, Norman Blum; Estate of Doris M. Pearlman; Heidi Pearlman; Jill Beth Pearlman; Doris M. Pearlman Revocable Trust; Marvin A. Goldberg; Lanx BM Investments, LLC; The Lanx Fund II, LP; Wolfson Cousins, LP; Edara Partnership; Stua, Appendix B, Murray Pergament 1999 Trust f/b/o Bruce Pergament; Linda Horowitz Spousal Trust f/b/o Richard Horowitz; James P. Marden; Patrice M. Auld; Bernard Marden Profit Sharing Plan; Marden Family Limited Partnership; Stanley Plesent. and Appendix C, Barbara J. Berdon; Laura E. Guggenheimer Cole; Alvin Gindel Revocable Trust, a Florida Trust, and Alvin Gindel, in his capacity as trustee of the Alvin Gindel Revocable Trust and individually as settlor and beneficiary thereof; Rose Ginde
Appellant: Estate of Boyer Palmer, Patricia DeLuca, Nancy Zraick, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Karen M. Rich
Appellee: Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Debtor: In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Intervenor: Securities Investor Protection Corporation, Statutory Intervenor pursuant to Securities Investor Protection Act, 15 U.S.C. Section 78eee(d)
Case Number: 16-420
Filed: February 16, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER, dated 09/25/2017, denying the application for costs filed by Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED.[2132222] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 09/25/2017 10:01 AM]
July 13, 2017 Filing 170 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[2078520] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 07/13/2017 04:19 PM]
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER, petition for rehearing denied, by RSP, PWH, SLC, C.JJ., FILED.[2072283] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 07/06/2017 02:53 PM]
June 19, 2017 Filing 166 CURED DEFECTIVE PETITION FOR REHEARING [ # 164 ], [ # 165 ], on behalf of Appellant Elliot G. Sagor in 16-413, FILED.[2061369] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 06/19/2017 03:53 PM]
June 19, 2017 Filing 165 PETITION FOR REHEARING, on behalf of Appellant Elliot G. Sagor in 16-413, FILED. Service date 06/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2061051] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 06/19/2017 12:57 PM]
June 19, 2017 Filing 164 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Petition for Rehearing, [163], on behalf of Appellant Elliot G. Sagor in 16-413, FILED.[2060644] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 06/19/2017 09:51 AM]
June 14, 2017 Filing 163 PETITION FOR REHEARING, on behalf of Appellant Elliot G. Sagor in 16-413, FILED. Service date 06/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2058697] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 06/14/2017 07:17 PM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 160 SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirming the district court judgment, by RSP, PWH, SLC, C.JJ., FILED.[2047740] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 06/01/2017 09:47 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 159 NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[2047718] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 06/01/2017 09:38 AM]
May 11, 2017 Filing 157 CASE, before RSP, PWH, SLC, C.JJ., HEARD.[2032757] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 05/11/2017 12:02 PM]
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER, dated 04/28/2017, granting permission to have a court reporter attend and transcribe oral argument, FILED.[2022643] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 04/28/2017 04:42 PM]
April 5, 2017 Filing 144 MOTION ORDER, denying motion for oral argument [ # 124 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, FILED. [2004687][144] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 04/05/2017 11:54 AM]
April 3, 2017 Filing 142 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, copy sent to pro se, TRANSMITTED.[2003189] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 04/03/2017 04:13 PM]
March 29, 2017 Filing 140 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 05/11/2017, SET.[2000374] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 03/29/2017 03:39 PM]
March 2, 2017 Filing 139 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/08/2017, PROPOSED.[1980648] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 03/02/2017 12:32 PM]
December 7, 2016 Filing 137 MOTION ORDER, referring motion for oral argument [ # 124 ] filed by Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A, to the panel that will determine the merits of the appeal, FILED. [1922190][137] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/07/2016 11:41 AM]
December 6, 2016 Filing 133 CURED DEFECTIVE : MOTION, FORM [ # 124 ], [ # 131 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, FILED.[1921122] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/06/2016 12:53 PM]
December 6, 2016 Filing 131 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Richard A. Kirby, Esq. for Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 12/06/2016 by CM/ECF. [1920823] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/06/2016 10:19 AM]
December 6, 2016 Filing 130 ATTORNEY, Richard A. Kirby for Amici Curiae Appendix A, in case 16-420 Richard A. Kirby for Amici Curiae Appendix A, in case 16-413 Richard A. Kirby for Amici Curiae Appendix A, in case 16-423 , [ # 129 ], ADDED.[1920669] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/06/2016 08:59 AM]
December 5, 2016 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A, FILED. Service date 12/05/2016 by CM/ECF. [1920426] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/05/2016 04:04 PM]
December 5, 2016 Filing 127 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,Motion, for oral argument, Oral argument statements, [120], [121], [125], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, FILED.[1920137] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/05/2016 12:38 PM]
December 2, 2016 Filing 125 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Laura Kristine Clinton, Esq. for Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 12/02/2016 by CM/ECF. [1919518] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/02/2016 04:33 PM]
December 2, 2016 Filing 124 MOTION, for oral argument, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 12/02/2016 by CM/ECF. [1919515] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/02/2016 04:32 PM]
December 2, 2016 Filing 121 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Laura Kristine Clinton, Esq. for Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 12/02/2016 by CM/ECF. [1919090] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/02/2016 12:45 PM]
December 2, 2016 Filing 120 MOTION, for oral argument, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 12/02/2016 by CM/ECF. [1919079] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/02/2016 12:41 PM]
December 2, 2016 Filing 119 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, for oral argument, [118], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, FILED.[1919043] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/02/2016 12:13 PM]
December 1, 2016 Filing 118 MOTION, for oral argument, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 12/01/2016 by CM/ECF. [1918139] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/01/2016 02:33 PM]
December 1, 2016 Filing 117 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, for oral argument, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A , [116], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, FILED.[1917595] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 12/01/2016 10:15 AM]
November 30, 2016 Filing 116 MOTION, for oral argument, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 11/30/2016 by CM/ECF. [1917355] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 11/30/2016 11:04 PM]
October 17, 2016 Filing 115 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 01/09/2017, B, PROPOSED.[1885349] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 10/17/2016 11:11 AM]
October 4, 2016 Filing 110 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Reply Brief, [105], [106], on behalf of Appellant Elliot G. Sagor in 16-413, FILED.[1876797] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 10/04/2016 12:05 PM]
October 4, 2016 Filing 109 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 12/12/2016, B, PROPOSED.[1876740] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 10/04/2016 11:39 AM]
October 4, 2016 Filing 107 CORRECTED REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Elliot G. Sagor in 16-413, FILED. Service date 10/04/2016 by CM/ECF. [1876506] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423]--[Edited 10/04/2016 by EM] [Entered: 10/04/2016 09:46 AM]
October 3, 2016 Filing 106 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Elliot G. Sagor in 16-413, FILED. Service date 10/03/2016 by CM/ECF. [1876330] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 10/03/2016 04:55 PM]
September 30, 2016 Filing 105 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Elliot G. Sagor in 16-413, FILED. Service date 09/30/2016 by CM/ECF. [1875190] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 09/30/2016 04:03 PM]
September 30, 2016 Filing 104 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Nancy Zraick in 16-413, Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr., Edward A. Zraick, Jr., Nancy Zraick and Nancy Zraick in 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 09/30/2016 by CM/ECF. [1875093] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 09/30/2016 03:22 PM]
September 29, 2016 Filing 102 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Denis Castelli, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Adele Fox, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Robert Halio, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Babanel JT Wros., Heidi Holmers, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Toby Lees, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Bret Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Marsha Peshkin, Glenn Rechler, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sage Realty, Sandy Sandler, Elaine R. Schaffer, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Steven C. Schupak, Jonathan Schwartz, Roberta Schwartz, Keith Shaffer, Timothy S. Teufel, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Angela Tiletnick, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Jon Warner, Robin L. Warner and Willi Rechler Trust in 16-413, Appellant Estate of Boyer Palmer in 16-420, Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Jessica Decker, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer & Boyer H. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Barbanel NT Wros, Heidi Holmers, Marsh Peshkin Ira, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, NTC & Co., Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Boyer H. Palmer, Bret Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Glenn Rechler, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sage Realty, Sandy Sandler, Elaine R. Schaffer, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Jonathan Schwartz, Roberta Schwartz, Timothy S. Teufel, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Angela Tiletnick, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Jon Warner, Robin L. Warner, Willi Rechler Trust and Robert Yaffe in 16-423, FILED. Service date 09/29/2016 by CM/ECF. [1874360] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 09/29/2016 05:04 PM]
September 2, 2016 Filing 100 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Elliot G. Sagor for Appellant Elliot G. Sagor in 16-413, FILED. Service date 09/02/2016 by CM/ECF. [1856178] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 09/02/2016 04:56 PM]
September 2, 2016 Filing 97 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Robert A. Rich, Esq. for Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Nancy Zraick in 16-413, Attorney Robert A. Rich, Esq. for Appellant Edward A. Zraick, Jr., Nancy Zraick, Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr., Nancy Zraick, Patricia DeLuca and Karen M. Rich in 16-420, Attorney Robert A. Rich, Esq. for Appellant Edward A. Zraick, Jr., Nancy Zraick, Patricia DeLuca and Karen M. Rich in 16-423, FILED. Service date 09/02/2016 by CM/ECF. [1856010] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 09/02/2016 03:10 PM]
September 1, 2016 Filing 95 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Helen Davis Chaitman, Esq. for Appellant Theresa R. Ryan, Lawrence J. Ryan, Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Kelly Bunch, Roberta Schwartz, Bret Palmer, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Aaron Blecker, Angela Tiletnick, Barbara Engel, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Ben Heller, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Beth P. Feldman, Bruce N. Palmer, Carol Fisher, Carol Kamenstein, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Frances Reiss, Isabel Chalek, John Tzannes Trust, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Peter Tzannes, Richard Mark Chalek, Robin Tzannes, Laura Hallick, Elaine R. Schaffer, Fern C. Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Fern C. Palmer Revocable Trust, Frieda Low, Glenn Rechler, Gunther Unflat, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Babanel JT Wros., Jonathan Schwartz, Keith Shaffer, Martin R. Harnick, Marjorie Forrest, Kurt C. Palmer, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Steven P. Norton, Robert K. Low, Richard M. Friedman, Rona Mast, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Philip E. Miller, Pamela K. Marxen, Sage Realty, Ryan Murray, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Palmer Family Trust, Gunther K. Unflat, Robin L. Warner, Jon Warner, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Megan Bunch, Marsha Peshkin, Benjamin Rechler Trust, Oscar Palmer, Blake Palmer, Mishkin Family Trust, Dana LeFavor, Sandy Sandler, Boyer Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Timothy S. Teufel, Willi Rechler Trust, Heidi Holmers, Gaba Partnership, Denis Castelli, Robert Halio, Steven C. Schupak, Adele Fox, Toby Lees and Estate of Boyer Palmer in 16-413, Attorney Ms. Helen Davis Chaitman, Esq. for Appellant Estate of Boyer Palmer in 16-420, FILED. Service date 09/01/2016 by CM/ECF. [1854417] [16-423, 16-413, 16-420] [Entered: 09/01/2016 10:30 AM]
September 1, 2016 Filing 92 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Nathanael Kelley, Esq. for Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 09/01/2016 by CM/ECF. [1854205] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 09/01/2016 09:11 AM]
August 31, 2016 Filing 91 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal, Esq. for Appellee Irving H. Picard in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 08/31/2016 by CM/ECF. [1854085] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 08/31/2016 05:11 PM]
August 23, 2016 Filing 89 CURED DEFECTIVE INTERVENOR BRIEF, [ # 88 ], on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 16-420, FILED.[1849371] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 08/25/2016 01:44 PM]
August 23, 2016 Filing 88 INTERVENOR BRIEF, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 08/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1847678] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 08/23/2016 04:20 PM]
August 23, 2016 Filing 87 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, INTERVENOR BRIEF, [83], on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED.[1847618] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 08/23/2016 03:51 PM]
August 22, 2016 Filing 84 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard in 16-413, 16-420, FILED. Service date 08/22/2016 by CM/ECF. [1846466] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 08/22/2016 04:01 PM]
August 22, 2016 Filing 83 INTERVENOR BRIEF, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 08/22/2016 by CM/ECF. [1845689] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 08/22/2016 08:48 AM]
July 26, 2016 Filing 82 ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 16-420 Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 16-413 Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 16-423 , [ # 1825034-2 ], ADDED.[1825389] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 07/26/2016 02:22 PM]
June 7, 2016 Filing 80 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Appendix D in 16-413, Amicus Curiae Appendix D in 16-420 and Amicus Curiae Appendix D in 16-423, ADDED.[1788533] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 06/07/2016 04:28 PM]
June 7, 2016 Filing 79 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Appendix C in 16-413, Amicus Curiae Appendix C in 16-420 and Amicus Curiae Appendix C in 16-423, ADDED.[1788530] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 06/07/2016 04:27 PM]
June 7, 2016 Filing 78 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Appendix B in 16-413, Amicus Curiae Appendix B in 16-420 and Amicus Curiae Appendix B in 16-423, ADDED.[1788465] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 06/07/2016 03:58 PM]
June 7, 2016 Filing 77 NEW PARTY, Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-413, Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-420 and Amicus Curiae Amici Curiae Appendix A in 16-423, ADDED.[1787725] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423]--[Edited 06/07/2016 by EM] [Entered: 06/07/2016 10:50 AM]
May 31, 2016 Filing 74 AMICUS BRIEF, for Amici Curiae Appendix A, Appendix B, Appendix C, and Appendix D, FILED. Service date 05/31/2016 by CM/ECF. [1783049] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423]--[Edited 06/07/2016 by EM] [Entered: 05/31/2016 06:10 PM]
May 31, 2016 Filing 73 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 16-423, 16-413, 16-420, informing Court of proposed due date 08/22/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 05/31/2016 by CM/ECF.[1782785] [16-423, 16-413, 16-420] [Entered: 05/31/2016 03:18 PM]
May 26, 2016 Filing 70 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, informing Court of proposed due date 08/22/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 05/26/2016 by CM/ECF.[1780809] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 05/26/2016 01:23 PM]
May 23, 2016 Filing 60 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Elliot G. Sagor in 16-413, FILED. Service date 05/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1778117] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 05/23/2016 04:55 PM]
May 23, 2016 Filing 59 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Nancy Zraick in 16-413, Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr., Edward A. Zraick, Jr., Nancy Zraick and Nancy Zraick in 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 05/23/2016 by CM/ECF.[1777816] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 05/23/2016 02:04 PM]
May 23, 2016 Filing 58 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 5 of 5, (pp. 1175-1466), on behalf of Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Denis Castelli, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Robert Halio, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Babanel JT Wros., Heidi Holmers, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Toby Lees, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Bret Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Marsha Peshkin, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sandy Sandler, Elaine R. Schaffer, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Jonathan Schwartz, Roberta Schwartz, Keith Shaffer, Timothy S. Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Angela Tiletnick, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Jon Warner, Robin L. Warner and Willi Rechler Trust in 16-413, Appellant Estate of Boyer Palmer in 16-420, -- Steven J. Andelman, Susan R. Andelman, David Drucker, Hilda Drucker, Manuel O. Jaffe, Naomi Karp, Marilyn Komarc, Elaine Langweiler, Myra M. Levine, Frederick H. Mandel, Edwin Michalove, David Shapiro Nominee, Theresa R. Ryan, Adele Shapiro, Irving M. Sonnenfeld, WDG Associates Inc. Retirement Trust and Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Jessica Decker, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer & Boyer H. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Barbanel NT Wros, Heidi Holmers, Marsh Peshkin Ira, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, NTC & Co., Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Boyer H. Palmer, Bret Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sandy Sandler, Elaine R. Schaffer, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Keith Schaffer, Jonathan Schwartz, Roberta Schwartz, Timothy S. Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Angela Tiletnick, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Jon Warner, Robin L. Warner, Willi Rechler Trust and Robert Yaffe in 16-423, FILED. Service date 05/23/2016 by CM/ECF.[1777804] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 05/23/2016 01:54 PM]
May 23, 2016 Filing 57 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 5, (pp. 881-1174), on behalf of Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Denis Castelli, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Adele Fox, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Robert Halio, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Babanel JT Wros., Heidi Holmers, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Toby Lees, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Bret Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Marsha Peshkin, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sandy Sandler, Elaine R. Schaffer, Steven C. Schupak, Jonathan Schwartz, Keith Shaffer, Timothy S. Teufel, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Peter Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Robin L. Warner and Willi Rechler Trust in 16-413, Appellant Estate of Boyer Palmer in 16-420, -- Steven J. Andelman, Susan R. Andelman, David Drucker, Hilda Drucker, Manuel O. Jaffe, Naomi Karp, Marilyn Komarc, Elaine Langweiler, Myra M. Levine, Frederick H. Mandel, Edwin Michalove, David Shapiro Nominee, Theresa R. Ryan, Adele Shapiro, Deborah Shapiro, WDG Associates Inc. Retirement Trust and Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Jessica Decker, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer & Boyer H. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Barbanel NT Wros, Heidi Holmers, Marsh Peshkin Ira, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, NTC & Co., Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Boyer H. Palmer, Bret Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sandy Sandler, Elaine R. Schaffer, Keith Schaffer, Jonathan Schwartz, Timothy S. Teufel, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Peter Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Robin L. Warner, Willi Rechler Trust and Robert Yaffe in 16-423, FILED. Service date 05/23/2016 by CM/ECF.[1777801] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 05/23/2016 01:48 PM]
May 23, 2016 Filing 56 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 5, (pp. 587-880), on behalf of Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Denis Castelli, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Adele Fox, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Robert Halio, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Babanel JT Wros., Heidi Holmers, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Toby Lees, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Marsha Peshkin, Glenn Rechler, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sandy Sandler, Elaine R. Schaffer, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Steven C. Schupak, Jonathan Schwartz, Roberta Schwartz, Keith Shaffer, Timothy S. Teufel, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Angela Tiletnick, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Jon Warner and Willi Rechler Trust in 16-413, Appellant Estate of Boyer Palmer in 16-420, -- Steven J. Andelman, Susan R. Andelman, David Drucker, Hilda Drucker, Manuel O. Jaffe, Naomi Karp, Marilyn Komarc, Elaine Langweiler, Myra M. Levine, Frederick H. Mandel, Edwin Michalove, David Shapiro Nominee, Theresa R. Ryan, Adele Shapiro, Deborah Shapiro, Irving M. Sonnenfeld, WDG Associates Inc. Retirement Trust and Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Jessica Decker, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer & Boyer H. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Barbanel NT Wros, Heidi Holmers, Marsh Peshkin Ira, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, NTC & Co., Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Boyer H. Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Glenn Rechler, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sandy Sandler, Elaine R. Schaffer, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Keith Schaffer, Jonathan Schwartz, Roberta Schwartz, Timothy S. Teufel, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Angela Tiletnick, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Jon Warner, Willi Rechler Trust and Robert Yaffe in 16-423, FILED. Service date 05/23/2016 by CM/ECF.[1777796] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 05/23/2016 01:44 PM]
May 23, 2016 Filing 55 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 5, (pp. 293-586), on behalf of Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Denis Castelli, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Adele Fox, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Robert Halio, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Babanel JT Wros., Heidi Holmers, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Toby Lees, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Bret Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Marsha Peshkin, Glenn Rechler, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sage Realty, Elaine R. Schaffer, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Steven C. Schupak, Jonathan Schwartz, Roberta Schwartz, Keith Shaffer, Timothy S. Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Angela Tiletnick, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Robin L. Warner and Willi Rechler Trust in 16-413, Appellant Estate of Boyer Palmer in 16-420, -- Steven J. Andelman, Susan R. Andelman, David Drucker, Hilda Drucker, Manuel O. Jaffe, Naomi Karp, Marilyn Komarc, Elaine Langweiler, Myra M. Levine, Frederick H. Mandel, Edwin Michalove, David Shapiro Nominee, Theresa R. Ryan, Adele Shapiro, Deborah Shapiro, Irving M. Sonnenfeld, WDG Associates Inc. Retirement Trust and Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Jessica Decker, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer & Boyer H. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Barbanel NT Wros, Heidi Holmers, Marsh Peshkin Ira, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, NTC & Co., Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Boyer H. Palmer, Bret Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Glenn Rechler, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sage Realty, Elaine R. Schaffer, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Keith Schaffer, Jonathan Schwartz, Roberta Schwartz, Timothy S. Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Angela Tiletnick, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Robin L. Warner and Willi Rechler Trust in 16-423, FILED. Service date 05/23/2016 by CM/ECF.[1777786] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 05/23/2016 01:40 PM]
May 23, 2016 Filing 54 JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 5, (pp. 1-292), on behalf of Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Denis Castelli, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Adele Fox, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Robert Halio, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Babanel JT Wros., Heidi Holmers, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Toby Lees, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Bret Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Marsha Peshkin, Glenn Rechler, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sage Realty, Sandy Sandler, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Steven C. Schupak, Roberta Schwartz, Keith Shaffer, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Jon Warner, Robin L. Warner and Willi Rechler Trust in 16-413, Appellant Estate of Boyer Palmer in 16-420, -- Steven J. Andelman, Susan R. Andelman, David Drucker, Hilda Drucker, Manuel O. Jaffe, Naomi Karp, Marilyn Komarc, Elaine Langweiler, Myra M. Levine, Frederick H. Mandel, Edwin Michalove, David Shapiro Nominee, Theresa R. Ryan, Adele Shapiro, Deborah Shapiro, Irving M. Sonnenfeld, WDG Associates Inc. Retirement Trust and Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Jessica Decker, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer & Boyer H. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Barbanel NT Wros, Heidi Holmers, Marsh Peshkin Ira, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, NTC & Co., Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Boyer H. Palmer, Bret Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Glenn Rechler, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sage Realty, Sandy Sandler, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Keith Schaffer, Roberta Schwartz, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Jon Warner, Robin L. Warner, Willi Rechler Trust and Robert Yaffe in 16-423, FILED. Service date 05/23/2016 by CM/ECF.[1777783] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 05/23/2016 01:36 PM]
May 23, 2016 Filing 53 BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Denis Castelli, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Adele Fox, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Robert Halio, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Babanel JT Wros., Heidi Holmers, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Toby Lees, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Bret Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Marsha Peshkin, Glenn Rechler, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sage Realty, Sandy Sandler, Elaine R. Schaffer, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Steven C. Schupak, Jonathan Schwartz, Roberta Schwartz, Keith Shaffer, Timothy S. Teufel, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Angela Tiletnick, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Jon Warner, Robin L. Warner and Willi Rechler Trust in 16-413, Appellant Estate of Boyer Palmer in 16-420, Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Jessica Decker, Barbara Engel, Estate of Boyer Palmer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer & Boyer H. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Barbanel NT Wros, Heidi Holmers, Marsh Peshkin Ira, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, NTC & Co., Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, Boyer H. Palmer, Bret Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Glenn Rechler, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sage Realty, Sandy Sandler, Elaine R. Schaffer, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Keith Schaffer, Jonathan Schwartz, Roberta Schwartz, Timothy S. Teufel, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Angela Tiletnick, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Gunther K. Unflat, Jon Warner, Robin L. Warner, Willi Rechler Trust and Robert Yaffe in 16-423, FILED. Service date 05/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1777779] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 05/23/2016 01:33 PM]
May 19, 2016 Filing 52 CAPTION, Estate of Boyer Palmer, AMENDED.[1776132] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 05/19/2016 04:24 PM]
April 11, 2016 Filing 50 ATTORNEY, Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Irving H. Picard, in case 16-420 Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Irving H. Picard, in case 16-413 Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Irving H. Picard, in case 16-423 , [ # 49 ], ADDED.[1747177] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 04/11/2016 01:33 PM]
April 6, 2016 Filing 51 NEW PARTY, Appellant Estate of Boyer Palmer in 16-413, Appellant Estate of Boyer Palmer in 16-420 and Appellant Estate of Boyer Palmer in 16-423, ADDED.[1773689] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 05/17/2016 12:42 PM]
April 4, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard in 16-413, 16-420, 16-423, FILED. Service date 04/04/2016 by CM/ECF. [1742731] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 04/04/2016 05:25 PM]
April 4, 2016 Filing 48 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Benjamin Rechler Trust, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Aaron Blecker, Kelly Bunch, Megan Bunch, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Isabel Chalek, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Richard Mark Chalek, Barbara Engel, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Beth P. Feldman, Fern C. Palmer & Boyer H. Palmer Revocable Trust, Carol Fisher, Marjorie Forrest, Richard M. Friedman, Gaba Partnership, Laura Hallick, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Martin R. Harnick, Ben Heller, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Barbanel NT Wros, Heidi Holmers, Marsh Peshkin Ira, John Tzannes Trust, Carol Kamenstein, Sloan G. Kamenstein, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Kenneth M. Kohl, Myrna Kohl, Dana LeFavor, Frieda Low, Robert K. Low, Pamela K. Marxen, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Mishkin Family Trust, Ryan Murray, Steven P. Norton, Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Palmer Family Trust, Blake Palmer, Boyer Palmer, NTC & Co., Boyer H. Palmer, Bret Palmer, Bruce N. Palmer, Fern C. Palmer, Kurt C. Palmer, Oscar Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Glenn Rechler, Frances Reiss, Lawrence J. Ryan, Theresa R. Ryan, Sage Realty, Sandy Sandler, Elaine R. Schaffer, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Keith Schaffer, Jonathan Schwartz, Roberta Schwartz, Timothy S. Teufel, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Angela Tiletnick, Peter Tzannes, Robin Tzannes, Gunther Unflat, Jon Warner, Robin L. Warner, Willi Rechler Trust, Robert Yaffe and Theresa R. Ryan in 16-423, RECEIVED. Service date 04/04/2016 by CM/ECF.[1742131] [16-423, 16-413, 16-420] [Entered: 04/04/2016 11:40 AM]
March 31, 2016 Filing 47 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to amend caption [ # 1723985-2 ] filed by Appellant Roberta Schwartz, Carol Kamenstein, Myrna Kohl, Mishkin Family Trust, Martin R. Harnick, Elaine Ruth Schaffer, Gunther Unflat, Robert Yaffe, Aaron Blecker, Angela Tiletnick, Barbara Engel, Barbara Kotlikoff Harman, Ben Heller, Benjamin T. Heller Irrevocable Trust, Beth P. Feldman, Bruce N. Palmer, Carol Fisher, Chalek Associates LLC, David Chalek, Frances Reiss, Isabel Chalek, Jessica Decker, John Tzannes Trust, Mitchel Chalek, Morton Chalek, Peter Tzannes, Richard Mark Chalek, Robin Tzannes, Laura Hallick, Elaine R. Schaffer, Estate of Gabriel Friedman c/o Richard Friedman Executor, Boyer H. Palmer, Fern C. Palmer & Boyer H. Palmer Revocable Trust, Fern C. Palmer, Frieda Low, Glenn Rechler, Herbert Barbanel & Alice Barbanel NT Wros, Jonathan Schwartz, Keith Schaffer, Kenneth M. Kohl, Kurt C. Palmer, Theresa R. Ryan, Marjorie Forrest, Steven P. Norton, NTC & Co., Robert K. Low, Richard M. Friedman, Rona Mast, Philip E. Miller, Pamela K. Marxen, Sage Realty, Ryan Murray, Tracy D. Kamenstein, Palmer Family Trust, Gunther K. Unflat, Robin L. Warner, Jon Warner, Timothy Shawn Teufel, Valerie Anne Teufel, Megan Bunch, Marsh Peshkin Ira, Benjamin Rechler Trust, Oscar Palmer, Blake Palmer, Dana LeFavor, Sandy Sandler, Boyer Palmer, Sophia Palmer, Timothy S. Teufel, Willi Rechler Trust, Heidi Holmers, Gaba Partnership, Lawrence J. Ryan, Callie A. Ostenson-Murray, Kelly Bunch, Bret Palmer, Sloan G. Kamenstein and Theresa R. Ryan in 16-423, by SLC, C.JJ., FILED. [1740741][47] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 03/31/2016 04:21 PM]
March 30, 2016 Filing 45 NEW PARTY, Appellant Karen M. Rich in 16-413, Appellant Karen M. Rich in 16-420 and Appellant Karen M. Rich in 16-423, ADDED.[1739892] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 03/30/2016 05:30 PM]
March 30, 2016 Filing 44 NEW PARTY, Appellant Patricia DeLuca in 16-413, Appellant Patricia DeLuca in 16-420 and Appellant Patricia DeLuca in 16-423, ADDED.[1739888] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 03/30/2016 05:24 PM]
March 23, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 1731407-2 ] 16-413, 16-420, and 16-423 filed by Appellee Irving H. Picard; granting motion to file one oversized brief containing up to 19,000 words addressing all of the Appellant's briefs, granting Appellant's request for permission to file a Joint Appendix; granting motion to extend time [ # 1731651-2 ] filed by Appellant Elliot G. Sagor to file reply briefs. Briefing shall proceed according t the following schedule: Appellants opening briefs due on 05/23/2016; Appellees brief due on 08/22/2016; SIPCs (Intervenor) brief due on 08/22/2016; and Appellants reply briefs due on 09/30/2016, by PWH, C.JJ., FILED. [1734803][42] [16-413] [Entered: 03/23/2016 04:27 PM]
March 23, 2016 Filing 41 NEW PARTY, Appellant Nancy Zraick in 16-413, Appellant Nancy Zraick in 16-420 and Appellant Nancy Zraick in 16-423, ADDED.[1734880] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 03/23/2016 05:12 PM]
March 23, 2016 Filing 40 NEW PARTY, Appellant Edward A. Zraick Jr. in 16-413, Appellant Edward A. Zraick Jr. in 16-420 and Appellant Edward A. Zraick Jr. in 16-423, ADDED.[1734871] [16-413, 16-420, 16-423] [Entered: 03/23/2016 05:02 PM]
March 18, 2016 Filing 34 MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 03/18/2016 by CM/ECF. [1731415] [16-420] [Entered: 03/18/2016 03:37 PM]
March 18, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Nancy Zraick, FILED. Service date 03/18/2016 by CM/ECF. [1731370] [16-420] [Entered: 03/18/2016 03:13 PM]
March 10, 2016 Filing 32 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Nancy Zraick Brief due date as 05/23/2016. Joint Appendix due date as 05/23/2016, FILED.[1723753] [16-420] [Entered: 03/10/2016 11:00 AM]
March 3, 2016 Filing 28 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Nancy Zraick, informing Court of proposed due date 05/23/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 03/03/2016 by CM/ECF.[1718468] [16-420] [Entered: 03/03/2016 03:43 PM]
March 1, 2016 Filing 26 ATTORNEY, Nathanael Kelley for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, in case 16-420 , [ # 25 ], ADDED.[1716329] [16-420] [Entered: 03/01/2016 04:55 PM]
March 1, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/01/2016 by CM/ECF. [1716065] [16-420] [Entered: 03/01/2016 03:16 PM]
March 1, 2016 Filing 24 ATTORNEY, Kevin H. Bell for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, in case 16-420 , [ # 23 ], ADDED.[1715651] [16-420] [Entered: 03/01/2016 10:57 AM]
March 1, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/01/2016 by CM/ECF. [1715463] [16-420] [Entered: 03/01/2016 09:09 AM]
February 29, 2016 Filing 22 ATTORNEY, Josephine Wang for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, in case 16-420 , [ # 20 ], ADDED.[1715297] [16-420] [Entered: 02/29/2016 04:58 PM]
February 29, 2016 Filing 21 NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[1715294] [16-420] [Entered: 02/29/2016 04:55 PM]
February 29, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/29/2016 by CM/ECF. [1715046] [16-420] [Entered: 02/29/2016 03:38 PM]
February 29, 2016 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/29/2016 by CM/ECF.[1715020] [16-420] [Entered: 02/29/2016 03:34 PM]
February 26, 2016 Filing 13 ATTORNEY, Peter S. Partee Sr. for Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Nancy Zraick & Edward A. Zraick Jr., in case 16-420, [ # 8 ], ADDED.[1714053] [16-420] [Entered: 02/26/2016 02:59 PM]
February 26, 2016 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 02/26/2016 by CM/ECF.[1714027] [16-420] [Entered: 02/26/2016 02:50 PM]
February 26, 2016 Filing 11 CAPTION, to include Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, AMENDED.[1714013] [16-420] [Entered: 02/26/2016 02:45 PM]
February 26, 2016 Filing 10 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Nancy Zraick, FILED. Service date 02/26/2016 by CM/ECF.[1713998] [16-420] [Entered: 02/26/2016 02:34 PM]
February 26, 2016 Filing 9 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Nancy Zraick, FILED. Service date 02/26/2016 by CM/ECF.[1713996] [16-420] [Entered: 02/26/2016 02:32 PM]
February 26, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Nancy Zraick, FILED. Service date 02/26/2016 by CM/ECF. [1713974] [16-420] [Entered: 02/26/2016 02:02 PM]
February 26, 2016 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Nancy Zraick, FILED. Service date 02/26/2016 by CM/ECF.[1713968] [16-420] [Entered: 02/26/2016 01:56 PM]
February 16, 2016 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1705896] [16-420] [Entered: 02/17/2016 10:04 AM]
February 16, 2016 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/27/2016, RECEIVED.[1705894] [16-420] [Entered: 02/17/2016 10:04 AM]
February 16, 2016 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 01/14/2016, RECEIVED.[1705892] [16-420] [Entered: 02/17/2016 10:03 AM]
February 16, 2016 Filing 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Nancy Zraick, district court receipt # 0208-11950241, FILED.[1705890] [16-420] [Entered: 02/17/2016 10:03 AM]
February 16, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Patricia DeLuca, Karen M. Rich, Edward A. Zraick, Jr. and Nancy Zraick, FILED. [1705888] [16-420] [Entered: 02/17/2016 10:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bernard L. Madoff Investment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Appendix D, Jeffrey Hinte
Represented By: William Paul Weintraub Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amici Curiae Appendix A, Norman Blum; Estate of Doris M. Pearlman; Heidi Pearlman; Jill Beth Pearlman; Doris M. Pearlman Revocable Trust; Marvin A. Goldberg; Lanx BM Investments, LLC; The Lanx Fund II, LP; Wolfson Cousins, LP; Edara Partnership; Stua
Represented By: Richard A. Kirby Esq.
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Appendix B, Murray Pergament 1999 Trust f/b/o Bruce Pergament; Linda Horowitz Spousal Trust f/b/o Richard Horowitz; James P. Marden; Patrice M. Auld; Bernard Marden Profit Sharing Plan; Marden Family Limited Partnership; Stanley Plesent.
Represented By: Richard Levy Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Appendix C, Barbara J. Berdon; Laura E. Guggenheimer Cole; Alvin Gindel Revocable Trust, a Florida Trust, and Alvin Gindel, in his capacity as trustee of the Alvin Gindel Revocable Trust and individually as settlor and beneficiary thereof; Rose Ginde
Represented By: Carole Neville Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Estate of Boyer Palmer
Represented By: Helen Davis Chaitman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Patricia DeLuca
Represented By: Robert A. Rich Esq.
Represented By: Peter S. Partee Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nancy Zraick
Represented By: Robert A. Rich Esq.
Represented By: Peter S. Partee Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Edward A. Zraick, Jr.
Represented By: Robert A. Rich Esq.
Represented By: Peter S. Partee Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Karen M. Rich
Represented By: Robert A. Rich Esq.
Represented By: Peter S. Partee Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal Esq.
Represented By: Seanna R. Brown Esq.
Represented By: David J. Sheehan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Securities Investor Protection Corporation, Statutory Intervenor pursuant to Securities Investor Protection Act, 15 U.S.C. Section 78eee(d)
Represented By: Nathanael Kelley Esq.
Represented By: Kevin H. Bell Esq.
Represented By: Josephine Wang Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?