In Re: Irving H. Picard, Trust
Petitioner: Ralf Michaels, Professors of Conflict of Laws, William S. Dodge, Professors of Conflict of Laws, Hannah L. Buxbaum, Professors of Conflict of Laws, Maggie Gardner, Professors of Conflict of Laws, Professor Troy McKenzie, Bankruptcy Law Professors, Professor Jay L. Westbrook, Bankruptcy Law Professors, Professor Robert K. Rasmussen, Bankruptcy Law Professors, Christopher Whytock, Professors of Conflict of Laws, Professor Chrystin Ondersma, Bankruptcy Law Professors, Professor Ronald Mann, Bankruptcy Law Profesors, Professor Mark J. Roe, Bankruptcy Law Professors, George A. Bermann, Esq., Professors of Conflict of Laws, Aaron D. Simowitz, Professors of Conflict of Laws, Professor Edward R. Morrison, Bankruptcy Law Professors, Zachary D. Clopton, Professors of Conflict of Laws, Anthony J. Colangelo, Professors of Conflict of Laws, Professor Frederick Tung, Bankruptcy Law Professors, Professor Alan Schwartz, Bankruptcy Law Professors, Professor Michael Simkovic, Bankruptcy Law Professors, National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees and Professor Stephen J. Lubben, Bankruptcy Law Professors
Appellee: Six Sis AG, LGT Bank (Switzerland) LTD., as successor in interest to Dresdner Bank (Schweiz) AG, Unifortune Conservative Fund, Eurizon Low Volatility PB, Piazzetta Giordano Dell'Amore 3 c/o Eurizon Capital SGR SpA 20121 Milan Italy, FKA Nextra Low Volatility PB, UKFP (Asia) Nominees Limited, Hermes Asset Management Limited, Merrill Lynch International, RBC Dexia Investor Services Trust, Intesa Sanpaolo S.p.A., as Successor in Interest to Banca Intesa SpA 1 William Street New York, NY 10004, Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A., Andrew Smith, Thema Asset Management Limited, Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., as Successor in Interest to Barep Asset Management S.A, Arden Asset Management LLC, SNS Global Custody B.V., Thema Asset Management (Bermuda) Limited, Credit Suisse Wealth Management Limited, Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, FKA American Express Bank, Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Trust Bank, Limited, FKA The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co., Ltd., Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, FKA American Express Bank International, Abu Dhabi Investment Authority, Union Arbitrage Strategy Fund, Credit Suisse London Nominees Limited, Harold Greisman, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Strongback Holdings Corporation, HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FKA Fortis Prime Fund Solutions Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., Credit Suisse AG, as successor in interest to Clariden Leu AG and Bank Leu AG, Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., El Prela Trust, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, Royal Bank of Canada, Singapore Branch, Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., FKA SG Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Grosvenor Aggressive Growth Fund Limited, Credit Suisse International Limited, EFG BANK & TRUST (BAHAMAS) LIMITED, as successor-in-interest to Banco Atlantico (Bahamas) Bank & Trust Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, Union USD Global Arbitrage Fund, SNS Bank N.V., Lighthouse Supercash Fund Limited, ZCM Asset Holding Company (Bermuda) LLC, Amit Vijayvergiya, Lion Global Investors Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, Mark Mckeefry, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Services - Succusale De Luxembourg, Kingate Management Limited, ABN AMRO Bank N.V., presently known as The Royal Bank of Scotland, N.V., Oval Palmares Europlus, Orbita Capital Return Strategy Limited, Northern Trust Corporation, 50 LaSalle Street Chicago, IL 60603, Bank Audi S.A.M.-Audi Saradar Group, Ashby Investment Services Limited, PF Trustees Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, RBC Alternative Assets, L.P., OFI MGA Alpha Palmares, FKA Oval Alpha Palmares, Port of Hercules Trustees Limited, Individually and as Trustee of the El Prela Trust, Credit Agricole S.A., AKA Banque Du Credit Agricole, Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch, FKA Blubank Ltd Panama Branch, Unifortune Asset Management SGR SPA, BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA, Individually and as Successor in Interest to United European Bank, Barclays Bank S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, Banque SYZ SA, Royal Bank of Canada Trust Company (Jersey) Limited, UBS Deutschland AG, as successor in interest to Dresdner Bank LateinAmerika AG, Kookmin Bank, BNP Paribas Securities Services S.A., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Credit Suisse AG, UBS AG, Cornelis Boele, Federico M. Ceretti, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Zephyros Limited, Banca Carige S.P.A., Banque Lombard Odier & Cie SA, FKA Lombard Odier Darier Hentsch & Cie, Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company, BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited, BNP Paribas Bank & Trust Cayman Limited, Meritz Fire & Marine Insurance Co. LTD., Grosvenor Balanced Growth Fund Limited, Eurizon Low Volatility, Piazzetta Giordano Dell'Amore 3 c/o Eurizon Capital SGR SpA 20121 Milan Italy, FKA Nextra Low Volatility, HSBC Holdings PLC, Multi-Strategy Fund Limited, Banco Itau Europa International, Inter Investissements S.A., Jacqueline Harary, UBS (Luxembourg) SA, Thema Fund Limited, Walter Noel, Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, FIM Advisers LLP, BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, Korea Exchange Bank, Individually And As Trustee For Korea Global All Asset Trust I-1, And For Tams Rainbow Trust III, Lagoon Investment Trust, Santiago Reyes, EFG Bank S.A., FKA EFG Private Bank S.A., UMR Select Alternatif, Fairfield Investment Fund Limited, Bank Hapoalim B.M., Jeffrey Tucker, CDP Capital Tactical Alternative Investments, Royal Bank of Canada (Asia) Limited, Guernroy Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Suisse) S.A., Hermes International Fund Limited, Access International Advisors Ltd., BSI AG, individually and as successor in interest to Banco Del Gottardo, Public Institution for Social Security, Bank Hapoalim (Switzerland) Ltd., Lyxor Premium Fund, FKA SGAM Alternative Diversified Premium Fund, LGT Bank (Liechtenstein) Ltd., Arden Asset Management Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Access Management Luxembourg SA, FKA Access International Advisors Luxembourg SA, as represented by its Liquidator Maitre Ferdinand Entringer, Barreneche, Inc., Equus Asset Management Limited, M&B Capital Advisers Sociedad De Valores, S.A., FIM Limited, Grosvenor Private Reserve Fund Limited, Eurizon Capital SGR S.p.A., Eurizon Capital SGR SpA (as Successor in Interest to Eurizon Investimenti SGR SpA, f/k/a Nextra Investment Management SGR SpA, and Eurizon Alternative Investments SGR Spa, f/k/a Nextra Alternative Inv Piazzatte Giordano De, BG Valores, S.A., Eurizon Total Return, Piazzetta Giordano Dell'Amore 3 c/o Eurizon Capital SGR SpA 20121 Milan Italy, FKA Nextra Total Return, Natixis Financial Products LLC, as Successor-in-interest to Natixis Financial Products, Inc., HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, Odyssey, Union Securities Investment Trust Co., Ltd., Citibank (Switzerland) AG, Carlo Grosso, Eurizon Low Volatility II, Piazzetta Giordano Dell'Amore 3 c/o Eurizon Capital SGR SpA 20121 Milan Italy, FKA Nextra Low Volatility II, Gordon McKenzie, UBS Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., Alpine Trustees Limited, Individually and as Trustees of the El Prela Trust, Lyxor Asset Management S.A., ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd., FKA Fortis Prime Fund Solutions Bank (Ireland) Ltd., The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co., Ltd., Fullerton Capital PTE Ltd., Lighthouse Diversified Fund Limited, Philip Toub, Banco General, S.A., ABN AMRO Fund Services (Isle of Man) Nominees Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, Vontobel Asset Management Inc., Merrill Lynch Bank (Suisse) SA, Solon Capital, Ltd., c/o Appleby Corporate Services (Bermuda) Canons Court 22 Victoria Street Hamilton HM 12 Bermuda, Caceis Bank, Luxembourg Branch, Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., FKA SG AM Alternative Diversified U.S. L.P., RBC Dexia Investor Services Bank S.A., Barfield Nominees Limited, Trafalgar Court Les Baques St. Peters Port Guernsey United Kingdom, UBS Third Party Management Company S.A., Cathay United Bank LTD., Atlantic Security Bank, Share Management LLC, Dakota Global Investments, Ltd., Bordier & Cie, Union USD Global Arbitrage A Fund, RBC Dexia Investor Services Espana S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch LATAM Investment Banking, Societe Generale, S.A., as Trustee for Lyxor Premium Fund, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, Credit Suisse Nominees (Guernsey) Limited, Lourdes Barreneche, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC, DBA Lighthouse Partners, LLC, Eurizon Medium Volatility II, Piazzetta Giordano Dell'Amore 3 c/o Eurizon Capital SGR SpA 20121 Milan Italy, FKA Nextra Medium Volatility II, Daniel Lipton, Naidot & Co., SG Audace Alternatif, FKA SGAM AI Audace Alternatif, First Gulf Bank, Dove Hill Trust, Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited, National Bank of Kuwait SAK, Trincastar Corporation, Access Partners SA, as represented by its Liqudator Maitre Ferdinand Entringer, Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A., Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A., FKA Compagnie Bancaire Espirito Santo S.A., Caceis Bank, Quilvest Finance LTD, Banque Internationale a Luxembourg S.A., individually and as successor in interest to Dexia Nordic Private Bank S.A., FKA Dexia Banque Internationale a Luxembourg S.A., Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Fein, Such, and Crane LLP., KBC Investments Limited, Lyxor Asset Management Inc., as General Partner of SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., FKA SGAM Asset Management, Inc., Bureau of Labor Insurance, Eurizon Medium Volatility, Piazzetta Giordano Dell'Amore 3 c/o Eurizon Capital SGR SpA 20121 Milan Italy, FKA Nextra Medium Volatility, ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, Gregory Bowes, BGL BNP Paribas Luxembourg S.A., as Successor in Interest to BNP Paribas Luxembourg S.A., HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., SafeHand Investments, Credit Suisse (UK) Limited, Natixis, Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A., Richard Landsberger, Parson Finance Panama S.A., Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch Wealth Management, RBC, Foreign Defendants, Korea Investment Trust Management Company, Selecta Financial Corporation Inc., First Peninsula Trustees Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, Lagoon Investment Limited, The Ashby Trust, Delta National Bank and Trust Company, Royal Bank of Canada (Channel Islands) Limited, Pierre Delandmeter, Nomura International plc, Schroder & Co. Bank AG, Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Corina Noel Piedrahita, Falcon Private Bank Ltd., Arden Endowment Advisers, Ltd., Andres Piedrahita, Patrick Littaye, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Grosvenor Investment Management Ltd., Bank Vontobel AG, El Prela Trading Investments Limited, Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd., Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) SA, RBC Dominion Securities Inc., SICO Limited, Banque Internationale a Luxembourg (Suisse) S.A., FKA Dexia Private Bank (Switzerland) Ltd., Access International Advisors LLC, Ashby Holding Services Limited, EFG BANK (MONACO) S.A.M., FKA EFG Eurofinancire dInvestissements S.A.M., Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A., FKA American Express Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A., FKA American Express Bank (Luxembourg) S.A., as represented by its Liquidator Hanspeter Kramer, Hanspeter Kramer, in his capacities as, Mark McKeefrey, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, BNP Paribas S.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, 1301 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10019, DBA Credit Agricole Private Banking Miami, FKA Calyon S.A., DBA Credit Agricole Miami Private Bank, Successor in Interest to Credit Lyonnais S.A., Robert Blum, Tensyr Limited, Koch Industries, Inc., Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A., FKA SG Private Banking Suisse S.A. and SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, FKA SGAM Alternative Multi Manager Diversified Fund
Amicus Curiae: Alvin Gindel, Neil Reger, individually and in his capacity as trustee of the Neil Reger Profit Sharing Keogh, Brian Child, Norma Shapiro Revocable Declaration of Trust, under agreement dated Trust under will of Philip L. Shapiro, Frederica R. French, Rose Gindel, individually and in her capacity as trustee of the Rose Gindel Trust, Frederica Ripley French Revocable Trust, Kenneth Krys, in his capacity as liquidator and foreign representative of Fairfield Sentry Limited (in liquidation), Fairfield Sigma Limited (in liquidation) and Fairfield Lambda Limited ( in liquidation), Cayman Finance, Barry Weisfeld, S&L Partnership, a New York partnership, Andrew Willins, Neil Reger Profit Sharing Keogh, Alexander McFerran, soley in his capacity as successor trustee, Bam L.P., Stanley T. Miller, Luke Goldworm, Christopher Hill, Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, Laura E. Guggenheimer Cole, Sidney Cole, Barbara J. Berdon, Betsy Mann Polatsch, Martin Trott, Alvin Gindel, in his capacity as trustee of the Rose Gindel Trust, Toby T. Hobish, LI, RAM L.P. a New York limited partnership, Michael Mann, Norma Shapiro, individually, and in her capacity as Trustee for the Norma Shapiro Revocable Declaration of Trust under agreement dated and the Trust under Will of Philip L. Shapiro, James Greiff, Lapin Children LLC, Nilani Perera, Alvin Gindel Revocable Trust, Martin Rosen, in his capacity as Trustee of the Trust under will of Philip L. Shapiro, Adam Mann, Rose Gindel Trust, Carla Goldworm, Harold J. Hein, Recovery and Insolvency Specialist Association, Certain Good Faith Defendants, Samuel Goldworm and Meryl Mann
Intervenor: Securities Investor Protection Corporation
Appellant: Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff
Case Number: 17-2992
Filed: September 27, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 1582 JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[2851896] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 06/01/2020 04:39 PM]
June 1, 2020 Filing 1581 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 06/01/2020, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 19-277, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[2851875] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 06/01/2020 04:31 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 1578 ATTORNEY, Scott D. Lawrence, for Cathay Life Insurance Company, Ltd., TERMINATED.[2817748] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/10/2020 02:46 PM]
April 10, 2020 Filing 1577 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD., advising the Court that Scott D. Lawrence, an associate at Akerman LLP ("Akerman"), will no longer be associated with Akerman and requesting that his appearance appearance on behalf of Cathay Life Insurance Company, Ltd. be withdrawn, RECEIVED. Service date 04/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2817616] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/10/2020 by YS] [Entered: 04/10/2020 12:43 PM]
December 27, 2019 Filing 1572 ATTORNEY, Jessa Degrotte, for Appellees HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited and HSBC Holdings PLC, TERMINATED.[2739540] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 12/27/2019 03:31 PM]
December 27, 2019 Filing 1571 LETTER, from Jessa DeGroote, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited and HSBC Holdings PLC, advising the Court that following 12/31/2019, she will no longer be associated with Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP (Cleary Gottlieb) RECEIVED. Service date 12/27/2019 by CM/ECF.[2739264] [17-2992]--[Edited 12/27/2019 by YS] [Entered: 12/27/2019 12:52 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 1568 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Union Arbitrage Strategy Fund, Union Securities Investment Trust Co., Ltd., Union USD Global Arbitrage A Fund and Union USD Global Arbitrage Fund, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States, RECEIVED. Service date 09/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2655917] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/17/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/16/2019 10:26 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 1567 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Meritz Fire & Marine Insurance Co. LTD., informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States, RECEIVED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2652375] [17-2992] [Entered: 09/11/2019 10:47 AM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 1566 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 09/09/2019, on behalf of Appellee Banco Itau Europa International, Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A. and Nomura International plc, alerting court that <, RECEIVED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650899] [17-2992] [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:26 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 1565 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Caceis Bank and Caceis Bank, Luxembourg Branch, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States, RECEIVED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2649851] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/09/2019 by RO] [Entered: 09/09/2019 07:59 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 1564 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, Guernroy Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Channel Islands) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada Trust Company (Jersey) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Suisse) S.A., RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Northern Trust Corporation, Barfield Nominees Limited, Access International Advisors Ltd., Access Management Luxembourg SA, Access Partners SA, Patrick Littaye, RBC Dexia Investor Services Bank S.A. and RBC Dexia Investor Services Espana S.A., informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2648872] [17-2992] [Entered: 09/06/2019 11:04 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 1563 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Pierre Delandmeter, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2648828] [17-2992] [Entered: 09/06/2019 10:47 AM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 1562 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2648126] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/06/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/05/2019 02:48 PM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 1561 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Atlantic Security Bank, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2648121] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/06/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/05/2019 02:45 PM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 1560 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Audi S.A.M.-Audi Saradar Group and Orbita Capital Return Strategy Limited, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2647928] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/06/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/05/2019 01:01 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1559 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Amit Vijayvergiya, Philip Toub, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners and Share Management LLC, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/04/2019 by CM/ECF.[2647011] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/05/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/04/2019 03:36 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1558 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2646875] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/05/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:19 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1557 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., ABN AMRO Fund Services (Isle of Man) Nominees Limited and ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/04/2019 by CM/ECF.[2646838] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/05/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/04/2019 01:49 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1556 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank and Credit Agricole S.A., informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/04/2019 by CM/ECF.[2646682] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/05/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/04/2019 12:22 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1555 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Bank N.V., informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/04/2019 by CM/ECF.[2646356] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/04/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/04/2019 10:01 AM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 1554 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Abu Dhabi Investment Authority, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2646164] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/04/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/03/2019 07:10 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 1553 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Korea Investment Trust Management Company, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2646129] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/04/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/03/2019 06:23 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 1552 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD., informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2646084] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/04/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/03/2019 05:38 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 1551 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Parson Finance Panama S.A., informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2645908] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/04/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/03/2019 04:09 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 1550 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE of writ of certiorari filing, dated 08/29/2019, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 19-277, RECEIVED.[2645842] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:49 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 1549 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Federico M. Ceretti, FIM Advisers LLP, FIM Limited and Carlo Grosso, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2645836] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/04/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:46 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 1548 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Delta National Bank and Trust Company, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2645762] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/04/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/03/2019 03:12 PM]
September 3, 2019 Filing 1547 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Bank N.V., informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2645483] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/04/2019 by YS] [Entered: 09/03/2019 12:40 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1545 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Solon Capital, Ltd., Zephyros Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch LATAM Investment Banking, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch Wealth Management, Credit Suisse International Limited, Credit Suisse London Nominees Limited, Credit Suisse Nominees (Guernsey) Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC and Credit Suisse Wealth Management Limited, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 08/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2645064] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/03/2019 by YS] [Entered: 08/30/2019 05:59 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1544 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee KBC Investments Limited, informing the Court that a Petition for a Writ of Certiorari was filed with the Supreme Court of the Untied States on 08/29/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 08/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2644929] [17-2992]--[Edited 09/03/2019 by YS] [Entered: 08/30/2019 03:37 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1543 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque Lombard Odier & Cie SA, stating on 8/29/2019, the petition for a writ of certiorari was filed, RECEIVED. Service date 08/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2644763] [17-2992]--[Edited 08/30/2019 by RO] [Entered: 08/30/2019 01:56 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1542 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, stating on 8/29/2019, the petition for a writ of certiorari was filed, RECEIVED. Service date 08/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2644547] [17-2992]--[Edited 08/30/2019 by RO] [Entered: 08/30/2019 11:22 AM]
July 12, 2019 Filing 1540 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Amit Vijayvergiya, Philip Toub, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners and Share Management LLC, that the U.S. Supreme Court granted Defendants-Appellees application for an extension of time to file the Petition, thereby extending the time to file the Petition from July 2, 2019 to August 30, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 07/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2607913] [17-2992] [Entered: 07/12/2019 06:58 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 1538 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque Lombard Odier & Cie SA, Societe Generale, S.A., Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A., Bordier & Cie, Lyxor Asset Management Inc., Lyxor Asset Management S.A., Lyxor Premium Fund, SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., SG Audace Alternatif, SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A., Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A. and Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A., that the U.S. Supreme Court granted Defendants-Appellees application for an extension of time to file the Petition, thereby extending the time to file the Petition from July 2, 2019 to August 30, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 07/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2602084] [17-2992] [Entered: 07/08/2019 02:29 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 1537 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Letter, [1536], on behalf of Appellee Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Banque Lombard Odier & Cie SA, Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A., Bordier & Cie, Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., Lyxor Asset Management Inc., SG Audace Alternatif, SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, Societe Generale, S.A., Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A. and Lyxor Premium Fund in 17-2992, Appellee Banque Cantonale Vaudoise in 17-2996, Appellee Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., Lyxor Asset Management Inc., SG Audace Alternatif, SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, Societe Generale, S.A., Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A. and Lyxor Premium Fund in 17-3047, Appellee Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A. in 17-3086, Appellee Bordier & Cie in 17-3112, FILED.[2601690] [17-2992, 17-2996, 17-3047, 17-3086, 17-3112] [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:02 AM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 1536 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 07/03/2019, on behalf of Appellee Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Banque Lombard Odier & Cie SA, Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A., Bordier & Cie, Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., Lyxor Asset Management Inc., SG Audace Alternatif, SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, Societe Generale, S.A., Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A. and Lyxor Premium Fund in 17-2992, Appellee Banque Cantonale Vaudoise in 17-2996, Appellee Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., Lyxor Asset Management Inc., SG Audace Alternatif, SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, Societe Generale, S.A., Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A. and Lyxor Premium Fund in 17-3047, Appellee Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A. in 17-3086, Appellee Bordier & Cie in 17-3112, alerting court that &EDIT by Clerk's Office &, RECEIVED. Service date 07/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2601092] [17-2992, 17-2996, 17-3047, 17-3086, 17-3112] [Entered: 07/03/2019 03:10 PM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 1535 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Caceis Bank and Caceis Bank, Luxembourg Branch, that the U.S. Supreme Court granted Defendants-Appellees application for an extension of time to file the Petition, thereby extending the time to file the Petition from July 2, 2019 to August 30, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 07/03/2019 by CM/ECF.[2601059] [17-2992]--[Edited 07/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:55 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 1534 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) SA, Credit Suisse (UK) Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch LATAM Investment Banking, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch Wealth Management, Credit Suisse London Nominees Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Nominees (Guernsey) Limited, Credit Suisse Wealth Management Limited, Solon Capital, Ltd. and Zephyros Limited, that the U.S. Supreme Court granted Defendants-Appellees application for an extension of time to file the Petition, thereby extending the time to file the Petition from July 2, 2019 to August 30, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 07/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2600156] [17-2992]--[Edited 07/03/2019 by YS] [Entered: 07/02/2019 09:21 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 1533 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Delta National Bank and Trust Company, that the U.S. Supreme Court granted Defendants-Appellees application for an extension of time to file the Petition, thereby extending the time to file the Petition from July 2, 2019 to August 30, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 07/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2599550] [17-2992] [Entered: 07/02/2019 01:46 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 1532 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD., that the U.S. Supreme Court granted Defendants-Appellees application for an extension of time to file the Petition, thereby extending the time to file the Petition from July 2, 2019 to August 30, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2598778] [17-2992] [Entered: 07/01/2019 07:22 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 1531 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Parson Finance Panama S.A., that the U.S. Supreme Court granted Defendants-Appellees application for an extension of time to file the Petition, thereby extending the time to file the Petition from July 2, 2019 to August 30, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 06/28/2019 by CM/ECF.[2597662] [17-2992] [Entered: 06/28/2019 05:24 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 1530 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee KBC Investments Limited, advising the Court that the U.S. Supreme Court granted Defendants-Appellees application for an extension of time to file the Petition, thereby extending the time to file the Petition from July 2, 2019 to August 30, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 06/28/2019 by CM/ECF.[2596659] [17-2992] [Entered: 06/28/2019 12:52 AM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 1529 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited, advising the Court that the Supreme Court of the United States granted the application for an extension of time to file the Petition, RECEIVED. Service date 06/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2581310] [17-2992] [Entered: 06/06/2019 10:45 AM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 1528 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Bank N.V., advising the Court that the Supreme Court of the United States granted the application for an extension of time to file the Petition RECEIVED. Service date 06/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2580557] [17-2992] [Entered: 06/05/2019 01:02 PM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 1527 CORRECTED MOTION ORDER, dated 06/05/2019, granting motion to amend caption filed by Appellee Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Jacqueline Harary and Santiago Reyes in 17-2992, 17-3066, to reflect that Fairfield Investment Fund Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda), Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Walter Noel, Jeffrey Tucker, Andres Piedrahita, Philip Toub, Amit Vijayvergiya, and Corina Noel Piedrahita are the only remaining defendants-appellees, by RSP, FILED.[2580469] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 06/05/2019 12:05 PM]
June 5, 2019 Filing 1526 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Citibank (Switzerland) AG, Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited and Citigroup Global Markets Limited, advising the Court that the Supreme Court of the United States granted the application for an extension of time to file the Petition, RECEIVED. Service date 06/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2580281] [17-2992]--[Edited 06/05/2019 by YS] [Entered: 06/05/2019 10:52 AM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 1524 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC in 17-2992 extension to file Writ of Certiorari, FILED.[2579975] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 06/04/2019 05:17 PM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 1522 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to amend caption [ # 1508 ] filed by Appellee Andrew Smith, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Philip Toub, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Richard Landsberger, Mark Mckeefry, Santiago Reyes, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Amit Vijayvergiya, Daniel Lipton, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC and Gordon McKenzie in 17-2992, 17-3066, to reflect that Fairfield Sentry Limited, Greenwich Sentry, L.P., Greenwich Sentry Partners, L.P., Fairfield Investment Fund Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda), Ltd., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Walter Noel, Jeffrey Tucker, Andres Piedrahita, Philip Toub, Amit Vijayvergiya, and Corina Noel Piedrahita are the only remaining defendants-appellees, by RSP, FILED. [2575917][1522] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:52 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 1518 ATTORNEY, Olivia Italiano for Korea Investment Trust Management Company, in case 17-2992 Olivia Italiano for Korea Investment Trust Management Company, in case 17-3043, ADDED.[2571652] [17-3043, 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:40 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 1517 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Korea Investment Trust Management Company in 17-3043, 17-2992, FILED. Service date 05/23/2019 by CM/ECF. [2571550] [17-3043, 17-2992] [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:05 PM]
May 22, 2019 Filing 1515 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to amend caption [ # 1509 ] filed by Appellee Barreneche, Inc., Dove Hill Trust, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc. in 17-2992, 17-3113, to reflect that only Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners and Share Management LLC are the defendants-appellees in docket no. 17-3113 (con) by RSP, FILED. [2569853][1515] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/22/2019 09:38 AM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 1511 CURED DEFECTIVE motion to amend caption, on behalf of AppelleeBarreneche, Inc., Dove Hill Trust, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc. and Share Management LLC and Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Jacqueline Harary and Santiago Reyes, in 17-2992, FILED.[2564058] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:17 AM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 1510 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion to amend caption, on behalf of Appellee Barreneche, Inc., Dove Hill Trust, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc. and Share Management LLC, and Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Jacqueline Harary and Santiago Reyes, FILED.[2564036] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:03 AM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 1509 MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellee Barreneche, Inc., Dove Hill Trust, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc. and Share Management LLC in 17-2992, 17-3113, FILED. Service date 05/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2562897] [17-2992, 17-3113] [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:54 PM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 1508 MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Jacqueline Harary and Santiago Reyes in 17-2992, 17-3066, FILED. Service date 05/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2562896] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:45 PM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 1507 MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellee Barreneche, Inc., Dove Hill Trust, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc. and Share Management LLC, FILED. Service date 05/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2562883] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/13/2019 06:36 PM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 1506 MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Jacqueline Harary and Santiago Reyes, FILED. Service date 05/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2562875] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/13/2019 06:24 PM]
April 23, 2019 Filing 1503 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to stay mandate [ # 1413 ] filed by Appellee Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citibank (Switzerland) AG and Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited in 17-2992, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-2995, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3025, 17-3024, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, by DJ, RSP, RCW, FILED. [2545850][1503] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:31 AM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 1500 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co., Ltd., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/22/2019 by CM/ECF.[2544573] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/22/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/22/2019 10:29 AM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 1497 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to stay mandate [ # 1413 ], on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3057, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3066, 17-3071, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3086, 17-3091, 17-3101, 17-3106, 17-3117, 17-3144, FILED. Service date 04/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2543343] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:52 PM]
April 15, 2019 Filing 1495 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Meritz Fire & Marine Insurance Co. LTD., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2539855] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/16/2019 by ML] [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:01 AM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 1493 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee SNS Bank N.V. and SNS Global Custody B.V., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2537260] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/11/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:28 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1491 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bureau of Labor Insurance, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2536321] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/10/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/09/2019 05:55 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1490 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Orbita Capital Return Strategy Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2536264] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/10/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/09/2019 05:00 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1489 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Audi S.A.M.-Audi Saradar Group, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2536257] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/10/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/09/2019 04:56 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1488 ATTORNEY, Lidia Helena Souza Rezende for Kingate Management Limited, and Six Sis AG, in case 17-3077 and 17-2992 , , ADDED.[2536125] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/09/2019 04:01 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1487 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Robert Blum, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2536120] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/10/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:59 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1486 ATTORNEY, Peter R. Chaffetz for Kingate Management Limited, in case 17-3077, ADDED.[2536096] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:44 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1485 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Six Sis AG, FILED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2536068] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:29 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1484 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kingate Management Limited, FILED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2536063] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:27 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1482 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque Lombard Odier & Cie SA, Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, Lyxor Asset Management S.A., Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., Lyxor Premium Fund, Societe Generale, S.A., Bordier & Cie, SG Audace Alternatif, Lyxor Asset Management Inc., SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A. and Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535996] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:55 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1481 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Falcon Private Bank Ltd., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535848] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:24 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1480 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Gregory Bowes, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535770] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:10 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1479 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited and Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535729] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:47 AM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1477 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, UBS (Luxembourg) SA, UBS Deutschland AG, UBS Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. and UBS Third Party Management Company S.A., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535703] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:32 AM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1476 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ZCM Asset Holding Company (Bermuda) LLC, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535699] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:30 AM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1475 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Merrill Lynch International and Merrill Lynch Bank (Suisse) SA, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535380] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:55 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1474 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banco Itau Europa International and Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535375] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:56 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1473 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Nomura International plc, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535372] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 10:46 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1472 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BSI AG, EFG BANK & TRUST (BAHAMAS) LIMITED, EFG BANK (MONACO) S.A.M. and EFG Bank S.A., joining motion to stay mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535354] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 07:13 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1471 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Andres Piedrahita, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535352] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 07:10 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1470 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Tensyr Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535351] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 07:08 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1469 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Ashby Trust, First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Ashby Investment Services Limited, Alpine Trustees Limited, Port of Hercules Trustees Limited, El Prela Trust, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, Ashby Holding Services Limited and El Prela Trading Investments Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535348] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:59 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1468 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Kingate Management Limited and Six Sis AG, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535344] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:54 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1467 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Jacqueline Harary and Santiago Reyes, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535342] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:49 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1466 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Hapoalim (Switzerland) Ltd. and Bank Hapoalim B.M., joining motion to stay mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535341] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:43 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1465 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Union Arbitrage Strategy Fund, Union Securities Investment Trust Co., Ltd., Union USD Global Arbitrage A Fund and Union USD Global Arbitrage Fund, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535339] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:39 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1464 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Quilvest Finance LTD, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535337] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:36 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1463 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Barreneche, Inc., Dove Hill Trust, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc. and Share Management LLC, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535336] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:32 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1462 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee UKFP (Asia) Nominees Limited, joining motion to stay mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535335] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:31 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1461 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank and Natixis Financial Products LLC, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535333] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:12 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1460 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Kookmin Bank, Korea Exchange Bank and National Bank of Kuwait SAK, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535330] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:09 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1459 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Abu Dhabi Investment Authority, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535325] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:03 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1458 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 04/08/2019, on behalf of Appellee Banco General, S.A. and BG Valores, S.A., RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535323] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/08/2019 06:00 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1457 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque Internationale a Luxembourg (Suisse) S.A., Banque Internationale a Luxembourg S.A. and Dakota Global Investments, Ltd., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535314] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:51 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1456 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee CDP Capital Tactical Alternative Investments and Multi-Strategy Fund Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535312] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:47 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1455 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535311] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:44 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1454 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA, BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, BNP Paribas Bank & Trust Cayman Limited, BGL BNP Paribas Luxembourg S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Services - Succusale De Luxembourg and BNP Paribas Securities Services S.A., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535308] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:44 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1453 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee LGT Bank (Liechtenstein) Ltd. and LGT Bank (Switzerland) LTD., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535302] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 05:24 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1452 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Pierre Delandmeter, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535273] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:49 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1451 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fullerton Capital PTE Ltd., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535269] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:48 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1450 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Korea Investment Trust Management Company, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535263] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:46 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1449 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee PF Trustees Limited, SafeHand Investments and Strongback Holdings Corporation, joining motion to stay the mandate,RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535207] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:24 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1448 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A., Credit Agricole S.A. and Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535186] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:19 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1447 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, Guernroy Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Channel Islands) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada Trust Company (Jersey) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Suisse) S.A., RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Northern Trust Corporation, Barfield Nominees Limited, Access International Advisors Ltd., Access Management Luxembourg SA, Access Partners SA, Patrick Littaye, RBC Dexia Investor Services Bank S.A. and RBC Dexia Investor Services Espana S.A., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535168] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:15 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1446 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Odyssey, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535159] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:12 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1445 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Lion Global Investors Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535140] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:06 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1444 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535119] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:59 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1443 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Atlantic Security Bank, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535109] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:56 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1442 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee First Gulf Bank, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535106] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:55 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1441 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee OFI MGA Alpha Palmares, Oval Palmares Europlus and UMR Select Alternatif, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535105] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:55 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1440 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Investment Fund Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535092] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:51 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1439 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Vontobel AG and Vontobel Asset Management Inc., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535089] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:50 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1438 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Grosvenor Aggressive Growth Fund Limited, Grosvenor Balanced Growth Fund Limited, Grosvenor Investment Management Ltd. and Grosvenor Private Reserve Fund Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535068] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:46 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1437 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., ABN AMRO Fund Services (Isle of Man) Nominees Limited and ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535056] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:44 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1436 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Federico M. Ceretti, FIM Advisers LLP, FIM Limited and Carlo Grosso, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535049] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:40 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1435 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Lighthouse Diversified Fund Limited, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC and Lighthouse Supercash Fund Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535046] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:39 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1434 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Koch Industries, Inc., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535035] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:34 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1433 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Barclays Bank S.A. and Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535032] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/09/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:33 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1432 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Public Institution for Social Security, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535018] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:29 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1431 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2535006] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:27 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1430 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Arden Asset Management Inc., Arden Asset Management LLC and Arden Endowment Advisers, Ltd., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534997] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:25 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1429 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) SA, Credit Suisse (UK) Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch LATAM Investment Banking, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch Wealth Management, Credit Suisse International Limited, Credit Suisse London Nominees Limited, Credit Suisse Nominees (Guernsey) Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Wealth Management Limited, Solon Capital, Ltd. and Zephyros Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534978] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:18 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1428 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Schroder & Co. Bank AG, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534967] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:11 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1427 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Eurizon Capital SGR S.p.A., Eurizon Low Volatility, Eurizon Low Volatility II, Eurizon Low Volatility PB, Eurizon Medium Volatility, Eurizon Medium Volatility II, Eurizon Total Return and Intesa Sanpaolo S.p.A., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534959] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:07 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1426 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Delta National Bank and Trust Company, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534954] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:05 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1425 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch and Naidot & Co., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534943] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:58 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1424 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Inter Investissements S.A., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534942] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:57 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1423 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banca Carige S.P.A., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534935] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:52 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1422 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Tucker, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534931] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:51 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1421 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534925] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:47 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1420 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534908] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:40 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1419 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Walter Noel, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534899] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:36 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1418 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Bank N.V., joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534894] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:35 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1417 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Parson Finance Panama joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534892] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:35 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1416 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee KBC Investments Limited, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534885] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:28 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1415 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque SYZ SA, M&B Capital Advisers Sociedad De Valores, S.A., Trincastar Corporation, Unifortune Asset Management SGR SPA and Unifortune Conservative Fund, joining motion to stay the mandate, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2534874] [17-2992]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by YS] [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:21 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1413 MOTION, to stay mandate, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citibank (Switzerland) AG and Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited in 17-2992, Appellee Citibank (Switzerland) AG in 17-3076, Appellee Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Citigroup Global Markets Limited in 17-3139, FILED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2534828] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/08/2019 01:48 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1412 ATTORNEY, Jessa Irene DeGroote for HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, in case 17-3077 Jessa Irene DeGroote for HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA HSBC Bank PLC HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, in case 17-2992 Jessa Irene DeGroote for HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, in case 17-3062 , , ADDED.[2534450] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:45 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1411 ATTORNEY, Lauren Murray Irwin for Citigroup Global Markets Limited, in case 17-3139 Lauren Murray Irwin for Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited, in case 17-3077 Lauren Murray Irwin for Citibank (Switzerland) AG, in case 17-2992 Lauren Murray Irwin for Citibank (Switzerland) AG, in case 17-3076 , ADDED.[2534438] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:38 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1410 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-2992, Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. and HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3062, Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, FILED. Service date 04/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2534334] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/08/2019 08:22 AM]
April 5, 2019 Filing 1409 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citibank (Switzerland) AG and Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited, FILED. Service date 04/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2534275] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/05/2019 05:43 PM]
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 ORDER, a petition for panel rehearing, or, in the alternative, for rehearing en banc denied, FILED.[2532113] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/03/2019 03:15 PM]
March 22, 2019 Filing 1406 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substiture Counsel, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited in 17-2992, 17-3062, FILED.[2524467] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:58 PM]
March 22, 2019 Filing 1405 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited in 17-2992, 17-3062, FILED. Service date 03/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2524417] [17-2992, 17-3062] [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:22 PM]
March 22, 2019 Filing 1404 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited in 17-2992, 17-3062, FILED. Service date 03/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2524407] [17-2992, 17-3062] [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:16 PM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 1402 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Meritz Fire & Marine Insurance Co. LTD., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2519551] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/18/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/18/2019 09:50 AM]
March 18, 2019 Filing 1401 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee UKFP (Asia) Nominees Limited, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2519438] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/18/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/18/2019 08:48 AM]
March 15, 2019 Filing 1400 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Koch Industries, Inc., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2518763] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/18/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/15/2019 11:09 AM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 1398 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co., Ltd., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2517882] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/15/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:39 AM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 1397 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Public Institution for Social Security, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2517841] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/15/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:21 AM]
March 14, 2019 Filing 1396 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Caceis Bank and Caceis Bank, Luxembourg Branch, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/14/2019 by CM/ECF.[2517833] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/15/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:17 AM]
March 13, 2019 Filing 1394 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Banque Lombard Odier & Cie SA, Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A., Bordier & Cie, Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, Lyxor Asset Management S.A., Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., Lyxor Premium Fund, Societe Generale, S.A., SG Audace Alternatif, Lyxor Asset Management Inc. and Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/13/2019 by CM/ECF.[2517597] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/14/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/13/2019 06:57 PM]
March 13, 2019 Filing 1393 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BSI AG, EFG BANK & TRUST (BAHAMAS) LIMITED, EFG BANK (MONACO) S.A.M. and EFG Bank S.A., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/13/2019 by CM/ECF.[2517574] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/14/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/13/2019 04:59 PM]
March 13, 2019 Filing 1391 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee OFI MGA Alpha Palmares, Oval Palmares Europlus and UMR Select Alternatif, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/13/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516819] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/13/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:36 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1390 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Falcon Private Bank Ltd., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516499] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/13/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 06:08 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1389 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Federico M. Ceretti, FIM Advisers LLP, FIM Limited and Carlo Grosso, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516420] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/13/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:54 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1388 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee SNS Bank N.V. and SNS Global Custody B.V., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516411] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/13/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:50 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1387 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Orbita Capital Return Strategy Limited, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516319] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/13/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:11 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1386 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Audi S.A.M.-Audi Saradar Group, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516309] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/13/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:08 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1385 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Lion Global Investors Limited, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516304] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/13/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:05 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1384 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Hapoalim (Switzerland) Ltd. and Bank Hapoalim B.M., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516212] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/13/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:27 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1383 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Korea Investment Trust Management Company, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516126] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/13/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:32 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1382 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Odyssey, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516123] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/13/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:29 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1381 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Six Sis AG, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516089] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 01:54 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1380 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Kingate Management Limited, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516086] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 01:52 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1379 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Kookmin Bank, Korea Exchange Bank and National Bank of Kuwait SAK, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516083] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 01:49 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1378 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Tucker, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516021] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:59 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1377 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fullerton Capital PTE Ltd., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516014] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:55 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1376 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Schroder & Co. Bank AG, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2516012] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:53 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1375 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Bank N.V., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515995] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:39 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1374 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515926] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:13 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1373 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Robert Blum, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515922] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:12 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1372 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Atlantic Security Bank, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515915] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:11 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1371 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ZCM Asset Holding Company (Bermuda) LLC, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515895] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:07 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1370 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Walter Noel, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515886] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:05 PM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1369 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Union Arbitrage Strategy Fund, Union Securities Investment Trust Co., Ltd., Union USD Global Arbitrage Fund and Union USD Global Arbitrage A Fund, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515822] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:38 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1368 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Vontobel AG and Vontobel Asset Management Inc., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515814] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:35 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1367 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Barclays Bank S.A. and Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515813] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:35 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1366 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA, BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, BNP Paribas Bank & Trust Cayman Limited, BGL BNP Paribas Luxembourg S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Services - Succusale De Luxembourg and BNP Paribas Securities Services S.A., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515811] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:35 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1365 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Investment Fund Limited, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515775] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:25 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1364 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque Internationale a Luxembourg (Suisse) S.A., Banque Internationale a Luxembourg S.A. and Dakota Global Investments, Ltd., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515769] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:24 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1363 ATTORNEY, Andrew M. Harris for Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A. Barclays Bank S.A. Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, in case 17-3011 Andrew M. Harris for Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A. Barclays Bank S.A. Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, in case 17-2992, ADDED.[2515730] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:12 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1362 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Pierre Delandmeter, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515714] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 11:04 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1361 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Gregory Bowes, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515690] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:55 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1360 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, Guernroy Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Channel Islands) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada Trust Company (Jersey) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Suisse) S.A., RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Northern Trust Corporation, Barfield Nominees Limited, Access International Advisors Ltd., Access Management Luxembourg SA, Access Partners SA, Patrick Littaye, RBC Dexia Investor Services Bank S.A. and RBC Dexia Investor Services Espana S.A., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515677] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:50 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1359 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banco General, S.A. and BG Valores, S.A., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515651] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:40 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1358 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Barclays Bank S.A. and Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, FILED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF. [2515644] [17-2992] [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:37 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1357 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Grosvenor Aggressive Growth Fund Limited, Grosvenor Balanced Growth Fund Limited, Grosvenor Investment Management Ltd. and Grosvenor Private Reserve Fund Limited, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515643] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:37 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1356 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Lighthouse Diversified Fund Limited, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC and Lighthouse Supercash Fund Limited, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515565] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:14 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1355 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Delta National Bank and Trust Company, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515547] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:10 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1354 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banca Carige S.P.A., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515544] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:10 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1353 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Arden Asset Management Inc., Arden Asset Management LLC and Arden Endowment Advisers, Ltd., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515536] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:07 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1352 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Inter Investissements S.A., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515519] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 10:00 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1351 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Citibank (Switzerland) AG, Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited and Citigroup Global Markets Limited, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515427] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/12/2019 09:23 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1350 ATTORNEY, David Z. Schwartz for HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, in case 17-3077 David Z. Schwartz for Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, in case 17-3102 David Z. Schwartz for HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA HSBC Bank PLC HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited HSBC Holdings PLC SICO Limited Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, in case 17-2992 David Z. Schwartz for HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA HSBC Bank PLC HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, in case 17-3062, ADDED.[2515424] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 03/12/2019 09:22 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1349 ATTORNEY, Joseph M. Kay for HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, in case 17-3077 Joseph M. Kay for Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, in case 17-3102 Joseph M. Kay for HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA HSBC Bank PLC HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited HSBC Holdings PLC SICO Limited Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, in case 17-2992 Joseph M. Kay for HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited HSBC Bank USA, N.A. HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA HSBC Bank PLC HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, in case 17-3062 Joseph M. Kay for SICO Limited, in case 17-3064, ADDED.[2515401] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 03/12/2019 09:13 AM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1348 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Jacqueline Harary and Santiago Reyes, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515332] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:59 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1347 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Barreneche, Inc., Dove Hill Trust, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc. and Share Management LLC, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515329] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:48 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1346 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Merrill Lynch Bank (Suisse) SA and Merrill Lynch International, joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515327] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:41 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1345 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515325] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:36 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1344 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Eurizon Capital SGR S.p.A., Eurizon Low Volatility, Eurizon Low Volatility II, Eurizon Low Volatility PB, Eurizon Medium Volatility, Eurizon Medium Volatility II, Eurizon Total Return and Intesa Sanpaolo S.p.A., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515323] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 11:01 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1343 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banco Itau Europa International and Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A., joining HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515321] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:37 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1342 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Nomura International plc, joining in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515318] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 10:28 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1341 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee PF Trustees Limited, SafeHand Investments and Strongback Holdings Corporation, joinin in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515314] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:57 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1340 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., ABN AMRO Fund Services (Isle of Man) Nominees Limited and ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, joinin in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515311] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:38 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1339 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd., advising the Court that they join in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515310] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:31 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1338 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee LGT Bank (Liechtenstein) Ltd. and LGT Bank (Switzerland) LTD., advising the Court that they join in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515309] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:27 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1337 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Solon Capital, Ltd., Zephyros Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch Wealth Management, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch LATAM Investment Banking, Credit Suisse Wealth Management Limited, Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) SA, Credit Suisse International Limited, Credit Suisse Nominees (Guernsey) Limited, Credit Suisse London Nominees Limited, Credit Suisse (UK) Limited and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, advising the Court that they join in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515305] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 09:09 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1336 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch and Naidot & Co., advising the Court that they join in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515303] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:58 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1335 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee KBC Investments Limited, advising the Court that they join in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515302] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:43 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1334 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited, advising the Court that they join in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515300] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:39 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1333 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank and Natixis Financial Products LLC, advising the Court that they join in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515299] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:33 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1332 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Quilvest Finance LTD, advising the Court that they join the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515296] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:30 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1331 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Tensyr Limited, advising the Court that they join the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515295] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:28 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1330 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bureau of Labor Insurance, advising the Court that they join in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515294] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:27 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1329 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Alpine Trustees Limited, Ashby Holding Services Limited, Ashby Investment Services Limited, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, El Prela Trading Investments Limited, El Prela Trust, First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Port of Hercules Trustees Limited and The Ashby Trust, advising the Court that they join in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515293] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:24 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1328 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited and Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A., advising the Court that they join in the HSBC petition, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515290] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 08:06 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1327 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee First Gulf Bank, advising the Court that they join in the HSBC Defendants' Petition filed on 03/11/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515289] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 07:54 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1326 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Abu Dhabi Investment Authority, advising the Court that they join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on March 11, 2019 RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515283] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 07:42 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1325 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque SYZ SA, M&B Capital Advisers Sociedad De Valores, S.A., Trincastar Corporation, Unifortune Asset Management SGR SPA and Unifortune Conservative Fund, advising the Court that they join in the HSBC Defendants Petition filed on March 11, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515281] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 07:41 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1324 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, UBS (Luxembourg) SA, UBS Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., UBS Deutschland AG and UBS Third Party Management Company S.A., advising the Court that they join in the etition for Panel Rehearing and Rehearing En Banc filed by the HSBC Defendants on March 11, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515280] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 07:41 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1323 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee CDP Capital Tactical Alternative Investments and Multi-Strategy Fund Limited, advising they Court that they join in the Petition for Panel Rehearing and Rehearing en Banc of Defendants-Appellees filed on March 11, 2019 by HSBC Holdings plc, et al., First Peninsula Trustees Limited, et al., UBS AG, et al., BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited, and Citibank (Switzerland) AG, et al. (Docket No. 1320) RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515279] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 07:41 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1322 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Parson Finance Panama S.A., advising the Court that they join in the HSBC Defendants Petition filed on March 11, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515273] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 07:20 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1321 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A., Credit Agricole S.A. and Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, advising the Court that they join in the HSBC Defendants' Petition filed on March 11, 2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515271] [17-2992]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by YS] [Entered: 03/11/2019 07:09 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1320 PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-2992, Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. and HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3062, Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, FILED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2515243] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 03/11/2019 05:41 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1319 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-2992, Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. and HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3062, Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, FILED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2515078] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 03/11/2019 04:03 PM]
March 11, 2019 Filing 1318 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-2992, Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. and HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3062, Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, FILED. Service date 03/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2515023] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:32 PM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 1317 JUDGMENT, FILED.[2504169] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:36 AM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 1312 CERTIFIED OPINION, dated 02/25/2019, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[2503980] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 02/25/2019 09:10 AM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 1311 OPINION, vacating the judgments and remanding for further proceeding, by DJ, RSP, RCW, FILED.[2503974] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 02/25/2019 09:06 AM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 1310 NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[2503953] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 02/25/2019 08:57 AM]
November 16, 2018 Filing 1309 CASE, before DJ, RSP, RCW, HEARD.[2435743] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 11/16/2018 12:49 PM]
November 1, 2018 Filing 1308 ATTORNEY, Jeffrey E. Baldwin for Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Jacqueline Harary , Santiago Reyes, Dove Hill Trust, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc. and Share Management LLC , TERMINATED.[2423512] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 11/01/2018 11:09 AM]
October 31, 2018 Filing 1307 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Dove Hill Trust, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc. and Share Management LLC, states Jeffrey E. Baldwin, Esq. no longer is affiliated with Simpson Thacher and requests his removal as counsel, RECEIVED. Service date 10/31/2018 by CM/ECF.[2423230] [17-2992] [Entered: 10/31/2018 08:08 PM]
October 31, 2018 Filing 1306 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Jacqueline Harary and Santiago Reyes, states Jeffrey E. Baldwin, Esq. no longer is affiliated with Simpson Thacher and requests his removal as counsel, RECEIVED. Service date 10/31/2018 by CM/ECF.[2423226] [17-2992] [Entered: 10/31/2018 07:56 PM]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1305 ORDER, dated 10/31/2018, granting request for Court Reporter, Nancy Bendish, to attend and transcribe the oral argument, FILED.[2422420] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 10/31/2018 10:02 AM]
October 26, 2018 Filing 1300 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, requests a court reporter be permitted to attend and transcribe the hearing on Nov. 16, 2018, RECEIVED. Service date 10/26/2018 by CM/ECF.[2419988] [17-2992] [Entered: 10/26/2018 05:18 PM]
October 24, 2018 Filing 1298 ATTORNEY, Justin Nessim Kattan, for Appellees EFG BANK & TRUST (BAHAMAS) LIMITED, EFG BANK (MONACO) S.A.M. and EFG Bank S.A.,TERMINATED.[2417162] [17-3115, 17-2992] [Entered: 10/24/2018 11:20 AM]
October 24, 2018 Filing 1297 ATTORNEY, Reid L. Ashinoff, for Appellees EFG BANK (MONACO) S.A.M., EFG BANK & TRUST (BAHAMAS) LIMITED and EFG Bank S.A., TERMINATED.[2417068] [17-3115, 17-2992] [Entered: 10/24/2018 10:25 AM]
October 22, 2018 Filing 1294 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Santiago Reyes and Jacqueline Harary, FILED. Service date 10/22/2018 by CM/ECF. [2415694] [17-2992] [Entered: 10/22/2018 05:18 PM]
October 2, 2018 Filing 1289 LETTER, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Certain Good Faith Defendants, states Mr. Goldenberg no longer wishes to participate as an amicus curaie in the above proceeding, as Mr. Goldenberg and the Trustee have reached an agreement to fully resolve the Trustee's claims against Mr. Goldenberg, RECEIVED. Service date 10/02/2018 by CM/ECF.[2401926] [17-2992] [Entered: 10/02/2018 04:21 PM]
October 2, 2018 Filing 1288 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Certain Good Faith Defendants, FILED. Service date 10/02/2018 by CM/ECF.[2401635] [17-2992] [Entered: 10/02/2018 02:16 PM]
October 2, 2018 Filing 1287 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited, FILED. Service date 10/02/2018 by CM/ECF. [2401398] [17-2992] [Entered: 10/02/2018 12:00 PM]
September 27, 2018 Filing 1285 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to file document [ # 1094 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard in 17-2992, FILED. [2398788][1285] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 09/27/2018 04:34 PM]
September 27, 2018 Filing 1284 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to file document [ # 1093 ] filed by Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 17-2992, FILED. [2398778][1284] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 09/27/2018 04:30 PM]
September 25, 2018 Filing 1282 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Kenneth Krys, FILED. Service date 09/25/2018 by CM/ECF.[2396287] [17-2992] [Entered: 09/25/2018 11:13 AM]
September 25, 2018 Filing 1281 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for judicial notice [ # 923 ] filed by Appellees FIM Advisers LLP, Carlo Grosso, FIM Limited and Federico M. Ceretti in 17-2992, FILED. [2396203][1281] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 09/25/2018 10:37 AM]
September 25, 2018 Filing 1280 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file amicus curiae brief, on behalf of Movant Kenneth Krys[ # 591 ] in 17-2992, FILED. [2396186][1280] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 09/25/2018 10:29 AM]
September 25, 2018 Filing 1279 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file amicus curiae brief, on behalf of Movant Lanx BM Investments, LLC, et al [ # 1028 ] in 17-2992, FILED. [2396179][1279] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 09/25/2018 10:21 AM]
September 24, 2018 Filing 1277 CURED DEFECTIVE : FORM, [ # 1274 ], on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED.[2395574] [17-2992] [Entered: 09/24/2018 03:18 PM]
September 24, 2018 Filing 1276 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, breaks down oral argument time and order of presentations for oral argument, RECEIVED. Service date 09/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2395084] [17-2992] [Entered: 09/24/2018 10:07 AM]
September 24, 2018 Filing 1275 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, FILED. Service date 09/24/2018 by CM/ECF. [2395079] [17-2992] [Entered: 09/24/2018 10:04 AM]
September 21, 2018 Filing 1274 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 09/21/2018 by CM/ECF. [2394396] [17-2992] [Entered: 09/21/2018 12:05 PM]
September 21, 2018 Filing 1273 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT, [1272], on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED.[2394363] [17-2992] [Entered: 09/21/2018 11:45 AM]
September 21, 2018 Filing 1272 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Josephine Wang, Esq. for Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862, FILED. Service date 09/21/2018 by CM/ECF. [2394073] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 09/21/2018 09:13 AM]
September 20, 2018 Filing 1271 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 09/20/2018 by CM/ECF. [2393956] [17-2992] [Entered: 09/20/2018 05:05 PM]
September 20, 2018 Filing 1270 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2393853] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 09/20/2018 04:19 PM]
September 20, 2018 Filing 1269 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 11/16/2018, SET.[2393168] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 09/20/2018 09:32 AM]
August 29, 2018 Filing 1268 ATTORNEY, Erica Klipper, for defendants-appellees Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Limited and Citibank (Switzerland) AG (the Citi Defendants), TERMINATED.[2378377] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 08/29/2018 01:57 PM]
August 27, 2018 Filing 1266 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Limited and Citibank (Switzerland) AG, stating Erica Klipper is no longer with the firm and should be terminated from the case, RECEIVED. Service date 08/27/2018 by CM/ECF.[2376414] [17-2992] [Entered: 08/27/2018 01:40 PM]
August 24, 2018 Filing 1264 ATTORNEY, Samuel P. Hershey, for HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited and HSBC Holdings PLC, TERMINATED.[2375115] [17-2992] [Entered: 08/24/2018 10:15 AM]
August 24, 2018 Filing 1262 LETTER, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, stating availability for oral argument, RECEIVED. Service date 08/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2374940] [17-2992] [Entered: 08/24/2018 08:33 AM]
August 23, 2018 Filing 1259 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, stating unavailable dates for oral argument, RECEIVED. Service date 08/23/2018 by CM/ECF.[2374377] [17-2992] [Entered: 08/23/2018 12:22 PM]
August 22, 2018 Filing 1258 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 11/13/2018, PROPOSED.[2373611] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 08/22/2018 03:31 PM]
August 22, 2018 Filing 1257 ROYAL BANK OF CANADA (ASIA) LIMITED, APPELLEE, TERMINATED.[2373456] [17-2992, 17-3013] [Entered: 08/22/2018 02:16 PM]
August 22, 2018 Filing 1256 ROYAL BANK OF CANADA (ASIA) LIMITED, APPELLEE, replaced by ROYAL BANK OF CANADA SINGAPORE BRANCH, APPELLEE, SUBSTITUTED.[2373426] [17-2992, 17-3013]--[Edited 08/22/2018 by TW] [Entered: 08/22/2018 01:51 PM]
August 22, 2018 Filing 1255 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to be substituted as party [ # 1223 ] filed by Appellee Royal Bank of Canada (Asia) Limited, by PWH, Circuit Judge, JAR, Judge, FILED. [2373392][1255] [17-2992, 17-3013] [Entered: 08/22/2018 01:21 PM]
August 20, 2018 Filing 1253 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Public Institution for Social Security, writes to inform the Court that Public Institution for Social Security joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935), RECEIVED. Service date 08/20/2018 by CM/ECF.[2371410] [17-2992] [Entered: 08/20/2018 11:35 AM]
August 17, 2018 Filing 1252 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited and HSBC Holdings PLC, stating Samuel P. Hershey is no longer associated with this firm. Accordingly, we request that his appearance in the above-referenced matter be terminated. RECEIVED. Service date 08/17/2018 by CM/ECF.[2370582] [17-2992] [Entered: 08/17/2018 01:08 PM]
August 8, 2018 Filing 1250 SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2362385] [17-2992, 17-3013] [Entered: 08/08/2018 11:02 AM]
August 1, 2018 Filing 1245 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited, unavailable dates for oral argument, RECEIVED. Service date 08/01/2018 by CM/ECF.[2357344] [17-2992] [Entered: 08/01/2018 03:49 PM]
July 27, 2018 Filing 1242 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, informing the Court of the available dates for argument, RECEIVED. Service date 07/27/2018 by CM/ECF.[2354278] [17-2992]--[Edited 07/27/2018 by EM] [Entered: 07/27/2018 10:46 AM]
July 16, 2018 Filing 1241 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Odyssey, join in HSBC Defendants' Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935) in appeal no. 17-2992,RECEIVED. Service date 07/16/2018 by CM/ECF.[2345791] [17-2992] [Entered: 07/16/2018 01:58 PM]
July 16, 2018 Filing 1231 STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee Odyssey letter [1002] from the docket, FILED.[2345635] [17-2992] [Entered: 07/16/2018 12:32 PM]
July 11, 2018 Filing 1223 MOTION, to be substituted as party, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada (Asia) Limited in 17-2992, 17-3013, FILED. Service date 07/11/2018 by CM/ECF. [2342385] [17-2992, 17-3013] [Entered: 07/11/2018 09:51 AM]
July 10, 2018 Filing 1222 CURED DEFECTIVE : LETTER, [ # 1221 ], on behalf of Appellee Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, FILED.[2341562] [17-2992] [Entered: 07/10/2018 11:40 AM]
July 10, 2018 Filing 1221 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 07/10/2018 by CM/ECF.[2341499] [17-2992] [Entered: 07/10/2018 11:17 AM]
July 10, 2018 Filing 1220 ATTORNEY, Scott Schreiber for Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, in case 17-2992 Scott Schreiber for Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, in case 17-3065 , , ADDED.[2341468] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 07/10/2018 11:07 AM]
July 10, 2018 Filing 1219 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter, [1189], on behalf of Appellee Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, FILED.[2341324] [17-2992] [Entered: 07/10/2018 10:15 AM]
July 3, 2018 Filing 1216 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 07/03/2018, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited, RECEIVED. Service date 07/03/2018 by email.[2337747] [17-2992] [Entered: 07/03/2018 11:54 AM]
June 28, 2018 Filing 1215 ATTORNEY, David Y Livshiz for Tensyr Limited, in case 17-3009 David Y Livshiz for Tensyr Limited, in case 17-2992 , , ADDED.[2334775] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 06/28/2018 12:36 PM]
June 27, 2018 Filing 1213 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 06/27/2018, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, RECEIVED. Service date 06/27/2018 by CM/ECF.[2334187] [17-2992] [Entered: 06/27/2018 05:02 PM]
June 1, 2018 Filing 1212 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Eurizon Capital SGR S.p.A., Eurizon Low Volatility, Eurizon Low Volatility II, Eurizon Low Volatility PB, Eurizon Medium Volatility, Eurizon Medium Volatility II, Eurizon Total Return and Intesa Sanpaolo S.p.A., join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 06/01/2018 by CM/ECF.[2316427] [17-2992] [Entered: 06/01/2018 05:00 PM]
May 29, 2018 Filing 1209 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 1129 ], on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3014, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3024, 17-3032, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3057, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3066, 17-3071, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3086, 17-3101, 17-3106, 17-3117, 17-3144, FILED. Service date 05/29/2018 by CM/ECF.[2313158][1209] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/29/2018 05:56 PM]
May 29, 2018 Filing 1208 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque SYZ SA, Unifortune Asset Management SGR SPA, Unifortune Conservative Fund, Trincastar Corporation and M&B Capital Advisers Sociedad De Valores, S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket Entry No. 1129) in lead case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 05/29/2018 by CM/ECF.[2312327] [17-2992]--[Edited 05/29/2018 by EM] [Entered: 05/29/2018 09:19 AM]
May 25, 2018 Filing 1207 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee UKFP (Asia) Nominees Limited, joins in HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/25/2018 by CM/ECF.[2311933] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/25/2018 01:41 PM]
May 24, 2018 Filing 1206 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Meritz Fire & Marine Insurance Co. LTD., joins in and adopts for purposes of Case No. 17-3071 the Limited Opposition to the Trustees and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration, filed on May 21, 2018 by the HSBC Defendants in the lead appeal, Case No. 17-2992 [Dk. No. 1129], RECEIVED. Service date 05/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2310777] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/24/2018 12:50 PM]
May 24, 2018 Filing 1205 CURED DEFECTIVE : LETTER, [ # 2310165-2 ], on behalf of Appellee BSI AG, FILED.[2310253] [17-3003] [Entered: 05/24/2018 09:08 AM]
May 23, 2018 Filing 1204 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA, BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, BNP Paribas Bank & Trust Cayman Limited, BGL BNP Paribas Luxembourg S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Services - Succusale De Luxembourg and BNP Paribas Securities Services S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129). RECEIVED. Service date 05/23/2018 by CM/ECF.[2310015] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/23/2018 04:17 PM]
May 23, 2018 Filing 1203 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 05/22/2018, on behalf of Appellee BSI AG , [ # 2309125-2 ], on behalf of Appellee BSI AG, FILED.[2309433] [17-3003] [Entered: 05/23/2018 10:33 AM]
May 23, 2018 Filing 1202 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Public Institution for Social Security, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Document 1129 in Case No. 17-2992 and Document 273 in Case No. 17-3043) RECEIVED. Service date 05/23/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309212] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/23/2018 02:21 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1201 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Korea Investment Trust Management Company, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Document 1129 in Case No. 17-2992 and Document 273 in Case No. 17-3043). RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309200] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 08:09 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1200 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Solon Capital, Ltd., Zephyros Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch, Credit Suisse Wealth Management Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch LATAM Investment Banking, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch Wealth Management, Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) SA, Credit Suisse International Limited, Credit Suisse (UK) Limited and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129). RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309195] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 07:55 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1199 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Pierre Delandmeter, joins in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129 in 17-2992).1 RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309192] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 07:36 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1198 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Merrill Lynch Bank (Suisse) SA and Merrill Lynch International, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129). RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309146] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 06:45 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1197 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BSI AG, EFG BANK & TRUST (BAHAMAS) LIMITED, EFG BANK (MONACO) S.A.M. and EFG Bank S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129) in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal. RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309121] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 05:37 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1196 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Naidot & Co.,join in and adopt for purposes of Case No. 17-2995 the Limited Opposition to the Trustees and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration, filed on May 21, 2018 by the HSBC Defendants in the lead appeal, Case No. 17-2992 [Dk. No. 1129, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309100] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 05:01 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1195 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch, join in and adopt for purposes of Case No. 17-2995 the Limited Opposition to the Trustees and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration, filed on May 21, 2018 by the HSBC Defendants in the lead appeal, Case No. 17-2992 [Dk. No. 1129, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309094] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:58 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1194 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., join in and adopt for purposes of Case No. 17-2995 the Limited Opposition to the Trustees and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration, filed on May 21, 2018 by the HSBC Defendants in the lead appeal, Case No. 17-2992 [Dk. No. 1129, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309083] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:53 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1193 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee SNS Global Custody B.V. and SNS Bank N.V., join in and adopt for purposes of Case No. 17-2995 the Limited Opposition to the Trustees and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration, filed on May 21, 2018 by the HSBC Defendants in the lead appeal, Case No. 17-2992 [Dk. No. 1129, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309080] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:52 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1192 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Union Arbitrage Strategy Fund, Union Securities Investment Trust Co., Ltd., Union USD Global Arbitrage A Fund and Union USD Global Arbitrage Fund, join in and adopt for purposes of Case No. 17-2995 the Limited Opposition to the Trustees and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration, filed on May 21, 2018 by the HSBC Defendants in the lead appeal, Case No. 17-2992 [Dk. No. 1129], RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309077] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:51 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1191 ATTORNEY, Peter E. Kazanoff for Amit Vijayvergiya, in case 17-3066 Peter E. Kazanoff for Amit Vijayvergiya, in case 17-2992 , , ADDED.[2309067] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:48 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1190 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Tensyr Limited, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129). RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309048] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:36 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1189 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, < RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309016] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:27 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1188 Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129). RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309013] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:27 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1187 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bureau of Labor Insurance, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129). RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2309010] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:25 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1186 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Hapoalim (Switzerland) Ltd. and Bank Hapoalim B.M., join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129). RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308979] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:15 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1185 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A. and Banco Itau Europa International, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129). RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308957] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:04 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1184 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Kookmin Bank, Korea Exchange Bank and National Bank of Kuwait SAK, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129). RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308939] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 04:00 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1183 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ZCM Asset Holding Company (Bermuda) LLC, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129). RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308926] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 03:57 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1182 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Nomura International plc and Nomura International plc, join in the HSBC defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129). RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308919] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 03:54 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1181 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank and Natixis Financial Products LLC, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129). RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308918] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 03:53 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1180 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Inter Investissements S.A., joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), in case no. 17-2992 RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308862] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 03:25 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1179 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Lighthouse Diversified Fund Limited, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC and Lighthouse Supercash Fund Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), in case no. 17-2992 RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308860] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 03:23 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1178 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Delta National Bank and Trust Company, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), in case no. 17-2992 RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308855] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 03:20 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1177 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Investment Fund Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), in case no. 17-2992 RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308851] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 03:18 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1176 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Abu Dhabi Investment Authority, joins in and adopts in full for purposes of Case No. 17-3059 the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), Case No. 17-2992, the lead case in this consolidated appeal. RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308832] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 03:05 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1175 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank and Credit Agricole S.A., joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308809] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 02:50 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1174 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque Internationale a Luxembourg (Suisse) S.A., Banque Internationale a Luxembourg S.A. and Dakota Global Investments, Ltd., joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308798] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 02:43 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1173 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Gregory Bowes, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308795] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 02:42 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1172 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Bank N.V., joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustees and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308783] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 02:36 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1171 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Banque Lombard Odier & Cie SA, Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A., Bordier & Cie, Lyxor Asset Management Inc., Lyxor Asset Management S.A., Lyxor Premium Fund, SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., SG Audace Alternatif, SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A., Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A. and Societe Generale, S.A., joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed in appeal number 17-2992 on May 21, 2018 (Docket No.1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308753] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 02:23 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1170 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD., joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed in appeal number 17-2992 on May 21, 2018 (Docket No.1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308746] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 02:17 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1169 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee CDP Capital Tactical Alternative Investments and Multi-Strategy Fund Limited, join in Defendants-Appellees Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 by HSBC Holdings plc, et al. (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308734] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 02:08 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1168 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Six Sis AG, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308718] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 02:00 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1167 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Atlantic Security Bank, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308714] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:56 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1166 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Kingate Management Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308711] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:55 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1164 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fullerton Capital PTE Ltd., joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308709] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:51 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1163 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Orbita Capital Return Strategy Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308704] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:48 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1162 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Audi S.A.M.-Audi Saradar Group, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308694] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:38 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1161 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Alpine Trustees Limited, Ashby Holding Services Limited, Ashby Investment Services Limited, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, El Prela Trading Investments Limited, El Prela Trust, First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Port of Hercules Trustees Limited and The Ashby Trust, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308693] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:37 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1160 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Schroder & Co. Bank AG, joins in and adopts for all purposes the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992 (Docket No. 1129) , RECEIVED Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308691] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:34 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1159 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Quilvest Finance LTD, joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Document 1129 in Case No. 17-2992), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308690] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:34 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1158 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Koch Industries, Inc., joins in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308678] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:27 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1157 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited and Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308675] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:25 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1156 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited, join in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308670] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:18 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1155 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Fund Services (Isle of Man) Nominees Limited, join in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308663] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:14 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1154 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee LGT Bank (Liechtenstein) Ltd. and LGT Bank (Switzerland) LTD., join in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308660] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:12 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1153 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited and ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., join in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308653] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 01:09 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1152 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Arden Endowment Advisers, Ltd., Arden Asset Management LLC and Arden Asset Management Inc., join in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308631] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 12:56 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1151 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, UBS (Luxembourg) SA, UBS Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., UBS Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., UBS Deutschland AG and UBS Third Party Management Company S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308597] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 12:33 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1150 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Robert Blum, join in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308582] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 12:27 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1149 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee PF Trustees Limited, SafeHand Investments and Strongback Holdings Corporation, join in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308571] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 12:23 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1148 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Santiago Reyes and Jacqueline Harary, join in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308557] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 12:13 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1147 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Barreneche, Inc., Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc., Share Management LLC and Dove Hill Trust, join in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308549] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 12:07 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1146 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited, Citibank (Switzerland) AG and Citigroup Global Markets Limited, join in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308545] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 12:05 PM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1144 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee OFI MGA Alpha Palmares, Oval Palmares Europlus and UMR Select Alternatif, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket Enety No. 1129) in lead appeal no. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308514] [17-2992]--[Edited 05/29/2018 by EM] [Entered: 05/22/2018 11:51 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1143 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Lion Global Investors Limited, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket Entry No. 1129) RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308505] [17-2992]--[Edited 05/29/2018 by EM] [Entered: 05/22/2018 11:48 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1142 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co., join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket Entry No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308496] [17-2992]--[Edited 05/29/2018 by EM] [Entered: 05/22/2018 11:45 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1141 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, Guernroy Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Channel Islands) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada Trust Company (Jersey) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Asia) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Suisse) S.A., RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Northern Trust Corporation, Barfield Nominees Limited, Access International Advisors Ltd., Access Management Luxembourg SA, Access Partners SA, Patrick Littaye, RBC Dexia Investor Services Bank S.A. and RBC Dexia Investor Services Espana S.A., joins in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308467] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 11:33 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1140 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Grosvenor Aggressive Growth Fund Limited, Grosvenor Balanced Growth Fund Limited, Grosvenor Investment Management Ltd. and Grosvenor Private Reserve Fund Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308465] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 11:33 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1139 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Parson Finance Panama S.A., joins in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308453] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 11:29 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1138 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Vontobel AG and Vontobel Asset Management Inc., joins in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308443] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 11:23 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1137 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee First Gulf Bank, joins in the HSBC Defendants' Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPC's Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129), RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308413] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 11:10 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1136 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Barclays Bank S.A. and Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (ECFNo. 1129) in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308399] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 11:02 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1135 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee KBC Investments Limited, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129) in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308377] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 10:54 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1134 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Federico M. Ceretti, FIM Advisers LLP, FIM Limited and Carlo Grosso, LETTER, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129) in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308367] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 10:46 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1133 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banca Carige S.P.A., LETTER, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129) in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308357] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 10:40 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1132 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Tucker, LETTER, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129) in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308351] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 10:37 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1131 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd., join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129) in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308207] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/22/2018 08:55 AM]
May 22, 2018 Filing 1130 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Caceis Bank and Caceis Bank, Luxembourg Branch, join in the HSBC Defendants Limited Opposition to the Trustee and SIPCs Joint Motion for Leave to File a Foreign Law Declaration filed on May 21, 2018 (Docket No. 1129) in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 05/22/2018 by CM/ECF.[2308175] [17-2992]--[Edited 05/23/2018 by TW] [Entered: 05/22/2018 07:59 AM]
May 21, 2018 Filing 1129 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 1094 ], [ # 1093 ], on behalf of Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-2992, Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. and HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3062, Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, FILED. Service date 05/21/2018 by CM/ECF. [2308158] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/21/2018 07:57 PM]
May 21, 2018 Filing 1128 CURED DEFECTIVE : LETTER, [ # 2307533-2 ], on behalf of Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD. in 17-3010, 17-2992, FILED.[2307869] [17-3010, 17-2992] [Entered: 05/21/2018 03:43 PM]
May 21, 2018 Filing 1127 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter, [ # 2307212-2 ], on behalf of Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD. in 17-3010, FILED.[2307482] [17-3010, 17-2992] [Entered: 05/21/2018 01:21 PM]
May 21, 2018 Filing 1126 ATTORNEY, Mark G. Cunha, for Barreneche, Inc., Dove Hill Trust, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc., Share Management LLC, TERMINATED.[2307464] [17-3113, 17-2992] [Entered: 05/21/2018 01:11 PM]
May 21, 2018 Filing 1125 ATTORNEY, Mark G. Cunha, for Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche Cornelis Boele, Santiago Reyes, Jacqueline Harary, Barreneche, Inc., Dove Hill Trust, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc., Share Management LLC, TERMINATED.[2307449] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 05/21/2018 12:56 PM]
May 21, 2018 Filing 1124 ATTORNEY, Mark G. Cunha, for Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Santiago Reyes, Jacqueline Harary TERMINATED.[2307417] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 05/21/2018 12:45 PM]
May 21, 2018 Filing 1123 CURED DEFECTIVE : LETTER, [ # 2307087-2 ], on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A. and Credit Agricole S.A. in 17-3026, FILED.[2307171] [17-3026, 17-2992] [Entered: 05/21/2018 11:14 AM]
May 21, 2018 Filing 1122 CURED DEFECTIVE : LETTER, [ # 2307090-2 ], on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank in 17-3042, FILED.[2307148] [17-3042, 17-2992] [Entered: 05/21/2018 11:09 AM]
May 18, 2018 Filing 1121 CURED DEFECTIVE : FORM, [ # 1120 ], on behalf of Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD., FILED.[2306273] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/18/2018 12:25 PM]
May 18, 2018 Filing 1120 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD., joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed in appeal number 17-2992 on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935) , RECEIVED. Service date 05/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2306228] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/18/2018 12:05 PM]
May 18, 2018 Filing 1119 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter, [1002], on behalf of Appellee Odyssey, FILED.[2306119] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/18/2018 11:29 AM]
May 18, 2018 Filing 1118 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter, [986], [ # 2283048-2 ], on behalf of Cathay Life Insurance Company Ltd., FILED.[2306069] [17-2992, 17-3010] [Entered: 05/18/2018 11:10 AM]
May 18, 2018 Filing 1117 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter, [ # 2283083-2 ], on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank in 17-3042, 17-2992, FILED.[2306054] [17-3042, 17-2992] [Entered: 05/18/2018 11:01 AM]
May 18, 2018 Filing 1116 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter, [ # 2283082-2 ], on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A. and Credit Agricole S.A. in 17-3026, 17-2992, FILED.[2306040] [17-3026, 17-2992] [Entered: 05/18/2018 10:52 AM]
May 15, 2018 Filing 1115 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Hapoalim (Switzerland) Ltd. and Bank Hapoalim B.M., join in the HSBC Defendants' Brief filed on April18, 2018 (Docket No. 935). RECEIVED. Service date 05/15/2018 by CM/ECF.[2303701] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/15/2018 06:17 PM]
May 15, 2018 Filing 1114 STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee Bank Hapoalim (Switzerland) Ltd. and Bank Hapoalim B.M. in 17-2992 letter [967] from the docket, FILED.[2303533] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/15/2018 03:59 PM]
May 15, 2018 Filing 1113 CURED DEFECTIVE : LETTER, [ # 1008 ], on behalf of Appellee KBC Investments Limited, FILED.[2303271] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/15/2018 02:02 PM]
May 15, 2018 Filing 1112 STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee Public Institution for Social Security in 17-2992 letter [933] from the docket, FILED.[2303246] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/15/2018 01:52 PM]
May 11, 2018 Filing 1106 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file document [ # 1093 ] filed by Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, referring motion to file document [ # 1094 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. [2301359][1106] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/11/2018 03:19 PM]
May 10, 2018 Filing 1104 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, will submit a timely opposition to motion of Intervenor and Appellants motion to file a foreign law declaration no later than May 21, 2018, RECEIVED. Service date 05/10/2018 by CM/ECF.[2300428] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/10/2018 05:23 PM]
May 10, 2018 Filing 1103 CURED DEFECTIVE : BRIEF, [ # 1102 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Cayman Finance and Recovery and Insolvency Specialist Association, FILED.[2299952] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/10/2018 01:53 PM]
May 10, 2018 Filing 1102 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of , Amicus Curiae Cayman Finance and Recovery and Insolvency Specialist Association, FILED. Service date 05/10/2018 by CM/ECF. [2299926] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/10/2018 01:34 PM]
May 10, 2018 Filing 1101 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, brief, [1092], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Cayman Finance and Recovery and Insolvency Specialist Association, FILED.[2299617] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/10/2018 10:55 AM]
May 10, 2018 Filing 1100 CURED DEFECTIVE : BRIEF, [2299542], on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 17-2992, FILED.[2299589] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/10/2018 10:40 AM]
May 10, 2018 Filing 1099 CURED DEFECTIVE : LETTER, [ # 1089 ], on behalf of Appellee Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited and Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A., FILED.[2299574] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/10/2018 10:33 AM]
May 10, 2018 Filing 1098 INTERVENOR REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862, FILED. Service date 05/10/2018 by email. [2299542] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/10/2018 10:15 AM]
May 10, 2018 Filing 1097 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, reply brief, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 17-2992, FILED.[2299474] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/10/2018 09:29 AM]
May 9, 2018 Filing 1094 MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3014, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3024, 17-3032, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3057, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3066, 17-3071, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3086, 17-3101, 17-3106, 17-3117, 17-3144, FILED. Service date 05/09/2018 by CM/ECF. [2299298] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/09/2018 04:36 PM]
May 9, 2018 Filing 1093 MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862, FILED. Service date 05/09/2018 by CM/ECF. [2299206] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/09/2018 03:56 PM]
May 9, 2018 Filing 1092 AMICUS BRIEF, <, FILED. Service date 05/09/2018 by CM/ECF. [2299096] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/09/2018 03:04 PM]
May 9, 2018 Filing 1091 REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3014, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3024, 17-3032, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3057, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3066, 17-3071, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3086, 17-3101, 17-3106, 17-3117, 17-3144, FILED. Service date 05/09/2018 by CM/ECF. [2298823] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/09/2018 12:04 PM]
May 8, 2018 Filing 1090 INTERVENOR REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862, FILED. Service date 05/08/2018 by CM/ECF. [2297698] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/08/2018 12:12 PM]
May 7, 2018 Filing 1089 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited and Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants' Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal (Docket No. 935). RECEIVED. Service date 05/07/2018 by CM/ECF.[2296897] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/07/2018 03:08 PM]
May 7, 2018 Filing 1088 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, brief, [1024], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Cayman Finance and Recovery and Insolvency Specialist Association, FILED.[2296569] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/07/2018 12:07 PM]
May 7, 2018 Filing 1087 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter, [969], on behalf of Appellee Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited and Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A., FILED.[2296240] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/07/2018 09:34 AM]
May 4, 2018 Filing 1086 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae cayman finance and Recovery and Insolvency Specialist Association, ADDED.[2295596] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/04/2018 01:26 PM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 1079 CURED DEFECTIVE :LETTER, [ # 1078 ], on behalf of Appellee First Gulf Bank, FILED.[2294582] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/03/2018 01:36 PM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 1078 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee First Gulf Bank, join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935), in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 05/03/2018 by CM/ECF.[2294570] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/03/2018 01:27 PM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 1077 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter, [967], on behalf of Appellee Bank Hapoalim (Switzerland) Ltd. and Bank Hapoalim B.M., FILED.[2294567] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/03/2018 01:14 PM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 1075 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter, [965], on behalf of Appellee First Gulf Bank, FILED.[2294512] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/03/2018 12:40 PM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 1074 CURED DEFECTIVE : FORM, [ # 1073 ], on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED.[2294399] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/03/2018 11:48 AM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 1073 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Josephine Wang, Esq. for Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862, FILED. Service date 05/03/2018 by CM/ECF. [2294366] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/03/2018 11:36 AM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 1072 CURED DEFECTIVE : LETTER, [ # 1050 ], on behalf of Appellee Delta National Bank and Trust Company, FILED.[2294331] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/03/2018 11:23 AM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 1071 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, oral argument statement, [1049], on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED.[2294298] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/03/2018 11:08 AM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 1070 CURED DEFECTIVE : BRIEF, [ # 1059 ], on behalf of Appellee Lighthouse Diversified Fund Limited, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC and Lighthouse Supercash Fund Limited, FILED.[2294148] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/03/2018 09:50 AM]
May 3, 2018 Filing 1067 CURED DEFECTIVE : BRIEF, FORMS, [ # 1064 ], [ # 1062 ], [ # 1065 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Brian Child, Christopher Hill, Nilani Perera, Martin Trott and Andrew Willins, FILED.[2294000] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/03/2018 08:25 AM]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1066 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Franklin B. Velie, Esq. for Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited in 17-2992, 17-3062, FILED. Service date 05/02/2018 by CM/ECF. [2293957] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/02/2018 05:51 PM]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1065 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Brian Child, Christopher Hill, Nilani Perera, Martin Trott and Andrew Willins, FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF. [2293851] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/02/2018 04:35 PM]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1064 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Brian Child, Christopher Hill, Nilani Perera, Martin Trott and Andrew Willins , FILED. Service date 05/02/2018 by CM/ECF. [2293840] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/02/2018 04:30 PM]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1063 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Thomas J Moloney for Appellee HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-2992, Attorney Thomas J Moloney for Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited and HSBC Holdings PLC in 17-3062, Attorney Thomas J Moloney for Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Attorney Thomas J Moloney for Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Attorney Thomas J Moloney for Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, FILED. Service date 05/02/2018 by CM/ECF. [2293826] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/02/2018 04:26 PM]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1062 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Brian Child, Christopher Hill, Nilani Perera, Martin Trott and Andrew Willins , FILED. Service date 05/02/2018 by CM/ECF. [2293794] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/02/2018 04:16 PM]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1061 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, amicus brief, notice of appearances, [1030], [1031], [1032], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Brian Child, Christopher Hill, Nilani Perera, Martin Trott and Andrew Willins, FILED.[2293436] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/02/2018 01:37 PM]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1060 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Brian Child, Christopher Hill, Nilani Perera, Martin Trott and Andrew Willins, ADDED.[2293415] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/02/2018 01:18 PM]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1059 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Lighthouse Diversified Fund Limited, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC and Lighthouse Supercash Fund Limited in 17-2992, 17-3132, FILED. Service date 05/02/2018 by CM/ECF. [2293396] [17-2992, 17-3132] [Entered: 05/02/2018 01:03 PM]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1058 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, ADDED.[2293363] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/02/2018 12:46 PM]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1057 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Harold J. Hein, Barbara J. Berdon, Laura E. Guggenheimer Cole, Sidney Cole, Frederica Ripley French Revocable Trust, Frederica R. French, Alexander McFerran, Alvin Gindel Revocable Trust, Alvin Gindel, Rose Gindel Trust, Rose Gindel, Alvin Gindel, S&L Partnership, Carla Goldworm, Samuel Goldworm, Luke Goldworm, Toby T. Hobish, Lapin Children LLC, Bam L.P., Michael Mann, Meryl Mann, Betsy Mann Polatsch, Adam Mann, Stanley T. Miller, Neil Reger Profit Sharing Keogh, Neil Reger, Norma Shapiro Revocable Declaration of Trust, Norma Shapiro, Martin Rosen, Barry Weisfeld and James Greiff, ADDED.[2293070] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/02/2018 10:17 AM]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1056 ATTORNEY, Matthew Kupillas for Certain Good Faith Defendants, in case 17-2992 , [ # 1020 ], ADDED.[2292880] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/02/2018 08:18 AM]
May 2, 2018 Filing 1055 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, supplemental brief, [981], on behalf of Appellee Lighthouse Diversified Fund Limited, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC and Lighthouse Supercash Fund Limited, FILED.[2292878] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/02/2018 08:07 AM]
May 1, 2018 Filing 1054 ATTORNEY, Richard Levy Jr. for Certain Good Faith Defendants, in case 17-2992 , [ # 1019 ], ADDED.[2292419] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/01/2018 01:32 PM]
May 1, 2018 Filing 1050 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Delta National Bank and Trust Company, joins the HSBC Defendants brief filed on April 18, 2018 [Docket No. 951] , RECEIVED. Service date 05/01/2018 by CM/ECF.[2292104] [17-2992] [Entered: 05/01/2018 11:13 AM]
May 1, 2018 Filing 1049 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ms. Josephine Wang, Esq. for Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862, FILED. Service date 05/01/2018 by CM/ECF. [2292102] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/01/2018 11:12 AM]
May 1, 2018 Filing 1048 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Roy T. Englert, Jr., Esq. for Appellant Irving H. Picard in 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862, FILED. Service date 05/01/2018 by CM/ECF. [2292097] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 05/01/2018 11:11 AM]
April 30, 2018 Filing 1045 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Franklin B. Velie, Esq. for Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited in 17-2992, 17-3062, FILED. Service date 04/30/2018 by CM/ECF. [2291534] [17-2992, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862, 17-3005, 17-3004, 17-3003, 17-2999, 17-2996, 17-2995] [Entered: 04/30/2018 04:21 PM]
April 30, 2018 Filing 1044 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Barreneche, Inc., Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Santiago Reyes, Jacqueline Harary, Dove Hill Trust, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc. and Share Management LLC, FILED. Service date 04/30/2018 by CM/ECF. [2291470] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/30/2018 03:55 PM]
April 30, 2018 Filing 1042 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file amicus curiae brief to the panel that will determine the merits of the appeal [ # 1028 ] in 17-2992, FILED. [2291371][1042] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/30/2018 03:16 PM]
April 30, 2018 Filing 1040 CURED DEFECTIVE : LETTER, [ # 1009 ], on behalf of Appellee Falcon Private Bank Ltd. in 17-2992, FILED.[2291224] [17-2992, 17-3067] [Entered: 04/30/2018 01:50 PM]
April 30, 2018 Filing 1039 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter, [951], on behalf of Appellee Delta National Bank and Trust Company, FILED.[2291206] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/30/2018 01:28 PM]
April 30, 2018 Filing 1038 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter, [933], on behalf of Appellee Public Institution for Social Security, FILED.[2291152] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/30/2018 12:47 PM]
April 30, 2018 Filing 1036 ATTORNEY, Samuel P. Hershey for HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA HSBC Bank PLC HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, in case 17-2992 Samuel P. Hershey for HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Bank PLC HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, in case 17-3062 , , ADDED.[2291050] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/30/2018 11:47 AM]
April 30, 2018 Filing 1033 NEW PARTY, Movant Certain Good Faith Defendants, ADDED.[2290754] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/30/2018 08:42 AM]
April 26, 2018 Filing 1032 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Brian Child, Christopher Hill, Nilani Perera, Martin Trott and Andrew Willins, FILED. Service date 04/26/2018 by CM/ECF. [2289571] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/26/2018 06:44 PM]
April 26, 2018 Filing 1031 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Brian Child, Christopher Hill, Nilani Perera, Martin Trott and Andrew Willins, FILED. Service date 04/26/2018 by CM/ECF. [2289570] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/26/2018 06:40 PM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 1030 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Brian Child, Christopher Hill, Nilani Perera, Martin Trott and Andrew Willins, FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF. [2288535] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/25/2018 08:51 PM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 1029 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF. [2288531] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/25/2018 08:09 PM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 1028 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Certain Good Faith Defendants, FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF.[2288488] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/25/2018 04:56 PM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 1027 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, < , FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF. [2288278] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/25/2018 03:29 PM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 1026 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, < , FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF. [2288261] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/25/2018 03:19 PM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 1025 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF. [2288240] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/25/2018 03:12 PM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 1024 AMICUS BRIEF, Cayman Finance, Recovery and Insolvency Specialist Association, FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF. [2288092] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/25/2018 01:48 PM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 1023 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Harold J. Hein, Barbara J. Berdon, Laura E. Guggenheimer Cole, Sidney Cole, the Frederica Ripley French Revocable Trust, Frederica R. French, Alvin Gindel Revocable Trust, Alvin Gindel, Rose Gindel Trust, Rose Gindel, Michael Gindel, S&L Partnership, Carla Goldworm, Samuel Goldworm, Luke Goldworm, Toby T. Hobish, Lapin Children, LLC., BAM L.P, Michael Mann, Meryl Mann, Betsy Mann Polatch, Adam Mann, Stanley T. Miller, Neil Reger Profit Sharing Keogh, Neil Reger, The Norma Shapiro Revocable Declaration of Trust , Philip L. Shapiro, Martin Rosen, Barry Weisfeld, James Greiff, FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF. [2288063] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/25/2018 01:26 PM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 1022 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Cayman Finance, RISA,Recovery and Insolvency Specialist Association, FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF. [2288041] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/25/2018 12:57 PM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 1021 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Cayman Finance, Recovery and Insolvency Specialist Association, FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF. [2288037] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/25/2018 12:55 PM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 1020 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Certain Good Faith Defendants , FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF. [2287919] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/25/2018 11:59 AM]
April 25, 2018 Filing 1019 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Certain Good Faith Defendants, FILED. Service date 04/25/2018 by CM/ECF. [2287639] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/25/2018 09:47 AM]
April 23, 2018 Filing 1018 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Picard v. Lanx BM Investments, Wolfson Cousins, LP, The Lanx Fund II, LP, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Edara Partnership, Picard v. Turtle Cay Partners, James Lowrey, Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Turtle Cay Partners, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Picard v. South Ferry, South Ferry Building Company, Emmanuel Gettinger, Abraham Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, Picard v. South Ferry #2, South Ferry #2 LP, Emmanuel Gettinger, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson, FILED. Service date 04/23/2018 by CM/ECF. [2286285] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/23/2018 05:52 PM]
April 23, 2018 Filing 1017 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee UKFP (Asia) Nominees Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in appeal no. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/23/2018 by CM/ECF.[2286249] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/23/2018 05:06 PM]
April 23, 2018 Filing 1015 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Thomas J Moloney for Appellee HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-2992, Attorney Thomas J Moloney for Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited and HSBC Holdings PLC in 17-3062, Attorney Thomas J Moloney for Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Attorney Thomas J Moloney for Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Attorney Thomas J Moloney for Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, FILED. Service date 04/23/2018 by CM/ECF. [2286110] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/23/2018 04:21 PM]
April 20, 2018 Filing 1014 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Andres Piedrahita, joins in and adopts the HSBC Defendants Brief (Docket No. 935) filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 04/20/2018 by CM/ECF.[2285081] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/20/2018 05:41 PM]
April 20, 2018 Filing 1013 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Tucker, informs the Court that they join in the filing of HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18,2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/20/2018 by CM/ECF.[2284329] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/20/2018 10:15 AM]
April 19, 2018 Filing 1012 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Orbita Capital Return Strategy Limited, informs the Court that they join in the filing of HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18,2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/19/2018 by CM/ECF.[2284004] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/19/2018 04:30 PM]
April 19, 2018 Filing 1011 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Audi S.A.M.-Audi Saradar Group, informs the Court that they join in the filing of HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18,2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/19/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283956] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/19/2018 04:19 PM]
April 19, 2018 Filing 1010 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banca Carige S.P.A., joins in and adopts No. 17-3071 the HSBC Defendants Brief (Docket No. 935) filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 04/19/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283369] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/19/2018 10:58 AM]
April 19, 2018 Filing 1009 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Falcon Private Bank Ltd., join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935), in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/19/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283306] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/19/2018 10:30 AM]
April 19, 2018 Filing 1008 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee KBC Investments Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935) in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 04/19/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283224] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/19/2018 09:39 AM]
April 19, 2018 Filing 1007 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 28 j LETTER, [968], on behalf of Appellee KBC Investments Limited, FILED.[2283135] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/19/2018 08:49 AM]
April 19, 2018 Filing 1006 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 28 j LETTER, [952], on behalf of Appellee Falcon Private Bank Ltd., FILED.[2283119] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/19/2018 08:28 AM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 1005 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Meritz Fire & Marine Insurance Co. LTD., joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief (Docket No. 935) filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283097] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 10:40 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 1004 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Union Arbitrage Strategy Fund, Union Securities Investment Trust Co., Ltd., Union USD Global Arbitrage A Fund and Union USD Global Arbitrage Fund, join in and adopt for purposes of Case No. 17-2995 the Joint Brief for Defendants-Appellees filed on April 18, 2018 by the HSBC Defendants in the lead appeal, Case No. 17-2992 [Dk. No. 935], RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283094] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 10:19 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 1003 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Korea Investment Trust Management Company, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Document 935 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283092] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 10:11 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 1002 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Odyssey, < RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283090] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 09:20 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 1001 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Tensyr Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935) in appeal no. 17-2992. RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283087] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 08:40 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 1000 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Walter Noel, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283080] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 08:24 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 999 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank and Credit Agricole S.A., joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935) , RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283079] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 08:12 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 998 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited, Citibank (Switzerland) AG and Citigroup Global Markets Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283075] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 07:56 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 997 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Alpine Trustees Limited, Ashby Holding Services Limited, Ashby Investment Services Limited, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, El Prela Trading Investments Limited, El Prela Trust, First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Port of Hercules Trustees Limited and The Ashby Trust, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935) RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283073] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 07:53 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 996 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA, BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, BNP Paribas Bank & Trust Cayman Limited, BGL BNP Paribas Luxembourg S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Services - Succusale De Luxembourg and BNP Paribas Securities Services S.A., joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283072] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 07:49 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 995 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd., joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935) RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283069] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 07:32 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 994 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Kingate Management Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283068] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 07:32 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 993 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Six Sis AG, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935) RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283065] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 07:28 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 992 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank and Natixis Financial Products LLC, join in the HSBC Defendants' Brief filed on April18, 2018 (Docket No. 935). RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283062] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 07:07 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 991 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Intesa Sanpaolo S.p.A., Eurizon Capital SGR S.p.A., Eurizon Low Volatility, Eurizon Low Volatility II, Eurizon Low Volatility PB, Eurizon Medium Volatility, Eurizon Medium Volatility II and Eurizon Total Return, join in the HSBC Defendants' Brief filed on April18, 2018 (Docket No. 935). RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283059] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 07:04 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 990 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Kookmin Bank, Korea Exchange Bank and National Bank of Kuwait SAK, join in the HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18, 2018 in 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283055] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:53 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 989 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Solon Capital, Ltd., Zephyros Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch Wealth Management, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch LATAM Investment Banking, Credit Suisse Wealth Management Limited, Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) SA, Credit Suisse International Limited, Credit Suisse (UK) Limited and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, join in the HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18, 2018 in 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283054] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:53 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 988 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Investment Fund Limited, join in the HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18, 2018 in 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283053] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:53 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 987 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Quilvest Finance LTD, join in the HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18, 2018 in 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283050] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:43 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 986 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD., < RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283047] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:39 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 985 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Federico M. Ceretti, FIM Advisers LLP, FIM Limited and Carlo Grosso, join in the HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18, 2018 in 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283046] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:39 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 984 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Amit Vijayvergiya, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Santiago Reyes, Cornelis Boele and Jacqueline Harary, join in the HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18, 2018 in 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283043] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:35 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 983 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Nomura International plc and Nomura International plc, join in the HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18, 2018 in 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283042] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:33 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 982 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee SNS Bank N.V. and SNS Global Custody B.V., join in the HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18, 2018 in 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283041] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:32 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 981 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Lighthouse Diversified Fund Limited, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC and Lighthouse Supercash Fund Limited in 17-2992, 17-3132, FILED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283040] [17-2992, 17-3132] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:31 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 980 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee LGT Bank (Liechtenstein) Ltd. and LGT Bank (Switzerland) LTD., join in the HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18, 2018 in 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283038] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:31 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 979 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Inter Investissements S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18, 2018 in 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283033] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:27 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 978 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Barreneche, Inc., Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc., Share Management LLC and Dove Hill Trust, join in the HSBC Defendants' brief filed on April 18, 2018 in 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283031] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:25 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 977 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Koch Industries, Inc., join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992 (Docket No. 935), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283027] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:21 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 976 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banco Itau Europa International and Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992 (Docket No. 935), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283026] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:20 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 975 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Barclays Bank S.A. and Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992 (Docket No. 935), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283024] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:19 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 974 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Vontobel AG and Vontobel Asset Management Inc., joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283022] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:17 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 973 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283020] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:16 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 972 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque SYZ SA, M&B Capital Advisers Sociedad De Valores, S.A., Trincastar Corporation, Unifortune Asset Management SGR SPA and Unifortune Conservative Fund, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283019] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:16 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 971 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Naidot & Co., joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283016] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:12 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 970 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283014] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:11 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 969 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited and Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935), in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283004] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:04 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 968 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 04/18/2018, on behalf of Appellee KBC Investments Limited, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2283000] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:01 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 967 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank Hapoalim (Switzerland) Ltd. and Bank Hapoalim B.M., < RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282998] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:00 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 966 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Banque Lombard Odier & Cie SA, Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A., Bordier & Cie, Lyxor Asset Management Inc., Lyxor Asset Management S.A., Lyxor Premium Fund, SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., SG Audace Alternatif, SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A., Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A. and Societe Generale, S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Appeal No. 17-2992(L), Docket No. 935), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282997] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:00 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 965 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee First Gulf Bank, < RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282996] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 06:00 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 964 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banque Internationale a Luxembourg (Suisse) S.A., Banque Internationale a Luxembourg S.A. and Dakota Global Investments, Ltd., join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935), in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal,RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282994] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:57 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 963 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd. and ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited, join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935), in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282990] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:54 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 962 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BSI AG, EFG BANK & TRUST (BAHAMAS) LIMITED, EFG BANK (MONACO) S.A.M. and EFG Bank S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935), in Case No. 17-2992, the lead appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF, email.[2282989] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:52 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 961 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Gregory Bowes, join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935 in 17-2992), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282985] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:46 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 960 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, UBS (Luxembourg) SA, UBS Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., UBS Deutschland AG and UBS Third Party Management Company S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935 in 17-2992), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282984] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:46 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 959 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Schroder & Co. Bank AG, join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935 in 17-2992), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282983] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:45 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 958 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Merrill Lynch Bank (Suisse) SA and Merrill Lynch International, join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935 in 17-2992), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282981] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:44 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 957 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Fund Services (Isle of Man) Nominees Limited, join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935 in 17-2992), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282980] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:44 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 956 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee CDP Capital Tactical Alternative Investments and Multi-Strategy Fund Limited, join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935 in 17-2992), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282974] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:37 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 955 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Robert Blum, join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935 in 17-2992) , RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282967] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:33 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 954 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Pierre Delandmeter, join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935 in 17-2992), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282966] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:33 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 953 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, Guernroy Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Channel Islands) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada Trust Company (Jersey) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Asia) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Suisse) S.A., RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Northern Trust Corporation, Barfield Nominees Limited, Access International Advisors Ltd., Access Management Luxembourg SA, Access Partners SA, Patrick Littaye, RBC Dexia Investor Services Bank S.A. and RBC Dexia Investor Services Espana S.A., join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935 in 17-2992), RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282964] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:30 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 952 FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 04/18/2018, on behalf of Appellee Falcon Private Bank Ltd., RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282962] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:29 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 951 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Delta National Bank and Trust Company, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282959] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:24 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 950 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bureau of Labor Insurance, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282957] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:23 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 949 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co., Ltd., joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282955] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:22 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 948 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banco General, S.A. and BG Valores, S.A., joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282954] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:22 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 947 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Bank N.V., we write to inform the Court that RBS/ABN joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992 RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282953] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:20 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 946 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282952] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:20 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 945 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Fullerton Capital PTE Ltd., joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282951] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:18 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 944 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Grosvenor Private Reserve Fund Limited, Grosvenor Investment Management Ltd., Grosvenor Balanced Growth Fund Limited and Grosvenor Aggressive Growth Fund Limited, join in and adopt in full for purposes of Case No. 17-2999 the Brief of Defendants-Appellees, filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282945] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:15 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 943 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Abu Dhabi Investment Authority, write to inform the Court that ADIA joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282946] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:15 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 942 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Caceis Bank and Caceis Bank, Luxembourg Branch, write to inform the Court that Caceis Bank and Caceis Bank, Luxembourg Branch join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 (Docket No. 935), in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282944] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:15 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 941 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282941] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:12 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 940 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Atlantic Security Bank, write to inform the Court that Atlantic Security Bank joins in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282936] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:09 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 939 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee PF Trustees Limited, SafeHand Investments and Strongback Holdings Corporation, write to inform the Court that these Defendants-Appellees join in and adopt for purposes of Case No. 17-3070 the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282935] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:08 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 938 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee OFI MGA Alpha Palmares, Oval Palmares Europlus and UMR Select Alternatif, join in the HSBC Defendants Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282929] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 05:05 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 937 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Parson Finance Panama S.A., joins in and adopts for purposes of Case No. 17-3005 the Brief of Defendants-Appellees filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992 RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282916] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 04:59 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 936 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Arden Asset Management Inc., Arden Asset Management LLC and Arden Endowment Advisers, Ltd., write to inform the Court that the Arden Defendants-Appellees join in the HSBC Defendants Brief that will be filed on todays date, April 18, 2018, in Case No. 17-2992, RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282901] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 04:51 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 935 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-2992, Appellee HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited and HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA in 17-3062, Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, FILED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF. [2282897] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/18/2018 04:50 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 933 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Public Institution for Social Security, < RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282791] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 04:13 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 932 MOTION ORDER, referring motion for judicial notice [ # 923 ] filed by Appellee FIM Advisers LLP, Carlo Grosso, FIM Limited and Federico M. Ceretti in 17-2992, is Referred to the panel that will determine the merits of this appeal, FILED. [2282787][932] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/18/2018 04:12 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 930 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Lion Global Investors Limited, to inform you that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 28(i), the Defendant-Appellee joins in and adopts in full for purposes of Case No. 17-3106 the Brief of Defendants-Appellees, filed April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992 RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282742] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 03:57 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 929 ATTORNEY, Jill Serpa for Alpine Trustees Limited El Prela Trust First Peninsula Trustees Limited El Prela Group Holding Services Limited El Prela Trading Investments Limited Port of Hercules Trustees Limited The Ashby Trust Ashby Holding Services Limited Ashby Investment Services Limited, in case 17-3077 Jill Serpa for Alpine Trustees Limited El Prela Trust First Peninsula Trustees Limited El Prela Group Holding Services Limited El Prela Trading Investments Limited Port of Hercules Trustees Limited The Ashby Trust Ashby Holding Services Limited Ashby Investment Services Limited, in case 17-2992 , [ # 924 ], ADDED.[2282709] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/18/2018 03:45 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 927 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Barclays Bank S.A. and Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited, FILED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282447] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 01:12 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 926 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee ZCM Asset Holding Company (Bermuda) LLC, I write to inform the Court that ZCM Asset Holding Company (Bermuda) LLC joins in and adopts for purposes of Case No.17-3075 the HSBC Defendants' Brief filed on April 18, 2018 in Case No. 17-2992 RECEIVED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF.[2282395] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/18/2018 12:39 PM]
April 18, 2018 Filing 925 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company, Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited and HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-2992, Appellee HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA and HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3062, Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, FILED. Service date 04/18/2018 by CM/ECF. [2282320] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/18/2018 12:01 PM]
April 17, 2018 Filing 924 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee First Peninsula Trustees Limited, The Ashby Trust, Ashby Investment Services Limited, Alpine Trustees Limited, Port of Hercules Trustees Limited, El Prela Trust, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, Ashby Holding Services Limited and El Prela Trading Investments Limited, FILED. Service date 04/17/2018 by CM/ECF. [2281795] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/17/2018 08:42 PM]
April 17, 2018 Filing 923 MOTION, for judicial notice, on behalf of Appellee Federico M. Ceretti, FIM Advisers LLP, FIM Limited and Carlo Grosso in 17-2992, 17-3077, FILED. Service date 04/17/2018 by CM/ECF. [2281792] [17-2992, 17-3077] [Entered: 04/17/2018 08:33 PM]
April 17, 2018 Filing 922 FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellee First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Port of Hercules Trustees Limited, Ashby Holding Services Limited, Ashby Investment Services Limited, El Prela Trading Investments Limited, Alpine Trustees Limited, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, The Ashby Trust and El Prela Trust, FILED. Service date 04/17/2018 by CM/ECF.[2281790] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/17/2018 08:25 PM]
April 17, 2018 Filing 921 FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellee Kingate Management Limited, FILED. Service date 04/17/2018 by CM/ECF.[2281783] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/17/2018 06:29 PM]
April 17, 2018 Filing 920 FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellee Federico M. Ceretti, FIM Advisers LLP, FIM Limited and Carlo Grosso, FILED. Service date 04/17/2018 by CM/ECF.[2281775] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/17/2018 06:05 PM]
April 17, 2018 Filing 919 ATTORNEY, Jill Serpa for Tensyr Limited, in case 17-3009 , [ # 918 ], ADDED.[2281533] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 04/17/2018 04:04 PM]
April 17, 2018 Filing 918 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Tensyr Limited, FILED. Service date 04/17/2018 by CM/ECF. [2281199] [17-2992] [Entered: 04/17/2018 01:52 PM]
April 6, 2018 Filing 917 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file reply briefs [ # 912 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard and Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 17-2992; granting motion to file oversized reply brief [ # 912 ] filed by Appellant Irving H. Picard and Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation in 17-2992, by SLC, Circuit Judge, FILED. [2273666][917] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862]--[Edited 05/10/2018 by EM] [Entered: 04/06/2018 12:46 PM]
March 29, 2018 Filing 912 MOTION, to file oversized brief, to extend time, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/29/2018 by CM/ECF. [2267585] [17-2992] [Entered: 03/29/2018 12:39 PM]
March 29, 2018 Filing 911 MOTION, to file oversized brief, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3014, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3024, 17-3032, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3057, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3066, 17-3071, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3086, 17-3101, 17-3106, 17-3117, 17-3144, FILED. Service date 03/29/2018 by CM/ECF. [2267565] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 03/29/2018 12:32 PM]
March 28, 2018 Filing 910 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time until April 18, 2018 to file briefs[ # 901 ] filed by Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA and HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., Appellee SICO Limited, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, by RKW, Circuit Judge, FILED. [2266614][910] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 03/28/2018 12:49 PM]
March 27, 2018 Filing 905 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file oversized brief [ # 901 ] filed by Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, Appellee HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA and HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., Appellee SICO Limited, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, by RSP, Circuit Judge, FILED. [2265280][905] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 03/27/2018 10:07 AM]
March 22, 2018 Filing 901 MOTION, to file oversized brief, to extend time, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-2992, Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. and HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3062, Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, FILED. Service date 03/22/2018 by CM/ECF. [2262341] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 03/22/2018 12:00 PM]
March 14, 2018 Filing 900 CURED DEFECTIVE : LETTER, [ # 820 ], on behalf of Appellee Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd., FILED.[2256366] [17-3019] [Entered: 03/14/2018 10:20 AM]
March 6, 2018 Filing 899 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Korea Investment Trust Management Company in 17-2992, 17-3043 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2250362] [17-2992, 17-3043] [Entered: 03/06/2018 12:38 PM]
March 5, 2018 Filing 897 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Korea Investment Trust Management Company in 17-2992, 17-3043, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 03/05/2018 by CM/ECF.[2249225] [17-2992, 17-3043] [Entered: 03/05/2018 11:54 AM]
March 2, 2018 Filing 895 ATTORNEY, James N. Lawlor, [ # 894 ], in place of attorney John D. Giampolo, SUBSTITUTED.[2247740] [17-2992, 17-3043] [Entered: 03/02/2018 08:36 AM]
March 1, 2018 Filing 894 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Korea Investment Trust Management Company in 17-2992, 17-3043, FILED. Service date 03/01/2018 by CM/ECF. [2247705] [17-2992, 17-3043] [Entered: 03/01/2018 09:16 PM]
March 1, 2018 Filing 893 HERMES INTERNATIONAL FUND LIMITED, TERMINATED.[2247436] [17-2992, 17-3062] [Entered: 03/01/2018 03:25 PM]
February 28, 2018 Filing 892 LAGOON INVESTMENT LIMITED, APPELLEE, TERMINATED.[2246471] [17-2992, 17-3062] [Entered: 02/28/2018 03:43 PM]
February 28, 2018 Filing 891 THEMA FUND LTD., APPELLEE, TERMINATED.[2246203] [17-2992, 17-3062] [Entered: 02/28/2018 01:44 PM]
February 28, 2018 Filing 890 LAGOON INVESTMENT TRUST, APPELLEE, TERMINATED.[2246197] [17-2992, 17-3062] [Entered: 02/28/2018 01:41 PM]
February 28, 2018 Filing 889 SO-ORDERED NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, to dismiss appellees Thema International Fund plc, Lagoon Investment Trust, Thema Fund Ltd., Thema Wise Investments Limited, Lagoon Investment Limied, and Hermes International Fund Limited, FILED.[2246187] [17-2992, 17-3062] [Entered: 02/28/2018 01:35 PM]
February 27, 2018 Filing 887 CURED DEFECTIVE : NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, [ # 2243608-2 ], [ # 885 ], on behalf of Appellee Hermes International Fund Limited, Lagoon Investment Limited, Lagoon Investment Trust and Thema Fund Limited in 17-2992, 17-3062, FILED.[2244865] [17-2992, 17-3062] [Entered: 02/27/2018 12:15 PM]
February 27, 2018 Filing 885 NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, re: (dismissing parties Thema International Fund plc, Lagoon Investment Trust, Thema Fund Ltd., Thema Wise Investments, Limited, Lagoon Investment Limited, and Hermes International Fund Limited) RECEIVED. Service date 02/27/2018 by CM/ECF.[2244736] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/27/2018 11:21 AM]
February 27, 2018 Filing 884 ATTORNEY, Diarra M. Guthrie for HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA HSBC Bank PLC HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited HSBC Holdings PLC SICO Limited Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, in case 17-2992 , [ # 881 ], ADDED.[2244663] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/27/2018 10:43 AM]
February 26, 2018 Filing 882 NEW PARTY, Appellee Natixis Financial Products LLC in 17-2992 and Appellee Natixis Financial Products LLC in 17-3009, ADDED.[2243459] [17-2992, 17-3009] [Entered: 02/26/2018 09:57 AM]
February 26, 2018 Filing 881 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company, Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited and HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited in 17-2992, Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited and HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited in 17-3062, Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, FILED. Service date 02/26/2018 by CM/ECF. [2243367] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 02/26/2018 09:26 AM]
February 26, 2018 Filing 880 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 42 STIPULATION, [ # 2242383-2 ], on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard and Appellee Hermes International Fund Limited, Lagoon Investment Limited, Lagoon Investment Trust and Thema Fund Limited in 17-3062, Appellee Hermes International Fund Limited, Lagoon Investment Limited, Lagoon Investment Trust and Thema Fund Limited in 17-2992, FILED.[2243289] [17-3062, 17-2992] [Entered: 02/26/2018 08:03 AM]
February 26, 2018 Filing 879 ATTORNEY, Andrew Finn for Standard Chartered International (USA) Ltd. Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A. Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, in case 17-3083 Andrew Finn for Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A. Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, in case 17-2992 , [ # 878 ], ADDED.[2243285] [17-3083, 17-2992] [Entered: 02/26/2018 07:44 AM]
February 23, 2018 Filing 878 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A. and Standard Chartered International (USA) Ltd. in 17-3083, Appellee Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited and Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A. in 17-2992, FILED. Service date 02/23/2018 by CM/ECF. [2243195] [17-3083, 17-2992] [Entered: 02/23/2018 05:14 PM]
February 23, 2018 Filing 876 ATTORNEY, Bruce M. Ginsberg, for Tensyr Limited, TERMINATED.[2242500] [17-2992, 17-3009] [Entered: 02/23/2018 12:03 PM]
February 23, 2018 Filing 874 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Amit Vijayvergiya Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2242378] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/23/2018 11:19 AM]
February 23, 2018 Filing 873 FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 02/23/2018 by CM/ECF.[2242376] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/23/2018 11:18 AM]
February 23, 2018 Filing 871 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Andres Piedrahita in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2242354] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 02/23/2018 11:11 AM]
February 23, 2018 Filing 869 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Walter Noel in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2242333] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 02/23/2018 11:00 AM]
February 23, 2018 Filing 867 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Robert Blum in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2242299] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 02/23/2018 10:50 AM]
February 23, 2018 Filing 865 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2242253] [17-2992, 17-3019] [Entered: 02/23/2018 10:33 AM]
February 23, 2018 Filing 863 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Jeffrey Tucker in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2242214] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 02/23/2018 10:25 AM]
February 22, 2018 Filing 861 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Kookmin Bank, Korea Exchange Bank and National Bank of Kuwait SAK in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2241278] [17-2992, 17-3008, 17-3018, 17-3043] [Entered: 02/22/2018 12:25 PM]
February 22, 2018 Filing 859 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Bank Audi S.A.M.-Audi Saradar Group Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2241250] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/22/2018 12:13 PM]
February 22, 2018 Filing 857 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Orbita Capital Return Strategy Limited Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2241203] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/22/2018 12:01 PM]
February 22, 2018 Filing 855 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee LGT Bank (Liechtenstein) Ltd. and LGT Bank (Switzerland) LTD. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2241150] [17-2992, 17-3100, 17-3126] [Entered: 02/22/2018 11:40 AM]
February 22, 2018 Filing 853 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Richard Landsberger, Daniel Lipton, Gordon McKenzie and Mark Mckeefry in 17-2992, Appellee Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Harold Greisman, Jacqueline Harary, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Santiago Reyes, Andrew Smith and Philip Toub in 17-3066 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2241116] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 02/22/2018 11:29 AM]
February 22, 2018 Filing 851 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Barreneche, Inc., Dove Hill Trust, Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc. and Share Management LLC in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2241077] [17-2992, 17-3113] [Entered: 02/22/2018 11:14 AM]
February 22, 2018 Filing 849 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Schroder & Co. Bank AG in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2241018] [17-2992, 17-3023] [Entered: 02/22/2018 10:54 AM]
February 22, 2018 Filing 847 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee SNS Bank N.V. and SNS Global Custody B.V. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2240937] [17-2992, 17-3014] [Entered: 02/22/2018 10:12 AM]
February 22, 2018 Filing 845 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee First Gulf Bank in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2240914] [17-2992, 17-3004] [Entered: 02/22/2018 10:03 AM]
February 22, 2018 Filing 843 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., ABN AMRO Fund Services (Isle of Man) Nominees Limited and ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2240893] [17-2992, 17-3065, 17-3117] [Entered: 02/22/2018 09:55 AM]
February 21, 2018 Filing 841 CURED DEFECTIVE : LETTER, [ # 820 ], on behalf of Appellee Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd., FILED.[2240049] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/21/2018 10:41 AM]
February 20, 2018 Filing 840 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Alpine Trustees Limited, Ashby Holding Services Limited, Ashby Investment Services Limited, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, El Prela Trading Investments Limited, El Prela Trust, First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Port of Hercules Trustees Limited and The Ashby Trust in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2239173] [17-2992, 17-3077] [Entered: 02/20/2018 01:50 PM]
February 20, 2018 Filing 838 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) SA, Credit Suisse (UK) Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch LATAM Investment Banking, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch Wealth Management, Credit Suisse International Limited, Credit Suisse London Nominees Limited, Credit Suisse Nominees (Guernsey) Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Wealth Management Limited, Solon Capital, Ltd. and Zephyros Limited in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2239154] [17-2992, 17-3029, 17-3039, 17-3080, 17-3091] [Entered: 02/20/2018 01:33 PM]
February 20, 2018 Filing 836 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Thema Fund Limited Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2239132] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/20/2018 01:14 PM]
February 20, 2018 Filing 834 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Eurizon Capital SGR S.p.A., Eurizon Low Volatility, Eurizon Low Volatility II, Eurizon Low Volatility PB, Eurizon Medium Volatility, Eurizon Medium Volatility II, Eurizon Total Return and Intesa Sanpaolo S.p.A. Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2239121] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/20/2018 01:06 PM]
February 20, 2018 Filing 832 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee BSI AG, EFG BANK & TRUST (BAHAMAS) LIMITED, EFG BANK (MONACO) S.A.M. and EFG Bank S.A. Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2239092] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/20/2018 12:51 PM]
February 20, 2018 Filing 830 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Banque Lombard Odier & Cie SA, Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A., Lyxor Asset Management Inc., Lyxor Asset Management S.A., Lyxor Premium Fund, SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., SG Audace Alternatif, SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A., Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A. and Societe Generale, S.A. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2239082] [17-2992, 17-2996, 17-3047, 17-3086, 17-3112] [Entered: 02/20/2018 12:42 PM]
February 20, 2018 Filing 828 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Tensyr Limited in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2239048] [17-2992, 17-3009] [Entered: 02/20/2018 12:25 PM]
February 20, 2018 Filing 826 ATTORNEY, Andreas A. Frischknecht for Six Sis AG, in case 17-2992 Andreas A. Frischknecht for Six Sis AG, in case 17-3020 , [ # 87 ], ADDED.[2239002] [17-2992, 17-3020] [Entered: 02/20/2018 11:48 AM]
February 15, 2018 Filing 825 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Amit Vijayvergiya, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 02/15/2018 by CM/ECF.[2236934] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/15/2018 12:14 PM]
February 15, 2018 Filing 824 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Natixis, Bloom Asset Holdings Fund and Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank, requests to be terminated as counsel for party Tensyr Limited, add party Natixis Financial Products LLC to docket, correct typographical error for party Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank, RECEIVED. Service date 02/15/2018 by CM/ECF.[2236923] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/15/2018 12:09 PM]
February 14, 2018 Filing 823 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Andres Piedrahita in 17-2992, 17-3066, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 02/14/2018 by CM/ECF.[2236458] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 02/14/2018 09:53 PM]
February 14, 2018 Filing 822 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Walter Noel in 17-2992, 17-3066, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 02/14/2018 by CM/ECF.[2236210] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 02/14/2018 03:47 PM]
February 14, 2018 Filing 821 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Robert Blum, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 02/14/2018 by CM/ECF.[2236196] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/14/2018 03:37 PM]
February 14, 2018 Filing 820 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd. in 17-2992, 17-3019, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 02/14/2018 by CM/ECF.[2236089] [17-2992, 17-3019] [Entered: 02/14/2018 02:48 PM]
February 14, 2018 Filing 819 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Tucker, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 02/14/2018 by CM/ECF.[2236075] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/14/2018 02:45 PM]
February 14, 2018 Filing 810 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Lighthouse Diversified Fund Limited, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC and Lighthouse Supercash Fund Limited in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2235393] [17-2992, 17-3083] [Entered: 02/14/2018 09:11 AM]
February 14, 2018 Filing 808 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited and Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2235368] [17-2992, 17-3083] [Entered: 02/14/2018 09:00 AM]
February 14, 2018 Filing 806 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee ZCM Asset Holding Company (Bermuda) LLC in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2235355] [17-2992, 17-3075] [Entered: 02/14/2018 08:52 AM]
February 14, 2018 Filing 804 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 scheduling notification, [651], on behalf of Appellee Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd. in 17-2992, 17-3019, FILED.[2235342] [17-2992, 17-3019] [Entered: 02/14/2018 08:40 AM]
February 14, 2018 Filing 803 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Lion Global Investors Limited in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2235332] [17-2992, 17-3106] [Entered: 02/14/2018 08:25 AM]
February 14, 2018 Filing 801 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Kingate Management Limited and Six Sis AG Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2235327] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/14/2018 08:17 AM]
February 13, 2018 Filing 799 ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Vicens for Credit Agricole S.A. Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A., in case 17-2992 , [ # 772 ], ADDED.[2234662] [17-2992, 17-3026, 17-3042] [Entered: 02/13/2018 12:02 PM]
February 13, 2018 Filing 798 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited, Citibank (Switzerland) AG and Citigroup Global Markets Limited in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2234429] [17-2992, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3139] [Entered: 02/13/2018 10:33 AM]
February 13, 2018 Filing 795 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee UBS (Luxembourg) SA, UBS AG, UBS Deutschland AG, UBS Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., UBS Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. and UBS Third Party Management Company S.A. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2234385] [17-2992, 17-3057, 17-3100, 17-3141] [Entered: 02/13/2018 10:14 AM]
February 13, 2018 Filing 793 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Grosvenor Aggressive Growth Fund Limited, Grosvenor Balanced Growth Fund Limited, Grosvenor Investment Management Ltd. and Grosvenor Private Reserve Fund Limited in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2234322] [17-2992, 17-2999] [Entered: 02/13/2018 09:52 AM]
February 13, 2018 Filing 791 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank and Credit Agricole S.A. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2234263] [17-2992, 17-3026, 17-3042] [Entered: 02/13/2018 09:37 AM]
February 13, 2018 Filing 789 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch and Naidot & Co. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2234217] [17-2992, 17-3087, 17-3122, 17-3136] [Entered: 02/13/2018 09:27 AM]
February 13, 2018 Filing 787 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Koch Industries, Inc. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2234186] [17-2992, 17-3016] [Entered: 02/13/2018 09:17 AM]
February 13, 2018 Filing 784 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Gregory Bowes in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2234153] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 02/13/2018 09:08 AM]
February 13, 2018 Filing 782 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Odyssey Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2234129] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/13/2018 08:54 AM]
February 13, 2018 Filing 780 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Nomura International plc, Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2234112] [17-2992, 17-3044, 17-3129] [Entered: 02/13/2018 08:46 AM]
February 13, 2018 Filing 778 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Banque Internationale a Luxembourg (Suisse) S.A., Banque Internationale a Luxembourg S.A. and Dakota Global Investments, Ltd. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2234105] [17-2992, 17-3058] [Entered: 02/13/2018 08:35 AM]
February 13, 2018 Filing 776 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Banco Itau Europa International and Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2234093] [17-2992, 17-3054] [Entered: 02/13/2018 08:20 AM]
February 9, 2018 Filing 773 CURED DEFECTIVE : BRIEF, [ # 758 ], on behalf of Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, FILED.[2233367] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/09/2018 01:10 PM]
February 7, 2018 Filing 772 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A., Credit Agricole S.A. and Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank in 17-2992, Appellee Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A. and Credit Agricole S.A. in 17-3026, Appellee Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank in 17-3042, FILED. Service date 02/07/2018 by CM/ECF. [2231489] [17-2992, 17-3026, 17-3042] [Entered: 02/07/2018 04:03 PM]
February 7, 2018 Filing 771 LETTER, on behalf of Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, authorizing the Court to shred the original hard copies of brief submitted, RECEIVED. Service date 02/07/2018 by CM/ECF.[2231165] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/07/2018 12:42 PM]
February 7, 2018 Filing 769 ATTORNEY, Richard F. Schwed for Inteligo Bank Ltd. Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., TERMINATED.[2230858] [17-2992, 17-3122, 17-3136] [Entered: 02/07/2018 09:55 AM]
February 7, 2018 Filing 767 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Bank Hapoalim (Switzerland) Ltd. and Bank Hapoalim B.M. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2230715] [17-2992, 17-3072] [Entered: 02/07/2018 08:32 AM]
February 7, 2018 Filing 765 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Meritz Fire & Marine Insurance Co. LTD. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2230703] [17-2992, 17-3071] [Entered: 02/07/2018 08:18 AM]
February 7, 2018 Filing 763 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Quilvest Finance LTD in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2230696] [17-2992, 17-3032] [Entered: 02/07/2018 07:58 AM]
February 7, 2018 Filing 761 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Platinum All Weather Fund Limited in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2230688] [17-2992, 17-3065] [Entered: 02/07/2018 07:44 AM]
February 6, 2018 Filing 758 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, FILED. Service date 02/06/2018 by CM/ECF. [2230475] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/06/2018 03:54 PM]
February 6, 2018 Filing 757 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A. and Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch, advising the Court that Richard Schwed will no longer represent above parties, RECEIVED. Service date 02/06/2018 by CM/ECF.[2230223] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/06/2018 01:30 PM]
February 6, 2018 Filing 756 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, brief, [588], on behalf of Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, FILED.[2230141] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/06/2018 12:30 PM]
February 6, 2018 Filing 755 NEW PARTY, Movant National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, ADDED.[2230138] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/06/2018 12:28 PM]
February 5, 2018 Filing 752 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee BGL BNP Paribas Luxembourg S.A., BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA, BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, BNP Paribas Bank & Trust Cayman Limited, BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Services - Succusale De Luxembourg and BNP Paribas Securities Services S.A. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2229187] [17-2992, 17-3069, 17-3088] [Entered: 02/05/2018 01:45 PM]
February 5, 2018 Filing 751 REPLY TO OPPOSITION [ # 701 ], on behalf of Movant Kenneth Krys in 17-2992, FILED. Service date 02/05/2018 by CM/ECF.[2229176][751] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 02/05/2018 01:36 PM]
February 5, 2018 Filing 749 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Union Arbitrage Strategy Fund, Union Securities Investment Trust Co., Ltd., Union USD Global Arbitrage A Fund and Union USD Global Arbitrage Fund in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2229149] [17-2992, 17-2995] [Entered: 02/05/2018 01:05 PM]
February 5, 2018 Filing 747 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Atlantic Security Bank in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2229095] [17-2992, 17-3034] [Entered: 02/05/2018 12:37 PM]
February 2, 2018 Filing 745 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2228667] [17-3009, 17-2992] [Entered: 02/05/2018 08:28 AM]
February 1, 2018 Filing 743 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tynetta Wilder, ASSIGNED.[2227337] [17-3862, 17-2992] [Entered: 02/01/2018 03:21 PM]
February 1, 2018 Filing 741 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Public Institution for Social Security in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2226888] [17-2992, 17-3109] [Entered: 02/01/2018 10:53 AM]
February 1, 2018 Filing 739 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Abu Dhabi Investment Authority in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2226878] [17-2992, 17-3059] [Entered: 02/01/2018 10:44 AM]
February 1, 2018 Filing 737 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Bureau of Labor Insurance in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2226860] [17-2992, 17-3024] [Entered: 02/01/2018 10:35 AM]
February 1, 2018 Filing 735 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Arden Asset Management Inc., Arden Asset Management LLC and Arden Endowment Advisers, Ltd. Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2226844] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/01/2018 10:25 AM]
February 1, 2018 Filing 731 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Fairfield Investment Fund Limited in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2226824] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 02/01/2018 10:13 AM]
February 1, 2018 Filing 729 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis and Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2226794] [17-2992, 17-3009] [Entered: 02/01/2018 10:01 AM]
February 1, 2018 Filing 727 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Delta National Bank and Trust Company Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2226784] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/01/2018 09:52 AM]
February 1, 2018 Filing 725 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Fullerton Capital PTE Ltd. Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2226774] [17-2992] [Entered: 02/01/2018 09:45 AM]
February 1, 2018 Filing 723 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Banca Carige S.P.A. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2226768] [17-2992, 17-3101] [Entered: 02/01/2018 09:38 AM]
February 1, 2018 Filing 721 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Merrill Lynch Bank (Suisse) SA and Merrill Lynch International in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2226751] [17-2992, 17-3040, 17-3134] [Entered: 02/01/2018 09:26 AM]
January 30, 2018 Filing 713 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Bank Vontobel AG and Vontobel Asset Management Inc. Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2224898] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/30/2018 01:20 PM]
January 30, 2018 Filing 712 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee UKFP (Asia) Nominees Limited in 17-2992, 17-3073 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2224882] [17-2992, 17-3073] [Entered: 01/30/2018 01:10 PM]
January 30, 2018 Filing 711 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Falcon Private Bank Ltd. in 17-2992, 17-3067 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2224873] [17-2992, 17-3067] [Entered: 01/30/2018 01:02 PM]
January 30, 2018 Filing 710 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee CDP Capital Tactical Alternative Investments and Multi-Strategy Fund Limited in 17-2992, 17-3074 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2224856] [17-2992, 17-3074] [Entered: 01/30/2018 12:54 PM]
January 30, 2018 Filing 709 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee PF Trustees Limited, SafeHand Investments and Strongback Holdings Corporation in 17-2992, 17-3070 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2224822] [17-2992, 17-3070] [Entered: 01/30/2018 12:36 PM]
January 30, 2018 Filing 708 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co., Ltd. Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2224791] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/30/2018 12:24 PM]
January 30, 2018 Filing 707 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Caceis Bank and Caceis Bank, Luxembourg Branch in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2224758] [17-2992, 17-3025] [Entered: 01/30/2018 12:15 PM]
January 30, 2018 Filing 706 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee BG Valores, S.A. and Banco General, S.A. Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2224730] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/30/2018 12:06 PM]
January 30, 2018 Filing 705 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD. in 17-2992, 17-3010 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2224667] [17-2992, 17-3010] [Entered: 01/30/2018 11:45 AM]
January 30, 2018 Filing 704 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee OFI MGA Alpha Palmares, Oval Palmares Europlus and UMR Select Alternatif in 17-2992, 17-3047 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2224617] [17-2992, 17-3047] [Entered: 01/30/2018 11:30 AM]
January 29, 2018 Filing 701 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to file amicus curiae brief [ # 591 ], on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-2992, Appellee HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited and HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA in 17-3062, Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, FILED. Service date 01/29/2018 by CM/ECF. [2224220] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/29/2018 08:09 PM]
January 26, 2018 Filing 700 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Banque SYZ SA, M&B Capital Advisers Sociedad De Valores, S.A., Trincastar Corporation, Unifortune Asset Management SGR SPA and Unifortune Conservative Fund in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2222709] [17-2992, 17-3007, 17-3021, 17-3078, 17-3141] [Entered: 01/26/2018 01:25 PM]
January 26, 2018 Filing 698 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Inter Investissements S.A. in 17-2992, 17-3143 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2222688] [17-2992, 17-3143] [Entered: 01/26/2018 01:12 PM]
January 26, 2018 Filing 696 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee KBC Investments Limited in 17-2992, 17-3140 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2222531] [17-2992, 17-3140] [Entered: 01/26/2018 11:49 AM]
January 26, 2018 Filing 694 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Federico M. Ceretti, FIM Advisers LLP, FIM Limited and Carlo Grosso in 17-2992, 17-3077 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2222490] [17-2992, 17-3077] [Entered: 01/26/2018 11:39 AM]
January 26, 2018 Filing 692 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Barclays Bank S.A. and Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited in 17-2992, 17-3011 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2222421] [17-2992, 17-3011] [Entered: 01/26/2018 11:14 AM]
January 26, 2018 Filing 690 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Parson Finance Panama S.A. in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2222397] [17-2992, 17-3005] [Entered: 01/26/2018 11:00 AM]
January 26, 2018 Filing 688 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee ABN AMRO Bank N.V. in 17-2992, 17-3862 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2222353] [17-2992, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/26/2018 10:45 AM]
January 26, 2018 Filing 686 ATTORNEY, Peter E. Kazanoff for Amit Vijayvergiya, in case 17-2992 , [ # 685 ], ADDED.[2222239] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/26/2018 09:51 AM]
January 26, 2018 Filing 685 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Amit Vijayvergiya in 17-2992, 17-3066, FILED. Service date 01/26/2018 by CM/ECF. [2222191] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 01/26/2018 09:29 AM]
January 25, 2018 Filing 684 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Access International Advisors Ltd., Access Management Luxembourg SA, Access Partners SA, Barfield Nominees Limited, Guernroy Limited, Patrick Littaye, Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Northern Trust Corporation, RBC Dexia Investor Services Bank S.A., RBC Dexia Investor Services Espana S.A., RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Canada (Asia) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Channel Islands) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Suisse) S.A. and Royal Bank of Canada Trust Company (Jersey) Limited in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2221636] [17-2992, 17-3013, 17-3033, 17-3041, 17-3057, 17-3058] [Entered: 01/25/2018 02:05 PM]
January 25, 2018 Filing 682 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited in 17-2992, 17-3062 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2221594] [17-2992, 17-3062] [Entered: 01/25/2018 01:30 PM]
January 25, 2018 Filing 680 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Pierre Delandmeter in 17-2992, 17-3057 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2221579] [17-2992, 17-3057] [Entered: 01/25/2018 01:15 PM]
January 25, 2018 Filing 677 ATTORNEY, David B. Rivkin, Andrew M. Grossman, for Irving H. Picard, TERMINATED.[2221140] [17-3057, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/25/2018 09:19 AM]
January 25, 2018 Filing 674 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2221047] [17-2992, 17-3136] [Entered: 01/25/2018 08:33 AM]
January 25, 2018 Filing 673 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2221041] [17-2992, 17-3069] [Entered: 01/25/2018 08:29 AM]
January 25, 2018 Filing 672 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2221038] [17-2992, 17-3057] [Entered: 01/25/2018 08:25 AM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 671 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Kookmin Bank, Korea Exchange Bank and National Bank of Kuwait SAK in 17-2992, Appellee National Bank of Kuwait SAK in 17-3008, Appellee Kookmin Bank in 17-3018, Appellee Korea Exchange Bank in 17-3043, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2221015] [17-2992, 17-3008, 17-3018, 17-3043] [Entered: 01/24/2018 11:00 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 670 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Bank Audi S.A.M.-Audi Saradar Group, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2221011] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 10:16 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 669 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Orbita Capital Return Strategy Limited, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2221010] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 10:12 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 668 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee LGT Bank (Liechtenstein) Ltd. and LGT Bank (Switzerland) LTD. in 17-2992, Appellee LGT Bank (Switzerland) LTD. in 17-3100, Appellee LGT Bank (Liechtenstein) Ltd. in 17-3126, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2221007] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/24/2018 08:34 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 667 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Fairfield Greenwich (Bermuda) Limited, Fairfield Greenwich Advisors LLC, Fairfield International Managers, Inc., Mark Mckeefry, Daniel Lipton, Gordon McKenzie, Richard Landsberger, Philip Toub, Andrew Smith, Harold Greisman, Corina Noel Piedrahita, Lourdes Barreneche, Cornelis Boele, Jacqueline Harary and Santiago Reyes, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2221006] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 08:34 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 666 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Barreneche, Inc., Fairfield Greenwich Capital Partners, Dove Hill Trust, Fortuna Asset Management Inc., Selecta Financial Corporation Inc. and Share Management LLC, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2221005] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 08:26 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 665 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Schroder & Co. Bank AG in 17-2992, 17-3023, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2221004] [17-2992, 17-3023] [Entered: 01/24/2018 08:12 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 664 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee SNS Bank N.V. and SNS Global Custody B.V., informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2221002] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 07:29 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 663 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee First Gulf Bank in 17-2992, 17-3004, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2221001] [17-2992, 17-3004] [Entered: 01/24/2018 07:26 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 662 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., ABN AMRO Fund Services (Isle of Man) Nominees Limited and ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited in 17-2992, Appellee ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd. and ABN AMRO Retained Custodial Services (Ireland) Limited in 17-3117, Appellee ABN AMRO Fund Services (Isle of Man) Nominees Limited in 17-3065, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2221000] [17-2992, 17-3117, 17-3065] [Entered: 01/24/2018 07:23 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 661 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Alpine Trustees Limited, Ashby Holding Services Limited, Ashby Investment Services Limited, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, El Prela Trading Investments Limited, El Prela Trust, First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Port of Hercules Trustees Limited and The Ashby Trust in 17-2992, 17-3077, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220999] [17-2992, 17-3077] [Entered: 01/24/2018 07:18 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 660 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) SA, Credit Suisse (UK) Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch LATAM Investment Banking, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch Wealth Management, Credit Suisse International Limited, Credit Suisse London Nominees Limited, Credit Suisse Nominees (Guernsey) Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Credit Suisse Wealth Management Limited, Solon Capital, Ltd. and Zephyros Limited in 17-2992, Appellee Solon Capital, Ltd. in 17-3029, Appellee Zephyros Limited in 17-3039, Appellee Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) SA, Credit Suisse (UK) Limited, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch LATAM Investment Banking, Credit Suisse AG, Nassau Branch Wealth Management, Credit Suisse International Limited, Credit Suisse London Nominees Limited, Credit Suisse Nominees (Guernsey) Limited, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC and Credit Suisse Wealth Management Limited in 17-3080, Appellee Credit Suisse AG in 17-3091, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220998] [17-2992, 17-3029, 17-3039, 17-3080, 17-3091] [Entered: 01/24/2018 07:17 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 659 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Thema Fund Limited, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220997] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 07:17 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 658 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Intesa Sanpaolo S.p.A., Eurizon Capital SGR S.p.A., Eurizon Low Volatility, Eurizon Low Volatility II, Eurizon Low Volatility PB, Eurizon Medium Volatility, Eurizon Medium Volatility II and Eurizon Total Return, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220995] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 07:12 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 657 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee BSI AG, EFG BANK & TRUST (BAHAMAS) LIMITED, EFG BANK (MONACO) S.A.M. and EFG Bank S.A., informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220994] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 07:08 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 656 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Banque Lombard Odier & Cie SA, Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A., Bordier & Cie, Lyxor Asset Management Inc., Lyxor Asset Management S.A., Lyxor Premium Fund, SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., SG Audace Alternatif, SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A., Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A. and Societe Generale, S.A. in 17-2992, Appellee Banque Cantonale Vaudoise in 17-2996, Appellee Lyxor Asset Management Inc., Lyxor Asset Management S.A., Lyxor Premium Fund, SG AM AI Premium Fund L.P., SG Audace Alternatif, SGAM AI Equilibrium Fund, Socgen Nominees (UK) Limited, Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A., Societe Generale Holding De Participations S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) S.A., Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A. and Societe Generale, S.A. in 17-3047, Appellee Banque Privee Espirito Santo S.A. in 17-3086, Appellee Bordier & Cie in 17-3112, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220992] [17-2992, 17-2996, 17-3047, 17-3086, 17-3112] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:58 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 655 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Tensyr Limited in 17-3009, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220990] [17-2992, 17-3009] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:49 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 654 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Lighthouse Diversified Fund Limited, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC and Lighthouse Supercash Fund Limited in 17-2992, 17-3132, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220987] [17-2992, 17-3132] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:41 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 653 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited and Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A. in 17-2992, Appellee Standard Chartered Bank International (Americas) Limited, Standard Chartered Financial Services (Luxembourg) S.A. and Standard Chartered International (USA) Ltd. in 17-3083, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220986] [17-2992, 17-3083] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:39 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 652 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee ZCM Asset Holding Company (Bermuda) LLC in 17-2992, 17-3075, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220985] [17-2992, 17-3075] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:29 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 651 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Bank Julius Baer & Co., Ltd. in 17-3019, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220981] [17-2992, 17-3019] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:22 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 650 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Lion Global Investors Limited in 17-2992, 17-3106, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220980] [17-2992, 17-3106] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:20 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 649 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Kingate Management Limited and Six Sis AG, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220978] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:18 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 648 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited, Citibank (Switzerland) AG and Citigroup Global Markets Limited in 17-2992, Appellee Citibank (Switzerland) AG in 17-3076, Appellee Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Citigroup Global Markets Limited in 17-3139, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220977] [17-2992, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3139] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:17 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 647 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, UBS (Luxembourg) SA, UBS Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., UBS Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., UBS Third Party Management Company S.A. and UBS Deutschland AG in 17-2992, Appellee UBS AG, UBS Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. and UBS Third Party Management Company S.A. in 17-3057, Appellee UBS Deutschland AG in 17-3100, Appellee UBS AG, UBS (Luxembourg) SA, UBS Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. and UBS Third Party Management Company S.A. in 17-3141, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220976] [17-2992, 17-3057, 17-3100, 17-3141] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:17 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 646 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Grosvenor Investment Management Ltd., Grosvenor Private Reserve Fund Limited, Grosvenor Aggressive Growth Fund Limited and Grosvenor Balanced Growth Fund Limited in 17-2992, 17-2999, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220975] [17-2992, 17-2999] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:16 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 645 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A., Credit Agricole S.A. and Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank in 17-2992, Appellee Credit Agricole (Suisse) S.A. and Credit Agricole S.A. in 17-3026, Appellee Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank in 17-3042, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220974] [17-2992, 17-3026, 17-3042] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:15 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 644 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Inteligo Bank Ltd. Panama Branch and Naidot & Co., informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220973] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:14 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 643 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Koch Industries, Inc. in 17-2992, 17-3016, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220972] [17-2992, 17-3016] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:14 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 642 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Gregory Bowes in 17-2992, 17-3066, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220971] [17-2992, 17-3066] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:10 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 641 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Odyssey in 17-2992, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220970] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:08 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 640 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Nomura International plc and Nomura International plc in 17-2992, Appellee Nomura International plc in 17-3044, 17-3129, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220969] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:07 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 639 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Banque Internationale a Luxembourg (Suisse) S.A., Banque Internationale a Luxembourg S.A. and Dakota Global Investments, Ltd. in 17-2992, Appellee Banque Internationale a Luxembourg (Suisse) S.A. and Banque Internationale a Luxembourg S.A. in 17-3058, Appellee Dakota Global Investments, Ltd. in 17-3060, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220966] [17-2992, 17-3058, 17-3060] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:07 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 638 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Banco Itau Europa International and Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg, S.A. in 17-2992, 17-3054, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220963] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:05 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 637 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Bank Hapoalim (Switzerland) Ltd. and Bank Hapoalim B.M. in 17-2992, 17-3072, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220962] [17-2992, 17-3072] [Entered: 01/24/2018 06:00 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 636 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Meritz Fire & Marine Insurance Co. LTD. in 17-2992, 17-3071, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220959] [17-2992, 17-3071] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:54 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 635 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Quilvest Finance LTD in 17-2992, 17-3032, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220958] [17-2992, 17-3032] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:53 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 634 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220957] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:53 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 633 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Union Arbitrage Strategy Fund, Union Securities Investment Trust Co., Ltd., Union USD Global Arbitrage A Fund and Union USD Global Arbitrage Fund in 17-2992, 17-2995, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220953] [17-2992, 17-2995] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:51 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 632 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA, BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, BNP Paribas Bank & Trust Cayman Limited, BGL BNP Paribas Luxembourg S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Services - Succusale De Luxembourg and BNP Paribas Securities Services S.A. in 17-2992, Appellee BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC in 17-3069, Appellee BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA, BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, BNP Paribas Bank & Trust Cayman Limited, BGL BNP Paribas Luxembourg S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Services - Succusale De Luxembourg and BNP Paribas Securities Services S.A. in 17-3088, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220952] [17-2992, 17-3069, 17-3088] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:51 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 631 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Atlantic Security Bank, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220951] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:50 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 630 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Public Institution for Social Security in 17-2992, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220947] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:46 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 629 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Abu Dhabi Investment Authority, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220945] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:45 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 628 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Bureau of Labor Insurance in 17-2992, 17-3024, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220942] [17-2992, 17-3024] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:43 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 627 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Arden Asset Management Inc., Arden Asset Management LLC and Arden Endowment Advisers, Ltd., informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220940] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:41 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 626 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Fairfield Investment Fund Limited, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220933] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:38 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 625 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank in 17-2992, Appellee Bloom Asset Holdings Fund and Natixis in 17-3009, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220932] [17-2992, 17-3009] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:38 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 624 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Delta National Bank and Trust Company in 17-2992, 17-3006, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220930] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:37 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 623 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Fullerton Capital PTE Ltd., informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220929] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:35 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 622 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Banca Carige S.P.A., informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220928] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:35 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 621 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Merrill Lynch Bank (Suisse) SA and Merrill Lynch International in 17-2992, Appellee Merrill Lynch Bank (Suisse) SA in 17-3040, Appellee Merrill Lynch International in 17-3134, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220927] [17-2992, 17-3040, 17-3134] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:35 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 620 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Bank Vontobel AG and Vontobel Asset Management Inc., informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220924] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:32 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 619 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee UKFP (Asia) Nominees Limited in 17-2992, 17-3073, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220923] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:31 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 618 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Falcon Private Bank Ltd. in 17-2992, 17-3067, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220922] [17-2992, 17-3067] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:29 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 617 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee CDP Capital Tactical Alternative Investments and Multi-Strategy Fund Limited in 17-2992, 17-3074, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220921] [17-2992, 17-3074] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:28 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 616 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee PF Trustees Limited, SafeHand Investments and Strongback Holdings Corporation, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220920] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:28 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 615 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee The Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co., Ltd., informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220919] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:28 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 614 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Caceis Bank and Caceis Bank, Luxembourg Branch, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220918] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:28 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 613 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Banco General, S.A. and BG Valores, S.A., informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220916] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:22 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 612 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD. in 17-2992, 17-3010, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220915] [17-2992, 17-3010] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:21 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 611 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee OFI MGA Alpha Palmares, Oval Palmares Europlus and UMR Select Alternatif in 17-2992, 17-3047, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220914] [17-2992, 17-3047] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:18 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 610 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Banque SYZ SA, M&B Capital Advisers Sociedad De Valores, S.A., Trincastar Corporation, Unifortune Asset Management SGR SPA and Unifortune Conservative Fund, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220913] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:17 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 609 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Inter Investissements S.A. in 17-2992, 17-3143, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220910] [17-2992, 17-3143] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:14 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 608 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee KBC Investments Limited, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220909] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:13 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 607 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Federico M. Ceretti, FIM Advisers LLP, FIM Limited and Carlo Grosso in 17-2992, 17-3077, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220906] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:09 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 606 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A., Barclays Bank S.A. and Barclays Private Bank & Trust Limited in 17-2992, 17-3011, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220905] [17-2992, 17-3011] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:09 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 605 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Parson Finance Panama S.A. in 17-2992, 17-3005, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220904] [17-2992, 17-3005] [Entered: 01/24/2018 05:09 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 604 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee ABN AMRO Bank N.V., informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220890] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/24/2018 04:59 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 603 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, Guernroy Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Channel Islands) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Asia) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Suisse) S.A., RBC Dominion Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Canada Trust Company (Jersey) Limited, Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Northern Trust Corporation, Barfield Nominees Limited, Access International Advisors Ltd., Access Management Luxembourg SA, Access Partners SA, Patrick Littaye, RBC Dexia Investor Services Bank S.A. and RBC Dexia Investor Services Espana S.A. in 17-2992, Appellee Royal Bank of Canada, Guernroy Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Channel Islands) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Asia) Limited, Royal Bank of Canada (Suisse) S.A., RBC Dominion Securities Inc. and Royal Bank of Canada Trust Company (Jersey) Limited in 17-3013, Appellee Lloyds TSB Bank PLC in 17-3033, Appellee Northern Trust Corporation and Barfield Nominees Limited in 17-3041, Appellee Access International Advisors Ltd., Access Management Luxembourg SA, Access Partners SA and Patrick Littaye in 17-3057, Appellee RBC Dexia Investor Services Bank S.A. and RBC Dexia Investor Services Espana S.A. in 17-3058, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220857] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/24/2018 04:37 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 602 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee BA Worldwide Fund Management Limited in 17-2992, 17-3062, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220856] [17-2992, 17-3062] [Entered: 01/24/2018 04:36 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 601 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Pierre Delandmeter in 17-2992, 17-3057, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/24/2018 by CM/ECF.[2220784] [17-2992, 17-3057] [Entered: 01/24/2018 04:11 PM]
January 24, 2018 Filing 600 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-2992 Brief due date as 04/11/2018, FILED.[2220435] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/24/2018 12:57 PM]
January 18, 2018 Filing 596 MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file amicus curiae brief to the panel that will determine the merits of the appeal [ # 591 ] in 17-2992, FILED. [2216084][596] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/18/2018 11:57 AM]
January 17, 2018 Filing 593 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Bankruptcy Law Professors, FILED. Service date 01/17/2018 by CM/ECF. [2215541] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/17/2018 04:15 PM]
January 17, 2018 Filing 592 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Professors of Conflict of Laws , FILED. Service date 01/17/2018 by CM/ECF. [2215516] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/17/2018 04:02 PM]
January 17, 2018 Filing 591 MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Movant Kenneth Krys, FILED. Service date01/17/2018 by CM/ECF.[2215456] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/17/2018 03:51 PM]
January 17, 2018 Filing 590 NEW PARTY, Movant George A. Bermann, Hannah L. Buxbaum, Zachary D. Clopton, Anthony J. Colangelo, William S. Dodge, Maggie Gardner, Ralf Michaels, Aaron D. Simowitz and Christopher Whytock, ADDED.[2215416] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/17/2018 03:35 PM]
January 17, 2018 Filing 589 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, FILED. Service date 01/17/2018 by CM/ECF. [2215415] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/17/2018 03:35 PM]
January 17, 2018 Filing 588 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, FILED. Service date 01/17/2018 by CM/ECF. [2215324] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/17/2018 03:09 PM]
January 17, 2018 Filing 587 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Professors of Conflict of Laws, FILED. Service date 01/17/2018 by CM/ECF. [2215185] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/17/2018 02:09 PM]
January 17, 2018 Filing 585 NEW PARTY, Movant Stephen J. Lubben, Troy McKenzie, Ronald Mann, Edward R. Morrison, Chrystin Ondersma, Robert K. Rasmussen, Mark J. Roe, Alan Schwartz, Michael Simkovic, Frederick Tung and Jay L. Westbrook, ADDED.[2214969] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/17/2018 11:54 AM]
January 17, 2018 Filing 584 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Professors of Conflict of Laws, FILED. Service date 01/17/2018 by CM/ECF. [2214956] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/17/2018 11:47 AM]
January 17, 2018 Filing 583 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Bankruptcy Law Professors, FILED. Service date 01/17/2018 by CM/ECF. [2214881] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/17/2018 11:21 AM]
January 17, 2018 Filing 582 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Bankruptcy Law Professors, FILED. Service date 01/17/2018 by CM/ECF. [2214810] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/17/2018 10:42 AM]
January 16, 2018 Filing 579 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, SICO Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-2992, Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Banking Holdings (Suisse) SA, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A. and HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3062, Appellee SICO Limited in 17-3064, Appellee HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited in 17-3077, Appellee Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company and Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited in 17-3102, informing Court of proposed due date 04/11/2018, RECEIVED. Service date 01/16/2018 by CM/ECF.[2214565] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/16/2018 06:31 PM]
January 16, 2018 Filing 578 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) SA, HSBC Securities Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Ireland) Limited, HSBC Securities Services (Bermuda) Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank (Cayman) Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., HSBC Fund Services (Luxembourg) S.A., HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company, Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited and SICO Limited, consent to the filings of amicus briefs by the National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees, Professors of Conflict of Laws and Professors of Bankruptcy Law in support of Apppellant RECEIVED. Service date 01/16/2018 by CM/ECF.[2214564] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/16/2018 06:25 PM]
January 16, 2018 Filing 577 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Bankruptcy Law Professors , FILED. Service date 01/16/2018 by CM/ECF. [2214170] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/16/2018 02:48 PM]
January 16, 2018 Filing 576 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Professors of Conflict of Laws, FILED. Service date 01/16/2018 by CM/ECF. [2214086] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/16/2018 02:05 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 575 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212985] [17-3862, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:44 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 574 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212980] [17-3144, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:41 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 573 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212973] [17-3143, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:39 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 572 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212972] [17-3141, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:37 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 571 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212969] [17-3140, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:34 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 570 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212967] [17-3139, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:32 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 569 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212964] [17-3134, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:30 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 568 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212960] [17-3132, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:27 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 567 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212955] [17-3129, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:25 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 566 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212951] [17-3126, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:23 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 565 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212948] [17-3122, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:21 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 564 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212946] [17-3117, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:19 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 563 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212944] [17-3115, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:17 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 562 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212941] [17-3113, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:14 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 561 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212936] [17-3112, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:11 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 560 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212929] [17-3109, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:09 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 559 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212926] [17-3106, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:07 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 558 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212917] [17-3102, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:04 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 557 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212911] [17-3101, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 01:01 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 556 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212905] [17-3100, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 12:58 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 555 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212895] [17-3091, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 12:56 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 554 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212887] [17-3088, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 12:54 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 553 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212873] [17-3087, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 12:51 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 552 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212866] [17-3086, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 12:48 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 551 NEW PARTY, Movant Kenneth Krys, ADDED.[2212832] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 12:27 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 550 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212798] [17-3084, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 12:03 PM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 549 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212781] [17-3083, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:56 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 548 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212773] [17-3080, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:53 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 547 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212766] [17-3078, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:49 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 546 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212760] [17-3077, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:47 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 545 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212758] [17-3076, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:45 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 544 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212755] [17-3075, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:43 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 543 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212748] [17-3074, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:39 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 542 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212741] [17-3073, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:36 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 541 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212739] [17-3072, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:34 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 540 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212733] [17-3071, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:32 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 539 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212727] [17-3070, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:30 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 538 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212724] [17-3068, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:28 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 537 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212719] [17-3067, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:26 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 536 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212698] [17-3066, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:16 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 535 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212696] [17-3065, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:14 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 534 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lighthouse Diversified Fund Limited, Lighthouse Investment Partners, LLC and Lighthouse Supercash Fund Limited, FILED. Service date 01/12/2018 by email.[2212693] [17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:13 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 533 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212689] [17-3064, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:12 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 532 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212685] [17-3062, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:10 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 531 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Kenneth Krys, in his capacity as liquidator and foreign representative of Fairfield Sentry Limited (in liquidation), Fairfield Sigma Limited ( in liquidation), and Fairfield Lambda Limited (in liquidation), FILED. Service date 01/12/2018 by CM/ECF. [2212683] [17-2992, 17-2995, 17-2996, 17-2999, 17-3003, 17-3004, 17-3005, 17-3006, 17-3007, 17-3008, 17-3009, 17-3010, 17-3011, 17-3012, 17-3013, 17-3014, 17-3016, 17-3018, 17-3019, 17-3020, 17-3021, 17-3023, 17-3024, 17-3025, 17-3026, 17-3029, 17-3032, 17-3033, 17-3034, 17-3035, 17-3038, 17-3039, 17-3040, 17-3041, 17-3042, 17-3043, 17-3044, 17-3047, 17-3050, 17-3054, 17-3057, 17-3058, 17-3059, 17-3060, 17-3062, 17-3064, 17-3065, 17-3066, 17-3067, 17-3068, 17-3069, 17-3070, 17-3071, 17-3072, 17-3073, 17-3074, 17-3075, 17-3076, 17-3077, 17-3078, 17-3080, 17-3083, 17-3084, 17-3086, 17-3087, 17-3088, 17-3091, 17-3100, 17-3101, 17-3102, 17-3106, 17-3109, 17-3112, 17-3113, 17-3115, 17-3117, 17-3122, 17-3126, 17-3129, 17-3132, 17-3134, 17-3136, 17-3139, 17-3140, 17-3141, 17-3143, 17-3144, 17-3862] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:08 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 530 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212682] [17-3060, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:08 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 529 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212675] [17-3059, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:06 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 528 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212670] [17-3058, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:03 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 527 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212665] [17-3054, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 11:00 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 526 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212663] [17-3050, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 10:58 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 525 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212646] [17-3047, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 10:52 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 524 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212559] [17-3044, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 10:00 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 523 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212553] [17-3043, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 09:58 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 522 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212535] [17-3042, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 09:48 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 521 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212529] [17-3041, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 09:46 AM]
January 12, 2018 Filing 520 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2212526] [17-3040, 17-2992] [Entered: 01/12/2018 09:43 AM]
January 11, 2018 Filing 518 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2211684] [17-3039] [Entered: 01/11/2018 12:25 PM]
January 11, 2018 Filing 517 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2211669] [17-3038] [Entered: 01/11/2018 12:22 PM]
January 11, 2018 Filing 516 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2211659] [17-3035] [Entered: 01/11/2018 12:18 PM]
January 11, 2018 Filing 515 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2211652] [17-3034] [Entered: 01/11/2018 12:15 PM]
January 11, 2018 F