Ratcliff v. Greyhound Bus Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Elijah W. Ratcliff
Defendant / Appellee: Greyhound Bus Lines, Inc., DBA Greyhound Bus Lines
Case Number: 19-109
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Scheduling Notification, [13], on behalf of Appellant Elijah W. Ratcliff, FILED.[2511326] [19-109] [Entered: 03/06/2019 10:33 AM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Elijah W. Ratcliff, informing Court of proposed due date 03/12/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 02/27/2019 by US mail.[2511318] [19-109] [Entered: 03/06/2019 10:31 AM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Elijah W. Ratcliff, FILED. Service date 02/13/2019 by US mail.[2502505] [19-109] [Entered: 02/21/2019 04:42 PM]
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Elijah W. Ratcliff, FILED. Service date 02/13/2019 by US mail.[2502501] [19-109] [Entered: 02/21/2019 04:41 PM]
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 02/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/26/2019, unless Appellant Elijah W. Ratcliff, submits the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se, FILED.[2489266] [19-109] [Entered: 02/05/2019 10:13 AM]
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, dated 02/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/26/2019, unless Appellant Elijah W. Ratcliff, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se, FILED.[2489250] [19-109] [Entered: 02/05/2019 10:06 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 PAPERS, request for district court record, RECEIVED.[2482454] [19-109] [Entered: 01/25/2019 12:03 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Elijah W. Ratcliff, district court receipt # 465401226788, FILED.[2477051] [19-109] [Entered: 01/17/2019 09:16 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2476317] [19-109] [Entered: 01/16/2019 11:22 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2473122] [19-109] [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:08 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/20/2018, RECEIVED.[2473121] [19-109] [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:07 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 11/20/2018, RECEIVED.[2473100] [19-109] [Entered: 01/11/2019 11:00 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Elijah W. Ratcliff, FILED. [2473096] [19-109] [Entered: 01/11/2019 10:56 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratcliff v. Greyhound Bus Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Elijah W. Ratcliff
Represented By: Elijah W. Ratcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Greyhound Bus Lines, Inc., DBA Greyhound Bus Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?