Berrios v. State of New York
Defendant: New York Lawyers For the Public Interest, Inc., Battiste, Aronowsky, and Suchow, Inc. and Bayley Seton Hospital
Plaintiff / Appellant: Jesus Berrios, as legal guardian of Vanessa Rivera
Defendant / Appellee: Richmond County District Attorney's Office, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation, City of New York and State of New York
Case Number: 19-129
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 35 CURED DEFECTIVE FOR ASSIGNMENT OF PRO BONO COUNSEL, TO APPEAL ON THE ORIGINAL RECORD [ # 27 ], on behalf of Appellant Jesus Berrios, FILED.[2502517] [19-129] [Entered: 02/21/2019 04:46 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 30 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, for assignment of pro bono counsel, to appeal on the original record, [28],[28], on behalf of Appellant Jesus Berrios, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2493641] [19-129] [Entered: 02/11/2019 11:15 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, to appeal on the original record, on behalf of Appellant Jesus Berrios, FILED. Service date 02/08/2019 by US mail.[2493615] [19-129] [Entered: 02/11/2019 11:09 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, for assignment of pro bono counsel, to appeal on the original record, on behalf of Appellant Jesus Berrios, FILED. Service date 02/08/2019 by US mail.[2493606] [19-129]--[Edited 02/21/2019 by TT] [Entered: 02/11/2019 11:06 AM]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER, dated 02/08/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/01/2019, unless Appellant Jesus Berrios, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2492487] [19-129] [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:44 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 25 STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Jesus Berrios Motion, for assignment of pro bono counsel, to proceed in forma pauperis, [4],[4] from the docket, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2492476] [19-129] [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:38 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY, David Lawrence III, [ # 21 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2484372] [19-129] [Entered: 01/29/2019 01:01 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee State of New York, FILED. Service date 01/29/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2484300] [19-129] [Entered: 01/29/2019 12:11 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE, to Appellee State of New York, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2483918] [19-129] [Entered: 01/29/2019 08:41 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 18 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, for assignment of pro bono counsel, to proceed in forma pauperis, to appeal on the original record, [17],[17],[17], on behalf of Appellant Jesus Berrios, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2482085] [19-129] [Entered: 01/25/2019 08:45 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, to proceed in forma pauperis, to appeal on the original record, on behalf of Appellant Jesus Berrios, FILED. Service date 01/23/2019 by US mail.[2482082] [19-129] [Entered: 01/25/2019 08:42 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Appellant Jesus Berrios, FILED. Service date 01/23/2019 by US mail. [2482080] [19-129] [Entered: 01/25/2019 08:38 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 15 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jesus Berrios, informing Court of proposed due date 04/24/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 01/23/2019 by US mail.[2482078] [19-129] [Entered: 01/25/2019 08:37 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Jesus Berrios, FILED. Service date 01/23/2019 by US mail.[2482074] [19-129] [Entered: 01/25/2019 08:35 AM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 13 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Jesus Berrios, FILED. Service date 01/23/2019 by US mail.[2482072] [19-129] [Entered: 01/25/2019 08:34 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/14/2019, denying IFP, RECEIVED.[2476826] [19-129] [Entered: 01/16/2019 04:25 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Jamison Davies, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Zachary W. Carter, SUBSTITUTED.[2476539] [19-129] [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:28 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation and Richmond County District Attorney's Office, FILED. Service date 01/16/2019 by US mail. [2476448] [19-129] [Entered: 01/16/2019 01:24 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, for assignment of pro bono counsel, [4],[4], on behalf of Appellant Jesus Berrios, FILED.[2474237] [19-129] [Entered: 01/14/2019 12:01 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2474232] [19-129] [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:57 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION, for assignment of pro bono counsel, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Jesus Berrios, FILED. Service date 01/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2474222] [19-129] [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:54 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2474210] [19-129] [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:47 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/13/2018, RECEIVED.[2474208] [19-129] [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:46 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jesus Berrios, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2474197] [19-129] [Entered: 01/14/2019 11:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berrios v. State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Lawyers For the Public Interest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Battiste, Aronowsky, and Suchow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayley Seton Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jesus Berrios, as legal guardian of Vanessa Rivera
Represented By: Jesus Berrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richmond County District Attorney's Office
Represented By: Jamison Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: New York City Health and Hospitals Corporation
Represented By: Jamison Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of New York
Represented By: Jamison Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State of New York
Represented By: David Lawrence III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?