Campbell v. Pepsi Beverages Inc.
Defendant: Pepsi Beverages Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: Bottling Group, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: Bobby Campbell, Jr.
Case Number: 19-1345
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Scheduling Notification, [9], on behalf of Appellant Bobby Campbell, Jr., FILED.[2576591] [19-1345] [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:07 PM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Bobby Campbell, Jr., informing Court of proposed due date 08/16/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 05/27/2019 by US mail.[2576580] [19-1345] [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:06 PM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Bobby Campbell, Jr., FILED. Service date 05/27/2019 by US mail.[2576575] [19-1345] [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:04 PM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Bobby Campbell, Jr., FILED. Service date 05/27/2019 by US mail.[2576570] [19-1345] [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:03 PM]
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bottling Group, LLC, FILED. Service date 05/21/2019 by US mail.[2569629] [19-1345] [Entered: 05/21/2019 04:46 PM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2563048] [19-1345] [Entered: 05/14/2019 09:46 AM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2561950] [19-1345] [Entered: 05/13/2019 08:38 AM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2560082] [19-1345] [Entered: 05/09/2019 01:02 PM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 04/15/2019, RECEIVED.[2560072] [19-1345] [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:55 PM]
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bobby Campbell, Jr., FILED. [2560076] [19-1345] [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Campbell v. Pepsi Beverages Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bottling Group, LLC
Represented By: Linda T. Prestegaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bobby Campbell, Jr.
Represented By: Bobby Campbell Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepsi Beverages Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?