Nunes Bey v. State of New York Queens Count
Plaintiff: Sister Claudette Angela Nunes Bey, Brother Isa Talib Chemeaux Bey, Sister Laviena Nunes Bey and Brother Ras Jai Bey
Defendant / Appellee: Cheree A. Buggs, Registration Number 2124527, State of New York, Andrew Cuomo, State of New York Queens County, Supreme Courts, Stephanie Leonardo, Registration Number 4766226, Franklin First Financial, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc., MERS, John Doe 1, Shapiro, DiCaro & Barak, LLC, Attorney 3rd Party Interloper, Federal National Mortgage Association, Fannie Mae, John Doe 2, Audrey Ipheffer, Acting Queens County Clerk, John Doe, Francis K. Kenna, Registration Number 4518197 and Alexander Phengsiaroun, Esq., Registration Number 4518197
Plaintiff / Appellant: Sister Constantina Ruby Lege Alba La'at Bey
Case Number: 19-1686
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 CAPTION, The Plaintiffs in the lead case designation's were changed to Plaintiff-Appellant, AMENDED.[2583575] [19-1673, 19-1679, 19-1686, 19-1689] [Entered: 06/10/2019 02:38 PM]
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2582728] [19-1686] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:30 PM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTE: See lead case, 19-1673, containing complete set of docket entries.[2582726] [19-1686] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:30 PM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2582724] [19-1686] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:29 PM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/02/2019, RECEIVED.[2582719] [19-1686] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:28 PM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 05/01/2019, RECEIVED.[2582718] [19-1686] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:27 PM]
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Sister Constantina Ruby Lege Alba La'at Bey in 19-1686, FILED. [2582711] [19-1686, 19-1673] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunes Bey v. State of New York Queens Count
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sister Claudette Angela Nunes Bey
Represented By: Claudette Angela Nunes Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brother Isa Talib Chemeaux Bey
Represented By: Isa Talib Chemeaux Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sister Laviena Nunes Bey
Represented By: Laviena Nunes Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brother Ras Jai Bey
Represented By: Ras Jai Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cheree A. Buggs, Registration Number 2124527
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State of New York, Andrew Cuomo
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: State of New York Queens County, Supreme Courts
Represented By: John M. Castellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephanie Leonardo, Registration Number 4766226
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Franklin First Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc., MERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shapiro, DiCaro & Barak, LLC, Attorney 3rd Party Interloper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal National Mortgage Association, Fannie Mae
Represented By: Varuni Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Audrey Ipheffer, Acting Queens County Clerk
Represented By: John M. Castellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Francis K. Kenna, Registration Number 4518197
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alexander Phengsiaroun, Esq., Registration Number 4518197
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sister Constantina Ruby Lege Alba La'at Bey
Represented By: Constantina Ruby Lege Alba La'at Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?