Compunnel Software Group, Inc. v. Gupta
Respondent: Thomas E Perez, in his capacity as Secretary, United States Department of Labor and R. Alexander Acosta
Not Yet Classified: Arvind Gupta and Compunnel Software Group, Inc.
Case Number: 19-1761
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time; Appellant moves for an extension to September 2, 2019 to pay the filing fee [ # 17 ], filed by Appellant Mr. Arvind Gupta, by RJL, FILED. [2608706][35] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:24 PM]
July 10, 2019 Filing 32 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 31 ], on behalf of Appellee Compunnel Software Group, Inc., FILED.[2604876] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/10/2019 03:17 PM]
July 10, 2019 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Compunnel Software Group, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2604824] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/10/2019 02:59 PM]
July 10, 2019 Filing 30 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, [29], on behalf of Appellee Compunnel Software Group, Inc., copy to pro se appellant, Inc., FILED.[2604022] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/10/2019 09:33 AM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Compunnel Software Group, Inc., FILED. Service date 07/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2603764] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/09/2019 04:46 PM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 28 CAPTION, corrected and edited designations of parties on appeal, AMENDED.[2602505] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/08/2019 04:50 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee R. Alexander Acosta, FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2599478] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/02/2019 01:04 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 CURED DEFECTIVE LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, [ # 23 ], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arvind Gupta, FILED.[2598715] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/01/2019 05:11 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 22 ], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arvind Gupta, FILED.[2598713] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/01/2019 05:10 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY, Brandon Matthew Waterman for R. Alexander Acosta, in case 19-1761, [ # 21 ], ADDED.[2598710] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/01/2019 05:08 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arvind Gupta, informing Court of proposed due date 09/30/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2598441] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/01/2019 03:11 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arvind Gupta, FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2598429] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/01/2019 03:07 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of R. Alexander Acosta, FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2598410] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/01/2019 02:57 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [16], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arvind Gupta, FILED.[2598017] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:12 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, [14], on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arvind Gupta, FILED.[2598007] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:08 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arvind Gupta, FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2597719] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/01/2019 06:32 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arvind Gupta, informing Court of proposed due date 09/30/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2597718] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:30 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arvind Gupta, FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2597717] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:10 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arvind Gupta, FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2597716] [19-1761] [Entered: 07/01/2019 03:13 AM]
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2588696] [19-1761] [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:46 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2588691] [19-1761] [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:43 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 05/20/2019, RECEIVED.[2588690] [19-1761] [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:43 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/30/2018, RECEIVED.[2588689] [19-1761] [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:42 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/30/2018, RECEIVED.[2588687] [19-1761] [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:41 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 01/11/2018, RECEIVED.[2588686] [19-1761] [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:39 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/05/2015, RECEIVED.[2588677] [19-1761] [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:34 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/17/2015, RECEIVED.[2588672] [19-1761] [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:32 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 04/13/2015, RECEIVED.[2588666] [19-1761] [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:30 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/19/2015, RECEIVED.[2588665] [19-1761] [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:29 AM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mr. Arvind Gupta, FILED. [2588650] [19-1761] [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compunnel Software Group, Inc. v. Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Arvind Gupta
Represented By: Arvind Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Compunnel Software Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sanjay Chaubey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas E Perez, in his capacity as Secretary, United States Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Alexander Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?