Wells Fargo Bank, National Ass v. Acropolis Gardens Realty Corp
Defendant: Building Service 32 BJ Thomas Shortman, People of the State of New York, Albany, New York, The City of New York, John Does I through XXXX, Building Service 32 BJ Legal Services, The City of New York Environmental Control Board, Building Service 32 BJ Health Fund and The Acropolis Gardens Condominium, Board of Managers
Plaintiff / Appellee: Wilmington Trust, N.A., as Trustee, on behalf of the registered holders of CSAIL 2017-C8 Commercial Mortgage Trust, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2017-C8 and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee, on behalf of the registered holders of CSAIL 2017-CX9 Commercial Mortgage Trust, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2017-CX9
Appellee: David Sorise
Defendant / Appellee: Acropolis Associates LLC, a New York limited liability company and Acropolis Gardens Realty Corp, a New York corporation
Petitioner / Appellant: Debra Vazquez
Case Number: 19-2230
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee David Sorise, FILED. Service date 09/13/2019 by CM/ECF.[2654979] [19-2230] [Entered: 09/13/2019 11:39 AM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY, Christina Vernaschi for Acropolis Associates LLC, in case 19-2230, [ # 26 ], ADDED.[2654414] [19-2230] [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:36 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY, Michael Barry Sloan for Acropolis Associates LLC, in case 19-2230, [ # 25 ], ADDED.[2654411] [19-2230] [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:35 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Acropolis Associates LLC, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2652227] [19-2230] [Entered: 09/11/2019 09:59 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Acropolis Associates LLC, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2652208] [19-2230] [Entered: 09/11/2019 09:54 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Acropolis Associates LLC, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2652200] [19-2230] [Entered: 09/11/2019 09:49 AM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE, to Appellee Acropolis Associates LLC, Acropolis Gardens Realty Corp, David Sorise, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and Wilmington Trust, N.A. , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2650710] [19-2230] [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:14 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 22 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 09/25/2019, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2642107] [19-2230] [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:31 PM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Debra Vazquez Brief due date as 11/01/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 11/01/2019, FILED.[2631245] [19-2230] [Entered: 08/13/2019 03:22 PM]
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Debra Vazquez, informing Court of proposed due date 11/01/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 08/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2628533] [19-2230] [Entered: 08/09/2019 11:12 AM]
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE, to Appellee Acropolis Associates LLC, Acropolis Gardens Realty Corp, David Sorise, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and Wilmington Trust, N.A. , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2628179] [19-2230] [Entered: 08/09/2019 09:00 AM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2625557] [19-2230] [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:09 PM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 09/04/2019, Start Time: 11:00 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2625194] [19-2230] [Entered: 08/06/2019 11:50 AM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Debra Vazquez, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2623189] [19-2230] [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:31 PM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Debra Vazquez, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2623188] [19-2230] [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:31 PM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Debra Vazquez, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2623185] [19-2230] [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:30 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Debra Vazquez, FILED. [2617495] [19-2230] [Entered: 07/25/2019 05:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, National Ass v. Acropolis Gardens Realty Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Wilmington Trust, N.A., as Trustee, on behalf of the registered holders of CSAIL 2017-C8 Commercial Mortgage Trust, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2017-C8
Represented By: Amy Hatch
Represented By: Amy Hatch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Trustee, on behalf of the registered holders of CSAIL 2017-CX9 Commercial Mortgage Trust, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2017-CX9
Represented By: Amy Hatch
Represented By: Amy Hatch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David Sorise
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Nogee Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Acropolis Associates LLC, a New York limited liability company
Represented By: Stephen B. Meister Esq.
Represented By: Michael Barry Sloan Esq.
Represented By: Christina Vernaschi Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Acropolis Gardens Realty Corp, a New York corporation
Represented By: John S. Ciulla
Represented By: Kevin J. Barry Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Building Service 32 BJ Thomas Shortman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of New York, Albany, New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I through XXXX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Building Service 32 BJ Legal Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York Environmental Control Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Building Service 32 BJ Health Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Acropolis Gardens Condominium, Board of Managers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Debra Vazquez
Represented By: Stephen Howard Orel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?