Prince v. The Government of the People's
Defendant: The Government of The People's Republic of China, Ethiopian Airlines, Yefang Construction Private Limited, Institute of Architecture, Design and Reseach, Girma Wake, Chief Executive Officer, Ethiopian Airlines, Gungsha International Construction Company and Geshan Construction Group Co. Ltd
Defendant / Appellee: Gang Xiao, Balehager Ayalew, BDMA Engineering PLC, Yiming He, Yifi He and Wan Wei
Plaintiff / Appellant: Leslie F. Prince and Prince Services International Inc., DBA PSI Consultants
Case Number: 19-2279
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 29 PRINCE SERVICES INTERNATIONAL INC., PLAINTIFF-APPELLANT, TERMINATED.[2658730] [19-2279] [Entered: 09/18/2019 03:38 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 26 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, for judicial notice, [25], on behalf of Appellant Leslie F. Prince, FILED.[2655123] [19-2279] [Entered: 09/13/2019 01:24 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION, for judicial notice, on behalf of Appellant Leslie F. Prince, FILED. Service date 09/13/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2655083] [19-2279] [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:42 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION, to file document, to proceed pro se, on behalf of Appellant Leslie F. Prince, FILED. Service date 09/13/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2655077] [19-2279] [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:37 PM]
August 14, 2019 Filing 22 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, [ # 19 ], on behalf of Appellant Leslie F. Prince, FILED.[2632121] [19-2279] [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:23 PM]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, dated 08/14/2019, dismissing appeal by 09/13/2019, unless Appellant Prince Services International Inc., obtains counsel and an attorney admitted to practice in this Court submits a notice of appearance form, copy to pro se, FILED.[2632118] [19-2279] [Entered: 08/14/2019 01:20 PM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Leslie F. Prince, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF.[2630889] [19-2279] [Entered: 08/13/2019 12:00 PM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Leslie F. Prince, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF.[2630888] [19-2279] [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:59 AM]
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, dated 08/13/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/13/2019, unless Appellant Leslie F. Prince, submits Form D-P, FILED.[2630441] [19-2279] [Entered: 08/13/2019 09:00 AM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [14], on behalf of Appellant Leslie F. Prince, FILED.[2630232] [19-2279] [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:22 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Leslie F. Prince, informing Court of proposed due date 08/12/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 08/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2629707] [19-2279] [Entered: 08/12/2019 12:15 PM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Leslie F. Prince, FILED. Service date 08/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2627747] [19-2279] [Entered: 08/08/2019 03:06 PM]
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2617166] [19-2279] [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:47 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE, to Appellant Prince Services International Inc., regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[2617137] [19-2279] [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:28 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2617133] [19-2279] [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:24 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Leslie F. Prince and Prince Services International Inc., district court receipt # 465401240325, FILED.[2616878] [19-2279] [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:23 AM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/21/2019, RECEIVED.[2617182] [19-2279] [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:57 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/19/2019, RECEIVED.[2616871] [19-2279] [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:21 AM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Leslie F. Prince and Prince Services International Inc., FILED. [2616861] [19-2279] [Entered: 07/25/2019 11:15 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Prince v. The Government of the People's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Government of The People's Republic of China
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethiopian Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yefang Construction Private Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Institute of Architecture, Design and Reseach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Girma Wake, Chief Executive Officer, Ethiopian Airlines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gungsha International Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geshan Construction Group Co. Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gang Xiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Balehager Ayalew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BDMA Engineering PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Yiming He
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Yifi He
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wan Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Leslie F. Prince
Represented By: Leslie F. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Prince Services International Inc., DBA PSI Consultants
Represented By: Prince Services International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?