Gibson v. Commissioner of New York City
Defendant: John Does, Gloria Goldstein, Honorable Judge Supreme Court, involved in prosecution and Mark Dwyer, Honorable Judge - Supreme Court
Plaintiff / Appellant: Bennie Gibson
Defendant / Appellee: Richard Brown, District Attorney, John Does, 1-4, Queens Auto Crime Units, Supervisors Adm., Policy creators, investigator Trainors, Deputy Commissioner of New York City Police Department, Assistants District Attorney and Commissioner of New York City Police Department
Case Number: 19-2320
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 CURED DEFECTIVE, Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 13 ], on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED.[2639191] [19-2320] [Entered: 08/22/2019 01:56 PM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED. Service date 08/11/2019 by US mail.[2639190] [19-2320] [Entered: 08/22/2019 01:56 PM]
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [9], on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED.[2634223] [19-2320] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:51 AM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED. Service date 08/10/2019 by US mail.[2634220] [19-2320] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:49 AM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Bennie Gibson, FILED. Service date 08/10/2019 by US mail.[2634216] [19-2320] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:48 AM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED. Service date 08/11/1971 by US mail.[2634210] [19-2320] [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:45 AM]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, dated 08/15/2019, dismissing appeal by 09/06/2019, unless Appellant Bennie Gibson submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, FILED.[2633369] [19-2320] [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:40 PM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY, Zachary W. Carter, for Commissioner of New York City Police Department, Deputy Commissioner of New York City Police Department, Queens Auto Crime Units, Supervisors Adm., Policy creators, investigator Trainors, Richard Brown, District Attorney, Assistants District Attorney, John Does, 1-4, TERMINATED.[2630807] [19-2320] [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:31 AM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER, dated 08/09/2019, on behalf of Appellee Assistants District Attorney, Richard Brown, Commissioner of New York City Police Department, Deputy Commissioner of New York City Police Department, John Does and Queens Auto Crime Units, Zachary W. Carter, Corporation Counsel of the City of New York, no longer be identified as counsel for any of the defendants-appellees, RECEIVED. Service date 08/09/2019 by US mail.[2630803] [19-2320] [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:29 AM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2618805] [19-2320] [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:16 AM]
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2618794] [19-2320] [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:12 AM]
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURTJUDGMENT, dated 06/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2618792] [19-2320] [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:11 AM]
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bennie Gibson, FILED. [2618782] [19-2320] [Entered: 07/29/2019 10:09 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Commissioner of New York City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bennie Gibson
Represented By: Bennie Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Goldstein, Honorable Judge Supreme Court, involved in prosecution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Dwyer, Honorable Judge - Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard Brown, District Attorney
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Does, 1-4
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Queens Auto Crime Units, Supervisors Adm., Policy creators, investigator Trainors
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deputy Commissioner of New York City Police Department
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Assistants District Attorney
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Commissioner of New York City Police Department
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?