Robinson v. Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, N
Plaintiff / Appellant: Albert Robinson
Defendant / Appellee: Ralph Vincent Morales, David Keith Oaks, Kimberly Murphy, The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A., Alfred R. Vigorito, Scott A. Singer, Margaret Antonino, Gregg Douglas Weinstock, Adonaid C. Medina, Adam S. Covitt, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Anna I. Hock, Dylan Braverman, Anthony Venditto, Kevin D. Porter, Gilbert H. Choi, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Robert Boccio, John Doe, Wayne M. Roth, Kiki Chrisomallides, Jerry Giardina, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Edward J. Arevalo, Todd E. Gilbert and Gary W. Patterson
Case Number: 19-2721
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 43 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, reminds the Court the appellant does not oppose the motion to dismiss and requests the Court enters an order dismissing the appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 10/25/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2689941] [19-2721]--[Edited 10/25/2019 by RW] [Entered: 10/25/2019 04:24 PM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 41 PAPERS, notice submitted in the district court dismissing the appeal, on behalf of the Appellant Albert Robinson, RECEIVED.[2676719] [19-2721] [Entered: 10/09/2019 05:27 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 32 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, TO DISMISS, [ # 31 ], on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, FILED.[2662812] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/24/2019 11:26 AM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, FILED. Service date 09/20/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2662641] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/24/2019 10:33 AM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 29 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to dismiss, [27], on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2662048] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/23/2019 03:05 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, FILED. Service date 09/20/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2661866] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/23/2019 01:09 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 26 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to dismiss, [25], on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, John Doe, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2661034] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/20/2019 04:31 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, FILED. Service date 09/20/2019 by US mail. [2660726] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/20/2019 02:10 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 24 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to dismiss, [23], on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, John Doe, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2660596] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/20/2019 12:40 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, FILED. Service date 09/20/2019 by US mail. [2660546] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/20/2019 12:21 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE, to Appellee Kimberly Murphy, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2658954] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/18/2019 05:59 PM]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, dated 09/18/2019, dismissing appeal by 10/09/2019, unless Appellant Albert Robinson, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2658949] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/18/2019 05:53 PM]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, dated 09/18/2019, dismissing appeal by 10/09/2019, unless Appellant Albert Robinson, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2658946] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/18/2019 05:48 PM]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, dated 09/18/2019, dismissing appeal by 10/09/2019, unless Appellant Albert Robinson, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2658943] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/18/2019 05:44 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, FILED. Service date 09/16/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2656193] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/16/2019 12:54 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Adonaid Casado Medina for Margaret Antonino Dylan Braverman Adonaid C. Medina Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri Robert Boccio Gregg Douglas Weinstock Todd E. Gilbert Alfred R. Vigorito Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP Gary W. Patterson Kiki Chrisomallides Ralph Vincent Morales Carolyn Rankin Adam S. Covitt Edward J. Arevalo Anna I. Hock Jeffrey R. Nichols Scott A. Singer Jerry Giardina Anthony Venditto Kevin D. Porter Wayne M. Roth Gilbert H. Choi Leilani Rodriguez, in case 19-2721, [ # 13 ], ADDED.[2655414] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/13/2019 03:52 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Gregg D. Weinstock, [ # 12 ], in place of attorney Alfred P. Vigorito, SUBSTITUTED.[2655409] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/13/2019 03:50 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [ # 13 ], on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Kimberly Murphy, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, FILED.[2655405] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/13/2019 03:49 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUE COUNSEL,, [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A., Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, FILED.[2655398] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/13/2019 03:46 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, FILED. Service date 09/13/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2655231] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/13/2019 02:19 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, FILED. Service date 09/13/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2655216] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/13/2019 02:14 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [9], on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, David Keith Oaks, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A., Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, copy to pro se appellant/appellee, FILED.[2654420] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:38 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [8], on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, John Doe, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Kimberly Murphy, Jeffrey R. Nichols, David Keith Oaks, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A., Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, copy to pro se appellant/appellee, FILED.[2654399] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:30 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, FILED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2653984] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/12/2019 01:22 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Margaret Antonino, Edward J. Arevalo, Robert Boccio, Dylan Braverman, Gilbert H. Choi, Kiki Chrisomallides, Adam S. Covitt, Jerry Giardina, Todd E. Gilbert, Anna I. Hock, Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft, Adonaid C. Medina, Ralph Vincent Morales, Jeffrey R. Nichols, Gary W. Patterson, Kevin D. Porter, Carolyn Rankin, Leilani Rodriguez, Wayne M. Roth, Scott A. Singer, Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri, Anthony Venditto, Alfred R. Vigorito, Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP and Gregg Douglas Weinstock, FILED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2653974] [19-2721] [Entered: 09/12/2019 01:16 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2643956] [19-2721] [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:09 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2643953] [19-2721] [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:08 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/01/2019, RECEIVED.[2643951] [19-2721] [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:07 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/31/2019, RECEIVED.[2643949] [19-2721] [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:06 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Albert Robinson, FILED. [2643946] [19-2721] [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:03 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, N
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Albert Robinson
Represented By: Albert Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ralph Vincent Morales
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Keith Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kimberly Murphy
Represented By: Kimberly Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Law Firm of David K. Oaks, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alfred R. Vigorito
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott A. Singer
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Margaret Antonino
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Adonaid C. Medina
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Adam S. Covitt
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ruth Bogatyrow Kraft
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anna I. Hock
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dylan Braverman
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anthony Venditto
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kevin D. Porter
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gilbert H. Choi
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mamie Stathatos-Fulgieri
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffrey R. Nichols
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert Boccio
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wayne M. Roth
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kiki Chrisomallides
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jerry Giardina
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carolyn Rankin
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Leilani Rodriguez
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edward J. Arevalo
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Todd E. Gilbert
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gary W. Patterson
Represented By: Alfred P. Vigorito Esq.
Represented By: Gregg Douglas Weinstock
Represented By: Adonaid Casado Medina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?