Sowell v. Southbury-Middlebury Youth and
Defendant: Southbury-Middlebury Youth and Family Services, Inc., Mary Jane McClay and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff / Appellant: Julie M. Sowell and George E. Mendillo
Defendant / Appellee: Nina F. Elgo, Honorable, Judge of the Connecticut Appellate Court, Richard A. Robinson, Honorable, Chief Justice of the Connecticut Supreme Court, John P. Majewski, Jeffrey J. Tinley, Eliot D. Prescott, Honorable, Judge of the Connecticut Appellate Court, Tinley Renehan & Dost, LLP and Douglas S. Levine, Honorable, Judge of the Connecticut Appellate Court
Case Number: 19-2809
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 30 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 11/07/2019, appellee's brief due date as 12/12/2019,TRANSMITTED.[2671899] [19-2809] [Entered: 10/03/2019 04:55 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 29 NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[2671894] [19-2809] [Entered: 10/03/2019 04:51 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 26 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 25 ], on behalf of Appellee John P. Majewski, Jeffrey J. Tinley and Tinley Renehan & Dost, LLP, FILED.[2658858] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/18/2019 04:42 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee John P. Majewski, Tinley Renehan & Dost, LLP and Jeffrey J. Tinley, FILED. Service date 09/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2658838] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/18/2019 04:28 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 24 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [23], on behalf of Appellee John P. Majewski, Jeffrey J. Tinley and Tinley Renehan & Dost, LLP, FILED.[2658670] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/18/2019 02:55 PM]
September 18, 2019 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee John P. Majewski, Tinley Renehan & Dost, LLP and Jeffrey J. Tinley, FILED. Service date 09/18/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2658492] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/18/2019 01:17 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 21 INDEX/ROA NOTICE, to Appellant George E. Mendillo, past due material(s) to be submitted by 09/27/2019, SENT.[2656742] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/17/2019 08:39 AM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Nina F. Elgo, Douglas S. Levine, Eliot D. Prescott and Richard A. Robinson, FILED. Service date 09/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2655990] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/16/2019 10:57 AM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM D, [ # 11 ], on behalf of Appellant George E. Mendillo and Julie M. Sowell, FILED.[2654495] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/12/2019 05:11 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [ # 10 ], on behalf of Appellant George E. Mendillo and Julie M. Sowell, FILED.[2654494] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/12/2019 05:10 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D, [9], on behalf of Appellant George E. Mendillo, FILED.[2654490] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/12/2019 05:07 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant George E. Mendillo and Julie M. Sowell, informing Court of proposed due date 11/25/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2654485] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/12/2019 05:05 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [8], on behalf of Appellant George E. Mendillo, FILED.[2654483] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/12/2019 05:04 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant George E. Mendillo and Julie M. Sowell, FILED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2654331] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:00 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant George E. Mendillo and Julie M. Sowell, FILED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2654234] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:21 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant George E. Mendillo and Julie M. Sowell, FILED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2654232] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:19 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant George E. Mendillo, FILED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2654203] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:11 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant George E. Mendillo, FILED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2654126] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:46 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2649854] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/09/2019 08:40 AM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant George E. Mendillo and Julie M. Sowell, district court receipt # ACTDC-5420220, FILED.[2647834] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:10 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/06/2019, RECEIVED.[2647831] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:09 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/05/2019, RECEIVED.[2647829] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:08 PM]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant George E. Mendillo and Julie M. Sowell, FILED. [2647821] [19-2809] [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sowell v. Southbury-Middlebury Youth and
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Julie M. Sowell
Represented By: George Eli Mendillo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: George E. Mendillo
Represented By: George Eli Mendillo Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nina F. Elgo, Honorable, Judge of the Connecticut Appellate Court
Represented By: Michael Skold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Richard A. Robinson, Honorable, Chief Justice of the Connecticut Supreme Court
Represented By: Michael Skold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John P. Majewski
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Tinley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffrey J. Tinley
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Tinley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Eliot D. Prescott, Honorable, Judge of the Connecticut Appellate Court
Represented By: Michael Skold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tinley Renehan & Dost, LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Tinley Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Douglas S. Levine, Honorable, Judge of the Connecticut Appellate Court
Represented By: Michael Skold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southbury-Middlebury Youth and Family Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jane McClay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?