Brown v. Rivera
Respondent: Eliot Spitzer
Respondent / Appellee: Israel Rivera, Superintendent, Coxsackie Correctional Facility
Petitioner / Appellant: Edward Brown
Case Number: 19-3027
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellant Edward Brown, FILED.[2700044] [19-3027]--[Edited 11/06/2019 by TT] [Entered: 11/06/2019 01:14 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION, for certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Edward Brown, FILED. Service date 10/22/2019 by US mail.[2700040] [19-3027] [Entered: 11/06/2019 01:13 PM]
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, dated 10/15/2019, dismissing appeal by 11/14/2019, unless Appellant Edward Brown, submits the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2679049] [19-3027] [Entered: 10/15/2019 09:30 AM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion for certificate of appealability, [7], on behalf of Appellant Edward Brown, FILED.[2679041] [19-3027] [Entered: 10/15/2019 09:22 AM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE, to Appellee Israel Rivera, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2678803] [19-3027] [Entered: 10/11/2019 04:45 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION, for certificate of appealability, on behalf of Appellant Edward Brown, FILED. Service date 10/01/2019 by US mail.[2679027] [19-3027] [Entered: 10/15/2019 09:15 AM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2661721] [19-3027] [Entered: 09/23/2019 11:56 AM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2661709] [19-3027] [Entered: 09/23/2019 11:49 AM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/03/2019, denying certificate of appealability, RECEIVED.[2661706] [19-3027] [Entered: 09/23/2019 11:48 AM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 09/03/2019, RECEIVED.[2661665] [19-3027] [Entered: 09/23/2019 11:32 AM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Edward Brown, FILED. [2661650] [19-3027] [Entered: 09/23/2019 11:29 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brown v. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Israel Rivera, Superintendent, Coxsackie Correctional Facility
Represented By: Leslie Elizabeth Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Edward Brown
Represented By: Edward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eliot Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?