In re: Lisa Elwell
Plaintiff / Appellant: Lisa V. Elwell
Defendant / Appellee: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 19-3039
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 29 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-124), on behalf of Appellant Lisa V. Elwell, FILED. Service date 11/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2711326] [19-3039] [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:14 PM]
November 20, 2019 Filing 28 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Lisa V. Elwell, FILED. Service date 11/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2711325] [19-3039] [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:12 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 25 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 11/20/2019, appellee's brief due date as 12/26/2019, TRANSMITTED.[2680199] [19-3039] [Entered: 10/16/2019 09:53 AM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 24 NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[2679778] [19-3039] [Entered: 10/15/2019 04:06 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 21 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 11/06/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2676225] [19-3039] [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:03 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Drew J. Cunningham for Lisa V. Elwell, in case 19-3039, [ # 19 ], ADDED.[2675913] [19-3039] [Entered: 10/09/2019 09:01 AM]
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Lisa V. Elwell, FILED. Service date 10/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2675834] [19-3039] [Entered: 10/08/2019 07:14 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Lisa V. Elwell, FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2674694] [19-3039] [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:33 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Lisa V. Elwell, FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2674693] [19-3039] [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:30 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Lisa V. Elwell, FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2674691] [19-3039] [Entered: 10/07/2019 06:25 PM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, Logan A. Carducci for Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, in case 19-3039, [ # 10 ], ADDED.[2673805] [19-3039] [Entered: 10/07/2019 11:19 AM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2673571] [19-3039] [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:39 AM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, FILED. Service date 10/04/2019 by CM/ECF.[2672837] [19-3039] [Entered: 10/04/2019 02:02 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2662939] [19-3039] [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:28 PM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Lisa V Elwell, district court receipt # ACTDC-5452122, FILED.[2662659] [19-3039] [Entered: 09/24/2019 10:40 AM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/27/2019, RECEIVED.[2662658] [19-3039] [Entered: 09/24/2019 10:39 AM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT RULING, dated 08/23/2019, RECEIVED.[2662655] [19-3039] [Entered: 09/24/2019 10:38 AM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT RULING, dated 08/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2662653] [19-3039] [Entered: 09/24/2019 10:38 AM]
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Lisa V Elwell, FILED. [2662642] [19-3039] [Entered: 09/24/2019 10:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Lisa Elwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lisa V. Elwell
Represented By: Jay Christopher Rooney Esq.
Represented By: Drew J. Cunningham Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Brian D. Rich Esq.
Represented By: Logan A. Carducci Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?