Medina v. Buther
Defendant: Michelle Belgard, M.D., Gregg Esposito, Captain at Eastern Correctional Facility, Kevin Signore, Captain at Five Points Correctional Facility, Donald M. Wilkins, Captain at Eastern Correctional Facility, Tricia Miller, Assistant Deputy Superintendent of Mental Health at Five Points Correctional Facility, Carl Koenigsmann, M.D., Kenneth Colao, Deputy Superintendent for Programs at Eastern Correctional Facility, Christopher M. Roberts, Correctional Officer at Five Points Correctional Facility, Bryan Bradt, Americans With Disabilities Act Coordinator, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Nancy Heywood, Deputy Commissioner and Counsel, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Patricia Jones, Deputy Superintendent for Programs at Five Points Correctional Facility, David S. Dinello, M.D., Patrick Burns, Correction Officer at Five Points Correctional Facility, Janice Wolf, M.D., Mikhail Gusman, M.D., Facility Health Service Director at Eastern Correctional Facility, Jacqueline Levitt, M.D., Sean O'Connor, Sergeant at Five Points Correctional Facility, New York State Office of Mental Health, A. Russo, Captain at Sullivan Correctional Facility, Wladyslaw Sidorowicz, M.D., Facility Health Service Director at Sullivan Correctional Facility, Patrick J. Griffin, Superintendent, Sullivan Correctional Facility, Daniel McGuane, Correction Officer at Five Points Correctional Facility, Darrowd Cunningham, Deputy Superintendent for Programs at Sullivan Correctional Facility, Raymond Coveny, Deputy Superintendent of Security at Five Points Correctional Facility, Carla Ross, Social Worker, Office of Mental Health at Sullivan Correctional Facility, Paula Bozer, M.D., M. Ranieri, Commissioner Hearing Officer at Five Points Correctional Facility, Lucy Buther, American's with Disabilities Act Coordinator, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Susan Mueller, M.D., Michael Sheahan, Superintendent at Five Points Correctional Facility and Thomas R. Griffin, Superintendent at Eastern Correctional Facility
Plaintiff / Appellee: Anthony Medina
Defendant / Appellant: New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision
Case Number: 19-3348
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 22 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision Brief due date as 01/24/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 01/24/2020, FILED.[2702763] [19-3348] [Entered: 11/08/2019 04:09 PM]
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision, informing Court of proposed due date 01/24/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 11/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2702155] [19-3348] [Entered: 11/08/2019 11:01 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 NEW CASE MANAGER, Kasey Hewitt, ASSIGNED.[2689759] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/25/2019 03:00 PM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [ # 11 ], on behalf of Appellee Anthony Medina, FILED.[2689393] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:20 PM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision, FILED. Service date 10/25/2019 by CM/ECF.[2689375] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:11 PM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision, FILED. Service date 10/25/2019 by CM/ECF.[2689363] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:06 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Anthony Medina, FILED. Service date 10/23/2019 by CM/ECF.[2687435] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/23/2019 04:05 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [9], on behalf of Appellee Anthony Medina, FILED.[2684109] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/21/2019 10:40 AM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Anthony Medina, FILED. Service date 10/21/2019 by CM/ECF.[2683831] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/21/2019 08:36 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17787496, FILED.[2683070] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/18/2019 11:35 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision, FILED. Service date 10/17/2019 by CM/ECF.[2682431] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/17/2019 04:34 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY, Matthew W. Grieco, [ # 5 ], in place of attorney Barbara D. Underwood, SUBSTITUTED.[2682374] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/17/2019 04:14 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision, FILED. Service date 10/17/2019 by CM/ECF. [2681926] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/17/2019 12:15 PM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2681730] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/17/2019 10:32 AM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/12/2019, RECEIVED.[2681727] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/17/2019 10:30 AM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 02/13/2019, RECEIVED.[2681723] [19-3348] [Entered: 10/17/2019 10:29 AM]
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision, FILED. [2681717] [19-3348]--[Edited 10/17/2019 by TT] [Entered: 10/17/2019 10:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Medina v. Buther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Belgard, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Esposito, Captain at Eastern Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Signore, Captain at Five Points Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald M. Wilkins, Captain at Eastern Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricia Miller, Assistant Deputy Superintendent of Mental Health at Five Points Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Koenigsmann, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Colao, Deputy Superintendent for Programs at Eastern Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. Roberts, Correctional Officer at Five Points Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Bradt, Americans With Disabilities Act Coordinator, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Heywood, Deputy Commissioner and Counsel, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Jones, Deputy Superintendent for Programs at Five Points Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Dinello, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Burns, Correction Officer at Five Points Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Wolf, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikhail Gusman, M.D., Facility Health Service Director at Eastern Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Levitt, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean O'Connor, Sergeant at Five Points Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Office of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Russo, Captain at Sullivan Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wladyslaw Sidorowicz, M.D., Facility Health Service Director at Sullivan Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Griffin, Superintendent, Sullivan Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel McGuane, Correction Officer at Five Points Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrowd Cunningham, Deputy Superintendent for Programs at Sullivan Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Coveny, Deputy Superintendent of Security at Five Points Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Ross, Social Worker, Office of Mental Health at Sullivan Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Bozer, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Ranieri, Commissioner Hearing Officer at Five Points Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Buther, American's with Disabilities Act Coordinator, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Mueller, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sheahan, Superintendent at Five Points Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Griffin, Superintendent at Eastern Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Anthony Medina
Represented By: Amy Jane Agnew Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision
Represented By: Matthew William Grieco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?