Sonterra Capital Master Fund L v. Credit Suisse Group AG
Defendant: Bluecrest Capital Management LLP and JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Plaintiff / Appellant: FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P., Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Frank Divitto, HG Holdings, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd., FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P., HG Holdings II, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P., FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P., Richard Dennis, FrontPoint European Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P. and California State Teachers Retirement System
Defendant / Appellee: Tullett Prebon (Europe) Limited, ICAP Securities USA LLC., ICAP Europe Limited, John Doe, Nos. 1-50, Tullett Prebon (USA) Inc., Gottex Brokers SA, Tullett Prebon Financial Services LLC, DB Group Services (UK) Limited, UBS AG, ICAP Securities USA LLC, TP ICAP plc, Credit Suisse Group AG, Cosmorex AG, Velcor SA, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Deutsche Bank AG, NEX Group plc, Intercapital Capital Markets LLC, Tullett Prebon Americas Corp., Credit Suisse AG and The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC
Case Number: 19-3367
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to hold appeal in abeyance, [ # 67 ] granting motion for removal from expedited appeals calendar, [ # 67 ] filed by Appellant FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P., Richard Dennis, Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., HG Holdings, Ltd., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P., HG Holdings II, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P., Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd., FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P., FrontPoint European Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., Frank Divitto and California State Teachers Retirement System, by RKW, FILED. [2721354][71] [19-3367] [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:01 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, remove appeal from expedited calendar, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers Retirement System, Richard Dennis, Frank Divitto, FrontPoint European Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P., HG Holdings II, Ltd., HG Holdings, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/27/2019 by CM/ECF. [2717734] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:24 PM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 66 ATTORNEY, Eric F. Citron for HG Holdings II, Ltd. California State Teachers Retirement System FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P. Frank Divitto FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P. FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P. Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd. Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd. FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P. Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P. Richard Dennis HG Holdings, Ltd. FrontPoint European Fund, L.P. FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P. FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P. Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd. Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd. Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P., in case 19-3367 , [ # 65 ], ADDED.[2717405] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/27/2019 09:50 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers Retirement System, Richard Dennis, Frank Divitto, FrontPoint European Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P., HG Holdings II, Ltd., HG Holdings, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/27/2019 by CM/ECF. [2717376] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/27/2019 09:33 AM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 64 ATTORNEY, Margaret C. MacLean for HG Holdings II, Ltd. California State Teachers Retirement System FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P. Frank Divitto FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P. FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P. Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd. Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd. FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P. Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P. Richard Dennis HG Holdings, Ltd. FrontPoint European Fund, L.P. FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P. FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P. Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd. Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd. Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P., in case 19-3367 , [ # 62 ], ADDED.[2715955] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/26/2019 09:05 AM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 63 ATTORNEY, Luke J. O'Brien for DB Group Services (UK) Limited Deutsche Bank AG, in case 19-3367 , [ # 61 ], ADDED.[2715948] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/26/2019 09:02 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Richard Dennis, California State Teachers Retirement System, Frank Divitto, FrontPoint European Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P., HG Holdings II, Ltd., HG Holdings, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/25/2019 by CM/ECF. [2715355] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:37 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee DB Group Services (UK) Limited and Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 11/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2709349] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/18/2019 04:54 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 60 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 56 ], [ # 57 ], on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED.[2709336] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/18/2019 04:52 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 59 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee DB Group Services (UK) Limited, FILED. Service date 11/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2709325] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/18/2019 04:46 PM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 57 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 11/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2707961] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/15/2019 07:22 PM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 56 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [55], on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED.[2707504] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/15/2019 02:24 PM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 55 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 11/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2707443] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/15/2019 01:44 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 53 CAPTION, ICAP Securities USA LLC. terminated as an Appellee per letter dated 11/01/2019, AMENDED.[2705010] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/13/2019 01:49 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 52 ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell, [ # 51 ], in place of attorney Lawrence J. Zweifach, SUBSTITUTED.[2703303] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/12/2019 10:44 AM]
November 11, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 11/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2703065] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/11/2019 06:44 PM]
November 1, 2019 Filing 50 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cosmorex AG, Gottex Brokers SA, ICAP Europe Limited, ICAP Securities USA LLC, Intercapital Capital Markets LLC, NEX Group plc, TP ICAP plc, Tullett Prebon (Europe) Limited, Tullett Prebon (USA) Inc., Tullett Prebon Americas Corp., Tullett Prebon Financial Services LLC and Velcor SA, requesting ICAP Securities USA LLC. be removed as a Defendant-Appellee, RECEIVED. Service date 11/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2696393] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/01/2019 05:10 PM]
November 1, 2019 Filing 49 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 12/06/2019, appellee's brief due date as 01/10/2020,TRANSMITTED.[2695691] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/01/2019 01:42 PM]
November 1, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE, to Appellee DB Group Services (UK) Limited, ICAP Securities USA LLC. and UBS AG , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2695126] [19-3367] [Entered: 11/01/2019 10:17 AM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 43 NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[2694769] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/31/2019 04:38 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 36 CAPTION, Defendant-Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co. to Defendant, AMENDED.[2693712] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/31/2019 08:39 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, T. Jakob Sebrow for ICAP Europe Limited Tullett Prebon Financial Services LLC Intercapital Capital Markets LLC Velcor SA Cosmorex AG TP ICAP plc NEX Group plc ICAP Securities USA LLC. Tullett Prebon (Europe) Limited Gottex Brokers SA ICAP Securities USA LLC Tullett Prebon Americas Corp. Tullett Prebon (USA) Inc., in case 19-3367, [ # 34 ], ADDED.[2693561] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:57 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cosmorex AG, Gottex Brokers SA, ICAP Europe Limited, ICAP Securities USA LLC, Intercapital Capital Markets LLC, NEX Group plc, TP ICAP plc, Tullett Prebon (Europe) Limited, Tullett Prebon (USA) Inc., Tullett Prebon Americas Corp., Tullett Prebon Financial Services LLC and Velcor SA, FILED. Service date 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF. [2693500] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 03:59 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 33 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers Retirement System, Richard Dennis, Frank Divitto, FrontPoint European Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P., HG Holdings II, Ltd., HG Holdings, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2693411] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 02:45 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 32 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers Retirement System, Richard Dennis, Frank Divitto, FrontPoint European Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P., HG Holdings II, Ltd., HG Holdings, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2693407] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 02:44 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers Retirement System, Richard Dennis, Frank Divitto, FrontPoint European Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P., HG Holdings II, Ltd., HG Holdings, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2693402] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 02:42 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Shari A. Brandt for ICAP Europe Limited Tullett Prebon Financial Services LLC Intercapital Capital Markets LLC Velcor SA Cosmorex AG TP ICAP plc NEX Group plc ICAP Securities USA LLC. Tullett Prebon (Europe) Limited Gottex Brokers SA ICAP Securities USA LLC Tullett Prebon Americas Corp. Tullett Prebon (USA) Inc., in case 19-3367, [ # 28 ], ADDED.[2692988] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 11:51 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 29 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee JPMorgan Chase & Co., informing the court they will not be participating with the appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2692986] [19-3367]--[Edited 10/30/2019 by KR] [Entered: 10/30/2019 11:51 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Velcor SA, Tullett Prebon Financial Services LLC, Tullett Prebon Americas Corp., Tullett Prebon (USA) Inc., Tullett Prebon (Europe) Limited, TP ICAP plc, NEX Group plc, Intercapital Capital Markets LLC, ICAP Securities USA LLC, ICAP Europe Limited, Gottex Brokers SA and Cosmorex AG, FILED. Service date 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF. [2692961] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 11:44 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 27 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cosmorex AG, Gottex Brokers SA, ICAP Europe Limited, ICAP Securities USA LLC, Intercapital Capital Markets LLC, NEX Group plc, TP ICAP plc, Tullett Prebon (Europe) Limited, Tullett Prebon (USA) Inc., Tullett Prebon Americas Corp., Tullett Prebon Financial Services LLC and Velcor SA, FILED. Service date 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2692950] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 11:38 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 10/30/2019 by CM/ECF.[2692729] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 10:23 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY, Lauren Perlgut for Credit Suisse AG Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 19-3367, [ # 19 ], ADDED.[2692472] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 08:53 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Credit Suisse AG Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 19-3367, [ # 18 ], ADDED.[2692469] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 08:52 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Credit Suisse AG Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 19-3367, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2692466] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 08:50 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Credit Suisse AG Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 19-3367, [ # 16 ], ADDED.[2692463] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 08:48 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Credit Suisse AG Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 19-3367, [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2692458] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 08:46 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [ # 14 ], in place of attorney Adam Mintz, SUBSTITUTED.[2692456] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/30/2019 08:45 AM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 10/29/2019 by CM/ECF. [2692417] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/29/2019 08:20 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 10/29/2019 by CM/ECF. [2692416] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/29/2019 08:18 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 10/29/2019 by CM/ECF. [2692415] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/29/2019 08:16 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 10/29/2019 by CM/ECF. [2692414] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/29/2019 08:14 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 10/29/2019 by CM/ECF. [2692413] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/29/2019 08:12 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 10/29/2019 by CM/ECF. [2692412] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/29/2019 08:05 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 10/29/2019 by CM/ECF.[2691823] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:00 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY, Jamie Dycus for The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, in case 19-3367, [ # 10 ], ADDED.[2691780] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/29/2019 01:39 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY, David Sapir Lesser, [ # 9 ], in place of attorney Alan E. Schoenfeld, SUBSTITUTED.[2691776] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/29/2019 01:38 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 10/29/2019 by CM/ECF. [2691735] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/29/2019 01:08 PM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 10/29/2019 by CM/ECF. [2691732] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/29/2019 01:05 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 10/24/2019 by CM/ECF.[2688480] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/24/2019 03:59 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2682331] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/17/2019 04:00 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers Retirement System, Richard Dennis, Frank Divitto, FrontPoint European Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P., HG Holdings II, Ltd., HG Holdings, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., district court receipt # ANYSDC-17778923., FILED.[2682329] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/17/2019 03:59 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT CLERK'S JUDGMENT, dated 09/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2682328] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/17/2019 03:58 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION & ORDER, dated 09/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2682327] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/17/2019 03:57 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers Retirement System, Richard Dennis, Frank Divitto, FrontPoint European Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P., FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P., HG Holdings II, Ltd., HG Holdings, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd., Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. [2682321] [19-3367] [Entered: 10/17/2019 03:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonterra Capital Master Fund L v. Credit Suisse Group AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Enhanced Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hunter Global Investors SRI Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FrontPoint Financial Services Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Frank Divitto
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HG Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hunter Global Investors Offshore Fund II, Ltd.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FrontPoint Healthcare Horizons Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HG Holdings II, Ltd.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hunter Global Investors Fund II, L.P.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FrontPoint Utility and Energy Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FrontPoint Healthcare Flagship Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hunter Global Investors Fund I, L.P.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Richard Dennis
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FrontPoint European Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FrontPoint Financial Horizons Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: California State Teachers Retirement System
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Margaret C. MacLean Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tullett Prebon (Europe) Limited
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ICAP Securities USA LLC.
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ICAP Europe Limited
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Doe, Nos. 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tullett Prebon (USA) Inc.
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gottex Brokers SA
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tullett Prebon Financial Services LLC
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DB Group Services (UK) Limited
Represented By: Aidan Synnott Esq.
Represented By: Luke J. O'Brien Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UBS AG
Represented By: Lawrence J. Zweifach Esq.
Represented By: Jefferson E. Bell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ICAP Securities USA LLC
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TP ICAP plc
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Suisse Group AG
Represented By: Adam Mintz Esq.
Represented By: Jason M. Hall Esq.
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Represented By: Lauren Perlgut Esq.
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer Esq.
Represented By: Joel Kurtzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cosmorex AG
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Velcor SA
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: Aidan Synnott Esq.
Represented By: Luke J. O'Brien Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEX Group plc
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Intercapital Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tullett Prebon Americas Corp.
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Suisse AG
Represented By: Adam Mintz Esq.
Represented By: Jason M. Hall Esq.
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Represented By: Lauren Perlgut Esq.
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer Esq.
Represented By: Joel Kurtzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Represented By: Jamie Dycus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluecrest Capital Management LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Paul C. Gluckow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?