Malloy v. Cuomo
Defendant / Appellee: Tina M. Stanford, Chairwoman of the State of New York and Andrew Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York
Plaintiff / Appellant: Anthony Malloy
Case Number: 19-3759
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, dated 01/06/2020, dismissing appeal by 01/27/2020, unless Appellant Anthony Malloy, submits a Signed Prisoner Authorization form, FILED.[2744865] [19-3759] [Entered: 01/06/2020 04:43 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[2733340] [19-3759] [Entered: 12/18/2019 04:01 PM]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, dated 12/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 12/02/2020 unless Appellant Anthony Malloy submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, FILED.[2725112] [19-3759] [Entered: 12/10/2019 10:00 AM]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, dated 12/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 12/20/2019, unless Appellant Anthony Malloy, submits form Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, FILED.[2725073] [19-3759] [Entered: 12/10/2019 09:45 AM]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 12/10/2019, dismissing appeal by 01/02/2020 unless Appellant Anthony Malloy submits form D-P, FILED.[2725010] [19-3759] [Entered: 12/10/2019 09:02 AM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY, Barbara D. Underwood, for Andrew Cuomo, Tina M. Stanford, TERMINATED.[2720409] [19-3759] [Entered: 12/04/2019 07:02 AM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Cuomo and Tina M. Stanford, informing this Court they do not currently represent the state defendants RECEIVED. Service date 12/03/2019 by US mail.[2720220] [19-3759] [Entered: 12/03/2019 04:32 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2705104] [19-3759] [Entered: 11/13/2019 02:19 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2705099] [19-3759] [Entered: 11/13/2019 02:15 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2705093] [19-3759] [Entered: 11/13/2019 02:14 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2705088] [19-3759] [Entered: 11/13/2019 02:12 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Anthony Malloy, FILED. [2705079] [19-3759] [Entered: 11/13/2019 02:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malloy v. Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tina M. Stanford, Chairwoman of the State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Andrew Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Anthony Malloy
Represented By: Anthony Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?